Bouchat v. Champion Products, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:99-cv-01576
District Judge Marvin J. Garbis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 6:42 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Frederick E. Bouchat, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schulman and Kaufman LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard J Schulman +1 410 576 0400 +1 410 576 0544 hschulman@schulmankaufman.com
v.
No Logo , Defendant
No Logo 4 Sports Inc., Defendant
No Logo 989 Studios, Defendant
No Logo A.D. Sutton & Sons, Defendant
No Logo A.d. Sutton & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ama International Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo A.R.C. Holdings, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo AA World Class Embroidery & Embellishment Co., Defendant
No Logo AA World Class Embroidery Embellishment, Defendant
No Logo Abbacus, Defendant
No Logo Abbacus, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Abc Sports Inc., Defendant
No Logo ABC, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, DC Holdco, Inc.
Officer/Director, ABC Radio Holdings, Inc.
Disney Enterprises, Inc. Officer/Director, Disney Enterprises, Inc.
Officer/Director, A.b.c. Enterprises, Inc.
Officer/Director, ABC Holding CO Inc.
No Logo Accessory Network, Defendant
No Logo Acclaim Entertainment, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Accolade, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Accudart, Defendant
No Logo Action Images, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Adams USA, Inc., Defendant
Adidas America, Inc. Adidas America, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Adidas America"
No Logo Aerial Sports Photgraphy, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Allure Home Creation Co, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alphabet City Records, Inc., Defendant
No Logo AMA International Group, Defendant
No Logo America's Sweetheart, Defendant
No Logo American Needle & Novelty, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Aminco Intern'l Inc., Defendant
No Logo Andrew Noch & Asso., Defendant
No Logo Andrews & Mc Meel, Defendant
No Logo Andrews Mcmeel Publishing, Defendant
No Logo Angel Lake Mulimedia, Inc., Defendant
Anheuser-Busch Companies, Inc. Anheuser-Busch Companies, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Anheuser-Busch, Incorporated"
No Logo Ansa Kids, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Antigua Group, Inc.,, Defendant
No Logo Antone's Gourmet Gifts, Defendant
No Logo Aquarius Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Arizona Cardinals, Defendant
No Logo At-a-Glance Corp., Defendant
No Logo At-A-Glance Group, Defendant
No Logo Athletic Supply of Dallas, Defendant
No Logo Atlanta Falcons, Defendant
No Logo Audrey Creative Table Linen, Defendant
No Logo Aurafin Corp., Defendant
No Logo Aurafin LLC, Defendant
No Logo Authentic Images, Defendant
No Logo Authentic Images, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Autographed Ball Company, Defendant
No Logo B & B Holdings, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Baby Fair, Defendant
No Logo Babyfair, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bacou Usa Safety, Inc, (, Defendant
No Logo Baron Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Barrell Sportswear, Defendant
No Logo Belding Sports, Defendant
No Logo Bell Atlantic Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Bell Atlantic Mobile, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bentley, Defendant
No Logo Bentley Lingerie, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bernie Kosar Greeting Card Co, Defendant
No Logo Bestco, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Best Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Best Equipment, Defendant
No Logo Best Personalized Books, Defendant
No Logo Betras Plastics, Defendant
No Logo Bibb Company, Defendant
No Logo Bic Corp., Defendant
No Logo Bic Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Biederlack Of America, Defendant
No Logo Big Fork Boot Co., Defendant
No Logo Big League Promotions, Defendant
No Logo Bike Athletic Co., Defendant
No Logo Blue Ridge : The Item Co., Defendant
No Logo Bnox, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bond Distributing Co., Defendant
No Logo Bottom Line Images, Defendant
No Logo Bow Line Family Products, Defendant
No Logo BowLine Family Products, Defendant
No Logo Brandon Apparel Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brimms Inc.,, Defendant
No Logo Buena Vista Books, Defendant
No Logo Buffalo Bills, Defendant
No Logo Buffalo Bills, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Buffalo Games, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Buffalo, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bulova Corp., Defendant
No Logo Bulova Corporation, Defendant
No Logo C&I Leasing, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cable News Network LP, LLP, Defendant
Cable News Network, Inc. Cable News Network, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cambridge Footwear Group, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Candy Cargo, Defendant
No Logo Cannon Usa, Inc., Defendant
Canon USA, Inc. Canon USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Carolina Panthers, Defendant
No Logo Carretta Sport, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Casablanca Fan Co, Defendant
No Logo Caseworks International, Defendant
No Logo Castrol North America Inc., Defendant
No Logo CBS Corp. Group, Defendant
CBS Corporation CBS Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Cendent Softwar/Sierra On-Line, Defendant
No Logo Champion Glove, Defendant
No Logo Champion Products, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Beall +1 410 659 2700 +1 410 539 6981 GBeall@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Robert Lloyd Raskopf +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 robertraskopf@quinnemanuel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Case LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc E Ackerman +1 212 819 8200 +1 212 354 8113 mackerman@whitecase.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRENDAN G. WOODARD +1 212 819 8200 +1 212 354 8113 bwoodard@ny.whitecase.com
No Logo Chargers Football Company, Defendant
No Logo Chestnut Hill Marketing Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Chicago Bears, Defendant
No Logo Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Chicagoland Processing Corp., Defendant
No Logo Cincinnati Bengals, Defendant
No Logo Cincinnati Bengals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Classic Balloon Corp., Defendant
No Logo Classic Collectible Products, Defendant
No Logo Cleo, Inc., Defendant
Coca-Cola Enterprises, Inc. Coca-Cola Enterprises, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Coca-Cola"
No Logo Coca-Cola Enterprise, Defendant
Colgate-Palmolive Company Colgate-Palmolive Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Colgate Palmolive Co."
No Logo Collector's Edge, Defendant
No Logo Collector's Edge, LP, Defendant
No Logo College Concepts, Defendant
No Logo Color-clings, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Colores International, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Columbia Tel-Com, Defendant
No Logo Columbia Telecommunications, Defendant
No Logo Commemorative Brands, Defendant
No Logo COMMEMORATIVE BRANDS, INC., Defendant
No Logo Cooperstown Bears, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Coordinated Strategic Allances, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Corinthian, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Costacos Brothers Sports, Defendant
No Logo Crown Central Petroleum Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Crown Crafts, Defendant
No Logo Crown Crafts, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Crown Oil & Gas Co., Defendant
No Logo Crown Pro, Defendant
No Logo Crown Pro, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Crownmark, Defendant
No Logo Css Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cui, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cushion Craft Biederlack Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Cushion Craft Biederlack of America, Defendant
No Logo Cushion Craft, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Custom Cribbage Inc., Defendant
No Logo Custom Edge, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cybrcard, Defendant
No Logo D. Glasgow & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Dallas Cowboys, Defendant
No Logo Dan River Inc., Defendant
No Logo Danby Products Inc., Defendant
No Logo Day Dream Publishing, Defendant
No Logo Denver Broncos, Defendant
No Logo Denver Broncos Football Club, Defendant
No Logo Derivative Works, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Detroit Lions, Defendant
No Logo Dick's Clothing & Sporting Goods, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Direct Impulse Design, Defendant
No Logo Disney Press/Hyperion Books, Defendant
No Logo Dixie Seal & Stamp Co. Inc., Defendant
No Logo Dolly, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Double Tree Hotel Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Constellation Energy Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D Corse +1 410 783 3321
No Logo Drew Pearson, Defendant
No Logo Drew Pearson Marketing, Inc., Defendant
No Logo DSJ & Asso., Defendant
No Logo Duck House, Defendant
No Logo Dynasty Apparel Industries, Defendant
No Logo E & J Gallo Winery, Defendant
Eastman Kodak Company Eastman Kodak Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Eastman Kodak Co."
