Harris, et al v. City of Boston
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-10123
Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 21, 2016 at 11:59 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bradford H. Jones, Plaintiff
No Logo Catherine Doherty, Plaintiff
No Logo Daniel M. Keeler, Plaintiff
No Logo Daniel P. Linskey, Plaintiff
No Logo David I. Walsh, Plaintiff
No Logo Dennis P. Harris, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F. McMahon +1 617 723 5500 +1 617 742 1015 jack.mcmahon@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Angoff, Goldman, Manning, Wanger & Hynes, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul T. Hynes +1 781 255 7700 phynes@angoffgoldman.com
No Logo Eduardo Dominques, Jr., Plaintiff
No Logo Edward D. Simmons, Plaintiff
No Logo Francis W. Armstrong, Jr., Plaintiff
No Logo J. Brewster, Plaintiff
No Logo Jeffrey Wolcott, Plaintiff
No Logo John A. Hamm, Plaintiff
No Logo John E. Lydstone, Plaintiff
No Logo Kathleen Doris, Plaintiff
No Logo Kelley A. Nee, Plaintiff
No Logo Kevin Buckley, Plaintiff
No Logo Kevin L. Witherspoon, Plaintiff
No Logo Maria Walsh, Plaintiff
No Logo Martin M. Wright, Plaintiff
No Logo Mary A. McInness, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Cox, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael P. Harper, Plaintiff
No Logo Miguel Novo, Jr., Plaintiff
No Logo Patricia Eagar, Plaintiff
No Logo Patricia Levitan, Plaintiff
No Logo Paul J. Corboy, Plaintiff
No Logo Paul Schroeder, Plaintiff
No Logo Rachel L. Keefe, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert M. Zingg, Plaintiff
No Logo Steven Downs, Plaintiff
No Logo William D. Mahoney, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo City Of Boston, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Deutsch Williams Brooks DeRensis & Holland, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Foskett +1 617 951 2300 +1 617 951 2323 jfoskett@dwboston.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Holland +1 617 951 2300
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine S. Reidy +1 617 951 2300
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 68 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: None
STIPULATION Re Pltfs' attys' fees by Francis W. Armstrong Jr., J. Brewster, Kevin Buckley, City of Boston, Paul J. Corboy, Michael Cox, Catherine Doherty, Eduardo Dominques Jr., Kathleen Doris, Steven Downs, Patricia Eagar, John A. Hamm, Michael P. Harper, Dennis P. Harris, Bradford H. Jones, Rachel L. Keefe, Daniel M. Keeler, Patricia Levitan, Daniel P. Linskey, John E. Lydstone, William D. Mahoney, Mary A. McInness, Kelley A. Nee, Miguel Novo Jr., Paul Schroeder, Edward D. Simmons, David I. Walsh, Maria Walsh, Kevin L. Witherspoon, Jeffrey Wolcott, Martin M. Wright, Robert M. Zingg, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 12/15/2004)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
    ASSENTED TO MOTION for Extension of Time from the close of business on 12/6/04 to 12/13/04 to File a Claim for atttorney's fees, by Pltfs Francis W. Armstrong Jr., J. Brewster, Kevin Buckley, City of Boston, Paul J. Corboy, Michael Cox, Catherine Doherty, Eduardo Dominques Jr., Kathleen Doris, Steven Downs, Patricia Eagar, John A. Hamm, Michael P. Harper, Dennis P. Harris, Bradford H. Jones, Rachel L. Keefe, Daniel M. Keeler, Patricia Levitan, Daniel P. Linskey, John E. Lydstone, William D. Mahoney, Mary A. McInness, Kelley A. Nee, Miguel Novo Jr., Paul Schroeder, Edward D. Simmons, David I. Walsh, Maria Walsh, Kevin L. Witherspoon, Jeffrey Wolcott, Martin M. Wright, Robert M. Zingg et al, FILED.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 12/07/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 66 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
      Judge Robert B. Collings : JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs against Defendant.(Dolan, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/04/2004)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
        PARTIES' PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT. (Dolan, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/02/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: None
          Letter dated 10/14/04 from John Foskett to MJ Collings requesting that the parties be given to 11/1/04 to submit the agreed-upon form of judgment, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 10/21/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: None
