Sherwin-Williams v. OXY USA Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Central District Court, Case No. 2:95-cv-02002-HAB
District Judge Harold A. Baker, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerome Kiley Bowman +1 312 558 1000 +7508 750 750 8600 bowman644@gmail.com
Space Charles M Chadd +1 312 558 1000 +7508 750 750 8600

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson & Bell, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William D Serritella +1 312 372 0770 serritellaw@jbltd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Loevy & Loevy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kurt Henry Feuer +1 312 243 5900 +1 312 243 5901 kurt@loevy.com
v.
BASF Corporation BASF Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wildman Harrold Allen & Dixon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James R. Morrin +1 312 201 2000 +2012 201 201 2555
Space Lisa S. Simmons +1 312 201 2000 +2012 201 201 2555 simmons@wildmanharrold.com
No Logo Oxy Usa Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, WGR Holdings LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan M Bay +1 414 792 9150

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William J. Holloway +1 312 704 3000 wholloway@hinshawlaw.com
Space Robert Hill Smeltzer +1 312 704 3000
No Logo The Glidden Company, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by McDonnell Boehnen Hulbert & Berghoff LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua R. Rich +1 312 913 0001 +31291300 312 291 3002 rich@mbhb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew H Perellis +1 312 460 5813 +1 312 460 7813 aperellis@seyfarth.com
Office Urbana
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $991000
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County XX Outside US
Terminated 4/14/1998
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 96-1357[], 94C5625[USDC NDIL]
Def Custody Status
Flags 20, CLOSED
  Entries (119) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/18/2000 Archives File Sent to FRC
ARCHIVES FILE sent to FRC, Chicago on 04/28/00, Accession No. 021 00 0077 Box No. 11 and 12 of 48 Location 190717-190764 (SK, ilcd)
    LREF
    Blank 103 Filed: 4/14/1998, Entered: 4/14/1998 Judgment*
    JUDGMENT in a civil case entered; case dismissed without costs and with prejudice by agreement of the parties. (cc: all counsel) (MB, ilcd)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 4/14/1998, Entered: 4/14/1998 Order
      ENDORSED ORDER on its face by Judge Harold A. Baker granting stipulation [102-1] for dismissal with prejudice. Case dismissed. (cc: all counsel). (MB, ilcd)
        LREF
        Blank 102 Filed: 4/9/1998, Entered: 4/9/1998, Terminated: 4/14/1998 Stipulation
        STIPULATION and Motion For Dismissal with prejudice (MB, ilcd)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1998, Entered: 3/27/1998 Minutes-Miscellaneous
          MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Harold A. Baker. Parties report final version of settlement agreement is being prepared and will be circulated among parties. Parties will file agreement by 4/3/98. Jury trial VACATED for 9:00 3/30/98 ; jury selection VACATED for 9:00 3/30/98. Atty Daggett to notify all parties. (MB, ilcd)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/23/1998, Entered: 3/24/1998 Minutes-Miscellaneous
            MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Harold A. Baker ; status hearing held 1:15 3/23/98, by conf call. Appr of attys Jerome Bowman, Kirk Minckler, David McCormack, Andrew Perellis, Thomas Daggett. Conf call taken by deputy clerk Marilyn Talbott. Parties expect to have settlement papers signed by 4/3/98. Atty Bowman will call the court on 3/27/98 to give a status. (MB, ilcd)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/16/1998, Entered: 3/16/1998 Minutes-Miscellaneous
              MINUTE-ENTRY: status conf call held by Judge Harold A. Baker--appearance of parties by attorneys Bowman, Minckler, McCormack, Perellis and Daggett. Draft settlement agreement is being circulated to parties; mtn to suspend proceedings (#100) will remain pending. Further status hearing set 1:15 3/23/98 by conf call. (SJ, ilcd)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 3/9/1998, Entered: 3/10/1998 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                MINUTE-ENTRY: conf call held by Judge Harold A. Baker; attorneys Bowman, Lupo, Daggett, McCormack and Minckler present on the call. Parties plan to distribute a settlement agreement this date; the hearing on summary judgment motions [89-1], [85-1], [79-1] is vacated and status hearing is set 9:00 3/16/98 by telephone; atty Bowman will initiate the call. (SJ, ilcd)
                  LREF
                  Blank 101 Filed: 3/6/1998, Entered: 3/9/1998 ~Notice (other)
                  NOTICE of filing doc #100 by plaintiff Sherwin-Williams (SJ, ilcd)
                    LREF
                    Blank 100 Filed: 3/6/1998, Entered: 3/9/1998 Motion for Order
                    AGREED MOTION by plaintiff Sherwin-Williams to suspend all dates (SJ, ilcd)
                      LREF
                      Blank 99 Filed: 2/24/1998, Entered: 2/26/1998 ResponseCourt Filing
                      Letter in RESPONSE by defendant OXY USA Inc to letter dated 1/30/98 from Judge Baker to counsel [84-1] (SJ, ilcd)
                        LREF
                        Blank 98 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/26/1998 ResponseCourt Filing
                        Letter in RESPONSE by defendant BASF Corporation to letter dated 1/30/98 from Judge Baker to counsel [84-1] (SJ, ilcd)
