Freeman v. Alaska Air Group Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-01022
Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 29, 2017 at 11:23 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Albert John Freeman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by John W. Carpenter, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Wade Carpenter +1 415 577 0698 +1 866 410 6248 john@jwcarpenterlaw.com
v.
Alaska Air Group, Inc. Alaska Air Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alaska Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Horizon Air Industries, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
REPORT on the determination of an action regarding:PATENT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/28/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/27/2014, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Albert John Freeman (Carpenter, John) (Filed on 4/27/2014) (Entered: 04/27/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/2/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Albert John Freeman.. (Carpenter, John) (Filed on 4/2/2014) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
              CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                REPORT on the filing of an action regarding patent infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                  Summons Issued as to Horizon Air Industries Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                    Summons Issued as to Alaska Airlines Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                      Summons Issued as to Alaska Air Group Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                        Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/26/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/3/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                            Proposed Summons. (Carpenter, John) (Filed on 3/5/2014) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                              Proposed Summons. (Carpenter, John) (Filed on 3/5/2014) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                Proposed Summons. (Carpenter, John) (Filed on 3/5/2014) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                  COMPLAINT Patent Infringement against Alaska Air Group Inc, Alaska Airlines Inc, Horizon Air Industries Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8425670.). Filed byAlbert John Freeman. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carpenter, John) (Filed on 3/5/2014) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 139 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?