No Logo Easton Sports, Inc., Defendant
Electronic Arts, Inc. Electronic Arts, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, F5 Networks, Inc.
Officer/Director, East West Bancorp, Inc.
Officer/Director, Trex Co Inc
Officer/Director, Teledyne Technologies Inc.
Stamps.com, Inc. Officer/Director, Stamps.com, Inc.
No Logo Eller Media Co., Defendant
No Logo Emerson USA, Defendant
No Logo Equity Marketing, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Equity Sports, Defendant
No Logo Ertl Company,, Defendant
No Logo Ertl Company, Inc.,, Defendant
No Logo Espn, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Essex Mfg. Co., Defendant
No Logo Everlasting Images, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Exclusive Pro Sports, Defendant
No Logo F. Schumacher & Co., Defendant
No Logo Fabric Traditions, Defendant
No Logo Fantasma, Defendant
No Logo Fiberlok, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Fine Host Cororation, Defendant
No Logo Fit for Sports, Defendant
No Logo Fleer Corp, Defendant
No Logo Fleer/skybox International LP, Defendant
No Logo Foley-Martens, Defendant
No Logo Foley-Martens Company, Defendant
Foot Locker Foot Locker, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/27/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer A. Albert +1 202 346 4322 jalbert@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Foot-Tec Industries, Defendant
No Logo Football Northwest LLC, Defendant
No Logo For Bare Feet, Defendant
No Logo For Bare Feet, Inc., Defendant
Ford Motor Company Ford Motor Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ford Motor Co."
Officer/Director, Gopivotal, Inc.
Officer/Director, Vastera, Inc.
No Logo Fossil, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Foster Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Foto Fantasy, Defendant
No Logo Fox Entertainment Group, Defendant
No Logo Fox Sports Direct, Defendant
No Logo Franco Apparel Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Franklin Sports, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Franklin Sports Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Fremont Consumer Die, Defendant
No Logo Fremont Die Consumer Products, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Front Pages Co., Defendant
No Logo Fruit Of The Loom Ltd., Defendant
No Logo FSC Wallcoverings, Defendant
No Logo Fuji Photo Film Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Fuji Photo Film"
No Logo Futech Designs, Defendant
No Logo G-III Apparel Group, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Galoob Toys, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Garan, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Garan, Incorporated"
No Logo General Mills Sales, Inc., Defendant
General Mills, Inc. General Mills, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Cardigant Medical Inc.
Officer/Director, Applied Therapeutics Inc.
No Logo Genesis Direct, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gfg Inc., Defendant
No Logo Giftco, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gill Apparel Group/Carl Banks, Defendant
No Logo Gilman Gear, Defendant
No Logo Global One Distribution & Merchandising, Defendant
No Logo Global Recognition, Defendant
No Logo Golden Golf, Defendant
No Logo Golden Harvest Popcorn, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Good Stuff Corp., Defendant
No Logo Gotta Go, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Great American Products, Defendant
No Logo Great American Products, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Green Bay Packers, Defendant
No Logo Green Bay Packers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gridiron Golf, Defendant
No Logo Gridiron Group, Defendant
No Logo Grossman Cap Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo H & H Furniture Mfg, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Haddad Apparel Group, Ltd.,, Defendant
No Logo Hallmark Cards, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Hallmark Cards, Incorporated"
Officer/Director, Crown Media Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, H C Crown Corp
Officer/Director, H.a., Inc.
No Logo Hallmark Emblems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hallmark Licensing, Defendant
No Logo Harper Collins, Defendant
No Logo Hasbro Toy Company, Defendant
No Logo Hasbro Toy Group, Defendant
Hasbro, Inc. Hasbro, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Head Games, Defendant
No Logo Head Games, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Helene Curtis, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Henry Modell & Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hershey Food Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Hershey Foods Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Highgate Products, L.l.c., Defendant
No Logo Highland Mint, Defendant
No Logo Home Innovations, Defendant
No Logo Host Apparel, Defendant
No Logo Hot Sauce Harry's, Defendant
No Logo Houston Harvest Gift Products, LLC, Defendant
No Logo HPI, Defendant
No Logo Hunter Manufacturing Group, Defendant
No Logo Hunter Media, Defendant
No Logo Hutch Sports USA, Defendant
No Logo Ichauway Mills, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ideal Rubber Products Co., Defendant
No Logo Identity, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Illinoy Toy, Defendant
No Logo IMC Products, Corp., Defendant
No Logo Imprinted Products Corp., Defendant
No Logo Indianapolis Colts, Defendant
No Logo Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Innovo Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Innovo, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Inventure Disk, Defendant
No Logo Iron Knights/Chinin USA Inc., Defendant
No Logo Its Academic, Defendant
No Logo J C Penney Co Inc., Defendant
No Logo J.D. Healy Specialties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo J.F. Sports Co., Defendant
No Logo J.W. Envisions D.B.A. Ultimate Vision, Defendant
No Logo J.w. Envisions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Jacksonville Jaguars, Defendant
No Logo Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Jay Franco And Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Jeff Hamilton, Defendant
No Logo Jester Company, Defendant
No Logo Jester Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo John F. Turner & Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo John H Harland Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "John H. Harland Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/07/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R. Beshears +1 404 322 6519 +1 404 322 6050 paul.beshears@nelsonmullins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Currie and Hancock LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/07/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew T Gomes +1 404 521 3800 +1 404 688 0671
No Logo Joy Athletic, Defendant
No Logo Joy Athletic, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Kansas City Chiefs, Defendant
No Logo Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Kelly Russell Studios, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ken Norton Jr.'s Stars & Legends, Defendant
No Logo Kenner Products, Defendant
No Logo Kentex, Defendant
No Logo Kettrich Corp., Defendant
No Logo Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kimberly Clark Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Brinks Gilson & Lione

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/22/2001, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffery A. Handelman +1 312 321 4200 +1 312 321 4299 jhandelman@usebrinks.com
TERMINATED: 06/22/2001 THOMAS M. WILLIAMS +1 312 321 4200 +1 312 321 4299

Toggle Switch Represented by Brocato Price and Janofsky LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/22/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louis Burton Price +1 410 823 2800 +1 410 823 0911 price@bpjfirm.com
No Logo Kool Sport, Defendant
No Logo Kooler Kraft, Defendant
No Logo K R Industries, Inc., Defendant
Kraft Foods, Inc. Kraft Foods, Inc., Defendant
Kraft Foods Group, Inc Officer/Director, Kraft Foods Group, Inc
Officer/Director, CSAB Inc.
No Logo Kurt S. Adler, Defendant
No Logo La Rue International, Defendant
No Logo Legends Athletic, Defendant
No Logo Licensed Lifestyles, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lightfoot Photography, Defendant
No Logo Limited Treasures, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Logoathletic, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lumatec Industrial, Defendant
No Logo Majestic Athletic Wear, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Maxit Designs, Defendant
No Logo Mbi, Inc., Defendant
No Logo MBNA America, Defendant
No Logo Mcarthur Towels, Inc., Defendant
No Logo McDonald's, Defendant
McDonald's Corporation McDonald's Corporation, Defendant
No Logo McKimson Productions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Mead Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Meltzer Industries, Defendant
No Logo M.g.i. Usa, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Mgwhiz, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Miami Dolphins, Defendant
No Logo Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Michael Anthony Jewelers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Michael Anthony, Inc., Defendant
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Defendant
Officer/Director, Greenfield Online Inc.
