Unknown
Bankruptcy Case California Northern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. Unknown

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 5, 2016 at 1:55 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/24/1997, Entered: 11/24/1997 Court Certificate of Mailing
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/29/1996, Entered: 6/12/1996 Certificate Of Service.
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/29/1996, Entered: 6/12/1996 Witness List
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/29/1996, Entered: 6/12/1996 Trial Brief
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: 11/7/1995 Certificate Of Service.
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: 10/30/1995 Scheduling Order
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/20/1995, Entered: 10/25/1995 Trustee No Asset Report
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/13/1995, Entered: 9/14/1995 Certificate Of Service.
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 9/6/1995 Certificate Of Service.
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/31/1995, Entered: 9/5/1995 Summons Service Executed
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/14/1995, Entered: 8/15/1995 Complaint
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 3 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?