Troice et al v. Proskauer Rose LLP et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:09-cv-01600
District Judge David C Godbey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 24, 2016 at 6:31 AM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Annalisa Mendez, Plaintiff
No Logo Horacio Mendez, Plaintiff
No Logo Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Plaintiff
No Logo Samuel Troice, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Castillo Snyder PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Jesse R Castillo +1 210 630 4200 +1 210 630 4210 jcastillo@casnlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Edward C Snyder +1 210 630 4200 +1 210 630 4210 esnyder@casnlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NELIGAN FOLEY, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Douglas James Buncher +1 214 840 5300 +1 214 840 5301 dbuncher@neliganlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Nicholas Andrew Foley +1 214 840 5330 +1 214 840 5301 nfoley@neliganlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strasburger & Price LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Andrew L Kerr +1 210 250 6015 +1 210 250 6100 andy.kerr@strasburger.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing David N Kitner +1 214 651 4618 +1 214 651 4330 david.kitner@strasburger.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Edward F Valdespino +1 210 250 6061 +1 210 250 6100 edward.valdespino@strasburger.com
v.
No Logo Chadbourne & Parke, LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Daniel J. Beller +1 212 373 3312 +1 212 373 2315 dbeller@paulweiss.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted DANIEL J. LEFFELL +1 212 373 3218 dleffell@paulweiss.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted William B Michael +1 212 373 3000 wmichael@paulweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Phoenix Tower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Kenneth P Held +1 713 357 5150 +1 713 615 5219 kheld@sohjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Elizabeth Chinyere Brandon +1 214 220 7929 +1 214 220 7716 ebrandon@velaw.com
Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Karen L Hirschman +1 214 220 7795 + 214 220 7716 khirschman@velaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Harry M Reasoner +1 713 758 2358 + 713 615 5173 hreasoner@velaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing William D. Sims, Jr. +1 214 220 7700 bsims@velaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing J Stuart Tonkinson +1 214 220 7952 +1 214 999 7952 stonkinson@velaw.com
No Logo P Mauricio Alvarado, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gerger & Clarke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/23/2012, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing David Gerger +1 713 224 4400 +1 713 224 5153 david@gergerclarke.com
TERMINATED: 07/23/2012, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing David Keith Isaak +1 713 224 4400 +1 713 224 5153 isaak@gergerclarke.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stanley Frank & Rose, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Michael John Stanley +1 713 980 4382 +1 713 980 1179 mstanley@stanleyfranklaw.com
Proskauer Rose LLP Proskauer Rose LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carrington, Coleman, Sloman & Blumenthal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Neil Ross Burger +1 214 855 3076 +1 214 840 0120 nburger@ccsb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Bruce Collins +1 214 855 3000 +1 214 855 1333 bcollins@ccsb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Fletcher L. Yarbrough, Jr. +1 214 855 3025 +1 214 855 1333 fyarbrough@ccsb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Richard Cooper +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 701 5800 richard.cooper@davispolk.com
TERMINATED: 05/23/2012, Bar Status: Not Admitted Rajesh S. James , +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3384 rajesh.james@davispolk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted James P. Rouhandeh +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3835 james.rouhandeh@dpw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Daniel Jacob Schwartz +1 212 450 4581 +1 212 450 3581 daniel.schwartz@dpw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing C Shawn Cleveland +1 214 969 3732 +1 214 969 5100 scleveland@jonesday.com
No Logo Thomas V Sjoblom, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/10/2010, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Keith Miles Aurzada +1 214 721 8041 +1 214 721 8100 keith.aurzada@bryancave.com
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010, Bar Status: Not Admitted James Michael Cole +1 202 508 6091 +1 202 508 6200 jmcole@bryancave.com
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Jay Lloyd Krystinik +1 214 721 8000 +1 214 721 8100 jay.krystinik@bryancave.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing William B Mateja +1 214 747 5070 + 214 747 2091 mateja@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Joshua R. Hochberg +1 202 496 7691 +1 202 496 7756 jhochberg@mckennalong.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Mindy L Rattan +1 202 496 7691 mrattan@mckennalong.com
No Logo John J Little, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Little, Pedersen, Fankhauser & Cox, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing John J Little +1 214 573 2305 +1 214 573 2323 jlittle@lpf-law.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 380 - Personal Property: Other Personal Property Damage
  Entries (248) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL re: 246 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that all claims brought by the Plaintiffs, individually and on behalf of the proposed class of similarly situated persons, against Defendant Pablo M. Alvarado are hereby dismissed without prejudice against refiling the same. Each party will bear its own costs, expenses and attorney fees. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/6/2016) (ndt) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
    STATUS REPORT filed by Punga Punga Financial Ltd, Pam Reed, Samuel Troice. (Snyder, Edward) Modified filers on 5/3/2016 (awc). (Entered: 05/02/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 246 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None
      Agreed MOTION to Dismiss filed by P Mauricio Alvarado (Stanley, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
        LREF
        Blank 245 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER: The Court requests an update from the parties within fourteen (14) days of the date this order is signed regarding the status of any remaining claims and parties in this case. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/27/2016) (ykp) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
          LREF
          Blank 244 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None
          LONG FORM NOTICE OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT, BAR ORDER AND JUDGMENT, AND HEARING BY ORDER THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT, NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS. Objections due by May 18, 2016. Hearing scheduled to be held before the Honorable David C. Godbey in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, United States Courthouse, 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas 75242, in Courtroom 1505, at 10:00 a.m. on July 8, 2016. (gmg) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None
            JUDGMENT/MANDATE of USCA as to 220 Notice of Appeal filed by Proskauer Rose LLP, 221 Notice of Appeal filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, 223 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas V Sjoblom. The order of the District Court denying defendants' motions to dismiss is reversed and judgment that the case is dismissed with prejudice is rendered. Issued as Mandate: 4/1/2016. (axm) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None
              Opinion of USCA in accordance with USCA judgment re 220 Notice of Appeal filed by Proskauer Rose LLP, 221 Notice of Appeal filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, 223 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas V Sjoblom. (axm) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None
