Simmonds v. Credit Suisse Group et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:07-cv-01583
District Judge James L. Robart, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge James L. Robart
Last Updated September 28, 2016 at 5:12 AM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Vanessa Simmonds, Plaintiff

Represented by Gordon Tilden Thomas & Cordell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey M Thomas , +1 206 467 6477 +1 206 467 6292 jthomas@gordontilden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey I Tilden +1 206 467 6477 jtilden@gordontilden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark A Wilner +1 206 467 6477 +1 206 467 6292 mwilner@gordontilden.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ian S Birk +1 206 623 1900 ibirk@kellerrohrback.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William C. Smart +1 206 623 1900 +1 503 623 3384 wsmart@kellerrohrback.com
v.
Credit Suisse Group AG Credit Suisse Group AG, Defendant
Officially listed as "Credit Suisse Group"

Represented by Lane Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan P McBride +1 206 223 7000 mcbrider@lanepowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian J. Meenaghan +1 206 223 7000 meenaghanb@lanepowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher B Wells +1 206 223 7000 wellsc@lanepowell.com

Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fraser Lee Hunter, Jr. +1 212 230 8882 +1 212 230 8888 fraser.hunter@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Sapir Lesser +1 212 230 8851 +1 212 230 8888 david.lesser@wilmerhale.com
TERMINATED: 06/08/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Bruce McCaw +1 212 230 8810 +1 212 230 8888 robert.mccaw@wilmer.com
Lehman Brothers, Inc. Lehman Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Lehman Abs Corp

Represented by Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Loomis Cave +1 212 837 6559 +1 212 422 4726 cave@hugheshubbard.com

Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/08/2009 Philip Gellert Barber +1 212 373 3356 +1 212 373 2274 pbarber@paulweiss.com
TERMINATED: 01/08/2009 David Mark Cave +1 212 373 3704 +1 212 492 0704 dcave@paulweiss.com
TERMINATED: 01/08/2009 Erica S Platt +1 212 373 3000 eplatt@paulweiss.com
TERMINATED: 01/08/2009 Moses Silverman +1 212 373 3355 +1 212 492 0355 msilverman@paulweiss.com
No Logo Sourceforge, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Stoel Rives, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Molly Margaret Daily +1 206 624 0900 +1 206 386 7500 mmdaily@stoel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barnes H. Ellis +1 503 294 9243 +1 503 220 2480 bhellis@stoel.com
Other Parties
No Logo James W. Giddens, Trustee for the Liquidation of the Business of Lehman Brothers Inc., Trustee