Officer/Director, Crisp Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, Visiocorp
Officer/Director, Immersion Corp
Officer/Director, Avanade Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George F Pappas +1 202 662 6000 +1 202 778 5594 gpappas@cov.com
No Logo Mid-Atlantic Bottling, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Midway Games, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Midwest Swiss Embroideries Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Miggle Toys Inc., Defendant
No Logo Miller Brewing Co., Defendant
No Logo Miller Brewing Company, Defendant
No Logo Mind Power, Defendant
No Logo Mine Safety Appliances Company, Defendant
No Logo Minnesota Vikings, Defendant
No Logo Mirage,, Defendant
No Logo Moretz Mills, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Moretz, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Motion Vision, Defendant
Motorola, Inc. Motorola, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Broadcast.com, Inc.
Officer/Director, Nextel Partners Inc
Officer/Director, Sps Spinco Inc
Officer/Director, Vocera Communications, Inc.
Officer/Director, Shotspotter, Inc.
Officer/Director, Tut Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Clearwire Corp
No Logo Mounted Memories, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Mouse Products, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Museum Editions, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Ntt, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Nanco, Nancy Sales Co., Defendant
No Logo Nancy Sales Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Nardi Enterprises, Inc., Defendant
No Logo National Broadcasting Co., Defendant
No Logo National Broadcasting Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo National Design Corp., Defendant
No Logo National Emblem, Inc., Defendant
No Logo National Embroidered Emblem, Defendant
National Football League National Football League, Defendant
No Logo National Football League, Inc. Films, Defendant
No Logo National Mat, Defendant
No Logo New England Patriots, Defendant
No Logo New England Patriots LP, Defendant
No Logo New Era Cap Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo New Life Art, Inc., Defendant
No Logo New Orleans Louisiana Saints Limited Partnership, Defendant
No Logo New Orleans Saints, Defendant
No Logo New York Football Giants, Inc., Defendant
No Logo New York Giants, Defendant
No Logo New York Jets, Defendant
No Logo New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Defendant
No Logo NFL Enterprises L.P., Defendant
No Logo NFL Enterprises, L.P., Defendant
No Logo NFL Productions, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Nfl, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Nicholas Simon Co., Defendant
No Logo Nike Company, Defendant
No Logo Nike Retail Services, Inc., Defendant
Nike USA, Inc. Nike USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Nike, Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/23/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael W Skojec +1 410 528 5541 +1 410 361 8967 skojecm@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gallagher Evelius & Jones LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/23/2001 Matthew W Oakey +1 410 727 7702 +1 410 468 2786 moakey@gejlaw.com
Nike, Inc. Nike, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Norman James Co., Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Norman James International Corp., Defendant
No Logo North American Boot Company, Defendant
No Logo Ntn Communications, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Nutmeg Mills, Defendant
No Logo Oakland Raiders, Defendant
No Logo Oakley Inc., Defendant
No Logo Orange Products, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Outerstuff Corp., Defendant
No Logo Outerstuff, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Overtime Sports, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Oxboro Outdoors, Defendant
No Logo P&K Products Co Inc, Defendant
No Logo P.a. Plymouth Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pacific Trading Cards, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Papel Giftware, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Papel/freelance, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Paul Arpin Van Lines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Penninsula Vending, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Penquin Products, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pentagram, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pentech International Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pentech Intn'l. Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pepsi-Cola Metropolitan, Defendant
No Logo Pepsi-Cola Operating Company of Chesapeake & Indianapolis, Defendant
PepsiCo, Inc. PepsiCo, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Pepsi Bottling Group Inc
No Logo Peter David, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pfaltzgraff Co., Defendant
No Logo Philadelphia Eagles, Defendant
No Logo Philadelphia Eagles Limited Partnership, Defendant
No Logo Photo File, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Picture Me Books, Defendant
No Logo Pine Hosiery Mills, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle Brands, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pique Embroidery, Defendant
No Logo Pittsburgh Steelers, Defendant
No Logo Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Defendant
No Logo PK Products Co., Defendant
No Logo Play-By-Play Toy & Novelties, Defendant
No Logo Playoff Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Plymouth, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Positive Image Bracing System, Defendant
No Logo Premier Concepts Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pro Cube, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Proelite, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pro Football, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pro Look, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pro Moves International, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pro Star LLC, Defendant
No Logo Pro Team Playables, Defendant
No Logo Pro-Peller Div/IMC Products, Defendant
No Logo Proctor & Gamble, Defendant
No Logo Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo Progressive Insurance, Defendant
No Logo Provident Bank of MD, Defendant
No Logo Psinet, Defendant
No Logo Psinet Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Xpedior, Inc.
No Logo Pyramid Accessories, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pyramid, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Quaker Oats Company, Defendant
No Logo Racing Champions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ralph Marlin & Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo RCA Consumer Electronics, Defendant
No Logo Reebok International, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Regal Ware, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Renaissance Editions, Defendant
No Logo Rhode Island Novelty, Defendant
No Logo Rhode Island Novelty, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Richardson Sports Limited Partnership, Defendant
No Logo Rico Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Riddell, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rival Company,, Defendant
No Logo Rossmor Industries, Defendant
No Logo Roxbury Industries, Defendant
No Logo Roxbury Industries Corp., Defendant
No Logo Russ Berrie & Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Russ Berrie And Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Russell Athletic, Defendant
No Logo Russell Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Salvino, Inc., Defendant
No Logo San Diego Chargers, Defendant
No Logo San Francisco 49ers, Defendant
No Logo San Francisco Forty Niners,limited, Defendant
No Logo Sanctuary Woods Multimedia, Defendant
No Logo Sanford Berol USA, Defendant
No Logo Sanford, L.p. (, Defendant
No Logo Sara Lee Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Sara Lee Knit Products, Defendant
No Logo Saranac Glove Company, Defendant
No Logo SASSI, Defendant
No Logo Sassi, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Sbm, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Schuessler Knitting Mills, Defendant
No Logo Score Board, Defendant
No Logo Scott Editions, Defendant
No Logo Sdi Technologies, Defendant
Sears, Roebuck & Company Sears, Roebuck & Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Sears, Roebuck and Co."
No Logo Seattle Seahawks, Defendant
Sega Of America, Inc. Sega Of America, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Seven Sons & Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Shaw Creations, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Shiara Holdings, Defendant
No Logo Shirt Xplosion, Defendant
No Logo Shoeware, Defendant
No Logo Sierra On-line, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Sierra Sun Editions, Defendant
No Logo Signal Apparel Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Simplicity Manufacturing, Defendant
No Logo Simpson Products, Defendant
No Logo Siskiyou Buckle Co., Defendant
No Logo Smart Dog Products, Defendant
No Logo Smart Dog Products, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Smithmark Publishing, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Snap-on Tools, Defendant
No Logo Snap-on Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Sony Interactive, Defendant
No Logo Southern Maryland Imports, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Southwest Airlines, Defendant
No Logo Sport Cook, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Sportacular Art, Defendant
No Logo Sports Accessories, Defendant
No Logo Sports Coverage, Defendant
No Logo Sports Illustrated, Defendant
No Logo Sports Section, Defendant
No Logo Sports Specialties, Defendant
No Logo Sportscast, Defendant
No Logo Sportspro Marketing, Defendant
No Logo Sportstar, Defendant
No Logo Sprint Communications Co., Defendant
Sprint Nextel Corporation Sprint Nextel Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Sprint Communications Company L.P."