                          LREF
                          Blank 97 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE of filing doc #96 by plaintiff Sherwin-Williams (SJ, ilcd)
                            LREF
                            Blank 96 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998, Terminated: 2/20/1998 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                            JOINT MOTION by plaintiff Sherwin-Williams to extend dates (SJ, ilcd)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                              MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Harold A. Baker granting motion to extend dates [96-1]; response to pending motions for summary judgment [89-1], [85-1], [79-1] due 3/11/98; setting hearing on pending motions for summary judgment [89-1], [85-1], [79-1] at 9:00 3/16/98 by personal appearance in Urbana, IL. Status hearing VACATED 9:00 3/2/98 . Jury selection RESET to 9:00 3/30/98 and jury trial RESET to 9:00 3/30/98 in Urbana, IL. (cc: all counsel) (SJ, ilcd)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 2/13/1998, Entered: 2/17/1998 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Harold A. Baker; the court was advised by the US Court of Appeals that parties are participating in the settlement conference program through the USCA. Due to negotiations being conducted in that program, the misc ddl of 2/16/98 for answering memoranda is extended to 2/25/98 ; response to motion for summary judgment [89-1] extended to 2/25/98. If parties require any further extensions of deadlines, they are to file written motions. (cc: all counsel) (SJ, ilcd)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 95 Filed: 2/12/1998, Entered: 2/13/1998 ResponseCourt Filing
                                  Letter from Specialty Coatings Co. in RESPONSE to letter dated 1/30/98 from Judge Baker to counsel [84-1] (SJ, ilcd)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 94 Filed: 2/9/1998, Entered: 2/9/1998 ResponseCourt Filing
                                    Letter in RESPONSE by plaintiff Sherwin-Williams to letter dated 1/30/98 from Judge Baker to counsel [84-1]. (SJ, ilcd)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 93 Filed: 2/5/1998, Entered: 2/5/1998 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                      MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of motion for summary judgment [85-1] by defendant BASF Corporation (SJ, ilcd)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/5/1998, Entered: 2/5/1998 Order
                                        ENDORSED ORDER on its face by Judge Harold A. Baker granting motion for leave to file brief in excess of 15 pages [86-1] (cc: all counsel). (SJ, ilcd)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 92 Filed: 2/2/1998, Entered: 2/3/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                          NOTICE of filing documents #89, #90, #91 by plaintiff Sherwin-Williams (SJ, ilcd)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 91 Filed: 2/2/1998, Entered: 2/3/1998 Statement of Facts
                                            STATEMENT OF FACTS (undisputed) by plaintiff Sherwin-Williams in support of motion for summary judgment [89-1] (SJ, ilcd)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 90 Filed: 2/2/1998, Entered: 2/3/1998 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                              MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of motion for summary judgment [89-1] by plaintiff Sherwin-Williams (SJ, ilcd)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 89 Filed: 2/2/1998, Entered: 2/3/1998 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                MOTION by plaintiff Sherwin-Williams for summary judgment (SJ, ilcd)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 88 Filed: 1/30/1998, Entered: 2/3/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                  NOTICE of filing documents #85, #86, #87 by defendant BASF Corporation (SJ, ilcd)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 1/30/1998, Entered: 2/3/1998 Statement of Facts
                                                    STATEMENT OF FACTS (uncontested) by defendant BASF Corporation in support of motion for summary judgment [85-1] (SJ, ilcd)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 1/30/1998, Entered: 2/3/1998 Motion for Leave to File
                                                      MOTION by defendant BASF Corporation for leave to file brief in excess of 15 pages instanter (SJ, ilcd)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 85 Filed: 1/30/1998, Entered: 2/3/1998 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                        MOTION by defendant BASF Corporation for summary judgment (SJ, ilcd)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 84 Filed: 1/30/1998, Entered: 2/2/1998 LetterCourt Filing