Represented by Robinson Tait

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer L Tait +1 206 676 9640 +1 206 676 9659 jtait@robinsontait.com
Attributes
Citation Unknown
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Timeline
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge James L. Robart; The Court DENIES the Underwriter Defendants' objections to Ms. Simmonds' notice of voluntary dismissal and DIRECTS the clerk to terminate all of Ms. Simmonds' 54 cases that have been consolidated under Master Case No. C07-1549JLR pursuant to her notices of voluntary dismissal. (TF) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Vanessa Simmonds (Wilner, Mark) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA (09-35308) as to 48 Notice of Appeal, filed by Vanessa Simmonds The following Non-Moving Issuer cases are REMANDED to the district court for proceedings consistent with the Opinion of the Supreme Court in Credit Suisse Securities (SA) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
OPINION OF USCA (NOT THE MANDATE); AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART, VACATED IN PART, AND REMANDED IN PART. (LMK) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None
ORDER of USCA (09-35308) as to 48 Notice of Appeal, filed by Vanessa Simmonds, The clerk is in receipt of the Notice of Bankruptcy with respect to appellee Lehman Brothers, Inc. consistent with the Order Commencing Liquidation dated 9/19/08. This appeal with respect to appellee Lehman Brothers, Inc. is STAYED until 12/24/09. Status report to be filed. (SA) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
TIME SCHEDULE ORDER (09-35308) as to 48 Notice of Appeal, filed by Vanessa Simmonds : The schedule is set as follows: Designation of RT for Appellant Vanessa Simmonds due 04/20/2009. Designation of RT for Appellee Credit Suisse Group, James W. Giddens, Lehman Brothers, Inc. and SourceForge, Inc. due 04/30/2009. Transcript order for Appellant Vanessa Simmonds due 05/11/2009. Transcript due for Orig Clerk USDC, Seattle on 06/09/2009. Certificate of record due 05/18/2009. Appellant Vanessa Simmonds opening brief due 07/27/2009. Appellee Credit Suisse Group, Appellee James W. Giddens, Appellee Lehman Brothers, Inc. and Appellee SourceForge, Inc. answering brief due 08/25/2009. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief.(LMK) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
APPEAL NOTIFICATION packet sent to US Court of Appeals re 48 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 Docket)(LMK) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL (09-35308) as to 44 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,, 45 Judgment by Court by Plaintiff Vanessa Simmonds. Filing Fee $455, Receipt number 09810000000001721147. (Attachments: # 1 Representation Statement, # 2 Docketing Statement)(Wilner, Mark) Modified on 4/15/2009; added CCA case number (LMK). (Entered: 04/10/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER DENYING CONSOLIDATION FOR APPEAL ONLY (Dkt. #84) by Judge James L. Robart. (Order posted in all related cases)(MD) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Cases for Appeal Only by parties. (Wilner, Mark) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None
JUDGMENT BY COURT (MD) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASES RE:(56) Motion to Dismiss; (57) Motion to Dismiss in case 2:07-cv-01549-JLR; (47) Motion to Dismiss in case 2:07-cv-01572-JLR; (33) Motion to Dismiss in case 2:07-cv-01623-JLR; (39) Motion to Dismiss in case 2:07-cv-01654-JLR by Judge James L. Robart.(MD) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Dep Clerk: Casey Condon; Pla Counsel: Jeff Tilden, Jeff Thomas, Will Smart; Def Counsel: Barnes Ellis, Judith Welcom, David Kistenbroker, Joni Jacobsen, Ben Stone, Andrew Clubok, Brant Bishop, Chris Wells; CR: Kari McGrath; MOTION HEARING held on 1/16/2009. The court hears argument from counsel on pending motions. The court takes the matter under advisement.(CC) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer L Tait on behalf of Trustee James W. Giddens, Trustee for the Liquidation of the Business of Lehman Brothers Inc.. (Tait, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Trustee James W. Giddens, Trustee for the Liquidation of the Business of Lehman Brothers Inc.. Jennifer L Tait is substituted as counsel for Trustee. Attorney Ryan P McBride; Brian J Meenaghan; Erica S Platt; Moses Silverman; Christopher Brian Wells; Philip G Barber and D Mark Cave terminated. (Tait, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RE: Set Oral Argument on (56 in 2:07-cv-01549-JLR) Joint MOTION to Dismiss; (57 in 2:07-cv-01549-JLR) MOTION to Dismiss; (47 in 2:07-cv-01572-JLR) Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss; (33 in 2:07-cv-01623-JLR) Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss; (39 in 2:07-cv-01654-JLR) Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2009 at 09:00 AM before Judge James L. Robart, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
STIPULATION and Order that Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP and Lane Powell PC are Relieved as Counsel for Lehman and Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP is Recognized as Counsel for the Trustee for Lehman, executed by parties. (Cave, Sarah) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
ORDER re 37 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Sarah L Cave for Lehman Brothers Inc., by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(MD) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sarah L. Cave FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000001617568. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Attorney Registration Form)(Tait, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion: (56 in 2:07-cv-01549-JLR) Joint MOTION to Dismiss, (57 in 2:07-cv-01549-JLR) MOTION to Dismiss, (47 in 2:07-cv-01572-JLR) Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss, (46 in 2:07-cv-01572-JLR) MOTION to Dismiss, (33 in 2:07-cv-01623-JLR) Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss, (39 in 2:07-cv-01654-JLR) Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2009 at 09:00 AM before Judge James L. Robart, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Order Commencing Liquidation as to Defendant Lehman Brothers Inc. ; filed by Defendant Lehman Brothers Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RE: LIAISON COUNSEL - The court orders as follows: 1. Liaison counsel is the only counsel authorized to file omnibus motions, pleadings or other matters in these coordinated cases; and 2. Service on liaison counsel shall constitute service on all defendants by Judge James L. Robart. (MD) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: None
Amended MOTION Underwriter Defendants' Amended Motion for Overlength Brief re (43 in 2:07-cv-01549-JLR) MOTION Leave to File Overlength Brief, (46 in 2:07-cv-01549-JLR) Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Leave to File Overlength Brief by Defendants Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Bank of America Corporation, Robertson Stephens, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., Credit Suisse Group, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated, Lehman Brothers Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Bear Stearns & Co Inc, Deutsche Bank AG. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/18/2008 (Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1. by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc. for. Filed by Defendants Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Group, Credit Suisse.(Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1. by Lehman Brothers Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc. for Lehman Brothers Inc.. Filed by Defendants Lehman Brothers Inc., Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc..(Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None