No Logo St. Louis Rams, Defendant
No Logo St. Louis Rams Partnership,, Defendant
No Logo Staple's, Defendant
No Logo Staples The Office Superstore, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Starline Novelties Inc., Defendant
No Logo Starline, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Starter Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Starwave Corp., Defendant
No Logo Sterling Sports, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Stuffins, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Stylus, Defendant
No Logo Subtle Perfection, Defendant
No Logo Sugar Plum, Defendant
No Logo Sun Time Enterprises, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Suncast Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Swiss Army Brands, Defendant
No Logo Swiss Army Brands, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Swiss Maid, Defendant
No Logo Tabletop Enterprises, Defendant
No Logo Tag Express, Defendant
No Logo Tampa Bay Buccaneers, Defendant
No Logo Tasco Sales, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Team Editions Automotive Marketing, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Team Golf, Defendant
No Logo Team Mouse, Defendant
No Logo Teamworks, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tennessee Titans, Defendant
No Logo Terrisol, Defendant
No Logo Terrisol Corp., Defendant
No Logo Terry Manufacturing, Defendant
No Logo The Antigua Group, Defendant
No Logo The Bibb Company, Defendant
No Logo The Bradford Exchange, Defendant
The Coca-Cola Company The Coca-Cola Company, Defendant
The Coca-Cola Company Officer/Director, The Coca-Cola Company
Officer/Director, Hansen Natural Corp
Officer/Director, Calyxt, Inc.
Officer/Director, Vir Biotechnology, Inc.
No Logo The Detroit Lions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Five Smiths, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Highland Mint, Defendant
No Logo The Mid-Atlantic Coca-Cola, Defendant
No Logo The Northwest Company, Defendant
No Logo The Oakland Raiders, Defendant
No Logo The Party Animal, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Pasta Shoppe, Defendant
No Logo The Pfaltzgraff Co., Defendant
No Logo The Quaker Oats Company, Defendant
No Logo The Score Board, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Snack Factory, Defendant
No Logo The Snack Factory, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Topps Company Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Topps Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank Charles Razzano +1 202 461 3100 +1 202 461 3102 frazzano@foxrothschild.com
No Logo The Upper Deck Co., Defendant
No Logo The Upper Deck Company LLC, Defendant
No Logo The Vermont Teddy Bear Co., Inc., Defendant
The Walt Disney Company, Inc. The Walt Disney Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Walt Disney Company"
Officer/Director, DC Holdco, Inc.
Officer/Director, York Entertainment, Inc.
Officer/Director, TWDC Holdco 613 Corp.
Officer/Director, TFCF America, Inc
Officer/Director, TFCF Corp
Disney Enterprises, Inc. Officer/Director, Disney Enterprises, Inc.
No Logo The Wormser Company, Defendant
No Logo Thermo-serv, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc., Defendant
Time Warner, Inc. Time Warner, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Time Warner"
No Logo Timezone, Defendant
No Logo Timezone Products, Defendant
No Logo Titleist & Foot-joy Worldwide, Defendant
No Logo Toon Art, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Topperscot, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Toy & Sport Trends, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Treasure Chest Novelty Corp., Defendant
No Logo Treat Entertainment, Defendant
No Logo Triatic, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Triumph Publishing, Defendant
No Logo Tultex Corp., Defendant
No Logo Tundra/Standard Knitting Inc., Defendant
No Logo Turbo Sportswear, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Turner National Television, Defendant
No Logo Turner Network Television, LP, LLP, Defendant
No Logo Twenty Fourth and Dean, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Twins Enterprises, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ultimate Vision, Defendant
No Logo Unique Premium Products, Defendant
No Logo Unique Sports Generation, Defendant
United Parcel Service United Parcel Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Whiteford Taylor Preston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/23/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter J Davis , +1 410 347 8738 +1 410 223 4304 pdavis@wtplaw.com
No Logo Universal Heights, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Universal Marketing Associates, Inc., Defendant
No Logo US Playing Card Co., Defendant
No Logo USA Games, Defendant
No Logo USA Licensed Bows, Defendant
No Logo Uvex Safety, Inc., Defendant
No Logo V. Fraas, Defendant
No Logo V. Fraas (u.s.a.) Inc., Defendant
No Logo Venator Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vermont Teddy Bear, Defendant
No Logo Vf Knitwear, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Village Wallcoverings, Defendant
No Logo Voyager Emblems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Warner Bros."
No Logo Washington Redskins, Defendant
No Logo Waterford Wedgewood USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Wells Lamont, Defendant
No Logo WEMCO, Defendant
No Logo White Rose Collectibles, Defendant
No Logo Williams Electronic Games, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Williams Electronics Games, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Williams Industries, Defendant
No Logo Willow Hoisery Co. Inc., Defendant
No Logo Wilson Sporting Goods Co, Defendant
No Logo Wincraft, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Winner Distributing Co., Defendant
No Logo Workman Publishing Co., Defendant
No Logo Workman Publishing Co., Inc., Defendant
Xerox Corporation Xerox Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Xpres Corporation, Defendant
No Logo York Barbell Co Inc., Defendant
No Logo Zippo Manufacturing Co., Defendant
No Logo Zippo Manufacturing Company, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 501
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (122) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None
JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy)"AFFIRMING" the judgment of the District Court as to 117 Notice of Appeal filed by Frederick E. Bouchat.(Filed Separately in Civil Docket No. MJG-01-1996 as Pleading #42) (sls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/22/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: None
    Certificate of Clerk certifying the record is complete for appeal purposes re: 117 Notice of Appeal (das, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/20/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: None
      ORDER of USCA "CONSOLIDATING" cases 03-2173(MJG-01-1996), 03-2174(MJG-99-1576), 03-2389(MJG-01-647) and 04-1008(MJG-03-2229) for purposes of briefing and oral argument as to 117 Notice of Appeal filed by Frederick E. Bouchat (sls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/27/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: None
        ORDER of USCA "CONSOLIDATING" case nos. 03-2173(MJG-01-1996), 03-2174(MJG-99-1576) and 03-2389(MJG-01-647) for purposes of briefing and oral argument as to 117 Notice of Appeal filed by Frederick E. Bouchat (sls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/24/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None
          Certificate of Clerk certifying the record is complete for appeal purposes re: 117 Notice of Appeal (sls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/17/2003, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 115 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,, 116 Judgment by Frederick E. Bouchat. Filing fee $ 105. Appeal Record due by 10/17/2003. (Schulman, Howard) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
              JUDGMENT entered in favor of plaintiff against defendants. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 8/22/03. (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/22/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting 82 Motion of plaintiff for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 83 Motion of defendants for Summary Judgment re: statutory damages; granting 84 Motion of defendants for Summary Judgment re: actual damages. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 8/22/03. (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/22/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None
                  Supplemental to 107 Response,, 101 Supplemental, 98 Response in Opposition to Motion,, 110 Response filed by Frederick E. Bouchat. (Schulman, Howard) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: None
                    ORDER granting 112 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 5/23/03. (For Pleading 113, See Pleading 112) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Brendan G. Woodward to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bnox, Inc., Champion Products, Inc., Colgate Palmolive Co., Double Tree Hotel Corporation, Paul Arpin Van Lines, Inc., Proctor & Gamble. (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Status Report Submitted Letter to Judge Garbis by Frederick E. Bouchat (Schulman, Howard) (Entered: 05/20/2003)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE re 108 Affidavit filed by Frederick E. Bouchat. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Schulman, Howard) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: None
