Method of enhancing myogenesis by electrical stimulation
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 10171051
Examiner Jeffrey R Jastrzab, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Leonhardt, Howard J., Applicant
Unknown Role, Bioheart, Inc.
Unknown Role, Leonhardt Brenda Lee

Toggle Switch Represented by Hodgson Russ LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edwin Jr Bean +1 716 848 1263
Space John Del Vecchio +1 716 218 7361
Space RANJANA KADLE +1 716 848 1628 rkadle@hodgsonruss.com
Space Martin Jr Linihan +1 716 856 4000
Space John Lopinski +1 716 856 4000
Space Kevin McCarthy +1 716 852 0400
Space Daniel Oliverio +1 716 856 4000
Space David Principe +1 716 847 7066
Space Ronald Roberts +1 716 856 4000
Space Michael Scalise +1 716 759 5810
Space George Jr Snyder +1 716 848 1545
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Leonhardt, Howard J., Weston, FL (US)
Filing Date June 13, 2002
Status Abandoned -- Failure to Respond to an Office Action
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 31090.0034
Confirmation Number 9850
Group Art Unit 3762
Class / Sub-Class 607 / 9
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Assignments (0) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - EBCC.AD
Notice of Change of Address placed in File Wrapper due to EBC Customer Number update (1 Page)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
    Correspondence Address Change
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
      Mail Abandonment for Failure to Respond to Office Action
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
        Bibliographic Data Sheet (2 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - ABN
          Abandonment (2 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank  Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
            Aband. for Failure to Respond to O. A.
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
              Extension of Time (2 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank  Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                Mail Non-Final Rejection
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
                  Bibliographic Data Sheet (2 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                    Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                      Index of Claims (1 Page)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
                        List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                          Non-Final Rejection (6 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                            Non-Final Rejection
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/26/2004, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                              Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 9/14/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                  Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                    Application Dispatched from OIPE
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                      Application Is Now Complete
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                        Additional Application Filing Fees
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                          A statement by one or more inventors satisfying the requirement under 35 USC 115, Oath of the Applic
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
                                            Oath or Declaration filed (2 Pages)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - PEFR
                                              Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (4 Pages)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 7/18/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                Notice Mailed--Application Incomplete--Filing Date Assigned
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/18/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - CTMS
                                                  Miscellaneous Action with SSP (2 Pages)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank  Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                    IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                      Initial Exam Team nn
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                        Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                          Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
                                                            Oath or Declaration filed (2 Pages)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
                                                              Abstract (1 Page)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                Claims (1 Page)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
                                                                  Specification (5 Pages)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
                                                                    Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 113 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?