Starr Indemnity & Liability Company et al v. The United States of America
Federal Court Proceeding New York Southern District Court, Case No. Unknown

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Allianz Global Risks, Plaintiff
No Logo Starr Indemnity & Liability Co., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Starr Indemnity & Liability Company"

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Dombroff +1 703 336 8700 +1 202 625 3150 mdombroff@dglitigators.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Oh +1 212 742 8517 +1 212 742 0161 joh@mckennalong.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge, LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Arnold Eastwood +1 703 336 8724 +1 703 336 8750 jeastwood@mckennalong.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "The United States of America"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SARAH S. KEAST +1 202 616 4039 +1 202 616 4159 sarah.keast@usdoj.gov
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from John R. Oh, Esq. and Sarah S. Keast, Esq. dated 12/4/2014 re: status of case. Document filed by Allianz Global Risks, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company.(Oh, John) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 22 Letter filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Allianz Global Risks. The August 15, 2014 pretrial conference is adjourned to December 9, 2014, at 2:30 p.m. The parties shall notify the Court should they wish to be referred to a Magistrate Judge for settlement purposes. SO ORDERED. (Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2014 at 02:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/7/2014) (ja) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from John R. Oh, Esq. and Sarah S. Keast, Esq. dated 8/7/2014 re: status of case. Document filed by Allianz Global Risks, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company.(Oh, John) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 20 Letter, filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Allianz Global Risks. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The deadline to exchange damages documents is extended to August 31, 2014. The deadline to complete all fact discovery is extended to December 5, 2014. The July 15, 2014 conference is adjourned to August 15, 2014, at 3:00 p.m. Absent compelling circumstances, no further extensions of these deadlines shall be granted. (Fact Discovery due by 12/5/2014.) (Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2014 at 03:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/26/2014) (tn) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from John R. Oh dated 6/26/2014 re: Joint Request for Discovery Extension. Document filed by Allianz Global Risks, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)(Oh, John) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 18 Letter, filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Allianz Global Risks. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The deadline to exchange damages information is extended to June 30, 2014, and the deadline to complete fact discovery is extended to September 12, 2014. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/16/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from John R. Oh dated May 16, 2014 re: Joint Request for Discovery Extension. Document filed by Allianz Global Risks, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)(Oh, John) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of re Liability. Document filed by The United States of America. (Keast, Sarah) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). Fact Discovery due by 7/11/2014. Expert Discovery, including reports, production of underlying documents, and depositions, due by 8/25/2014. Depositions of fact witnesses due by 6/15/2014. This case is not to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and the present best estimate of the length of trial is 3 days. The next Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/13/2014) (tn) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 15 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from John R. Oh dated March 6, 2014 re: Initial pretrial conference- Joint Letter. Document filed by Allianz Global Risks, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Attachments: # 1 Management Plan and Scheduling Order)(Oh, John) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 11 Motion for James A. Eastwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/30/2014) (rjm) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAV VICE granting 12 Motion for Mark A. Dombroff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/30/2014) (rjm) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Mark Andrew Dombroff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9307652. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Allianz Global Risks, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Certificate of Good Standing, # 4 Certificate of Good Standing, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Dombroff, Mark) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                            MOTION for James Arnold Eastwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9304340. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Allianz Global Risks, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Eastwood, James) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by The United States of America.(Keast, Sarah) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Allianz Global Risks. (Oh, John) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/13/2014 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/23/2013) (mro) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by John R. Oh on behalf of Allianz Global Risks, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. New Address: McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP, 230 Park Avenue, Suite 1700, New York, New York, USA 10169, 212-905-8365. (Oh, John) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by Karen Brown, Window Clerk, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Allianz Global Risks. (Oh, John) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. The United States of America served on 11/21/2013, answer due 1/21/2014. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company; Allianz Global Risks. (Oh, John) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Starr Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Starr Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Starr International Company, Inc. for Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. Document filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company.(Oh, John) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Allianz of America Inc., Corporate Parent Allianz SE for Allianz Global Risks. Document filed by Allianz Global Risks.(Oh, John) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                              FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company.(Oh, John) Modified on 11/22/2013 (lb). (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                COMPLAINT against The United States of America. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401081668)Document filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Allianz Global Risks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B Part 1, # 4 Exhibit B Part 2, # 5 Exhibit B Part 3, # 6 Exhibit C)(msa) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Space Space

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 239 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?