Grossmont Hospital Corporation, et al v. Sylvia Mathews Burwell
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 12-5411

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 26, 2016 at 5:42 PM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Nature of Suit 2151 - Contract: Medicare Act Overpay
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 01207605714 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
CLERK'S ORDER filed [1499649] to counsel concerning the use of uncommon acronyms and abbreviations in briefs. [12-5411]
    LREF
    Blank 01207605663 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
    APPELLANT BRIEF [1499616] filed by Grossmont Hospital Corporation, Sharp Chula Vista Medical Center, Sharp Healthcare, Sharp Memorial Hospital and Tri-City Healthcare District [Service Date: 06/26/2014 ] Length of Brief: 13,808 Words. [12-5411] (Roth, Robert)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207598279 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
      CLERK'S ORDER filed [1495425] granting appellants' unopposed motion to extend the briefing schedule by three weeks [1494934-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Brief due 06/26/2014. APPELLEE Brief due on 08/11/2014. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 08/25/2014. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 09/02/2014. Final Briefs due 09/23/2014. [12-5411]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207597335 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
        UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1494934] by Grossmont Hospital Corporation, Sharp Chula Vista Medical Center, Sharp Healthcare, Sharp Memorial Hospital and Tri-City Healthcare District to Extend Briefing Schedule by Approximately Three Weeks. [Service Date: 05/29/2014 ] Pages: 1-10. [12-5411] (Roth, Robert)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207595690 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE FILED [1494063] by Grossmont Hospital Corporation, Sharp Chula Vista Medical Center, Sharp Healthcare, Sharp Memorial Hospital and Tri-City Healthcare District Appellants' Notice of Change of Address. [Service Date: 05/22/2014 ] [12-5411] (Roth, Robert)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207574896 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
            CLERK'S ORDER filed [1482463] granting appellants' fifth unopposed motion to defer briefing schedule by three months to try to resolve case [1482261-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Brief due 06/10/2014. APPELLEE Brief due on 07/10/2014. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 07/24/2014. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 07/31/2014. Final Briefs due 08/14/2014. [12-5411]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207574578 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
              UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1482261] by Grossmont Hospital Corporation, Sharp Chula Vista Medical Center, Sharp Healthcare, Sharp Memorial Hospital and Tri-City Healthcare District to suspend briefing schedule [Service Date: 03/04/2014 ] Pages: 1-10. [12-5411] (Roth, Robert)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207551870 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                CLERK'S ORDER filed [1469120] granting appellants' fourth unopposed motion to defer briefing schedule by approximately three months to try to resolve case [1468759-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Brief due 03/11/2014. APPELLEE Brief due on 04/11/2014. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 04/25/2014. Deferred ppendix due 05/02/2014. Final Briefs due 05/16/2014. [12-5411]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207551232 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                  UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1468759] by Grossmont Hospital Corporation, Sharp Chula Vista Medical Center, Sharp Healthcare, Sharp Memorial Hospital and Tri-City Healthcare District to suspend briefing schedule Pages: 1-10. [12-5411] (Roth, Robert)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207520353 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                    CLERK'S ORDER filed [1451382] granting appellants' third unopposed motion to defer the briefing schedule by approximately three months to try to resolve the case [1451075-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Brief due 12/10/2013. APPELLEE Brief due on 01/10/2014. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 01/24/2014. Deferred Appendix due 01/31/2014. Final Briefs due 02/14/2014. [12-5411]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207519813 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                      UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1451075] by Grossmont Hospital Corporation, Sharp Chula Vista Medical Center, Sharp Healthcare, Sharp Memorial Hospital and Tri-City Healthcare District to suspend briefing schedule Pages: 1-10. [12-5411] (Roth, Robert)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207499133 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                        CLERK'S ORDER filed [1438084] granting appellants' second unopposed motion to defer briefing schedule by approximately two months to try to resolve case [1437912-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Brief due 08/27/2013. APPELLEE Brief due on 09/27/2013. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 10/11/2013. Deferred Appendix due 10/18/2013. Final Briefs due 10/25/2013. [12-5411]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207498773 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                          UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1437912] by Grossmont Hospital Corporation, Sharp Chula Vista Medical Center, Sharp Healthcare, Sharp Memorial Hospital and Tri-City Healthcare District to Defer Briefing Schedule. [Service Date: 05/24/2013 ] Pages: 1-10. [12-5411] (Roth, Robert)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207480249 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                            CLERK'S ORDER filed [1427433] granting appellants' unopposed motion to defer briefing schedule by two months to accommodate mediation [1427217-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Brief due 06/10/2013. APPELLEE Brief due on 07/10/2013. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 07/24/2013. Deferred Appendix due 07/31/2013. Final Briefs due 08/14/2013. [12-5411]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207479835 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                              UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1427217] by Grossmont Hospital Corporation, Sharp Chula Vista Medical Center, Sharp Healthcare, Sharp Memorial Hospital and Tri-City Healthcare District to Defer Briefing Schedule By Two Months To Try To Resolve Case. [Service Date: 03/25/2013 ] Pages: 1-10. [12-5411] (Roth, Robert)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207471290 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
                                CLERK'S ORDER filed [1422488] setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 04/10/2013. APPELLEE Brief due on 05/10/2013. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 05/24/2013. Deferred Appendix due 05/31/2013. Final Briefs due 06/14/2013. [12-5411]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207462575 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                  UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1417558] by Grossmont Hospital Corporation, Sharp Chula Vista Medical Center, Sharp Healthcare, Sharp Memorial Hospital and Tri-City Healthcare District [Service Date: 01/28/2013 ] [12-5411] (Roth, Robert)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207462569 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                    TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1417556] by Grossmont Hospital Corporation, Sharp Chula Vista Medical Center, Sharp Healthcare, Sharp Memorial Hospital and Tri-City Healthcare District [Service Date: 01/28/2013 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [12-5411] (Roth, Robert)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207462561 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                      STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1417554] by Grossmont Hospital Corporation, Sharp Chula Vista Medical Center, Sharp Healthcare, Sharp Memorial Hospital and Tri-City Healthcare District [Service Date: 01/28/2013 ] [12-5411] (Roth, Robert)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207462550 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                        STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1417550] by Grossmont Hospital Corporation, Sharp Chula Vista Medical Center, Sharp Healthcare, Sharp Memorial Hospital and Tri-City Healthcare District [Service Date: 01/28/2013 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [12-5411] (Roth, Robert)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207462538 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                          ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1417546] by Robert L. Roth and co-counsel John R. Hellow on behalf of Appellants Grossmont Hospital Corporation, Sharp Chula Vista Medical Center, Sharp Healthcare, Sharp Memorial Hospital and Tri-City Healthcare District. [12-5411] (Roth, Robert)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207462532 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                            DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1417544] by Grossmont Hospital Corporation, Sharp Chula Vista Medical Center, Sharp Healthcare, Sharp Memorial Hospital, Tri-City Healthcare District and Kathleen Sebelius [Service Date: 01/28/2013 ] [12-5411] (Roth, Robert)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207462526 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                              CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1417542] by Grossmont Hospital Corporation, Sharp Chula Vista Medical Center, Sharp Healthcare, Sharp Memorial Hospital and Tri-City Healthcare District [Service Date: 01/28/2013 ] [12-5411] (Roth, Robert)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207462376 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1417461] by Kathleen Sebelius [Service Date: 01/28/2013 ] [12-5411] (Foster, Sydney)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207462373 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                  ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1417459] by Sydney Foster and co-counsel Michael S. Raab on behalf of Appellee Kathleen Sebelius. [12-5411] (Foster, Sydney)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207453732 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                    CLERK'S ORDER filed [1412329] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 01/28/2013. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 01/28/2013. APPELLANT statement of issues due 01/28/2013. APPELLANT underlying decision due 01/28/2013. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 01/28/2013. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 01/28/2013. APPELLANT transcript status report due 01/28/2013. APPELLANT procedural motions due 01/28/2013. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 02/11/2013; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 01/28/2013. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 01/28/2013. APPELLEE procedural motions due 01/28/2013. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 02/11/2013 [12-5411]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207453727 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1412324] by Grossmont Hospital Corporation, Sharp Chula Vista Medical Center, Sharp Healthcare, Sharp Memorial Hospital and Tri-City Healthcare District seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:10-cv-01201-RLW. Assigned USCA Case Number [12-5411]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 151 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?