ORDER re 27 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS David Sapir Lesser for Credit Suisse Group, by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(MD) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None
ORDER re 26 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Fraser L Hunter, Jr for Credit Suisse Group, by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(MD) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None
ORDER re 24 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Robert B McCaw for Credit Suisse Group, by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(MD) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: None
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David Lesser FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Credit Suisse Group (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000001475529. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Application Form)(Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: None
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Fraser L. Hunter FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Credit Suisse Group (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000001475512. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Application Form)(Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE Corrected Pro Hac Vice filing for Robert B. McCaw Receipt No. 09810000000001475459 re 24 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; filed by Defendant Credit Suisse Group. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Application Form)(Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: None
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert B. McCaw FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Credit Suisse Group (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000001475459. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Application Form)(Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
ORDER re 19 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Erica S Platt for Lehman Brothers Inc., by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(MD) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
ORDER re 18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS D Mark Cave for Lehman Brothers Inc., by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(MD) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
ORDER re 17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Philip G Barber for Lehman Brothers Inc., by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(MD) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
ORDER re 16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Moses Silverman for Lehman Brothers Inc., by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(MD) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Erica Platt FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Lehman Brothers Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000001465125. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Application Form)(Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY D. Mark Cave FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Lehman Brothers Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000001465107. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Application Form)(Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Philip G. Barber FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Lehman Brothers Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000001465044. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Application Form)(Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Moses Silverman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Lehman Brothers Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000001464929. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Application Form)(Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Dep Clerk: Casey Condon; Pla Counsel: Jeff Tilden, Jeff Thomas, Will Smart, Ian Birk; Def Counsel: Andrew Clubok, Brant Bishop, Christopher Wells; CR: Susan Zielie; STATUS CONFERENCE held April 28, 2008. Underwriter defendants will file one coordinated motion to dismiss and issuer defendants will file one coordinated motion to dismiss. Opening briefs due July 25, 2008; Responsive briefs due Sept. 8,2008; and Reply briefs due Oct. 23,2008, with page limits in compliance with Local Rules. These cases will be coordinated for pretrial purposes using case no. 07-1549 as the master docket. The parties should familiarize themselves with the CM/ECF upgrades. The parties agree to a stay of discovery pending the courts decision on the motion to dismiss. Jeff Thomas shall act as liaison counsel for plaintiff and Christopher Wells, Andrew Clubok and Brant Bishop will act as liaison counsel for Underwriter defendants. Issuer defendants agree to promptly notify the court of their chosen liaison counsel. There shall be no further amendments to the complaints or additional parties added without first seeking leave of court. Liaison counsel for the Underwriter defendants agree to keep the court apprised of the status of the New York "IPO litigation." (CC) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
AMENDMENT Notice of Appearance by Defendants Lehman Brothers Inc., Credit Suisse Group, Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. (Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties; estimated Trial Days: 20.. (Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher Brian Wells on behalf of Defendants Lehman Brothers Inc., Credit Suisse Group. (Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Lehman Brothers Inc. mailed on 2/29/2008 (Thomas, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Credit Suisse Group mailed on 10/26/2007 (Thomas, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT for Recovery of Short-Swing Profits Under Section 16(b) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 against defendant(s) Credit Suisse Group, Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc, SourceForge Inc with JURY DEMAND, filed by Vanessa Simmonds.(Thomas, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT. Status Conference set for 4/28/2008 at 01:30 PM before James L. Robart, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD, ) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE Plaintiffs Withdrawal of Motion to Consolidate Related Cases for Pretrial Proceedings re Docket Annotation ; filed by Plaintiff Vanessa Simmonds. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Thomas, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Barnes H. Ellis on behalf of Defendant SourceForge Inc. (Ellis, Barnes) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant SourceForge Inc mailed on 11/30/2007 (Thomas, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REASSIGNING ACTIONS INVOLVING RECOVERY OF SHORT-SWING PROFITS UNDER SECTION 16(b) OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934 Case reassigned to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. Judge Monica J. Benton no longer assigned to case by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS, ) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT.Joint Status Report due by 11/21/2007,FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/7/2007.,Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/14/2007. by Judge Monica J. Benton. (PV, ) (Entered: 10/10/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If consent, return the executed form by 11/20/2007. Please Note: Consents must not be electronically filed with the Court. (MKB) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: None
COMPLAINT FOR RECOVERY OF SHORT-SWING PROFITS - JURY DEMAND against all defendants (Summons(es) NOT issued)(Receipt # SEA12510), filed by Vanessa Simmonds. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Transmittal email)(MKB) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 178 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?