                ORDER of USCA as to 220 Notice of Appeal, filed by Proskauer Rose LLP; 221 Notice of Appeal, filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP' 223 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thomas V Sjoblom. Appellees' opposed motion to dismiss the appeal for lack of jurisdiction is DENIED. (axm) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 239 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Attorney. Edward F Valdespino no longer associated with this case. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/9/2016) (ndt) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None
                    Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney, Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Pam Reed, Punga Punga Financial Ltd, Samuel Troice. Added attorney Judith Reed Blakeway. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Blakeway, Judith) (Entered: 02/02/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 238 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Judith Reed Blakeway on behalf of Horacio Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Pam Reed, Samuel Troice. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Blakeway, Judith) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick J Neligan, Jr on behalf of Annalisa Mendez, Horacio Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Pam Reed, Samuel Troice. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Neligan, Patrick) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                          REPLY filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom re: 235 Response/Objection (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Leffell, Daniel) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None
                            RESPONSE filed by Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Pam Reed, Samuel Troice re: 232 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Motion to Dismiss for Want of Jurisdiction, # 2 Exhibit(s) Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Jung, Peter) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                              Amended Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Pam Reed, Samuel Troice re 192 MOTION to Certify Class. (jrr) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 231 Motion for Leave to File. order.) The Clerk shall file the Brief in Support of Class Certification (filed as Attachment 1) as a replacement for the brief filed on April 20, 2015. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/21/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Advisory to the Court filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom (Leffell, Daniel) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Revised Brief in Compliance with Local Rules of the Northern District of Texas filed by Annalisa Mendez, Horacio Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Brief, # 2 Proposed Order) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER: This Order addresses Defendant Proskauer Rose LLP's ("Proskauer") motion to correct the record and strike the Valdespino declaration 204 . Because Plaintiffs' brief in support of class certification as submitted to the Court violated the Court's Class Certification Scheduling Order 142 , the Court grants the motion. The Court orders Plaintiffs to file, within seven (7) days of this Order, the brief in support of class certification that was initially served upon Defendants. Once filed, the Clerk of Court is directed to replace docket entry 193 with the newly filed document. The Clerk of Court is also directed to strike docket entry 195-11. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/11/2015) (bdb) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward F Valdespino for Robert M. O'Boyle on behalf of Annalisa Mendez, Horacio Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Pam Reed, Samuel Troice. (Valdespino, Edward) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Change of Firm Name filed by Thomas V Sjoblom (Carroll, Christina) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Advisory to the Court of filing with the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals, Appellees' Motion to Dismiss for Want of Jurisdiction filed by Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Pam Reed, Samuel Troice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Fifth Circuit Appellees' Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Want of Jurisdiction) (Valdespino, Edward) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                              Transcript Order Form: re 221 Notice of Appeal,, transcript not requested. (Beller, Daniel) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                Transcript Order Form: re 220 Notice of Appeal,, transcript not requested (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 222 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Mindy L. Rattan removed as counsel for Defendant Thomas V. Sjoblom. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/29/2015) (ctf) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit as to 176 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,,,,,, 217 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion for Joinder,,, by Thomas V Sjoblom. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0539-6828666. T.O. form to appellant electronically at Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Mateja, William) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MINDY L. RATTAN filed by Thomas V Sjoblom (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Mateja, William) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit as to 217 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion for Joinder,,, 176 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,,,,,, by Chadbourne & Parke LLP. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0539-6823019. T.O. form to appellant electronically at Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Beller, Daniel) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit as to 217 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion for Joinder, 176 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Leave to File, by Proskauer Rose LLP. (Filing Fee $505.00 Receipt Number 0539-6822774) T.O. form to appellant electronically at Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Rouhandeh, James) Modified to add payment information on 5/26/2015 (cea). (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL OF MINDY L. RATTAN AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT THOMAS V. SJOBLOM filed by Thomas V Sjoblom (Mateja, William) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                              REPLY filed by Proskauer Rose LLP re: 204 MOTION to Amend/Correct 193 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER: This Order addresses Defendant Chadbourne and Parke LLP's motion to amend/correct 186 and Defendant Proskauer Rose LLP's motion for reconsideration 187 . The Court denies both motions. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/15/2015) (ctf) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 216 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  RESPONSE filed by Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Pam Reed, Samuel Troice re: 204 MOTION to Amend/Correct 193 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER: This Order addresses Defendants Chadbourne & Parke LLP and Proskauer Rose LLP's objection to the Magistrate Judge's Order denying Defendants' motion to compel 181 . After reviewing Defendants' objections and the Magistrate Judge's Order in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A), the Court determines the Magistrate Judge's Order was not clearly erroneous or contrary to law. Accordingly, the Court declines to reconsider the Magistrate Judge's Order. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/7/2015) (ctf) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      REPLY filed by Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom re: 186 MOTION to Amend/Correct 176 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        REPLY filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP re: 186 MOTION to Amend/Correct 176 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, (Beller, Daniel) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thomas V Sjoblom. (Mateja, William) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint, filed by P Mauricio Alvarado. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Stanley, Michael) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Proskauer Rose LLP. (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chadbourne & Parke LLP. (Leffell, Daniel) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint, filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Leffell, Daniel) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint, filed by Proskauer Rose LLP. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint, filed by Thomas V Sjoblom. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Mateja, William) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        Appendix in Support filed by Proskauer Rose LLP re 204 MOTION to Amend/Correct 193 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION to Amend/Correct 193 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Proskauer Rose LLP (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 203 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP re 202 Reply (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 202 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              REPLY filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP re: 181 Response/Objection (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 191 Motion exceed page limit. 1) Plaintiffs to file an opening brief in support of their Opposed Motion for Class Certification, for Designation of Class Representatives and Class Counsel (the Motion) in excess of twenty-five (25), and not to exceed fifty-six (56), pages; (2) Defendants to file a single, joint brief in opposition to the Motion in excess of twenty-five (25), and not to exceed seventy-five (75), pages; and (3) Plaintiffs to file a reply brief in further support of their Motion in excess of ten (10), and not to exceed fifty-five (55), pages. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/24/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  RESPONSE filed by Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Pam Reed, Samuel Troice re: 186 MOTION to Amend/Correct 176 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, , 187 MOTION for Reconsideration re 186 MOTION to Amend/Correct 176 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, , 176 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, MOTION to Join in Defendant Chadbourne & Parke LLP's Motion to Alter or Amend (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    REPLY filed by Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Pam Reed, Samuel Troice re: 192 MOTION to Certify Class (PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, FOR DESIGNATION OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVES AND CLASS COUNSEL) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Appendix in Support filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom re 197 Response/Objection, (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s) 152-287, # 2 Additional Page(s) 288-312, # 3 Additional Page(s) 313-362, # 4 Additional Page(s) 363-409, # 5 Additional Page(s) 410-527, # 6 Additional Page(s) 528-729, # 7 Additional Page(s) 730-821, # 8 Additional Page(s) 822-1040, # 9 Additional Page(s) 1041-1129) (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 197 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        RESPONSE filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom re: 192 MOTION to Certify Class (PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, FOR DESIGNATION OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVES AND CLASS COUNSEL) (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Appendix in Support filed by Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Pam Reed, Samuel Troice re 193 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Part III: Exhibits 55-63) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 55, # 2 Exhibit(s) 56, # 3 Exhibit(s) 57, # 4 Exhibit(s) 58, # 5 Exhibit(s) 59, # 6 Exhibit(s) 60, # 7 Exhibit(s) 61, # 8 Exhibit(s) 62, # 9 Exhibit(s) 63) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Pam Reed, Samuel Troice re 193 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, (PART II: Exhibits 36-54) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 36, # 2 Exhibit(s) 37, # 3 Exhibit(s) 38, # 4 Exhibit(s) 39, # 5 Exhibit(s) 40, # 6 Exhibit(s) 41, # 7 Exhibit(s) 42, # 8 Exhibit(s) 43, # 9 Exhibit(s) 44, # 10 Exhibit(s) 45,***STRICKEN PER 230 ORDER*** # 11 Exhibit(s) 46, # 12 Exhibit(s) 47, # 13 Exhibit(s) 48, # 14 Exhibit(s) 49, # 15 Exhibit(s) 50, # 16 Exhibit(s) 51, # 17 Exhibit(s) 52, # 18 Exhibit(s) 53, # 19 Exhibit(s) 54) (Snyder, Edward) Modified to strike 11 on 8/12/2015 (bdb). (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Appendix in Support filed by Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Pam Reed, Samuel Troice re 193 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Part I: Exhibits 1-35) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4, # 5 Exhibit(s) 5, # 6 Exhibit(s) 6, # 7 Exhibit(s) 7, # 8 Exhibit(s) 8, # 9 Exhibit(s) 9, # 10 Exhibit(s) 10, # 11 Exhibit(s) 11, # 12 Exhibit(s) 12, # 13 Exhibit(s) 13, # 14 Exhibit(s) 14, # 15 Exhibit(s) 15, # 16 Exhibit(s) 16, # 17 Exhibit(s) 17, # 18 Exhibit(s) 18, # 19 Exhibit(s) 19, # 20 Exhibit(s) 20, # 21 Exhibit(s) 21, # 22 Exhibit(s) 22, # 23 Exhibit(s) 23, # 24 Exhibit(s) 24, # 25 Exhibit(s) 25, # 26 Exhibit(s) 26, # 27 Exhibit(s) 27, # 28 Exhibit(s) 28, # 29 Exhibit(s) 29, # 30 Exhibit(s) 30, # 31 Exhibit(s) 31, # 32 Exhibit(s) 32, # 33 Exhibit(s) 33, # 34 Exhibit(s) 34, # 35 Exhibit(s) 35) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Pam Reed, Samuel Troice re 192 MOTION to Certify Class (PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, FOR DESIGNATION OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVES AND CLASS COUNSEL) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Certify Class (PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, FOR DESIGNATION OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVES AND CLASS COUNSEL) filed by Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Pam Reed, Samuel Troice (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION (JOINT) TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITATIONS filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Pam Reed, Thomas V Sjoblom, Samuel Troice (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      REPLY filed by Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Pam Reed, Samuel Troice re: 181 Response/Objection (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE filed by Ralph S. Janvey re: 181 Response/Objection (Sadler, Kevin) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Appendix in Support filed by Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom re 187 MOTION for Reconsideration re 186 MOTION to Amend/Correct 176 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, , 176 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, MOTION to Join in Defendant Chadbourne & Parke LLP's Motion to Alter or Amend (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 187 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration re 186 MOTION to Amend/Correct 176 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, , 176 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, , MOTION to Join in Defendant Chadbourne & Parke LLP's Motion to Alter or Amend () filed by Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct 176 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Beller, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' 164 MOTION TO QUASH AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER: It is therefore ORDERED that the depositions of Annalisa Mendez and Horacio Mendez, as noticed by Defendants, are hereby quashed. ORDERED that Plaintiffs are hereby granted protection from having to appear for the depositions of Annalisa and Horacio Mendez in this case pursuant to the notices issued by the Defendants. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Nancy M Koenig on 3/27/2015) (ctf) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Agreed STIPULATION Regarding Defendant Mauricio Alvarado's Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint by P Mauricio Alvarado. (Stanley, Michael) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER: This Order addresses Plaintiffs Samuel Troice and Punga Punga Financial, Ltd.'s motion to add named plaintiff and putative class representative 163 . Plaintiffs seek to add Pam Reed as a named plaintiff and class representative in this action to replace class representative plaintiffs Horacio and Annalisa Mendez, who no longer wish to serve as class representatives. The Court finds good cause exists for Plaintiffs' motion and accordingly grants it. The Court orders that Pam Reed is added as a named plaintiff and putative class representative. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/24/2015) (ctf) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Appendix in Support filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP re 181 Response/Objection (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP re: 179 Order on Motion to Compel (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 178 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom answer due 5/4/2015. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/17/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' 154 MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM THE RECEIVER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Nancy M Koenig on 3/9/2015) (ctf) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Michael, William) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                REPLY filed by Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice re: 163 Opposed MOTION to Add Named Plaintiff and Putative Class Representative (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit(s) A - ECS Dec App 1-3, # 3 Exhibit(s) A - to ECS Dec App 4-33) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 176 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: This Order addresses Defendant Chadbourne & Parke LLP's motion to dismiss 29 ; Defendant Proskauer Rose LLP's motion to dismiss 31 ; Defendant Thomas V. Sjoblom's motion to dismiss 36 ; and Defendant Mauricio Alvarado's motion to dismiss 44 . The Court grants in part and denies in part Defendants' motions. The Court also denies Chadbourne and Proskauer's motion for leave to file a response to Plaintiffs' supplemental briefing 147 . (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/4/2015) (ctf) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Appendix in Support filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom re 174 Response/Objection (Michael, William) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom re: 163 Opposed MOTION to Add Named Plaintiff and Putative Class Representative (Michael, William) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        REPLY filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP re: 154 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Receiver Ralph S. Janvey (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Appendix in Support filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP re 171 Response/Objection (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP re: 164 MOTION TO QUASH AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ON DEFENDANTS NOTICES OF INTENTION TO TAKE ORAL DEPOSITIONS OF ANNALISA MENDEZ AND HORACIO MENDEZ (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE filed by Annalisa Mendez, Horacio Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice re: 169 Notice (Other),, (Buncher, Douglas) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Letter re: respectfully suggest that the Court abstain from ruling on Defendants' motions to dismiss until the Texas Supreme Court decides Cantey Hanger, LLP v. Byrd re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss, 36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Class Action Complaint, 29 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re 167 Response/Objection (Sadler, Kevin) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE filed by Ralph S. Janvey re: 154 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Receiver Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL PROPER DESIGNATION OF EXPERTS: It is therefore, ORDERED that Defendant Alvarado designate expert witnesses, if any, and produce expert reports in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a) within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. ORDERED that Plaintiffs' deadline to designate rebuttal experts, if any, is extended to forty-five (45) days after the date of this order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Nancy M Koenig on 2/3/2015) (ctf) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY filed by Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice re: 154 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Receiver Ralph S. Janvey (Valdespino, Edward) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION TO QUASH AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ON DEFENDANTS NOTICES OF INTENTION TO TAKE ORAL DEPOSITIONS OF ANNALISA MENDEZ AND HORACIO MENDEZ filed by Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Opposed MOTION to Add Named Plaintiff and Putative Class Representative filed by Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) "A" Declaration with Exhibit "1", # 2 Proposed Order). Party Pam Reed added. (Snyder, Edward) Docket text modified on 1/30/2015 (twd). (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 161 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gabrielle E. Tenzer. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/23/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6553596) filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Tenzer, Gabrielle) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Defendants Proskauer Rose LLP and Chadbourne & Parke LLP (Defendants) filed a Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Receiver Ralph S. Janvey on 1/13/2015 (ECF No. 154 ). In the motion, Defendants request, among other things, an expedited briefing schedule that would require a response within five days of the motion being filed, with any reply to the response due two days thereafter. After considering the request and the status of this case, the court finds that Defendants' request for an expedited briefing schedule should be and is hereby DENIED. The parties shall comply with the time periods contemplated by Rule 7.1 of the Local Civil Rules for the Northern District of Texas. This order only addresses Defendants' request for an expedited briefing schedule and does not dispose of the Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Receiver Ralph S. Janvey (ECF No. 154 ). The court will consider the motion at the appropriate time. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Nancy M Koenig on 1/15/2015) (ctf) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY filed by Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice re: 150 Emergency MOTION to Compel Proper Designation of Experts Pursuant to Class Action Scheduling Order and for Extension of Time to Designate Rebuttal Experts (Valdespino, Edward) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: The Court vacates Paragraph 6 of the 9/16/2014 Class Certification Scheduling Order 142 , which the Court inadvertently included from its customary form order. All discovery disputes will continue to be resolved by United States Magistrate Judge Koenig. See 9/24/2012 Order 113 ; 2/13/2014 Order 121 . (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/14/2015) (tln) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Letter Concerning Expedited Consideration re: 153 Notice (Other), 154 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Receiver Ralph S. Janvey filed by John J Little (Little, John) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING RESOLUTION OF re: 150 Emergency MOTION to Compel Proper Designation of Experts Pursuant to Class Action Scheduling Order and for Extension of Time to Designate Rebuttal Experts filed by Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP re 154 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Receiver Ralph S. Janvey (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s) 157 to 224 (Exhibits 3 to 8), # 2 Additional Page(s) 225 to 418 (Exhibits 9 to 17)) (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Receiver Ralph S. Janvey filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Letter re: Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Receiver Ralph S. Janvey filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Resolution Between the Parties re: 150 Emergency MOTION to Compel Proper Designation of Experts Pursuant to Class Action Scheduling Order and for Extension of Time to Designate Rebuttal Experts filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom (Michael, William) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE filed by P Mauricio Alvarado re: 150 Emergency MOTION to Compel Proper Designation of Experts Pursuant to Class Action Scheduling Order and for Extension of Time to Designate Rebuttal Experts (Stanley, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Emergency MOTION to Compel Proper Designation of Experts Pursuant to Class Action Scheduling Order and for Extension of Time to Designate Rebuttal Experts filed by Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Proposed Order) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Bankruptcy Stay filed by Thomas V Sjoblom (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A) (Mateja, William) Modified text on 12/18/2014 (skt). (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Annalisa Mendez, Horacio Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice re: 147 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Briefingin Response and Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Valdespino, Edward) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Briefing in Response and Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Briefing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Burger, Neil) Modified typo on 10/24/2014 (awc). (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 145 Motion to Withdraw. Nicholas A. Foley is withdrawn as counsel for plaintiffs Annalisa Mendez, Horacio Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/2/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw filed by Annalisa Mendez, Horacio Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice (Buncher, Douglas) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE filed by P Mauricio Alvarado re: 140 Notice (Other) (Stanley, Michael) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE filed by Annalisa Mendez, Horacio Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss, 36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Class Action Complaint, 44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, 29 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Attachment - Receiver's Complaint) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 142 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULING ORDER. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/16/2014) (cea) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The Court denies Plaintiffs' 125 motion to defer reconsideration of pending motions to dismiss. The Court grants 125 Plaintiffs' motion to compel a Rule 26 conference and enter a scheduling order in part. Discovery shall proceed according to the terms of a class certification discovery schedule to be released by separate order. The Court grants 134 Plaintiffs and Defendant Alvarado leave to file supplemental briefing within seven (7) days of this Order. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/16/2014) (cea) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Supplemental Authority filed by Annalisa Mendez, Horacio Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Godbey: Status Conference held on 8/21/2014. Attorney Appearances: SEC - David Reece; Receiver- Kevin Sadler, Michael Kuckelman, Douglas Buncher; Examiner- John Little; Defense - Jonathan Polkes, Ashley Kleber, Brian Tagtmeier, Robert Plotkin, Phil Preis, Jesse Castillo, Edward Valdepino, and Randy Pulman. (Court Reporter: Linda Langford) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 01:11. (chmb) (Entered: 08/21/2014) (jkm) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 138 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Thomas V Sjoblom. (Mateja, William) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                The Court will hold a status hearing for all parties to the Stanford MDL proceeding on 8/21/2014 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/22/2014) (jkm) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom re: 134 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Further Support of Their Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Beller, Daniel) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE filed by Annalisa Mendez, Horacio Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice re: 134 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Further Support of Their Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Valdespino, Edward) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Further Support of Their Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Proposed Order) (Beller, Daniel) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY filed by Annalisa Mendez, Horacio Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice re: 125 MOTION to Compel MOTION TO DEFER RESOLUTION OF MOTIONS TO DISMISS, TO COMPEL RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE AND FOR ENTRY OF SCHEDULING ORDER (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT re 131 Response/Objection, 125 MOTION to Compel MOTION TO DEFER RESOLUTION OF MOTIONS TO DISMISS, TO COMPEL RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE AND FOR ENTRY OF SCHEDULING ORDER / Declaration of James P. Rouhandeh in Support of Defendants Proskauer Rose LLP, Chadbourne & Parke LLP and Thomas V. Sjoblom's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Defer Resolution of Motions to Dismiss, to Compel Rule 26(f) Conference and for Entry of Scheduling Order by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom re: 125 MOTION to Compel MOTION TO DEFER RESOLUTION OF MOTIONS TO DISMISS, TO COMPEL RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE AND FOR ENTRY OF SCHEDULING ORDER (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 127 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christina M. Carroll. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/17/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 126 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan Chang. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/17/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE filed by P Mauricio Alvarado re: 125 MOTION to Compel MOTION TO DEFER RESOLUTION OF MOTIONS TO DISMISS, TO COMPEL RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE AND FOR ENTRY OF SCHEDULING ORDER (Stanley, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Christina M. Carroll (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-5973387) filed by Thomas V Sjoblom (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Mateja, William) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-5968170) filed by Proskauer Rose LLP (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Chang, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 125 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel MOTION TO DEFER RESOLUTION OF MOTIONS TO DISMISS, TO COMPEL RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE AND FOR ENTRY OF SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Annalisa Mendez, Horacio Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT Examiner's Report No. 8 filed by John J Little. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s)) (Little, John) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of (Letter) re: 122 Notice (Other) filed by John J Little, Annalisa Mendez, Horacio Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice (Attachments: # 1 Letter) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Letter re: scheduling conference request filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP (Beller, Daniel) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                It is ordered that all matters and motions previously referred to the Honorable E. Scott Frost, United States Magistrate Judge, in the In re Stanford Entities Securities Litigation multidistrict litigation, are now hereby referred to the Honorable Nancy M. Koenig, United States Magistrate Judge, except for two matters outlined in the order. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/13/2014) (gmg) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Godbey: Status Conference held on 1/16/2014. Attorney Appearances: Receiver - Kevin Sadler; SEC - David Reece; Examiner - John Little; Defendants - Daniel Schwartz, Michael Kuckelman, Jim E. Cowles, Sim Israeloff, Chuck Green, Bill Mateja, Ed Snyder, Emil Lippe, Jr. (Court Reporter: Linda Langford) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :48. (chmb) (jkm) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER requesting input regarding the priority of decision in various matters pending in all cases within the In re Stanford Entities Securities Litigation. Input must be filed with the Court within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/3/2013) (gmg) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Status Hearing for all parties to the Stanford MDL proceeding set for 1/16/2014 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/2/2013) (gmg) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel of Record filed by Proskauer Rose LLP (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Defendant Chadbourne & Parke's Notice Regarding the Amended Joint Motion of the SEC, Receiver, Examiner, and Official Stanford Investors Committee to Approve Settlement Agreement and Cross-Border Protocol filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A) (Reasoner, Harry) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Received letter from USCA5 Re: Supreme Court granted certiorari (svc) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/19/2012 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost on 10/4/2012)(gmg) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636, it is ordered that all cases within the In re Stanford Entities Securities Litigation multidistrict litigation, other than Securities Exchange Commission v. Stanford, et al., Civil Action No. 3:09-0298-N, are hereby referred to the Hon. E. Scott Frost, United States Magistrate Judge, for hearing and determination. See Order for specifics. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/24/2012) (gmg) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Court grants Examiner's request for status conference. Status Conference set for 7/26/2012 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/16/2012) (gr) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 110 Motion to Substitute Attorney. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/23/2012) (jrb) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Michael J Stanley,Michael J Stanley for P Mauricio Alvarado. Motion filed by P Mauricio Alvarado (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Stanley, Michael) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 108 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard Cooper. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/3/2012) (chmb) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Richard Cooper (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-4642384) filed by Proskauer Rose LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel of Record filed by Proskauer Rose LLP (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JUDGMENT/MANDATE of USCA as to 97 Notice of Appeal, filed by Horacio Mendez, Annalisa Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice. Case remanded to the district court for further proceedings. Issued as Mandate: 4/27/12. Electronic copy of the record has been recycled (Attachments: # 1 Letter) (svc) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opinion of USCA (certified copy) in accordance with USCA judgment re 97 Notice of Appeal, filed by Horacio Mendez, Annalisa Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice. (svc) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Received letter from USCA5 re: revised caption (svc) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Record on Appeal for USCA5 11-11031 (related to 97 appeal): Record consisting of: 4 Volume(s) ECF electronic record, transmitted to USCA5. Shipped: Federal Express 296232215006231, 296232215006224 (svc) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Received letter from USCA5 regarding removal of Mark Manela as an appellee. (svc) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE ADVISORY TO THE COURT FROM CASTILO SNYDER P.C. REGARDING FILING OF INDIVIDUAL STATE COURT LAWSUITS filed by Annalisa Mendez, Horacio Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Attachment - Exhibit A) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Received letter from USCA5 re: Consolidation of appeals. (svc) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript Order Form: re 97 Notice of Appeal, transcript not requested. (Valdespino, Edward) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit as to 96 Order on Motions to Dismiss,and Order on Motion to Stay by Annalisa Mendez, Horacio Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice. Amendment to 97 Notice of Appeal. (Valdespino, Edward) Modified on 10/31/2011 (svc). (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit as to 96 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion to Stay by Annalisa Mendez, Horacio Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice. Filing fee $455, receipt number 0539-4200008. T.O. form to appellant electronically at Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Valdespino, Edward) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 29 , 31 , 36 , 44 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and denying 91 Motion to Stay Case pending Appeal of SLUSA decison in related case as moot. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/21/2011) (jrb) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss, 36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Class Action Complaint, 44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, 29 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by P Mauricio Alvarado, Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY filed by Annalisa Mendez, Horacio Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice re: 91 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Appeal of SLUSA Decision in Related Case (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE filed by P Mauricio Alvarado, Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom re: 91 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Appeal of SLUSA Decision in Related Case (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: The Court will hold a status conference for all parties to the Stanford MDL proceeding on 10/13/2011 10:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/27/2011) (jkm) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Stay Case Pending Appeal of SLUSA Decision in Related Case filed by Annalisa Mendez, Horacio Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by P Mauricio Alvarado, Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C) (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Any party that has briefed SLUSA issues in a case proceeding under this MDL may call the Court's attention to that briefing by filing an appropriate notice in Roland within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. It is unnecessary for the parties in Civil Action No. 3:09-CV-1600-N to provide such notice. Any other party desiring to apprise the Court of its views should file, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, a motion for leave to file an amicus brief, together with a copy of such proposed brief not to exceed twenty-five (25) pages. Motions for leave should indicate how the partys legal position differs from those of the parties in Roland and Troice v. Proskauer. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/10/2011) (jkm) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/28/2011 03:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1351, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/17/2011) (jkm) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Keith Isaak on behalf of P Mauricio Alvarado. (Isaak, David) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT Examiner's Report No. 3 filed by John J Little. (jkm) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/23/2010 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX, 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Counsel is advised multiple NEFs may be received for this filing.) (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/20/2010) (jkm) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 70 Motion to Compel; granting 74 Cross Motion to Stay discovery. (see Order) (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/19/2010) (ykp) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 80 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua R. Hochberg. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/19/2010) (Judge David C Godbey) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 79 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mindy L. Caplan. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/19/2010) (Judge David C Godbey) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Supplemental Authority filed by Proskauer Rose LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Romano v Kazacos) (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Joshua R. Hochberg (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 41730) filed by Thomas V Sjoblom. (dnc) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Mindy L. Caplan (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 41731) filed by Thomas V Sjoblom. (dnc) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: granting 77 MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel filed by Thomas V Sjoblom. Attorney Jay L Krystinik; Keith Miles Aurzada and James M Cole terminated. (See Order) (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/30/2010) (dnc) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel filed by Thomas V Sjoblom (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Krystinik, Jay) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY filed by P Mauricio Alvarado, Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom re: 72 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending the Court's Consideration of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY filed by Annalisa Mendez, Horacio Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice re: 72 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending the Court's Consideration of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures, 70 MOTION to Compel (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL INITIAL DISCLOSURES) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom re 73 Response/Objection to Motion to Compel and in Support of Cross-Motion to Stay Discovery (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom re: 70 MOTION to Compel (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL INITIAL DISCLOSURES) (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending the Court's Consideration of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures filed by P Mauricio Alvarado (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Gerger, David) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File to file a Motion for Class Certification. (see order) (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/30/2010) (mfw) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel Initial Disclosures filed by Annalisa Mendez, Horacio Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Samuel Troice (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 66 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Excess of Page Limitations. Mr. Alvarado shall submit a brief of no more than twenty pages. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/19/2010) (klm) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY filed by P Mauricio Alvarado re: 44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Gerger, David) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 62 Motion to Extend Time. Replies due by 3/17/2010. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/17/2010) (Judge David C Godbey) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Excess of Page Limitations filed by P Mauricio Alvarado (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gerger, David) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Thomas V Sjoblom re 36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Krystinik, Jay) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY filed by Proskauer Rose LLP re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss (Collins, Bruce) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP re 29 MOTION to Dismiss. (Hirschman, Karen) Modified on 3/16/2010 (axm). (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time for Filing Reply to Motion to Dismiss filed by P Mauricio Alvarado (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gerger, David) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 59 Agreed Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Excess of Page Limitations. Defendant Proskauer Rose LLP may file a reply brief in excess of ten (10) pages, but not to exceed thirty-five (35) pages, in support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/11/2010) (klm) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 58 Motion to Extend Page Limitation. Defendant Chadbourne & Parke LLP is permitted to file a reply brief not to exceed thirty-five (35) pages in further support of its motion to dismiss. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/11/2010) (klm) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Excess of Page Limitations filed by Proskauer Rose LLP (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Agreed MOTION Extend Page Limitation filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Held, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 35 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/19/2010) (Judge David C Godbey) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 55 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Replies due by 3/15/2010. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/10/2010) (Judge David C Godbey) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Briefs in Support of re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss, 36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Class Action Complaint, 29 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by P Mauricio Alvarado, Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 49 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. Plaintiffs are permitted to file a brief not to exceed 80 pages in support of their joint response to Defendants' motions to dismiss. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/5/2010) (rrr) Modified on 2/9/2010 (mfw). (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil R Burger on behalf of Proskauer Rose LLP. (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint STATUS REPORT in Response to Order Requiring Status and Scheduling Conference filed by Samuel Troice, Horacio Mendez, P Mauricio Alvarado, Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Annalisa Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom. (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by Samuel Troice, Horacio Mendez, Annalisa Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd re 50 Response/Objection, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward C. Snyder, # 2 Exhibit A-B) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE filed by Samuel Troice, Horacio Mendez, Annalisa Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss, 36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Class Action Complaint, 44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, 29 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit filed by Samuel Troice, Horacio Mendez, Annalisa Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 47 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Reponse to Motion to Dismiss is due by February 1, 2010. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/8/2010) (Judge David C Godbey) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: 44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Samuel Troice, Horacio Mendez, Annalisa Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. See Order (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/22/2009) (svc) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 42 Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time to File Responses to the Motions to Dismiss. Responses due by 2/1/2010. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/18/2009) (klm) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by P Mauricio Alvarado with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gerger, David) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by P Mauricio Alvarado. (Gerger, David) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to: 31 MOTION to Dismiss, 36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Class Action Complaint, 29 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Samuel Troice, Horacio Mendez, Annalisa Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 22 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/14/2009) (Judge David C Godbey) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/14/2009) (Judge David C Godbey) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/14/2009) (Judge David C Godbey) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Daniel J Schwartz for Proskauer Rose LLP. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/9/2009) (dnc) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Rajesh S James for Proskauer Rose LLP. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/9/2009) (dnc) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Thomas V Sjoblom (Krystinik, Jay) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            First Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James M. Cole (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 05390000000003036618) filed by Thomas V Sjoblom (Krystinik, Jay) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chadbourne & Parke LLP. (Brandon, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Proskauer Rose LLP. (Collins, Bruce) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT re 31 MOTION to Dismiss by Proskauer Rose LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3) (Collins, Bruce) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss filed by Proskauer Rose LLP with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Collins, Bruce) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix in Support filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP re 29 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Brandon, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Brandon, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 24 AGREED MOTION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITATION (See Order.) (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/10/2009) (twd) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 23 AGREED MOTION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITATION (See Order.) (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/10/2009) (twd) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth P Held on behalf of Chadbourne & Parke LLP. (Held, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Thomas V Sjoblom answer due 12/11/2009. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/4/2009) (Judge David C Godbey) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Page Limitation filed by Proskauer Rose LLP (Collins, Bruce) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Extension of Page Limitation filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Brandon, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel J. Leffell (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 05390000000003024762) filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP (Brandon, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney William B. Michael (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 05390000000003024748) filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP (Brandon, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel J. Beller (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 05390000000003024656) filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP (Brandon, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Thomas V Sjoblom (Krystinik, Jay) (Entered: 12/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jay L Krystinik on behalf of Thomas V Sjoblom. (Krystinik, Jay) (Entered: 12/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion For Class Certification Pursuant To Local Rule 23.2 Until Further Order Of This Court filed by Samuel Troice, Horacio Mendez, Annalisa Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 15 Motion to Extend Time. Response due by 12/18/2009. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/19/2009) (Judge David C Godbey) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond filed by P Mauricio Alvarado (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gerger, David) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by James P Rouhandeh for Proskauer Rose LLP. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/13/2009) (axm) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 9 Motion to Extend Time. Response due December 11, 2009. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/12/09) (Judge David C Godbey) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth C Brandon on behalf of Chadbourne & Parke LLP. (Brandon, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 10 Motion to Extend Time. Response due December 11, 2009. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/10/09) (Judge David C Godbey) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Respond filed by Samuel Troice, Horacio Mendez, Annalisa Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd, Proskauer Rose LLP (Collins, Bruce) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Extend Time to Respond filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP (Tonkinson, Stuart) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom. (klm) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to P Mauricio Alvarado, Chadbourne & Parke LLP. (ISS-2) (axm) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Second AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against PROSKAUER ROSE LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom filed by Samuel Troice, Horacio Mendez, Annalisa Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd. Clerk to issue summons(es). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Judge Royal Furgeson no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Royal Furgeson on 8/31/2009) (twd) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against PROSKAUER ROSE LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom filed by Samuel Troice, Horacio Mendez, Annalisa Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Samuel Troice, Horacio Mendez, Annalisa Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd. (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS Civil Cover Sheet to 1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Samuel Troice, Horacio Mendez, Annalisa Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd. (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against PROSKAUER ROSE LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom filed by Samuel Troice, Horacio Mendez, Annalisa Mendez, Punga Punga Financial, Ltd. Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing the filer receives, the judge assignment is indicated in the subject line, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (Filing fee $350; Receipt number 05390000000002877490) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 416 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?