                                                          LETTER faxed to counsel from Judge Baker with questions he would like answered in the statements of uncontested facts (SJ, ilcd)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/30/1998, Entered: 2/2/1998 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                            MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Harold A. Baker; Rule 16 conference held by conf call 2:00 1/30/98 in 89-2306 and 95-2002--appearance of pltf by Jerome Bowman and Kurt Feuer; appearance of Oxy USA by Robert Hill Smeltzer and Susan Bay; appearance of BASF Corp by James Morrin, Thomas Daggett and Katheline McFarland; appearance of Glidden Co by Andrew Perellis and Thomas Lupo. Progress of case discussed. (SJ, ilcd)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/29/1998, Entered: 1/30/1998 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                              MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Harold A. Baker; case dispositive mtn filing ddl extended to 2/2/98 . (cc: all counsel) (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/26/1998, Entered: 1/26/1998 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Harold A. Baker; telephone status conference set 2:00 1/30/98 (counsel notified by telephone) (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 83 Filed: 12/22/1997, Entered: 12/22/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 by Judge Harold A. Baker re cases 89-2306, 95-2002 and 95-2244. The court, over the objection of Sherwin-Williams, sua sponte dismisses without prejudice the remaining claims in 95-2244. The court consolidates 89-2306 and 95-2002 for purposes of administration and possibly for trial. Case dispositive motions with supporting memoranda (not longer than 15 pages) must be filed by 1/30/98 ; answering memoranda (not longer than 15 pages) must be filed by 2/16/98 . Hearings on case dispositive motions are set for 9:00 3/2/98 in Urbana, IL. Jury selection set 9:00 3/16/98 and jury trial set 9:00 3/16/98 in Urbana, IL. It is the court's present intention to try 95-2002 first and separately and then try 89-2306. (cc: all counsel; copy faxed to attys Bowman, Smeltzer, Daggett, Perellis and Minckler) (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 82 Filed: 12/16/1997, Entered: 12/16/1997 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                    MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of motion for summary judgment [79-1] by defendant OXY USA Inc (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/16/1997, Entered: 12/16/1997 Order
                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER on its face by Judge Harold A. Baker granting dft Oxy USA's motion for leave to file memo in excess of fifteen pages [78-1] (cc: all counsel). (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 81 Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: 12/16/1997 ~Notice (other)
                                                                        NOTICE of filing documents #78-80 by defendant OXY USA Inc (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 80 Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: 12/16/1997 Statement of Facts
                                                                          STATEMENT OF FACTS (uncontested) by defendant OXY USA Inc in support of motion for summary judgment [79-1] (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 79 Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: 12/16/1997 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                            MOTION by defendant OXY USA Inc for summary judgment (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 78 Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: 12/16/1997 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                              MOTION by defendant OXY USA Inc for leave to file memo in excess of fifteen pages (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/12/1997, Entered: 12/16/1997 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Harold A. Baker; settlement conference held before Mag. Judge David G. Bernthal 10:00 12/12/97; Rule 16 conference held 1:30 12/12/97 before Judge Harold A. Baker; appearance of Sherwin-Williams Co by Jerome Bowman, Kurt Feuer and client rep Alan Danzig; appearance of Oxy USA by Robert Smeltzer, David McCormack and client rep Angela Paulsen; appearance of BASF Corp by Thomas Daggett and client rep Kathleen McFadden; appearance of Glidden Co by Andrew Perellis and Thomas Lupo. (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/3/1997, Entered: 12/3/1997 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                  MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge David G. Bernthal; Matter set for a settlement conference at 10:00 on 12/12/97 by pesonal appearance in Urbana. (cc: all counsel) (SLJ, ilcd)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 77 Filed: 12/2/1997, Entered: 12/3/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                    RESPONSE by defendant OXY USA Inc to motion for order to lift stay [75-1] (SLJ, ilcd)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/18/1997, Entered: 11/18/1997 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                      MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Harold A. Baker ; Rule 16 conference set for 1:30 12/12/97 by personal appearance in Urbana, IL (cc: all counsel) (MB, ilcd)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 11/12/1997, Entered: 11/12/1997 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                        NOTICE of filing doc #75 by plaintiff Sherwin-Williams (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 11/12/1997, Entered: 11/12/1997, Terminated: 4/14/1998 Motion for Order
                                                                                          MOTION by plaintiff Sherwin-Williams for order to lift stay (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/27/1997, Entered: 2/27/1997 Order
