Network-based Method And System For Distributing Data

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 10066795
Examiner Tan Quang Nguyen, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Tan Quang Nguyen
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Carroll, Anthony, Applicant

Represented by Andrews & Kurth, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space L. Scott Bloebaum +1 919 313 4830 +1 202 974 9553 ScottBloebaum@andrewskurth.com
Space Peter Brunovskis +1 312 321 4233
Space Frederick Frei +1 202 662 3049
Space Kelly Kasha +1 240 423 8431
Space James Mahon +1 212 878 8073
Space Aldo Noto +1 202 662 2700 +1 202 662 2739 notoa@andrewskurth.com
Space Francois VanderVegt +1 202 662 3053
Space Ping Wang +1 202 662 2700
Space Joseph Williams +1 512 320 9200
Space Sean Wooden +1 202 662 2738
Space Michael Ye +1 202 662 3008
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Carroll, Anthony, Cork (IE)
Filing Date February 6, 2002
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 10473-839
Confirmation Number 5571
Group Art Unit 3661
Class / Sub-Class 701 / 33
Timeline
  Entries (136) Tab Overlap Assignments (3) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - R3.73B
Assignee showing of ownership per 37 CFR 3.73(b). (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
Power of Attorney (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - ARTIFACT
Artifact sheet indicating an item has been filed which cannot be scanned (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None Prosecution - RXOGNOTC
Notice of Reexam Published in Official Gazette (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Dispatch to FDC
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Dispatch to FDC
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Dispatch to FDC
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Received
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - IFEE
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - IFEE
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Dispatch to Publications
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (9 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - 1449
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (8 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Rescinded Abandonment
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Rescinded Abandonment in TCs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Petition to Revive Application - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - PETDEC
Petition Decision (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - IMIS
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition Entered
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow incoming amendment IFW
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (12 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.OP
Petition for review by the Office of Petitions. (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Abandonment for Failure to Respond to Office Action
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - ABN
Abandonment (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/1/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Aband. for Failure to Respond to O. A.
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - FOR
Foreign Reference (14 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - 371P
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - 371P
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - 371P
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - NPL
Non Patent Literature (7 Pages)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - FOR
Foreign Reference (29 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - 371P
Documents submitted with 371 Applications (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - 892
List of references cited by examiner (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (7 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Record Petition Decision of Granted Related to Inventor in Application
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Petition Decision - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - PETDEC
Petition Decision (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition Entered
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition Entered
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - AF/D
Rule 130, 131 or 132 Affidavits (16 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - AF/D
Rule 130, 131 or 132 Affidavits (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - AF/D
Rule 130, 131 or 132 Affidavits (8 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - AF/D
Rule 130, 131 or 132 Affidavits (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - AF/D
Rule 130, 131 or 132 Affidavits (9 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
Specification (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
Specification (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.OP
Petition for review by the Office of Petitions. (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - RESC
Rescind Nonpublication Request for Pre Grant Pub (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/28/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Now Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Payment of additional filing fee/Preexam
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Applicant has submitted new drawings to correct Corrected Papers problems
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (8 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
Oath or Declaration filed (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - PEFR
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: None Pacr - OATH
Oath or Declaration filed (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: None Pacr - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (8 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: None Pacr - TRNA
Transmittal of New Application (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice Mailed--Application Incomplete--Filing Date Assigned
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - PEFN
Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/16/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - WCLM
Claims Worksheet (PTO-2022) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (9 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
Specification (17 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (7 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
Transmittal of New Application (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None Pacr - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (7 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None Pacr - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None Pacr - CLM
Claims (9 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None Pacr - SPEC
Specification (17 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None Pacr - TRNA
Transmittal of New Application (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 15 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?