Engine cylinder head elevator apparatus and method of use

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 10043835
Examiner Robert C Watson, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Robert C Watson
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Attorney at Law, Applicant
Officially listed as "Burns, Thomas Robert"

Represented by Brooks Kushman PC

Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Burns, Thomas Robert, Clarkston, MI (US)
Filing Date January 14, 2002
Status Abandoned -- Failure to Respond to an Office Action
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 01-1-115
Confirmation Number 1182
Group Art Unit 3723
Class / Sub-Class 29 / 252
Timeline
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Assignments (1) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Abandonment for Failure to Respond to Office Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Aband. for Failure to Respond to O. A.
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/31/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Transfer Inquiry to GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Response to Election / Restriction Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Restriction Requirement
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Restriction/Election Requirement
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Transfer Inquiry to GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/14/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Now Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/2/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 4 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?