                                                                                            ENDORSED ORDER on its face by Mag. Judge David G. Bernthal denying motion for attorney Susan M. Bay to appear pro hac vice [73-1] (cc: all counsel). (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 74 Filed: 2/24/1997, Entered: 2/25/1997 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                              NOTICE of filing doc #73 by defendant OXY USA Inc (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 73 Filed: 2/24/1997, Entered: 2/25/1997 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                MOTION by defendant OXY USA Inc for attorney Susan M. Bay to appear pro hac vice (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 72 Filed: 1/17/1997, Entered: 1/22/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Harold A. Baker entered pursuant to hearing held 1/17/97. Specialty Coating advised the court that it would seek to intervene but not delay the proceedings in any way. Parties wishing to do so shall file a detailed proposed calendar for discovery and hearing on the USA mtn to enter the proposed consent decree; the proposed calendar shall state with specificity what discovery is sought and why that discovery is necessary to a consideration of the proposed consent decree-- misc ddl set 1/31/97 for submission of said calendar. Telephone hearing set 1:30 2/5/97 on the proposed calendars for discovery and hearing; Ross & Hardies to initiate the call. (cc: all counsel) (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/17/1997, Entered: 1/22/1997 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                    MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Harold A. Baker; Rule 16 conference held by conf call 1:30 1/17/97 re cases 95-2244, 89-2306, 95-2002. The following appearances were made: Frank Bentkover for the United States, Jacqueline Kline for the U.S. EPA, Jerome Bowman for Sherwin Williams, Thomas Lupo for Glidden Co, David McCormick for Oxy USA, Kirk Minkler for Specialty Coating, Thomas Daggett for BASF. After discussion with counsel the parties were ordered to file a proposed detailed discovery calendar re the consent decree motion; cause will be set in February; written order to be entered. (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 12/19/1996, Entered: 12/19/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Harold A. Baker; all proceedings are stayed until 1/17/97 with the exception of expert rebuttal reports; the govt is to file a mtn for an approval of the consent decree by 1/15/97; expert rebuttal reports are to be sent as previously scheduled; Rule 16 conference set 1:30 1/17/97 by telephone with Seyfarth, Shaw, Fairweather & Geraldson to initiate the call. (cc: all counsel) (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/19/1996, Entered: 11/25/1996 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                        MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Harold A. Baker; status hearing held 1:30 11/19/96 in cases 95-2002, 95-2244 and 89-2306. Appearance of pltf by Kurt Feuer, Jerome Bowman; app of dft OXY by David McCormack; app of dft BASF by James Morrin, Thomas Daggett; app of movant Glidden by Andrew Perellis, Thomas Lupo. Deadline for mtn to approve consent decree to be filed by 1/15/97 by end of business that day. Rule 16 conference set 1:30 1/17/97 by telephone (Seyfarth Shaw to set up call). All proceedings stayed until 1/17/97 as to all 3 cases with the exception of rebuttal reports; rebuttal reports to be sent as scheduled. Written order to be entered. (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/25/1996, Entered: 10/25/1996 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                          MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Harold A. Baker; status hearing set 11/4/96 is VACATED; status hearing RESET to 1:30 11/19/96 by PERSONAL APPEARANCE in Urbana, IL. (cc: all counsel) (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/21/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                            MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Harold A. Baker; Status hearing set 11/4/96 will be by PERSONAL APPEARANCE NOT TELEPHONE in Urbana, IL. (cc: all counsel) (SLJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 70 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/21/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Harold A. Baker entered pursuant to scheduling hearing held 10/21/96. Discovery to close 10/21/96 ; further scheduling hearing set 1:30 11/4/96 by conf call--BASF to initiate the call. (cc: all counsel) (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/21/1996 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Harold A. Baker; scheduling hearing held 2:00 6/21/96 in Urbana; appearance of pltf Sherwin-Williams by Kurt Feuer, Jerome Bowman; appearance of dft OXY by Robert Smeltzer, dft BASF by Thomas Daggett, movant Glidden by Thomas Lupo. Discovery cutoff ddl set in 120 days (10/21/96); further telephone scheduling conf set 1:30 11/4/96--BASF to initiate the call. Order to be entered. (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/7/1996, Entered: 6/7/1996 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                  MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Harold A. Baker granting motion for pretrial scheduling order [67-1]; scheduling conference set 2:00 6/21/96 by personal appearance in Urbana, IL. (cc: all counsel) (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 5/28/1996, Entered: 5/30/1996 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                    MANDATE from USCA dismissing the appeal [61-1] for lack of jurisdiction (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 5/6/1996, Entered: 5/30/1996 USCA Order
