ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00317

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 10, 2019 at 11:38 AM ST (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Electronic Privacy Information Center, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sunlight Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ginger P. McCall +1 202 483 1140 +1 202 483 1248 gmccall@sunlightfoundation.com
v.
No Logo United States Drug Enforcement Administration, Defendant
Officially listed as "DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Space James C. Luh +1 202 514 4938 james.luh@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/25/2016, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              SUPPLEMENTAL Exhibits to re 36 Supplemental Memorandum,, filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (td) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 8, 2016. (lcegs4) (zmac). (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 33 Memorandum & Opinion, 32 Order, (Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule in Response to June 24, 2016, Order and Memorandum Opinion) filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Luh, James) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 24, 2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER DENYING in part and HOLDING IN ABEYANCE in part Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING in part and DENYING without prejudice in part Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 24, 2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Surreply
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                            RESPONSE re 23 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION (Defendant's Motion Regarding the Parties' Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment) Opposition filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCall, Ginger) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment) by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration of Katherine L. Myrick, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Luh, James) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: 7/3/2014 Status Report
                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Horwitz, Julia) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: 7/3/2014 Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                      RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, (Defendant's Status Report in Response to May 20, 2014, Order) filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Luh, James) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: 7/3/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Rotenberg on behalf of ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Rotenberg, Marc) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: 5/13/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: 5/12/2014 Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: 4/8/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER FOR MEET AND CONFER REPORT. Attorney Meet and Confer Conference due by 4/30/2014. Meet & Confer Statement due by 5/14/2014. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/08/14. (mac) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: 4/7/2014 Answer
                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION.(Luh, James) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: 2/27/2014 Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: 4/2/2014 Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by James C. Luh on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Judith A. Kidwell (Luh, James) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                                                    LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (McCall, Ginger) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: 3/21/2014 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney
                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/6/2014. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/5/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - U.S. Attorney General, # 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - DC Attorney, # 3 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - Drug Enforcement Administration, # 4 Exhibit Receipt for Certified Mail - U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Exhibit Receipt for Certified Mail - DC Attorney, # 6 Exhibit Receipt for Certified Mail - Drug Enforcement Administration)(McCall, Ginger) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 Complaint
                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3634783) filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons DEA, # 4 Summons US Attorney)(McCall, Ginger) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 67 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?