PHL Variable Insurance Company v. Chinn

Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-00241
District Judge Janet C. Hall, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Janet C. Hall
Last Updated August 23, 2016 at 12:11 PM EDT (8.7 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo PHL Variable Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Represented by Loughlin Fitzgerald, P.C.-Wallingford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. Glen Pierson +1 203 265 2035 +1 203 269 3487 gpierson@lflaw.com
v.
No Logo Larry P. Chinn, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Timeline
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Settlement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Good Standing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Sanctions
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None extension of time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None extension of time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None extension of time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Larry P. Chinn* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *W. Glen Pierson* *Loughlin Fitzgerald, P.C.-Wallingford* *150 South Main Street* *Wallingford, CT 06492*. (Malone, P.) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 1 Complaint filed by PHL Variable Insurance Company, 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 5 Standing Protective Order, 4 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by PHL Variable Insurance Company Signed by Clerk on 2/27/2014.(Malone, P.) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/26/2014.(Malone, P.) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/26/2014.(Malone, P.) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 5/26/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 4/27/2014 Discovery due by 8/28/2014 Dispositive Motions due by 9/27/2014 Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2014.(Malone, P.) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHL Variable Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent PM Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate The Phoenix Companies, Inc. for PHL Variable Insurance Company. (Pierson, W.) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against Larry P. Chinn ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-3161562.), filed by PHL Variable Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Pierson, W.) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 695 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?