            AFFIDAVIT of Patricia Murphy by City of Boston, FILED, c/s. (Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: None
              ASSENTED TO MOTION for Extension of Time by Deft for Filing of Agreed-Upon Form of Judgment to and including October 15, 2004, by City of Boston, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: None
                Consents of Michael P. Harper and Michael P. Harper as Party Pltfs and FILED. (Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 07/20/2004)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER for deadline for filing motions to add parties entered.(Dolan, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/17/2004)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: None
                    SUPPLEMENTAL notice of consents by Francis W. Armstrong Jr., J. Brewster, Kevin Buckley, Paul J. Corboy, Michael Cox, Catherine Doherty, Eduardo Dominques Jr., Kathleen Doris, Steven Downs, Patricia Eagar, John A. Hamm, Dennis P. Harris, Bradford H. Jones, Rachel L. Keefe, Daniel M. Keeler, Patricia Levitan, Daniel P. Linskey, John E. Lydstone, William D. Mahoney, Mary A. McInness, Kelley A. Nee, Miguel Novo Jr., Paul Schroeder, Edward D. Simmons, David I. Walsh, Maria Walsh, Jeffrey Wolcott, Martin M. Wright, Robert M. Zingg (Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 06/16/2004)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                      NOTICE of TELEPHONE Status Conference set for 6/15/2004 03:15 PM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Robert B. Collings. (Dolan, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/03/2004)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: None
                        Consent of Francis T. Miller filed Pursuqnt to 16(b), 29:216(b), FILED. (Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 05/28/2004)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Judge Robert B. Collings : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting 47 Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages; denying 50 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages. Counsel shall agree on form of judgment to be entered and forward same to the Court. (Dolan, Kathleen) (Entered: 04/08/2004)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: None
                            REPLY BRIEF by Pltfs Francis W. Armstrong Jr., J. Brewster, Kevin Buckley, Paul J. Corboy, Michael Cox, Catherine Doherty, Eduardo Dominques Jr., Kathleen Doris, Steven Downs, Patricia Eagar, John A. Hamm, Dennis P. Harris, Bradford H. Jones, Rachel L. Keefe, Daniel M. Keeler, Patricia Levitan, Daniel P. Linskey, John E. Lydstone, William D. Mahoney, Mary A. McInness, Kelley A. Nee, Miguel Novo Jr., Paul Schroeder, Edward D. Simmons, David I. Walsh, Maria Walsh, Jeffrey Wolcott, Martin M. Wright, Robert M. Zingg, FILED, c/s. (Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 02/04/2004)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: None
                              AFFIDAVIT of Sally Glora re 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment.c/s (Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 01/27/2004)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: None
                                AFFIDAVIT of David M. Connelly re 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment.c/s (Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 01/27/2004)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: None
                                  STATEMENT of facts re 50 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment.c/s (Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 01/27/2004)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: None
                                    Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment and in support of Defendants 50 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City of Boston.c/s (Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 01/27/2004)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: None
                                      Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages issues by City of Boston.c/s(Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 01/27/2004)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: None
                                        LOCAL RULE 56.1 STATEMENT of 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment, FILED, c/s. (Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: None
