United States of America et al v. Saber Health Care Group et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00197
District Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 8, 2017 at 5:56 PM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather Tonsing Volosin +1 216 622 3797 +1 216 522 4982 Heather.Tonsing.Volosin@usdoj.gov
No Logo William Victor O'Boyle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Joseph Mauro, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Warner Mendenhall +1 330 535 9160 +1 330 762 9743 warnermendenhall@hotmail.com
No Logo Bill Weisburg, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine A Trefz +1 202 434 5038 +1 202 434 5029 ktrefz@wc.com
No Logo Saber Health Care Group, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by corsarolaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian M. Bates +1 440 871 4022 +1 440 871 9567 email@corsarolaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph G. Corsaro +1 440 871 4022 +1 440 871 9567 JCorsaro@Corsarolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2015 Gabriel Aaron Cohen +1 202 434 5258 gcohen@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry S. Simon +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 bsimon@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine A Trefz +1 202 434 5038 +1 202 434 5029 ktrefz@wc.com
Citation Section 31 U.S.C. § 3729
Nature of Suit 375 - Other Statutes: False Claims Act
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
    Withdrawal of Appearance of Gabriel Cohen filed by All Defendants. (Bates, Christian) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None
      Reply in support of 16 Motion to dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b) and 12(b)(6) filed by All Defendants. (Bates, Christian) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None
        FILING ERROR: Wrong document uploaded. Attorney to refile. Reply in support of 16 Motion to dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b) and 12(b)(6) filed by All Defendants. (Bates, Christian) Modified on 8/4/2014 (M, S). (Entered: 08/04/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
          Response to 16 Motion to dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b) and 12(b)(6) filed by William Victor O'Boyle. (Mendenhall, Warner) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
            Response to 18 Motion for extension of time until 7-18-2014 to file response/reply to 16 Motion to dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b) and 12(b)(6) Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time Unitl 7/18/2014 filed by Saber Health Care Group, Bill Weisburg. (Trefz, Katherine) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
              Motion for extension of time until 7-18-2014 to file response/reply to 16 Motion to dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b) and 12(b)(6), filed by Plaintiff William Victor O'Boyle. (Related document(s) 16 ) (Mendenhall, Warner). Modified text on 6/19/2014 (H,SP). (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                Brief Memorandum of Points and Authorites in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b) and 12(b)(6) filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) 16 . (Bates, Christian) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                  Motion to dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b) and 12(b)(6) filed by Saber Health Care Group, Bill Weisburg. (Related document(s) 1 ) (Bates, Christian). Modified on 5/20/2014 to add filers (H,SP). (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                    Motion for Order Permitting the Filing of a Thirty-Page Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(f) and Memorandum in Support filed by Saber Health Care Group, Bill Weisburg (Bates, Christian). Modified text on 5/16/2014 (H,SP). (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                      Motion for attorney Barry S. Simon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $120, receipt number 0647-6539637, filed by Saber Health Care Group and Bill Weisburg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Bates, Christian). Modified on 5/13/2014 to add filers (H,SP). (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                        Motion for attorney Katherine Trefz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $120, receipt number 0647-6539629, filed by Saber Health Care Group and Bill Weisburg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Bates, Christian). Modified on 5/13/2014 to add filers (H,SP). (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                          Motion for attorney Gabriel Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $120, receipt number 0647-6539594, filed by Saber Health Care Group and Bill Weisburg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Bates, Christian). Modified on 5/13/2014 to add filer (H,SP). (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                            Attorney Appearance of Joseph G. Corsaro and Christian M. Bates filed on behalf of All Defendants (Bates, Christian). Modified text on 5/13/2014 (H,SP). (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                              Waiver of Service Returned Executed by William Victor O'Boyle. Bill Weisburg waiver sent on 3/18/2014, answer due 5/19/2014. filed on behalf of William Victor O'Boyle (Mendenhall, Warner) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                Waiver of Service Returned Executed by William Victor O'Boyle. Saber Health Care Group waiver sent on 3/18/2014, answer due 5/19/2014. filed on behalf of William Victor O'Boyle (Mendenhall, Warner) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Order The Complaint and Notice of Election to Decline Intervention be unsealed re 1 , 7 . The seal is lifted as to all other matters occurring in this action after this date. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 2/13/2014. (H,SP) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                    Corrected Notice of Election to Decline Intervention filed by United States of America (Related document(s) 5 ). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (H,SP) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                      Notice of Declination of Appearance filed by United States of America (Related document(s) 1 ). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (H,SP) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                        Complaint with jury demand against Saber Health Care Group, Bill Weisburg. Filing fee of $350 paid, receipt # 54660004325. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be a refiling of terminated case 1:07cv2786. Filed by William Victor O'Boyle. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (M,TL) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 276 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?