CHEROKEE INC.- Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case Delaware Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 95-00023
District Judge Peter J. Walsh, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 9, 2016 at 9:37 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ASHER/GOULD ADVERTISING, INC., A CA CORP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brobeck, Phleger & Harrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dan Woods +1 213 489 4060
v.
No Logo ANTONY P. RESSLER, Defendant
No Logo BRYAN MARSAL, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
BRYAN MARSAL Robert Dale Crockett +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 bob@bobcrockettlaw.com
No Logo CARY D. COOPER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
CARY D. COOPER Robert Dale Crockett +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 bob@bobcrockettlaw.com
No Logo CHEROKEE, INC., A DELAWARE CORP., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cheryl A. King, Sr., Legal Ass't

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Dale Crockett +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 bob@bobcrockettlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
CHEROKEE, INC., A DELAWARE CORP. Robert Dale Crockett +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 bob@bobcrockettlaw.com
No Logo JOE ELLES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
JOE ELLES Robert Dale Crockett +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 bob@bobcrockettlaw.com
No Logo JOHN H. KISSICK, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Irell & Manella, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip J. Graves +1 310 277 1010
No Logo MICHAEL SEYHUN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
MICHAEL SEYHUN Robert Dale Crockett +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 bob@bobcrockettlaw.com
No Logo MICHAEL SINGER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
MICHAEL SINGER Robert Dale Crockett +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 bob@bobcrockettlaw.com
  Entries (78) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/19/1995, Entered: None
COUNSEL'S Letter Confirming Intention of Stipulation [Filed by Karen Jacobs Louden, Atty./ASHER/GOULD ADVERTISING,INC.] Re: Item # 77, [JW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #45 (Entered: 10/21/1995)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/11/1995, Entered: None
    STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal [Filed by Laura Davis Jones, Atty./DEBTOR/DEFENDANT, Robert J. Stern,Jr., Atty./JOHN H. KISSICK, & ANTHONY R. RESSLER, & Karen Jacobs Louden, Atty./ASHER/GOULD ADVERTISING,INC.] Re: Item # 1, [JW] ORDER signed 10/11/95 Re: Item # 77, [JW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #44 (Entered: 10/11/1995)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/6/1995, Entered: None
      CERTIFICATE of Service Re: Item # 75, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #43A (Entered: 09/07/1995)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/6/1995, Entered: None
        REPLY Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Filed by Laura Davis Jones, Atty/ DEBTOR/ DEFENDANT]. Re: Item # 57, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #43 (Entered: 09/07/1995)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/5/1995, Entered: None
          CERTIFICATE of Service Re: Item # 73, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #42A (Entered: 09/07/1995)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/5/1995, Entered: None
            REPLY Brief [Filed by Robert J. Stearn, Jr., Atty/ DEFENDANTS/ JOHN KISSICK/ ANTONY RESSLER]. [LOCATED EXPANSION FOLDER]. Re: Item # 61, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #42 (Entered: 09/07/1995)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/28/1995, Entered: None
              STIPULATION Suspending Deadlines for Pleadings Regarding Defendant's Motions to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Response Thereto [Filed by Mark I. Duedall, Atty/ DEBTOR/ DEFENDANT, Robert J. Stearn, Jr., Atty/ JOHN H. KISSICK/ ANTONY P. RESSLER and William H. Sudell, Jr., At ty/ PLAINTIFF].Re: Item #'s 32 & 34., [KM] ORDER SIGNED 8/28/95., [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #41 (Entered: 08/29/1995)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/9/1995, Entered: None
                STIPULATION Suspending Deadlines for Pleadings Regarding Defendants' Motions to Dismiss [Filed by Mark I. Duedall, Atty/ DEBTOR/ DEFENDANT, Robert J. Stearn, Jr., Atty/ DEFENDANTS/ JOHN KISSICK/ ANTONY RESSLER & Andrea L. Rocanelli, Atty/ PLAINTIFF]., [KM] ORDER SIGNED 8/14/95.Re: Item #'s 32 & 34., [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #40 (Entered: 08/10/1995)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/31/1995, Entered: None
                  APPENDIX to Answering Brief and Memorandum of Points and Authorities. [LOCATED EXPANSION FOLDER] Re: Item # 68, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #39 (Entered: 08/02/1995)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/31/1995, Entered: None
                    CERTIFICATE of Service Re: Item # 68, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #38A (Entered: 08/02/1995)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/31/1995, Entered: None