                                          MEMORANDUM in Support of 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Francis W. Armstrong Jr., J. Brewster, Kevin Buckley, Paul J. Corboy, Michael Cox, Catherine Doherty, Eduardo Dominques Jr., Kathleen Doris, Steven Downs, Patricia Eagar, John A. Hamm, Dennis P. Harris, Bradford H. Jones, Rachel L. Keefe, Daniel M. Keeler, Patricia Levitan, Daniel P. Linskey, John E. Lydstone, William D. Mahoney, Mary A. McInness, Kelley A. Nee, Miguel Novo Jr., Paul Schroeder, Edward D. Simmons, David I. Walsh, Maria Walsh, Jeffrey Wolcott, Martin M. Wright, Robert M. Zing, FIled, C/S. (Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Summary Judgmenton Damages by Francis W. Armstrong Jr., J. Brewster, Kevin Buckley, Paul J. Corboy, Michael Cox, Catherine Doherty, Eduardo Dominques Jr., Kathleen Doris, Steven Downs, Patricia Eagar, John A. Hamm, Dennis P. Harris, Bradford H. Jones, Rachel L. Keefe, Daniel M. Keeler, Patricia Levitan, Daniel P. Linskey, John E. Lydstone, William D. Mahoney, Mary A. McInness, Kelley A. Nee, Miguel Novo Jr., Paul Schroeder, Edward D. Simmons, David I. Walsh, Maria Walsh, Jeffrey Wolcott, Martin M. Wright, Robert M. Zingg, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/18/2003, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of FURTHER CONFERENCE scheduled for 10/16/2003 12:45 PM in Courtroom 14 before Robert B. Collings. (Dolan, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/18/2003)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                FURTHER STATUS REPORT by City of Boston. (Affsa, Gina) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                  Letter from John Foskett requesting leave until Sept. 10, 2003 to file status report. (Affsa, Gina) (Entered: 08/19/2003)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                    Letter from John Foskett, Esq. regarding proposed procedures for determining FLSA damages and requesting that counsel not have to appear at the June 3rd conference. (Affsa, Gina) (Entered: 05/30/2003)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Mag. Judge Robert B. Collings. Clerk's Notes: set further scheduling conference for 10:30 6/3/03 The liability phase of the case is complete. Counsel request six weeks to try to arrive at framework for determing damages. Further Conference: 6/3/03 at 10:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Tape X (ktb) (Entered: 04/21/2003)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                        Unopposed Sixth Motion by Dennis P. Harris in 1:02-cv-10123, John A. Hamm in 1:02-cv-10123, Eduardo Dominques Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel M. Keeler in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, William D. Mahoney in 1:02-cv-10123, J.Brewster in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul J. Corboy in 1:02-cv-10123, Kathleen Doris in 1:02-cv-10123, Bradford H. Jones in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel P. Linskey in 1:02-cv-10123, Kelley A. Nee in 1:02-cv-10123, Miguel Novo Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul Schroeder in 1:02-cv-10123, Martin M. Wright in 1:02-cv-10123, Robert M. Zingg in 1:02-cv-10123, Michael Cox in 1:02-cv-10123, Catherine Doherty in 1:02-cv-10123, Steven Downs in 1:02-cv-10123, Patricia Eagar in 1:02-cv-10123, Rachel L. Keefe in 1:02-cv-10123, Patricia Levitan in 1:02-cv-10123, John E. Lydstone in 1:02-cv-10123, Mary A. McInness in 1:02-cv-10123, David I. Walsh in 1:02-cv-10123, Maria Walsh in 1:02-cv-10123, Jeffrey Wolcott in 1:02-cv-10123 to add party plaintiffs , filed. (mlb) (Entered: 04/04/2003)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Mag. Judge Robert B. Collings . Notice of Status Conference: set status conference for 10:30 4/14/03 . (mlb) (Entered: 04/04/2003)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Mag. Judge Robert B. Collings . Clerk's Notes: Court Re Further 16(b) Conference: Reporter: Tape X (ktb) (Entered: 04/02/2003)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Mag. Judge Robert B. Collings . Memorandum and Order entered. denying [32-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment granting [34-1] cross motion for partial summary judgment as to Claims in Amended Complaint [EOD Date 4/1/03] (ktb) (Entered: 04/01/2003)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                Letter by John F. McMahon in 1:02-cv-10123 dated: 3/14/03 to: clerk re: waiving jury claim filed. (mr) (Entered: 03/31/2003)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: None
