Torres v. Peoria County Jail, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Central District Court, Case No. 2:91-cv-02138-HAB-RJK
District Judge Harold A. Baker, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ramon A Torres, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Palmer, Defendant
No Logo Evan Bayh, Defendant
No Logo Henry Vellnon, Defendant
No Logo JAMES THOMPSON, Defendant
No Logo John Ashcrost, Defendant
No Logo Medical Center for Federal Prisoners, Defendant
No Logo Metropolitan Correctional Center, Defendant
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.
No Logo Peoria County Jail, Defendant
No Logo Peoria County Sheriff, Defendant
No Logo St Frances (Hospital) Medical Center, Defendant
No Logo U S Marshals, Defendant
No Logo U S Penitentiary Camp Elreno Okla, Defendant
No Logo U S Penitentiary Camp Terre Haute IN, Defendant
No Logo U S Penitentiary Leavenworth Kansas, Defendant
Office Urbana
Filed 2/20/1991
Jury Demand None
Demand $500000
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Peoria
Terminated 5/9/1991
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 91-1030[Peoria]
Def Custody Status
Flags 21, CLOSED, PRISONER, REFER, TRANSF
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 11/8/1995, Entered: 11/8/1995 Remark
Remark-File sent to FRC, Chicago in Aug. 1995, Accession No. 021 95 0160, Box 18 of 20, Location 226992 (SLJ, ilcd)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/15/1991, Entered: 5/20/1991 Remark
    Remark: Copy of jgm & order returned from Corr Center. Pla no longer there. (KW, ilcd)
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 5/9/1991, Entered: 5/9/1991 Judgment*
      JUDGMENT in a civil case entered in favor of the dfts & against the pla. Case dismissed. (cc:pro se pla) (KW, ilcd)
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 5/9/1991, Entered: 5/9/1991 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Chief Judge Harold A. Baker; Pla's petition for leave to proceed w/o prepayment of costs & fees, denied. Cmp, dismissed. Cause stricken & case dismissed. to dismiss case (cc: pro se pla) (KW, ilcd)
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 5/2/1991, Entered: 5/2/1991 Case Transferred In - Divisional TransferCourt Filing
          Original file, transfer order received from Peoria [ 91-1030]. Case assigned to Chief Judge Harold A. Baker . Case referred to Magistrate Judge Robert J. Kauffman . (CL, ilcd)
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 5/2/1991, Entered: 5/2/1991 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER by Judge Michael M. Mihm transferring case to the Danville Division New case number in Danville is 91-2138; old case number in Peoria Division was 91-1030. File mailed to Danvile Division; all futher pleadings are to filed in Danville. (cc: all counsel) (CL, ilcd)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 4/8/1991, Entered: 4/8/1991 Description not availableCourt Filing
              SIGNED PETITION to PROCEED IFP filed; forwarded to the judge for review (complaint received). Case referred to Magistrate Judge Robert J. Kauffman (VB, ilcd) Modified on 04/08/1991
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 4/8/1991, Entered: 4/8/1991 Response
                RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER OF MARCH 19, 1991 (FILED AS MOTION TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S MARCH 19, 1991 ORDER, DIRECTING THE PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT A SIGNED PETITION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF COSTS AND FEES, IFP) by plaintiff Ramon A Torres (VB, ilcd)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/19/1991, Entered: 3/19/1991 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                  MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Michael M. Mihm. Plaintiff submitted documents for initiating a civil rights action under 42:1983. The Clerk accepted the documents due to the statements of the filer, who indicated that the case had to be filed by 2/20/91 to avoid limitation problems. However, the Clerk is directed now to return the petition to proceed without prepayment of costs and fees for the plaintiff's signature. Failure to return the signed petition within 21 days will result in summary denial of leave to proceed ifp, and dismissal of this case. The plaintiff's undocketed motion to waive the Court's trust fund ledger requirement is allowed. Court sets misc ddl of 4/9/91 for petitioner to return signed ifp. (cc: all counsel) (CL, ilcd)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 2/20/1991, Entered: 2/27/1991 Description not availableCourt Filing
                    PETITION to PROCEED IFP filed; forwarded to the judge 2/27/91 for review (complaint received). Case referred to Magistrate Judge Robert J. Kauffman (HK, ilcd)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 97 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?