                                                                                                                      COPY of USCA order dismissing appeal for lack of jurisdiction (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 4/30/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                        MOTION by plaintiff Sherwin-Williams for pretrial scheduling order (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 2/23/1996, Entered: 2/29/1996 USCA Order
                                                                                                                          COPY of USCA Order directing appellant to file a brief memorandum stating why appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction on or before 3/4/96. (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/22/1996 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                                                                                                                            Notification by USCA of Appellate Docket Number 96-1357 (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/16/1996, Entered: 2/16/1996 Remark
                                                                                                                              Remark--copy of APPELLANT THE GLIDDEN COMPANY'S DOCKETING STATEMENT [64-1] mailed to U.S. Court of Appeals. (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: 2/16/1996 Jurisdictional Statement
                                                                                                                                JURISDICTIONAL DOCKETING STATEMENT filed by movant Glidden Company (SLJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 2/14/1996, Entered: 2/14/1996, Terminated: 4/14/1998 Short Record of Appeal Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                  SHORT RECORD ON APPEAL sent to USCA (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 2/14/1996 USCA Appeal Fees
                                                                                                                                    Received appeal fee in amount of $105.00 ( Receipt # 018026) (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 2/14/1996 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of APPEAL by movant Glidden Company from Dist. Court decision on 12/13/95 [55-1] and 1/12/96 [60-1] (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/22/1996, Entered: 1/22/1996 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                        MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Harold A. Baker; The hearing set 3/4/96 is VACATED. See order of 1/12/96. (cc: all counsel) (SLJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 1/12/1996, Entered: 1/12/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Harold A. Baker; On 12/13/95 the court entered an order striking Glidden's motion to dismiss recognizing that Glidden is not a party in the pending action. Glidden lacks standing to file the current motion; striking motion for reconsideration [57-1], striking motion clarification [57-2] (cc: all counsel) (SLJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/10/1996, Entered: 1/10/1996 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                            MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Harold A. Baker; Re: motion to strike Glidden Company's mtn for reconsideration [59-1] hearing set for 10:00 3/4/96, by personal appearance in Urbana. Re: motion for reconsideration [57-1] hearing set for 10:00 3/4/96, by personal appearance in Urbana. Re: motion clarification [57-2] hearing set for 10:00 3/4/96, by personal appearance in Urbana. Re: motion to strike Glidden Co's mtn to dismiss [49-1] hearing set for 10:00 3/4/96, by personal appearance in Urbana. (cc: all counsel) (KW, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 1/5/1996, Entered: 1/5/1996, Terminated: 1/12/1996 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant BASF Corporation to strike Glidden Company's mtn for reconsideration or, in the alternative, clarification. (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 1/2/1996, Entered: 1/3/1996 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion/Petition
                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION to motion for reconsideration [57-1], motion clarification [57-2] by plaintiff Sherwin-Williams (SLJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 12/26/1995, Entered: 12/27/1995 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by movant Glidden Company for reconsideration , or in the alternative clarification of its 12/13/95 order striking Glidden's motion to dismiss (SLJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 12/13/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Harold A. Baker denying Sherwin-Williams' motion for partial summary judgment [24-1], denying BASF's motion for summary judgment [41-1] (cc: all counsel) (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 12/13/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Harold A. Baker granting BASF's motion to strike the Glidden Company's motion to dismiss [51-1], striking motion to dismiss the pending action pursuant to Rule 12(b)(7) [46-1] (cc: all counsel) (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 12/4/1995, Entered: 12/7/1995 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of filing Glidden Co's resp to pltf's mo to strike its mo to dismiss by movant Glidden Company (SLJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 12/4/1995, Entered: 12/7/1995 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by movant Glidden Company to pltf's motion to strike Glidden Co's mtn to dismiss [49-1] (SLJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 12/4/1995, Entered: 12/7/1995 Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Andrew Perellis and Joshua Rich for movant Glidden Company (SLJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 11/22/1995, Entered: 11/22/1995, Terminated: 12/13/1995 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant BASF Corporation to strike the Glidden Company's motion to dismiss (SLJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 11/20/1995, Entered: 11/21/1995 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION to Glidden's motion to dismiss the pending action pursuant to Rule 12(b)(7) [46-1] by plaintiff Sherwin-Williams (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 11/20/1995, Entered: 11/21/1995 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by plaintiff Sherwin-Williams to strike Glidden Co's mtn to dismiss (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 11/9/1995, Entered: 11/13/1995 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service re mtn to dismiss and supporting memo by movant Glidden Company (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 11/9/1995, Entered: 11/13/1995 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of motion to dismiss the pending action pursuant to Rule 12(b)(7) [46-1] by movant Glidden Company (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 11/9/1995, Entered: 11/13/1995 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by movant Glidden Company to dismiss the pending action pursuant to Rule 12(b)(7) (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 11/9/1995, Entered: 11/13/1995 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                          Remark--rec'd NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion to Consolidate from The Glidden Company as related to case #89-2306 USA vs CROSS (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: 7/26/1995 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE-ENTRY: Hrg held 7/26/95 by Judge Harold A. Baker; apr of pltfl thru William Serritella & Kurt Feuer, apr of deft OXY thru William Holloway, apr of deft BASF thru James Morrin and Lisa Simmons, Tom Lupo as an interested party. Arguments heard; taking under advisement on 7/26/95 motion for partial summary judgment [24-1] (SLJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: 7/21/1995 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by plaintiff Sherwin-Williams to BASF Corp's cross-motion for summary judgment [41-1] (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 7/14/1995, Entered: 7/14/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                SURREPLY by defendant BASF Corporation in opposition to pltf's motion for partial summary judgment [24-1] (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/14/1995, Entered: 7/14/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER on its face by Judge Harold A. Baker granting motion for leave to file surreply [39-1] (cc: all counsel). (SJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 7/10/1995, Entered: 7/10/1995 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of cross-motion for summary judgment [41-1] by defendant BASF Corporation (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 7/10/1995, Entered: 7/10/1995, Terminated: 12/13/1995 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                      CROSS-MOTION by defendant BASF Corporation for summary judgment (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/1/1995, Entered: 6/1/1995 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Harold A. Baker re motion for partial summary judgment [24-1] hearing set 6/5/95 is VACATED AND RESET for 9:00 7/26/95 by TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Pltf counsel is to arrange the c/c. Clerk will notify pltf atty of phone number Judge Baker can be reached for the call. (cc: all counsel) (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 5/16/1995, Entered: 5/18/1995 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING by defendant BASF Corporation (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 5/16/1995, Entered: 5/18/1995 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by defendant BASF Corporation for leave to file surreply (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/20/1995, Entered: 4/20/1995 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Harold A. Baker; motion hearing for partial summary judgment [24-1] 5/22/95 is VACATED AND RESET AT 3:00 6/5/95 by personal appearance in Urbana.