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Champion Products, Inc. , et al. (Beall, George) (Entered: 04/16/2003)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: None
                              AFFIDAVIT of George Beall by Champion Products, Inc.. (Beall, George) (Entered: 04/16/2003)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None
                                RESPONSE re 101 Supplemental, 98 Response in Opposition to Motion,, 83 Motion for Summary Judgment, 84 Motion for Summary Judgment, 100 Response in Opposition to Motion, Line filed by Frederick E. Bouchat. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Appellant's Brief# 2 Exhibit Appellant's Reply Brief)(Schulman, Howard) (Entered: 04/04/2003)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: None
                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frederick E. Bouchat. MGWHIZ, Inc. served on 2/25/2003, answer due 3/17/2003; Nicholas Simon Co. served on 2/25/2003, answer due 3/17/2003; Renaissance Editions served on 2/25/2003, answer due 3/17/2003; Scott Editions served on 2/25/2003, answer due 3/17/2003. (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/03/2003)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                    SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for MGWHIZ, Inc., Nicholas Simon Co., Renaissance Editions, Scott Editions (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/19/2003)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                      CORRESPONDENCE by Frederick E. Bouchat Re: Reissuance of Summons (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/19/2003)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: None
                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Angel Lake, Cendent Softwar, Chestnut Hill, Home Innovations, North American Boot, Premier Concepts, Pro Star LLC, Tabletop Enterprises 2/5/03 Answer due on 2/25/03 for Tabletop Enterprises, for Pro Star LLC, for Premier Concepts, for North American Boot, for Home Innovations, for Chestnut Hill, for Cendent Softwar, for Angel Lake (jlb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/14/2003)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: None
                                          REPLY Memorandum by Champion Products, et al. in support of their [84-1] motion for Summary Judgment to preclude plaintiff from recovering profits and actual damages by Accolade, Inc., Acclaim, Champion (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/11/2003)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: None
                                            SUPPLEMENT to [98-1] opposition memorandum by Frederick E. Bouchat and attachment (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/22/2003)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 100 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: None
                                              CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM (Sealed) by Frederick E. Bouchat in opposition to [84-1] motion for Summary Judgment to preclude plaintiff from recovering profits and actual damages by Accolade, Inc., Acclaim, Champion Products and attachments (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                MEMORANDUM by Champion Products et al in opposition to [82-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Frederick E. Bouchat and Exhibit A (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                  CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM by Frederick E. Bouchat in opposition to [84-1] motion for Summary Judgment to preclude plaintiff from recovering profits and actual damages by Accolade, Inc., Acclaim, Champion Products, [83-1] motion for Summary Judgment to preclude plaintiff from recovering statutory damages by Accolade, Inc., Acclaim, Champion Products and Attachments (FILED UNDER SEAL) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2003)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                    SUMMONS(ES) (20 days) re-issued for Angel Lake, Cendent Softwar, Chestnut Hill, Helene Curtis, Inc., Home Innovations, North American Boot, Premier Concepts, Pro Star LLC, Tabletop Enterprises (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2003)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Tabletop Enterprises 12/13/02 Answer due on 2/13/03 for Tabletop Enterprises (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2003)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Best Equipment, Williams Industries 12/12/02 Answer due on 2/11/03 for Williams Industries, for Best Equipment (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2003)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Alphabet City Record, Antone's Gourmet, Cybrcard, Derivative Works, Front Pages Co., Kooler Kraft, MGI USA Inc., Mirage, Picture Me Books, Pro Cube, Inc., Pro Look, Inc., Sanctuary Woods, Shirt Xplosion, Sierra Sun Editions, Smithmark Publishing, Bibb Company, The Score Board, Treasure Chest, USA Games, DSJ & Asso., Fantasma, Gridiron Group, Pinnacle Brands, Sega of America, Shiara Holdings, 4 Sports Inc., Carretta Sport Inc. 12/19/02 Answer due on 1/8/03 for Antone's Gourmet, for Cybrcard, for Derivative Works, for Front Pages Co., for Kooler Kraft, for MGI USA Inc., for Mirage, for Picture Me Books, for Pro Cube, Inc., for Pro Look, Inc., for Sanctuary Woods, for Shirt Xplosion, for Sierra Sun Editions, for Smithmark Publishing, for Bibb Company, for The Score Board, for Treasure Chest, for USA Games, for DSJ & Asso., for Fantasma, for Gridiron Group, for Pinnacle Brands, for Sega of America, for Shiara Holdings, for 4 Sports Inc., for Carretta Sport Inc., for Alphabet City Record (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2003)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to GFG Inc. (date not visible on return card) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2003)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                              SUMMONS(ES) re-issued (20 days) for DSJ & Asso., Fantasma, Gridiron Group, Pinnacle Brands, Sega of America, Shiara Holdings, 4 Sports Inc., Carretta Sport Inc. (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/19/2002)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                CORRESPONDENCE by Frederick E. Bouchat Re: Reissuance of Summons (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/19/2002)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                  SUMMONS(ES) re-issued (20 days) for Mirage, Derivative Works, Picture Me Books, Pro Cube, Inc., Shirt Xplosion, USA Games, Antone's Gourmet, Bibb Company, Cybrcard, Front Pages Co., MGI USA Inc., Pro Look, Inc., Sanctuary Woods, Sierra Sun Editions, Smithmark Publishing, Treasure Chest, The Score Board (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/18/2002)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                    SUMMONS(ES) re-issued (20 days) for Alphabet City Record, Kooler Kraft (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/18/2002)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                      CORRESPONDENCE by Frederick E. Bouchat Re: Reissuance of Summons (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/18/2002)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                                        Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure by New Life Art, Inc. (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/16/2002)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: None
                                                                          Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure by Team Golf (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/13/2002)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [85-1] motion of plaintiff to Extend Time to effectuate service on defendants until 12/19/02 ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 12/9/02) (c/f 12/9/02 jw) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/11/2002)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION with memorandum in support by Champion Products, Acclaim, Accolade, Inc., et al. for Summary Judgment to preclude plaintiff from recovering profits and actual damages and Declaration of Andrew Hammond with Exhibits A-M (c/s) (Declaration FILED SEPARATELY) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/10/2002)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION with memorandum in support by Champion Products, Acclaim, Accolade, Inc., et al. for Summary Judgment to preclude plaintiff from recovering statutory damages and declaration of Andrew Hammons with exhibits A-G (c/s) (Declaration FILED SEPARATELY) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/10/2002)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION by Frederick E. Bouchat for Partial Summary Judgment to preclude plaintiff from recovering profits and actual damages (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/24/2003 (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 12/09/2002)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                    SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for Best Equipment, Carretta Sport Inc., Helene Curtis, Inc., The Score Board, Williams Industries (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/09/2002)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                      