PLUNKETT et al v. DONOVAN

Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00326
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 29, 2016 at 4:56 PM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo CHARLIE PLUNKETT, Plaintiff

Represented by AARP Foundation Litigation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jean Marie Constantine-Davis +1 202 434 2058 +1 202 434 6424 jcdavis@aarp.org

Represented by Community Legal Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PETER D. SCHNEIDER +1 215 981 3718 pschneider@clsphila.org

Represented by MEHRI & SKALET, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L. Briskin +1 202 822 5100 +1 202 822 4997 cbriskin@findjustice.com
No Logo CLARISA WELTE, Plaintiff

Represented by Community Legal Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PETER D. SCHNEIDER +1 215 981 3718 pschneider@clsphila.org
No Logo LEILA JOSEPH, Plaintiff

Represented by Aarp Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/22/2015 Jean Marie Constantine-Davis +1 202 434 2058 +1 202 434 6424 jcdavis@aarp.org

Represented by Community Legal Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PETER D. SCHNEIDER +1 215 981 3718 pschneider@clsphila.org

Represented by MEHRI & SKALET, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L. Briskin +1 202 822 5100 +1 202 822 4997 cbriskin@findjustice.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven A. Skalet +1 202 822 5100 +1 202 822 4997 pleadings@findjustice.com
No Logo Robert Bennett, Plaintiff

Represented by Aarp Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/22/2015 Jean Marie Constantine-Davis +1 202 434 2058 +1 202 434 6424 jcdavis@aarp.org

Represented by Community Legal Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PETER D. SCHNEIDER +1 215 981 3718 pschneider@clsphila.org

Represented by MEHRI & SKALET, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L. Briskin +1 202 822 5100 +1 202 822 4997 cbriskin@findjustice.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven A. Skalet +1 202 822 5100 +1 202 822 4997 pleadings@findjustice.com
No Logo ROSELAINE LABONTE, Plaintiff

Represented by Community Legal Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PETER D. SCHNEIDER +1 215 981 3718 pschneider@clsphila.org
No Logo WINNIE BARLOCK, Plaintiff