(cc: all counsel) (SLJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 4/13/1995, Entered: 4/18/1995 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION to pltf's motion for leave to file reply memorandum [35-1] by defendant BASF Corporation (SLJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: 4/10/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by plaintiff Sherwin-Williams to response to motion for partial summary judgment [24-1] (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: 4/10/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED ORDER on its face by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman granting motion for leave to file reply memo in support of mo for partial sum judg, instanter [36-1] (cc: all counsel). (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 4/4/1995, Entered: 4/4/1995, Terminated: 4/10/1995 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by plaintiff Sherwin-Williams for leave to file reply memo in support of mo for partial sum judg, instanter (SLJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/29/1995, Entered: 3/29/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED ORDER on its face by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman denying motion for leave to file reply memorandum [35-1] (cc: all counsel). (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/27/1995, Terminated: 3/29/1995 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by plaintiff Sherwin-Williams for leave to file reply memorandum (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 3/23/1995, Entered: 3/23/1995 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of filing by defendant BASF Corporation (SLJ, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 3/15/1995, Entered: 3/15/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              DEFICIENCY ORDER by Judge Harold A. Baker misc ddl set 4/24/95 for cert of serv re: #32 (cc: all counsel) (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 3/15/1995, Entered: 3/15/1995 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 2.9(D) STATEMENT OF GENUIN ISSUES by defendant BASF Corporation (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 3/1/1995, Entered: 3/1/1995 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION to motion for partial summary judgment [24-1] by defendant BASF Corporation (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 2/27/1995, Entered: 2/27/1995 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING by defendant OXY USA Inc (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 2/27/1995, Entered: 2/27/1995 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by defendant OXY USA Inc to motion for partial summary judgment [24-1] (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/27/1995, Entered: 2/27/1995 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Harold A. Baker Status hearing held 9:00 2/27/95 Apr of pltf by William Serritella and Kurt Feuer; apr of dft OXY USA by William Holloway and Robert Smeltzer; apr of dft BASF by Lisa Simmons. Status of case discussed. Motion for partial summary judgment [24-1] is set for hrg at 1:30 5/22/95 (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 2/24/1995, Entered: 2/24/1995, Terminated: 2/24/1995 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant BASF Corporation to extend time to respond to pltf's partial summ judg mo (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/24/1995, Entered: 2/24/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED ORDER on its face by Judge Harold A. Baker granting motion to extend time to respond to pltf's partial summ judg mo [28-1]. Response to motion for partial summary judgment [24-1] due 3/1/95 (cc: all counsel). (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 2/7/1995, Entered: 2/7/1995, Terminated: 2/7/1995 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant OXY USA Inc, defendant BASF Corporation to extend time to respond to pltf mo for partial summ judg (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/7/1995, Entered: 2/7/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER on its face by Judge Harold A. Baker granting motion to extend time to respond to pltf mo for partial summ judg [27-1] re motion for partial summary judgment [24-1] to 2/24/95 (cc: all counsel). (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 1/27/1995, Entered: 1/31/1995 Discovery - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DISCLOSURE PLAN filed by plaintiff Sherwin-Williams, defendant OXY USA Inc, defendant BASF Corporation (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 1/25/1995, Entered: 1/25/1995 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of motion for partial summary judgment [24-1] by plaintiff Sherwin-Williams (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 1/25/1995, Entered: 1/25/1995, Terminated: 12/13/1995 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by plaintiff Sherwin-Williams for partial summary judgment (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/5/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Harold A. Baker Status hearing set 9:00 a.m. 2/27/95 The court will initiate the conf call (cc: all counsel) (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/5/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Harold A. Baker; pursuant to order entered 11/30/94 in the US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois, this case has been transferred to the US District Court for the Central District of Illinois, Danville/Urbana Division; previous case number in NDIL was 94 C 5625; new case number in the Danville/Urbana Division is 95-2002; all further pleadings are to be filed with the US District Court, 201 S. Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61801 under the new case number 95-2002 (cc: all counsel) (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORIGINAL FILE (included documents 1 - 23) certified copy of transfer order (document #23), and docket sheet received from Northern Dist IL (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 9/15/1994, Entered: 1/5/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT (summons(es) issued) case referred (case was filed and summonses were issued in US Dist Court, Northern Dist of Illinois) (MT, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 140 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?