                                                                  Local Rule 56.1 Statement of counsel filed by City of Boston, FILED, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 08/28/2002)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: None
                                                                    Response by City of Boston in 1:02-cv-10123 in opposition to [34-1] cross motion for partial summary judgment as to Claims in Amended Complaint, and Memoramdum of Reasons, filed, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 08/28/2002)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: None
                                                                      Cross motion by City of Boston in 1:02-cv-10123 for partial summary judgment as to Claims in Amended Complaint , filed, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 08/28/2002)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                        Memorandum by Dennis P. Harris in 1:02-cv-10123, John A. Hamm in 1:02-cv-10123, Eduardo Dominques Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel M. Keeler in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, William D. Mahoney in 1:02-cv-10123, J.Brewster in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul J. Corboy in 1:02-cv-10123, Kathleen Doris in 1:02-cv-10123, Bradford H. Jones in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel P. Linskey in 1:02-cv-10123, Kelley A. Nee in 1:02-cv-10123, Miguel Novo Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul Schroeder in 1:02-cv-10123, Martin M. Wright in 1:02-cv-10123, Robert M. Zingg in 1:02-cv-10123, Michael Cox in 1:02-cv-10123, Catherine Doherty in 1:02-cv-10123, Steven Downs in 1:02-cv-10123, Patricia Eagar in 1:02-cv-10123, Rachel L. Keefe in 1:02-cv-10123, Patricia Levitan in 1:02-cv-10123, John E. Lydstone in 1:02-cv-10123, Mary A. McInness in 1:02-cv-10123, David I. Walsh in 1:02-cv-10123, Maria Walsh in 1:02-cv-10123, Jeffrey Wolcott in 1:02-cv-10123 in support of [32-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 08/21/2002)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                          Motion by Dennis P. Harris, et al in 1:02-cv-10123 for Partial Summary Judgment , filed, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 08/21/2002)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                            Statement of counsel filed by Dennis P. Harris in 1:02-cv-10123, John A. Hamm in 1:02-cv-10123, Eduardo Dominques Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel M. Keeler in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, William D. Mahoney in 1:02-cv-10123, J.Brewster in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul J. Corboy in 1:02-cv-10123, Kathleen Doris in 1:02-cv-10123, Bradford H. Jones in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel P. Linskey in 1:02-cv-10123, Kelley A. Nee in 1:02-cv-10123, Miguel Novo Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul Schroeder in 1:02-cv-10123, Martin M. Wright in 1:02-cv-10123, Robert M. Zingg in 1:02-cv-10123, Michael Cox in 1:02-cv-10123, Catherine Doherty in 1:02-cv-10123, Steven Downs in 1:02-cv-10123, Patricia Eagar in 1:02-cv-10123, Rachel L. Keefe in 1:02-cv-10123, Patricia Levitan in 1:02-cv-10123, John E. Lydstone in 1:02-cv-10123, Mary A. McInness in 1:02-cv-10123, David I. Walsh in 1:02-cv-10123, Maria Walsh in 1:02-cv-10123, Jeffrey Wolcott in 1:02-cv-10123 Re: Rule 56.1. FILED, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 08/21/2002)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                              Letter by John F. McMahon in 1:02-cv-10123 dated: July 31, 2002 to: Gina Piccininno re: motion for summary judgment filed. (kf) (Entered: 08/06/2002)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                STIPULATION by Dennis P. Harris in 1:02-cv-10123, John A. Hamm in 1:02-cv-10123, Eduardo Dominques Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel M. Keeler in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, William D. Mahoney in 1:02-cv-10123, City of Boston in 1:02-cv-10123, J.Brewster in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul J. Corboy in 1:02-cv-10123, Kathleen Doris in 1:02-cv-10123, Bradford H. Jones in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel P. Linskey in 1:02-cv-10123, Kelley A. Nee in 1:02-cv-10123, Miguel