SECOND SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for Fantasma, Hunter Media, MGWHIZ, Inc., Sierra Sun Editions (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/02/2002)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                        CORRESPONDENCE (Cover Letter) by Frederick E. Bouchat requesting reissuance of summons for Fantasma Toys, Hunter Media, MGWHIZ, and Sierra Sun (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/02/2002)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                          SUMMONS(ES) (20 days) issued for Inventure Disk, Overtime Sports (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/02/2002)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                            SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for Accessory Network, Angel Lake, Antone's Gourmet, Athletic Supply, Bibb Company, Cendent Softwar, Cybrcard, DSJ & Asso., Easton Sports, Inc., Franco Apparel, Front Pages Co., Gridiron Group, Ken Norton, Kraft, MGI USA Inc., Nicholas Simon Co., Pinnacle Brands, Pro Look, Inc., Pro Star LLC, Renaissance Editions, Sanctuary Woods, Sega of America, Shiara Holdings, Sierra On-Line, Inc., Smithmark Publishing, Tabletop Enterprises, Treasure Chest, Willow Hoisery Co., 4 Sports Inc. (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/02/2002)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service by Frederick E. Bouchat Re: [73-1] Order (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/02/2002)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                SUMMONS(ES) (20 days) issued for Shirt Xplosion, Southern Maryland (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/02/2002)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                  SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for Alphabet City Record, Barrell Sportswear, Home Innovations, IMC Products, Corp., Mirage, Pro Peller, Sportacular Art, Team Golf, Voyager Emblems, Autographed Ball, Chestnut Hill, Cooperstown Bears, Coordinated, Derivative Works, GFG Inc., Gridiron Golf, Grossman Cap Co., Fit Sports, Hutch Sports USA, Lightfoot Photograph, Mind Power, New Life Art, Inc., North American Boot, Picture Me Books, Premier Concepts, Pro Cube, Inc., Scott Editions, Shoeware, Sports Specialties, Stylus, Perfection, Pasta Shoppe, Titleist Footjoy, Triumph Publishing, USA Games, Village Wallcovering (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/02/2002)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER DIRECTING plaintiff serve upon all defendants, together with the amended complaint, a copy of the notice of related litigation ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 11/7/02) (c/m 11/7/02 jw) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/07/2002)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                      THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Frederick E. Bouchat, amending [26-1] amended complaint by Frederick E. Bouchat and red-lined version (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/17/2002)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER REOPENING case; DIRECTING plaintiff to file an amended complaint as therein set forth ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 10/11/02) (c/f 10/16/02 jw) (hml, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/16/2002 (Entered: 10/16/2002)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER STAYING and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING case pending related proceedings ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 2/7/02) (c/i & microfilmed 2/11/02) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/11/2002)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER STAYING case until the conclusion of MJG-97-1470 unless reopened by further Order ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 2/7/02) (c/i 2/11/02) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/11/2002)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER denying without prejudice [38-1] motion of defendant to Dismiss; denying without prejudice [37-1] motion of plaintiff for Partial Summary Judgment as therein set forth ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 1/25/02) (c/m 1/25/02 jw) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/25/2002)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [67-1] motion of John H. Harland Co. for Paul Beshears and Matthew Gomes to Withdraw as Attorneys (Terminated attorney Paul R Beshears for John H. Harland Co., attorney Matthew T Gomes for John H. Harland Co. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 8/6/01) (c/m 8/7/01 jw) (microfilmed 8/7/01) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/07/2001)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER APPROVING amendment to complaint by interlination ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 8/2/01) (c/m 8/2/01 jw) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/02/2001)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    CONSENT ORDER FOR DISMISSAL; DISMISSING all claims against Everlasting Images subject to reinstatement, nunc pro tunc to the date of this Order ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 7/17/01) (c/m 7/17/01 jw) (microfilmed 7/17/01) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/17/2001)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/26/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [64-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint by interlineation ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 6/26/01) (c/m 6/26/01 jw) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/28/2001)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/22/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        CONSENT ORDER FOR DISMISSAL; DISMISSING all claims against Kimberly-Clark subject to reinstatement, nunc pro tunc to the date of this Order ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 6/20/01) (c/m 6/21/01 dtm) (MICROFILMED 6/22/01) (hml, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 06/22/2001 (Entered: 06/22/2001)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          CONSENT ORDER FOR DISMISSAL DISMISSING all claims against Classic Collectible Products, Inc. subject to reinstatement, nunc pro tunc to the date of this Order ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 6/17/01) (c/m 6/19/01 dtm) (MICROFILMED 6/20/01) (hml, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 06/20/2001 (Entered: 06/20/2001)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY memorandum in support by AA World Class, Abbacus, et al to their [38-1] motion to Dismiss and exhibit 1 (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/04/2001)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING without prejudice [48-1] motion of Nike USA, Inc. and Nike Retail Services to Dismiss ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 6/1/01) (c/m 6/1/01 jw) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/04/2001)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                CONSENT ORDER FOR DISMISSAL as to Big Fork Boot Company; DISMISSING all claims against Big Fork subject to reinstatement, nunc pro tunc to the date of this Order ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 5/29/01) (c/i 5/30/01) (MICROFILMED 5/30/01) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/30/2001)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [58-1] motion of Nike for Michael W. Skojec and Matthew W. Oakey to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Matthew W. Oakey for Nike Company, attorney W. Skojec for Nike Company, attorney Matthew W. Oakey for Nike, Co., attorney Michael W. Skojec for Nike, Co. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 5/23/01) (c/m 5/23/01) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/24/2001)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL Memorandum by Frederick E. Bouchat to his [42-1] response to defendants' motion to dismiss (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/22/2001)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by AA World Class, et al in opposition to [37-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Frederick E. Bouchat and exhibit A-B (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/22/2001)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by Classic Collectible (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/21/2001)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of dismissal as to defendant, HarperCollins Publishers Inc. and APPROVAL (signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 5/11/01) (c/m 5/14/01 dtm) (MICROFILMED 5/14/01) (hml, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/14/2001 (Entered: 05/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            CONSENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL; DISMISSING all claims against Houston Harvest Gift Products subject to reinstatement, nunc pro tunc to the date of this Order ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 5/2/01) (c/m 5/2/01 jw) (MICROFILMED 5/2/01) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              CONSENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL; DISMISSING all claims against Golden Harvest subject to reinstatement, nunc pro tunc to the date of this Order ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 5/2/01) (c/m 5/2/01 jw) (MICROFILMED 5/2/01) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER Re: Supplemental briefing regarding pending motions ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 4/30/01) (c/i 4/30/01) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/30/2001)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Frederick E. Bouchat to [48-1] motion to Dismiss by Nike Company, Nike, Co. (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT ORDER for dismissal as to United Parcel Service; DISMISSING all claims nunc pro tunc to the date of this order ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 4/23/01) (c/m 4/23/01) (MICROFILMED 4/24/01) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/24/2001)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Nike, Co., Nike Company to Dismiss (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 04/19/2001 (Entered: 04/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of attorney appearance for Nike, Co., Nike Company by Michael W. Skojec, Matthew W. Oakey (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 04/19/2001 (Entered: 04/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by ABC, Inc., ABC Sports, Inc., et al. to plaintiff's response to their [38-1] motion to Dismiss and exhibit A (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/17/2001)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL DISMISSING Blue Ridge International Products Company subject to reinstatement ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 4/12/01) (c/m 4/12/01 jw) (MICROFILMED 4/12/01) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/12/2001)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT ORDER DISMISSING Warner Bros subject to reinstatement nunc pro tunc to the date of this order ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 4/4/01) (c/m 4/4/01 jw) (MICROFILMED 4/5/01) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 43 Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MEMORANDUM by Champion Products, AA World Class, et al. in opposition to [37-1] motion of plaintiff for Partial Summary Judgment (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/04/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in RESPONSE by Frederick E. Bouchat to [39-1] motion to Dismiss by Proctor & Gamble, Paul Arpin Van Lines, Double Tree Hotel, Colgate Palmolive Co, Bnox, Inc., [38-1] motion to Dismiss by ABC Sports, Inc., ABC, Inc. (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/27/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER DIRECTING Clerk temporarily seal plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment pending decision on the request to seal ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 3/27/01) (c/m 3/27/01 jw) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER DISMISSING claims against Colgate-Palmolive, Proctor & Gamble, Paul Arpin Van Lines, BNOX, Standard Knitting and Doubletree Hotel ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 3/22/01 ) (c/faxed 3/22/01 jw) (MICROFILMED 3/22/01) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Bnox, Inc., Colgate Palmolive Co, Double Tree Hotel, Paul Arpin Van Lines, Proctor & Gamble to Dismiss (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/22/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION with memorandum in support by ABC, Inc., ABC Sports, Inc. et al to Dismiss and Exhibit A (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            (Sealed) MOTION with memorandum in support by Frederick E. Bouchat for Partial Summary Judgment and Attachments (c/s)(jnl, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 03/27/2001 (Entered: 03/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for Fantasma, Racing Champions, Nardi Enterprises, Its Academic, Giftco, Inc., American Needle, Playoff Corporation, MGWHIZ, Inc., Lumatec Industrial, Hot Sauce Harry's, Universal Heights, Mounted Memories, Score Board, Pentagram, Inc., Best Equipment, Accudart, Crownmark, Cui, Inc., Classic Collectible, Everlasting Images, Global One, Hunter Media, Imprinted Products, Kelly Russell Studio, Limited Treasures, National Mat, Sierra Sun Editions, Jeff Hamilton (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/15/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                CORRESPONDENCE by Frederick E. Bouchat RE: Request for summons (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING [34-1] motion of Kimberly-Clark Corporation for Thomas M Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 3/5/01 ) (c/i 3/5/01) (Fee Paid) (jlb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING [33-1] motion of Kimberly-Clark Corporation for Jeffery A Handelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 3/5/01 ) (c/i 3/5/01) (Fee Paid) (jlb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of attorney appearance for Kimberly Clark Corp. by Louis B. Price (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS(ES) (20 days) issued for Venator Group, Inc., Pepsi-Cola Metro, Pepsi Cola, MBNA America, Henry Modell, Nike Company (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for Starter Corporation, Venator Group, Inc., Sports Illustrated, Time Inc. (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/1/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            CORRESPONDENCE by Frederick E. Bouchat RE: Issuance of summons (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/01/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS(ES) (20 days) issued for C&I Leasing, Inc., Pepsico, Inc., Eller Media Co., Wilson Sporting, Winner Distributing, Reebok International, Henry Modell, Nike Company (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/28/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for Dallas Cowboys, Minnesota Vikings, Tampa Bay Buccaneers, Hasbro, Inc., Hasbro Toy Company, Hasbro Toy Group (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/28/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT by interlineation by Frederick E. Bouchat , amending [13-1] amended complaint and APPROVAL (signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 2/27/01) (c/m 2/27/01 jw) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/28/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of attorney appearance for Foot Locker by Jennifer A. Albert (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/26/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER CONFIRMING the proceedings held in this matter on 2/21/01. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 2/22/01) (c/m 2/23/01 jw) (bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of by Double Tree Hotel Confirming Entry of Appearance of John D. Corse, Esq. (c/s) (bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORRESPONDENCE from counsel for Time Warner, Warner Bros. re: court's order reopening case. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/15/2001 (Entered: 02/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [21-1] motion for Matthew T Gomes to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 2/2/01) (c/i 2/6/01) (bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [20-1] motion for Paul R Beshears to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 2/2/01) (c/i 2/6/01) (bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DIRECTING counsel to cofer with counsel for each of the six defendants and advise the court by 2/14/01 as therein set forth ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 2/5/01 ) (c/m 2/5/01 jw) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of attorney appearance for Microsoft by George F. Pappas (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/31/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of attorney appearance for United Parcel by Peter J. Davis (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/31/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of attorney appearance for defendant Topps Co., Inc. by Frank C. Razzano. (c/s) (bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/30/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER ACCEPTING amendment to complaint by interlineation ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 1/16/01) (c/m 1/17/01 jw) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/17/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to reopen this case; DIRECTING plaintiff to serve each defendant with a copy of this Order; and DIRECTING defendant to respond to the complaint, as therein set forth. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 1/4/01) (c/m 1/5/01 chambers) (bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/25/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDMENT by Interliniation by Frederick E. Bouchat , amending [1-1] complaint against Cushion Craft Biederlack Corporation, and APPROVAL. (signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 7/24/00) (c/m 7/25/00-jw) (Corrected Amendment by interlineation to the complaint rec'd 8/2/00) (das, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/02/2000 (Entered: 07/27/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/7/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER STAYING case pending interlocutory appeal, ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING case for possible reopening by order of court upon application by 12/31/01 as therein set forth; DIRECTING this shall not prevent the parties from proceeding, by agreement, with discovery or the taking of testimony for use at trial while the interlocutory appeal is pending. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 6/7/00) (c/m 6/7/00) (microfilmed 6/8/00) (das, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/08/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/7/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Plaintiff of Defendants Action Images, Inc., Adams U.S.A., Inc. d/b/a Neuman Tackified Glove, Allure Home Creation Co. Inc., America's Sweetheart, Baron Group, Inc., Brimms Inc., Dolly Inc, Foto Fantasy, Gilman Gear, Golbal Recognition, Gotta Go Inc. d/b/a Head Legends Athletic, Maxit Designs, Mid-Atlantic Bottling LLC, Midwest Swiss Embroideries Co. Inc., Play-By-Play Toy & Novelties, Tasco Sales Inc, Simplicity Manufacturing Simpson Products, Tasco Sales Inc., Team Best, The Bradford Exchange, The Wormser Company, US Playing Card Co., and York Barbell Co. Inc., and APPROVAL. (signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 8/26/99) (c/m 6/7/00-jw) (microfilmed 6/8/00) (das, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/08/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/9/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [10-1] motion of Certain Defendants for Robert L. Raskopf to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 11/8/99) (c/m 11/9/99) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/09/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/9/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [9-1] motion of Certain Defendants for Marc E. Ackerman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 11/8/99) (c/m 11/9/99) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/09/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/2/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of attorney appearance for Champion Products by George Beall (and other certain defendants). (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/03/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/20/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to AA World Class, Abbacus, Accolade, Inc., Adams U.S.A., Inc., A.D. Sutton & Sons, Aerial Sports, AMA International, Andrew Noch & Asso., Andrews & McMeel, Ansa Kids, Inc., Arizona Cardinals, Atlanta Falcons, Antigua Group, Inc., Antone's Gourmet, Aquarius Ltd., Aurafin Corp., Authentic Images, Baby Fair, Babyfair, Inc., Baron Group, Inc., Belding Sports, Bentley, Bernie Kosar, Best Co. Inc., Best Equipment, Best Personalized, Betras Plastics, Bic Corp., Biederlack America, Big League Promotion, Bike Athletic Co., Bond Distributing Co, Bow Line Family, Buffalo Bills, Bulova Corp., Cable News Network, Cambridge Footwear, Campbell Soup, Cannon USA, Inc., Carolina Panthers, Castrol North, Chicago Bears, Chicagoland, Cincinnati Bengals, Cleo, Inc., Coca-Cola, Colgate Palmolive Co, College Concepts, Color Clings, Inc., Colores, Commemorative Brands, Corinthian, Inc., Crown Crafts, Crown Oil & Gas Co., Crown Pro, CSS Industries, Inc., Cushion Craft, Inc., Danby Products, Inc., Detroit Lions, Dick's Clothing, Direct Impulse, Drew Pearson, Dynasty Apparel, E & J Gallo Winery, Electronic Arts, Emerson USA, Equity Sports, Ertl Company, Inc., Exclusive Pro Sports, Fabric Traditions, Fine Host Cororation, Fleer Corp., Bare Feet, Fossil, Inc., Foster Industries, Franklin Sports, Fremont Consumer Die, Fremont Die Consumer, Fuji Photo Film, Garan Inc., General Mills, Inc., Gill Apparel Group, Gilman Gear, Golden Golf, Gotta Go, Inc., Great American, Green Bay Packers, H & H Furniture, Haddad Apparel Group, Hallmark Emblems, Head Games, Hershey Food, Highgate Products, Highland Mint, HPI, Hunter Manufacturing, Ichauway Mills, Inc., Ideal Rubber Product, Indianapolis Colts, Illinoy Toy, Innovo Group, Inc., Iron Knights Chinin, Jacksonville Jaguars, Jay Franco, J.D. Healy, Jester Company, J.F. Sports Co., John F. Turner & Co., Joy Athletic, J.W. Envisions, Kansas City Chiefs, Kettrich Corp., Kool Sport, Kraft Foods, Inc., KR Industries, Inc., La Rue International, Majestic Athletic, Maxit Designs, McArthur Towels, McKimson Productions, Michael Anthony, Midway Games, Inc., Miggle Toys Inc., Miller Brewing Co., Mine Safety, Moretz Mills, Inc., Museum Editions, Nanco, National Broadcast, National Embroidered, NFL Enterprises, NFL, Inc., National Football, New England Patriots, New Orleans Saints, New York Giants, New York Jets, Norman James Co., NTN Communications, Nutmeg Mills, Oakland Raiders, Orange Products, Outerstuff Corp., Fox Sports Direct, Papel Freelance Inc., Pentech Intn'l. Inc., Peter David, Inc., Pfaltzgraff Co., Philadelphia Eagles, Photo File Inc., Pine Hosiery Mills, Pique Embroidery, Pittsburgh Steelers, P&K Products Co Inc, Play By Play Toy, Plymouth, Inc., Pro Elite, Inc., Progressive, Pro Moves, Pro Team Playables, Provident Bank of MD, PSINET, Quaker Oats Company, Ralph Marlin & Co., RCA Consumer, Rhode Island Novelty, Rico Industries, Riddell Inc., Rossmor Industries, Roxbury Industries, Russ Berrie & Co., Russell Athletic, Russell Corporation, San Diego Chargers, Sanford Berol USA, San Francisco 49ers, Sara Lee Knit, SASSI, Schuessler Knitting, Sears, Seattle Seahawks, SDI Technologies, Shaw Creations, Inc., Signal Apparel Co., Siskiyou Buckle Co., Smart Dog Products, Snap On Tools, Sony Interactive, Sports Accessories, Sportscast, Sport Cook, Inc., Sports Coverage, Sportspro Marketing, Sprint Communication, St. Louis Rams, Staples, Starline, Inc., Sterling Sports, Stuffins, Inc., Suncast Corporation, Sun Time Enterprises, Swiss Army Brands, Team Editions, Teamworks, Inc., Tennessee Titans, Terrisol, Party Animal, Inc., Quaker Oats Company, Thermo-Serv, Inc., Snack Factory, Upper Deck Co., Timezone, Toon Art, Inc., Toy & Sport Trends, Topperscot, Inc., Treat Entertainment, Turbo Sportswear, Turner National, Twenty Fourth, Twins Enterprises, Ultimate Vision, Unique Premium, Unique Sports, Universal Marketing, USA Licensed Bows, US Playing Card Co., Uvex Safety, Inc., V. Fraas, Vermont Teddy Bear, VF Knitwear, Inc., Wells Lamont, White Rose, Williams Electronic, Wincraft, Inc., Workman Publishing, Xpres Corporation, Zippo Manufacturing 10/19/99; Answer due on 12/19/99. (mdd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/20/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of attorney appearance for Double Tree Hotel by John D. Corse. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/31/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Abbacus, A.D. Sutton & Sons, Adams U.S.A., Inc., Andrew Noch & Asso., Bentley, Best Personalized, Bic Corp., Arizona Cardinals, Biederlack America, Bottom Line Images, Bulova Corp., Campbell Soup, Carolina Panthers, Casablanca Fan Co., Classic Balloon Corp, Coca-Cola, Cushion Craft, Inc., D. Glasgow & Sons, Danby Products, Inc., Direct Impulse, Dixie Seal & Stamp, Eastman Kodak Co., Fiberlok, Inc., Foley-Martens, Bare Feet, Foto Fantasy, Fremont Consumer Die, Fruit of the Loom, Fuji Photo Film, Garan Inc., Global One, Good Stuff Corp., Gotta Go, Inc., H & H Furniture, Hallmark Licensing, Harper Collins, Host Apparel, Houston Harvest Gift, Innovo Group, Inc., Jester Company, John H. Harland Co., Kelly Russell Studio, Kool Sport, Kraft Foods, Inc., Kurt S. Adler, La Rue International, Logo Athletic, Inc., Majestic Athletic, McArthur Towels, McDonald's, Motorola, Inc., National Corp, Nike, Inc., Oxboro Outdoors, Papel Freelance Inc., Penquin Products, Pro Moves, Pro Team Playables, Quaker Company, Riddell Inc., Russell Corporation, San Francisco 49ers, Seven Sons & Co., Shiara Holdings, Simplicity, Sport Cook, Inc., Sports Illustrated, Sports Section, Sportstar, Starwave Corp., Sterling Sports, Suncast Corporation, Tabletop Enterprises, Team Mouse, Tennessee Titans, Terry Manufacturing, Mid Atlantic Cola, Northwest Company, Topps Co., Inc., Toy & Sport Trends, Tundra Standard, Turbo Sportswear, US Playing Card Co., V. Fraas, White Rose, Wilson Sporting, Xerox Corporation, Zippo Manufacturing, Wormser Company (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/26/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/20/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE: [2-1] motion of plaintiff to Seal Complaint; UNSEALING complaint. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 7/20/99) (c/m 7/20/99-dtm) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/22/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/16/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRELIMINARY ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff shall provide a copy of this order to each Defendant with the complaint at time of service or notice of waiver; DIRECTING any Defendant waiving service of process must within 60 days of the notice of commencement notify Plaintiff if the Defendant contends that the Defendant has been incorrectly identified in the complaint and Defendant shall not be required to respond to the complaint unless and until directed to do so by further order of court as therein set forth; DIRECTING any Defendant not waiving service shall be served pursuant to normal applicable principles and shall respond accordingly; ADVISING any party is free to request a conference or move for modification of this order at any time. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 7/16/99) (c/m 7/16/99-dtm) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/19/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by plaintiff to Seal Complaint (eg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/07/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEMAND for jury trial by plaintiff (eg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/07/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 336 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?