Represented by Community Legal Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PETER D. SCHNEIDER +1 215 981 3718 pschneider@clsphila.org
v.
No Logo SHAUN DONOVAN, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carol Federighi +1 202 514 1903 +1 202 318 7597 carol.federighi@usdoj.gov
in his capacity as SECRETARY OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT Brian G. Kennedy +1 202 514 3357 +1 202 616 8460 brian.kennedy@usdoj.gov
Attributes
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 551
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Timeline
  Entries (89) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Substitute
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Substitute
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by SHAUN DONOVAN (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1: Himes Decl, # 3 Exhibit A-1 to Himes Decl, # 4 Exhibit A-2 to Himes Decl, # 5 Exhibit A-3 to Himes Decl, # 6 Exhibit B-1 to Himes Decl, # 7 Exhibit B-2 to Himes Decl, # 8 Exhibit C to Himes Decl, # 9 Exhibit D to Himes Decl, # 10 Exhibit E to Himes Decl, # 11 Exhibit F-1 to Himes Decl, # 12 Exhibit F-2 to Himes Decl, # 13 Exhibit F-3 to Himes Decl, # 14 Exhibit G to Himes Decl, # 15 Exhibit H to Himes Decl, # 16 Exhibit I to Himes Decl, # 17 Exhibit J to Himes Decl, # 18 Exhibit 2: Federighi Decl, # 19 Exhibit A to Federighi Decl, # 20 Exhibit B to Federighi Decl, # 21 Exhibit C to Federighi Decl, # 22 Exhibit D to Federighi Decl, # 23 Exhibit E to Federighi Decl, # 24 Text of Proposed Order)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None USCA Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to 63 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by WINNIE BARLOCK, CHARLIE PLUNKETT, LEILA JOSEPH, ROSELAINE LABONTE, CLARISA WELTE, ROBERT BENNETT. ORDERED that the motion be granted, and this case is hereby dismissed. USCA Case Number 14-5322. (rd) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Surreply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Alter Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Certify Class
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 3 MOTION to Certify Class filed by WINNIE BARLOCK, ROBERT BENNETT, LEILA JOSEPH, ROSELAINE LABONTE, CHARLIE PLUNKETT, CLARISA WELTE. (jf, ) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Certify Class
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
ERRATA by SHAUN DONOVAN 38 Memorandum in Opposition filed by SHAUN DONOVAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Title Page to Def's Mem in Support of Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Pl's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
Memorandum in opposition to re 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SHAUN DONOVAN. (Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by SHAUN DONOVAN (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Federighi, Carol). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 7/22/2014 (jf, ). (Entered: 07/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
MOTION for Summary Judgment by WINNIE BARLOCK, ROBERT BENNETT, LEILA JOSEPH, ROSELAINE LABONTE, CHARLIE PLUNKETT, CLARISA WELTE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig L. Briskin, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Mortgagee Letter 2011-01, # 3 Exhibit 2 - ELMORE, # 4 Exhibit 3 - HUD HERMIT Manual, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Szymanski et al, # 6 Exhibit 5 - HUD Data, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Deval, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Mortgagee Letter 2006-25, # 9 Exhibit 8 - DeBlasio Paper, # 10 Declaration of Robert Bennett, # 11 Declaration of Roselaine LaBonte, # 12 Declaration of Charlie Plunkett, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Briskin, Craig) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by SHAUN DONOVAN 33 Administrative Record filed by SHAUN DONOVAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AR 2090-2189, # 2 Exhibit AR 2190-2289, # 3 Exhibit AR 2290-2381, # 4 Exhibit AR 2382-2452)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by SHAUN DONOVAN 33 Administrative Record filed by SHAUN DONOVAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AR 1790-1889, # 2 Exhibit AR 1890-1989, # 3 Exhibit AR 1990-2089)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Notice of Filing by SHAUN DONOVAN. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit AR 1490-1589, # 3 Exhibit AR 1590-1689, # 4 Exhibit AR 1690-1789)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT by SHAUN DONOVAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT by SHAUN DONOVAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson held on 6-10-14; Page Numbers: 1-52. Date of Issuance:6-14-14. Court Reporter/Transcriber Barbara DeVico, Court Reporter Email Address : Barbara_DeVico@dcd.uscourts.gov.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/7/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/14/2014.(DeVico, Barbara) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER based on June 10, 2014 Status Conference. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on June 10, 2014.(lcesh2) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
WITHDRAWN PURSUANT 45 NOTICE.....MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Opposition to Class Certification by SHAUN DONOVAN (Attachments: # 1 Document to be filed, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Federighi, Carol) Modified on 8/12/2014 (jf, ). (Entered: 06/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT by WINNIE BARLOCK, ROSELAINE LABONTE, CHARLIE PLUNKETT, CLARISA WELTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Mehlsack Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Cooper Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Jaramillo Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Drysdale Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Gill Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Peacock Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Moskowitz Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Scott Declaration)(Briskin, Craig) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT by SHAUN DONOVAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
REPLY to opposition to motion re 3 MOTION to Certify Class filed by WINNIE BARLOCK, ROSELAINE LABONTE, CHARLIE PLUNKETT, CLARISA WELTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Mortgagee Letter 2006-25)(Briskin, Craig) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT by SHAUN DONOVAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
Memorandum in opposition to re 3 MOTION to Certify Class filed by SHAUN DONOVAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Federighi, Carol) Modified on 5/6/2014 to correct docket link (jf, ). (Entered: 05/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint by SHAUN DONOVAN.(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle held on April 17, 2014; Page Numbers: 1-18. Date of Issuance: May 2, 2014. Court Reporter: William Zaremba. Telephone number: (202)354-3249. Email Address: William_Zaremba@dcd.uscourts.gov. For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/23/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2014.(Zaremba, William) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE re 19 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by SHAUN DONOVAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. A, Kathleen Zadareky Declaration)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by WINNIE BARLOCK, ROSELAINE LABONTE, CHARLIE PLUNKETT, CLARISA WELTE (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Constantine-Davis, Jean) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT JOINT by SHAUN DONOVAN. (Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
MOTION to Stay re 3 MOTION to Certify Class by SHAUN DONOVAN (Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle held on 3-20-14; Page Numbers: 1-35. Date of Issuance:3/28/14. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller, Telephone number 202-354-3243, Court Reporter Email Address : patfromhawaii@aol.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/18/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/28/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2014.(Kaneshiro-Miller, Patricia) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
REPLY to opposition to motion re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by WINNIE BARLOCK, ROSELAINE LABONTE, CHARLIE PLUNKETT, CLARISA WELTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4 - Mortgagee Letter 2006-25, # 2 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Michael Weinstein)(Briskin, Craig) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by WINNIE BARLOCK, ROSELAINE LABONTE, CHARLIE PLUNKETT, CLARISA WELTE (Briskin, Craig) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
Memorandum in opposition to re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by SHAUN DONOVAN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/5/2014. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/4/2014. (jf, ) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 3/5/2014. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 3/26/2014. (Briskin, Craig) Modified on 3/7/2014 (jf, ). (Entered: 03/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/5/2014. (Briskin, Craig) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Federighi on behalf of SHAUN DONOVAN (Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/1/2014, Entered: None
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (1) ISSUED as to SHAUN DONOVAN. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent, # 2 Consent Form)(md, ) (Entered: 03/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 11-0498. (Briskin, Craig) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Marie Constantine-Davis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Constantine-Davis, Jean) (Main Document 6 replaced on 3/3/2014) (jf, ). (Entered: 02/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by CLARISA WELTE, WINNIE BARLOCK, CHARLIE PLUNKETT, ROSELAINE LABONTE re 1 Complaint filed by CLARISA WELTE, WINNIE BARLOCK, CHARLIE PLUNKETT, ROSELAINE LABONTE. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by WINNIE BARLOCK, CHARLIE PLUNKETT, ROSELAINE LABONTE, CLARISA WELTE.(Briskin, Craig) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
CIVIL COVER SHEET by CLARISA WELTE, WINNIE BARLOCK, CHARLIE PLUNKETT, ROSELAINE LABONTE re 1 Complaint filed by CLARISA WELTE, WINNIE BARLOCK, CHARLIE PLUNKETT, ROSELAINE LABONTE. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by WINNIE BARLOCK, CHARLIE PLUNKETT, ROSELAINE LABONTE, CLARISA WELTE.(Briskin, Craig) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
MOTION to Certify Class by WINNIE BARLOCK, ROSELAINE LABONTE, CHARLIE PLUNKETT, CLARISA WELTE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig L. Briskin, # 2 Declaration of Jean Constantine-Davis, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Briskin, Craig) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by WINNIE BARLOCK, ROSELAINE LABONTE, CHARLIE PLUNKETT, CLARISA WELTE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig L. Briskin, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Craig L. Briskin, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Craig L. Briskin, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Craig L. Briskin, # 5 Declaration of Jean Constantine-Davis, # 6 Declaration of Winnie Barlock, # 7 Declaration of Charlie Plunkett, # 8 Declaration of Clarisa Welte, # 9 Declaration of Roselaine LaBonte, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Briskin, Craig) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3636638) filed by CLARISA WELTE, WINNIE BARLOCK, CHARLIE PLUNKETT, ROSELAINE LABONTE.(Briskin, Craig) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 871 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?