Novo Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul Schroeder in 1:02-cv-10123, Martin M. Wright in 1:02-cv-10123, Robert M. Zingg in 1:02-cv-10123 as to claim in paragraphs 14 and 18 of amended complaint, filed. c/s (kf) (Entered: 07/29/2002)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                  Parties' Stipulation of Stage I filed by Dennis P. Harris in 1:02-cv-10123, John A. Hamm in 1:02-cv-10123, Eduardo Dominques Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel M. Keeler in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, William D. Mahoney in 1:02-cv-10123, City of Boston in 1:02-cv-10123, J.Brewster in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul J. Corboy in 1:02-cv-10123, Kathleen Doris in 1:02-cv-10123, Bradford H. Jones in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel P. Linskey in 1:02-cv-10123, Kelley A. Nee in 1:02-cv-10123, Miguel Novo Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul Schroeder in 1:02-cv-10123, Martin M. Wright in 1:02-cv-10123, Robert M. Zingg in 1:02-cv-10123, FILED, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 07/17/2002)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Mag. Judge Robert B. Collings . Clerk's Notes: re: Rule 16(b) Conference; Counsel to file a stipulation resolving all issues in Phase I except lunch differential issue. As to that issue, counsel to stipulation resolving all issues in Phase I except lunch differential issue. As to that issue, counsel to stipulate to the underlying facts. Stipulations to be filed by cob 7/16/02. If the parties are unable to stipulate as to any aspect they shall inform the court by letter by cob 7/16/02. If a stipulation on the underlying facts re: the lunc differential is filed by 7/16/02, pltfs' brief on the lunch differential issue due 8/6; deft's by 8/13. Court Reporter: Tapw (ktb) Modified on 07/15/2002 (Entered: 07/15/2002)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                      Inopposed FifthMotion by Dennis P. Harris in 1:02-cv-10123 to add party pltfs , filed, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 07/12/2002)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                        Answer by City of Boston in 1:02-cv-10123 to amended complaint, filed. (ktb) (Entered: 06/24/2002)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                          Amended complaint by Robert M. Zingg in 1:02-cv-10123 filed. (Answer due 6/30/02 for City of Boston ) . Amended complaint amends [1-1] complaint adding additionmal claims (ktb) (Entered: 06/24/2002)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                            Unopposed Fourth Revised Motion by Dennis P. Harris in 1:02-cv-10123, John A. Hamm in 1:02-cv-10123, Eduardo Dominques Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel M. Keeler in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, William D. Mahoney in 1:02-cv-10123, City of Boston in 1:02-cv-10123, J.Brewster in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul J. Corboy in 1:02-cv-10123, Kathleen Doris in 1:02-cv-10123, Bradford H. Jones in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel P. Linskey in 1:02-cv-10123, Kelley A. Nee in 1:02-cv-10123, Miguel Novo Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul Schroeder in 1:02-cv-10123, Martin M. Wright in 1:02-cv-10123, Robert M. Zingg in 1:02-cv-10123 , filed, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 06/07/2002)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                              Motion by Dennis P. Harris, et al in 1:02-cv-10123 to amend complaint , filed, with amended complaint, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 06/06/2002)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                Mag. Judge Robert B. Collings . Clerk's Notes: re: Initial Rule 16(b) Conference, set scheduling conference for 3:15 6/25/02 Pltfs may attempt to amend the complaint to bring claims re: weekend differential. Any motion to amend to be filed and served within 30 days. Counsel to confer within the next thirty days to attempt to reach agreement of issues which have been the subject of agreement in the O'Hara case. Further Conference: 6/25/02 at 3:15 p.m. Court Reporter: Tape (ktb) (Entered: 05/30/2002)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  Mag. Judge Robert B. Collings . Notice of Hearing/conference: Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/02 at 11:30 a.m. (ktb) (Entered: 05/13/2002)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    