Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. SlickEdit Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00814
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 17, 2016 at 7:49 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013 Decker A. Cammack +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 cammack@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDole & Williams, P C

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Z. Duffy +1 214 979 1122 +1 214 979 1123 zduffy@kcwfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth P Kula +1 214 979 1122 +1 214 979 1123 kkula@mcdolewilliams.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven N Williams +1 214 979 1122 +1 214 979 1123 swilliams@kcwfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013 Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013 Steven W. Hartsell +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 shartsell@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013 Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 806 3818 +1 817 377 3485 coneill@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013 Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Slickedit, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Slickedit, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Collin Michael Maloney +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071

Toggle Switch Represented by Verrill & Dana, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy R Shannon tshannon@verrilldana.com
No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 38 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiffs and Defendant are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Parties shall each bear their own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/24/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
    LREF
    Blank 37 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
    USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT NOTICE of Docketing. A petition for writ of mandamus has been filed. USCA-Federal Circuit Case No. 14-120. (dlc, ) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER denying 22 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/09/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 30 Motion to Withdraw ; granting 31 Motion to Withdraw ; granting 32 Motion to Withdraw ; granting 33 Motion to Withdraw ; granting 34 Motion to Withdraw. ORDERED that Barry J. Bumgardner, Edward E. Casto, Jr., Steven W. Hartsell, Jaime K. Olin, and R. Casey ONeill are withdrawn as counsel for Uniloc in the above-styled cases. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/25/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casto, Edward) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth P Kula on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Kula, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Zachary Duffy on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Duffy, William) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Nelson Williams on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 22 MOTION to Change Venue Plaintiffs' Sur-reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to SlickEdit, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 22 MOTION to Change Venue filed by SlickEdit Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Shannon Decl. in Supt. of Reply, # 2 Exhibit 17 (Google map from AL to NC), # 3 Exhibit 18 (Google map from AL to TX), # 4 Exhibit 19 (Google map from FL to NC), # 5 Exhibit 20 (Google map from FL to TX))(Shannon, Timothy) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 22 MOTION to Change Venue Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to SlickEdit Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration Burdick, # 2 Exhibit Declaration Kowalec, # 3 Exhibit Declaration O'Neill, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
                                Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint (Amended), COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. by SlickEdit Inc..(Shannon, Timothy) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                  MOTION to Change Venue by SlickEdit Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Clark Maurer, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Timothy Shannon, # 3 Exhibit #1 Copy of Patent, # 4 Exhibit #2 Copy of Patent Assignment, # 5 Exhibit #3 Uniloc's Corporate profile, Texas Secretary of State, # 6 Exhibit #4 Uniloc's corporate profile, website, # 7 Exhibit #5 Accurint Finder Report (Davis location), # 8 Exhibit #6 Accurint Finder Report (Etchegoyen location), # 9 Exhibit #7 Uniloc v. Revostock Complaint (page 1), # 10 Exhibit #8 Burdick Declaration, # 11 Exhibit #9 Travelocity search (Boston to Raleigh), # 12 Exhibit #10 Travelocity search (Boston to Dallas), # 13 Exhibit #11 Mapquest search (Boston to Raleigh), # 14 Exhibit #12 Mapquest search (Boston to Tyler), # 15 Exhibit #13 U.S.D.C. (E.D. Tex.) Judicial Caseload Profile, # 16 Exhibit #14 U.S.D.C. (E. N.C.) Judicial Caseload Profile, # 17 Exhibit #15 Explanation of Judicial Caseload Profiles, # 18 Exhibit #16 Table (C-5) Time from filing to disposition, # 19 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shannon, Timothy) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                    ***FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED BY ATTORNEY WITH CORRECTED SIGNATURE.*** MOTION to Change Venue by SlickEdit Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Clark Maurer, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Timothy Shannon, # 3 Exhibit Copy of Patent, # 4 Exhibit Copy of Patent Assignment, # 5 Exhibit Uniloc's corporate profile, Texas Secretary of State, # 6 Exhibit Uniloc's corporate profile, website, # 7 Exhibit Accurint Finder Report (Davis location), # 8 Exhibit Accurint Finder Report (Etchegoyen location), # 9 Exhibit Uniloc v. Revostock Complaint (page 1), # 10 Exhibit Burdick Declaration, # 11 Exhibit Travelocity search (Boston to Raleigh), # 12 Exhibit Travelocity search (Boston to Dallas), # 13 Exhibit Mapquest search (Boston to Raleigh), # 14 Exhibit Mapqeust search (Boston to Tyler), # 15 Exhibit U.S.D.C. (E.D. Tex.) Judicial Caseload Profile, # 16 Exhibit U.S.D.C. (E. N.C.) Judicial Caseload Profile, # 17 Exhibit Explanation of Judicial Caseload Profiles, # 18 Exhibit Table C-5 (Time from filing to disposition), # 19 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shannon, Timothy) Modified on 4/2/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv806 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order and each of the respective orders shall be filed in the lead case. All parties to the consolidated case are ORDERED to meet-and-confer and submit uniform Docket Control, Protective, and Discovery Orders which will govern the consolidated case, regardless of whether the same have previously been entered in individual actions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/13. cc:attys 2-04-13(mll, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                        RESPONSE to 14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant SlickEdit Inc. filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting 13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Decker A Cammack terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/07/13. cc:attys 1-08-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SlickEdit Inc. (Shannon, Timothy) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. by SlickEdit Inc..(Shannon, Timothy) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Timothy R Shannon on behalf of SlickEdit Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3917669. (Shannon, Timothy) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re SlickEdit Inc..( Maloney, Collin) (Entered: 12/10/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                          Return of Service Executed as to SlickEdit Inc. on 11/1/2012, by service on the Texas Secretary of State; answer due: 11/22/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Decker A Cammack on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    SUMMONS Issued as to SlickEdit Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            COMPLAINT against SlickEdit Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3847501.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 5,579,222)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 151 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?