Mag. Judge Robert B. Collings . Notice of Hearing/conference: reset scheduling conference for 11:30 5/21/02 (ktb) (Entered: 05/13/2002)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Motion by Dennis P. Harris in 1:02-cv-10123, John A. Hamm in 1:02-cv-10123, Eduardo Dominques Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel M. Keeler in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, William D. Mahoney in 1:02-cv-10123, J.Brewster in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul J. Corboy in 1:02-cv-10123, Kathleen Doris in 1:02-cv-10123, Bradford H. Jones in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel P. Linskey in 1:02-cv-10123, Kelley A. Nee in 1:02-cv-10123 to add party pltfs , filed, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 05/07/2002)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Rule 16.1 Certification filed by Dennis P. Harris in 1:02-cv-10123, John A. Hamm in 1:02-cv-10123, Eduardo Dominques Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel M. Keeler in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, William D. Mahoney in 1:02-cv-10123, J.Brewster in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul J. Corboy in 1:02-cv-10123, Kathleen Doris in 1:02-cv-10123, Bradford H. Jones in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel P. Linskey in 1:02-cv-10123, Kelley A. Nee in 1:02-cv-10123, Miguel Novo Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul Schroeder in 1:02-cv-10123, Martin M. Wright in 1:02-cv-10123, Robert M. Zingg in 1:02-cv-10123, FILED, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 05/07/2002)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Unopposed Dennis P. Harris in 1:02-cv-10123, John A. Hamm in 1:02-cv-10123, Eduardo Dominques Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel M. Keeler in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, William D. Mahoney in 1:02-cv-10123, J.Brewster in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul J. Corboy in 1:02-cv-10123, Kathleen Doris in 1:02-cv-10123, Bradford H. Jones in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel P. Linskey in 1:02-cv-10123, Kelley A. Nee in 1:02-cv-10123, Miguel Novo Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul Schroeder in 1:02-cv-10123, Martin M. Wright in 1:02-cv-10123, Robert M. Zingg in 1:02-cv-10123 to add party pltfs , filed, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 05/07/2002)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Unopposed Motion by Dennis P. Harris in 1:02-cv-10123, John A. Hamm in 1:02-cv-10123, Eduardo Dominques Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel M. Keeler in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, William D. Mahoney in 1:02-cv-10123, J.Brewster in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul J. Corboy in 1:02-cv-10123, Kathleen Doris in 1:02-cv-10123, Bradford H. Jones in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel P. Linskey in 1:02-cv-10123, Kelley A. Nee in 1:02-cv-10123, Miguel Novo Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul Schroeder in 1:02-cv-10123, Martin M. Wright in 1:02-cv-10123, Robert M. Zingg in 1:02-cv-10123 to add party pltfs , filed, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 05/06/2002)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Rule 16.1 Certification filed by City of Boston in 1:02-cv-10123, FILED, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 04/30/2002)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Joint motion by Dennis P. Harris in 1:02-cv-10123, John A. Hamm in 1:02-cv-10123, Eduardo Dominques Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel M. Keeler in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, William D. Mahoney in 1:02-cv-10123, City of Boston in 1:02-cv-10123, J.Brewster in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul J. Corboy in 1:02-cv-10123, Kathleen Doris in 1:02-cv-10123, Bradford H. Jones in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel P. Linskey in 1:02-cv-10123, Kelley A. Nee in 1:02-cv-10123, Miguel Novo Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul Schroeder in 1:02-cv-10123, Martin M. Wright in 1:02-cv-10123, Robert M. Zingg in 1:02-cv-10123 for bifurcation , filed, c/s (ktb) (Entered: 04/24/2002)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Joint statement by Dennis P. Harris in 1:02-cv-10123, John A. Hamm in 1:02-cv-10123, Eduardo Dominques Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel M. Keeler in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, William D. Mahoney in 1:02-cv-10123, City of Boston in 1:02-cv-10123, J.Brewster in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul J. Corboy in 1:02-cv-10123, Kathleen Doris in 1:02-cv-10123, Bradford H. Jones in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel P. Linskey in 1:02-cv-10123, Kelley A. Nee in 1:02-cv-10123, Miguel Novo Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul Schroeder in 1:02-cv-10123, Martin M. Wright in 1:02-cv-10123, Robert M. Zingg in 1:02-cv-10123 for Stage I, filed, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 04/24/2002)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing of Written Consents and apended consents by Dennis P. Harris in 1:02-cv-10123, John A. Hamm in 1:02-cv-10123, Eduardo Dominques Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel M. Keeler in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, William D. Mahoney in 1:02-cv-10123, J.Brewster in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul J. Corboy in 1:02-cv-10123, Kathleen Doris in 1:02-cv-10123, Bradford H. Jones in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel P. Linskey in 1:02-cv-10123, Kelley A. Nee in 1:02-cv-10123, Miguel Novo Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul Schroeder in 1:02-cv-10123, Martin M. Wright in 1:02-cv-10123, Robert M. Zingg in 1:02-cv-10123 by Paul T. Hynes in 1:02-cv-10123, filed. (ktb) (Entered: 04/17/2002)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Notice of change of address filed by John F. McMahon in 1:02-cv-10123 by Dennis P. Harris in 1:02-cv-10123, John A. Hamm in 1:02-cv-10123, Eduardo Dominques Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel M. Keeler in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, Kevin Buckley in 1:02-cv-10123, William D. Mahoney in 1:02-cv-10123, City of Boston in 1:02-cv-10123, J.Brewster in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul J. Corboy in 1:02-cv-10123, Kathleen Doris in 1:02-cv-10123, Bradford H. Jones in 1:02-cv-10123, Daniel P. Linskey in 1:02-cv-10123, Kelley A. Nee in 1:02-cv-10123, Miguel Novo Jr. in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul Schroeder in 1:02-cv-10123, Martin M. Wright in 1:02-cv-10123, Robert M. Zingg in 1:02-cv-10123, FILED. (ktb) (Entered: 04/17/2002)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing of Written Consents by John F. McMahon in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul T. Hynes in 1:02-cv-10123, filed, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 04/01/2002)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          Judge Mark L. Wolf . Notice of Hearing/conference: set scheduling conference for 3:00 4/29/02 . cc/cl. (ktb) (Entered: 03/29/2002)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Notice of Filing of Written Consents by J.Brewster, Paul J. Corboy, Kathleen Doris, Bradford H. Jones, Daniel P. Linskey, Kelley A. Nee, Miguel Novo Jr., Paul Schroeder, Martin M. Wright, Robert M. Zingg to case(s) 1:02-cv-10123, by John F. McMahon in 1:02-cv-10123, Paul T. Hynes in 1:02-cv-10123, with enlosed written consents, filed. (ktb) (Entered: 03/25/2002)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Letter by John F. McMahon in 1:02-cv-10123 enclosing a Notice of Filing of Written Consents with Exhibit A and 281 Consents as a Party Pltf, filed. (ktb) (Entered: 03/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Notice of change of address filed by Paul T. Hynes in 1:02-cv-10123, FILED, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 03/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Notice of appearance of attorney for City of Boston in 1:02-cv-10123 by John Foskett and Catherine S. Reidy, FILED, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 02/19/2002)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Answer by City of Boston in 1:02-cv-10123 to complaint , filed, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 02/19/2002)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Notice of Acknowledgment of Service by City of Boston in 1:02-cv-10123, filed. (ktb) (Entered: 02/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        Complaint filed. Case assigned to Judge: Wolf. Receipt #: 36544 Amount:$ 150.00. Fee Status: pd (ktb) (Entered: 01/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 97 times.

                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?