                      ANSWERING Brief and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Combined Opposition to Motions to Dismiss Complaint [Filed by Andrea L. Rocanelli, Atty/ PLAINTIFF] [LOCATED EXPANSION FOLDER] Re: Item #'s 32 & 34., [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #38 (Entered: 08/02/1995)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/31/1995, Entered: None
                        CERTIFICATE of Service Re: Item # 66, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #37A (Entered: 08/02/1995)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/31/1995, Entered: None
                          MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities In Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice [Filed by Andrea L. Rocanelli, Atty/ PLAINTIFF]. Re: Item # 18, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #37 (Entered: 08/02/1995)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: None
                            APPENDIX of Exhibits and Cases In Support of Motion to Dismiss Re: Item #'s 34 & 35. [LOCATED EXPANSION FOLDER]., [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #36 (Entered: 07/24/1995)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: None
                              CERTIFICATE of Service Re: Item # 63, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #35A (Entered: 07/24/1995)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: None
                                OPENING BRIEF In Support of Motion to Dismiss [Filed by Robert J. Stearn, Jr., Atty/ DEFENDANTS/ JOHN H. KISSICK/ ANTONY P. RESSLER]. [LOCATED EXPANSION FOLDER] Re: Item # 61, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #35 (Entered: 07/24/1995)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: None
                                  CERTIFICATE of Service Re: Item # 61, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #34A (Entered: 07/24/1995)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: None
                                    MOTION to Dismiss [Filed by Robert J. Stearn, Jr., Atty/ DEFENDANTS/ JOHN H. KISSICK/ ANTONY P. RESSLER]. Re: Item # 1, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #34 (Entered: 07/24/1995)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: None
                                      CERTIFICATE of Service Re: Item # 59, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #33A (Entered: 07/24/1995)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: None
                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW In Support of Motion to Dismiss [Filed by Laura Davis Jones, Atty/ DEBTOR/ DEFENDANT] Re: Item # 57, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #33 (Entered: 07/24/1995)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: None
                                          CERTIFICATE of Service Re: Item # 57, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #32A (Entered: 07/24/1995)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: None
                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Failure to Plead Fraud with Particularity [Filed by Mark I. Duedall, Atty/ DEBTOR/ DEFENDANT] Re: Item # 1, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #32 (Entered: 07/24/1995)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/5/1995, Entered: None
                                              STIPULATION Re: Extension of Hold on Discovery & Extension of Time to Answer [Filed by Daniel Scott Schecter & Laura Davis Jones, Attys/ CHEROKEE INC./ CARY D. COOPER, et al., Philip J. Graves & Robert J. Stearn, Jr., Attys/ JOHN KISSICK/ ANTONY RESSLER, and Sabrina Fang & William H. Sudell, Jr., Attys/ PLAINTIFF]., [KM] ORDER SIGNED 7/5/95., [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #31 (Entered: 07/17/1995)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: None
                                                CERTIFICATE of Service Re: Item # 54, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #30A (Entered: 06/09/1995)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: None
                                                  STIPULATION Re: Extension of Hold on Discovery and Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead [Filed by Daniel Scott Schecter & Laura Davis Jones, Attys/ DEBTOR, et al., Philip J. Graves & Robert J. Stearn, Jr., Attys/ JOHN H. KISSICK, et al., Sabrina Fang & Will iam H. Sudell Jr., Attys/ ASHER/GOULD ADVERTISING, INC.] Re: Item # 1, [KM] ORDER SIGNED 6/7/95., [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #30 (Entered: 06/09/1995)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/19/1995, Entered: None
                                                    ORDER SIGNED 4/19/95. Re: Item # 51, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #29B (Entered: 04/21/1995)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/17/1995, Entered: None
                                                      CERTIFICATE of Service Re: Item # 51, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #29A (Entered: 04/21/1995)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/17/1995, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dan Woods, Susan B. Hall and Sabrina Y. T. Fang., [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #29 (Entered: 04/21/1995)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/17/1995, Entered: None
                                                          STIPULATED PROTECTIVE Order Regarding Confidentiality of Business, Personal & Financial Information [Filed by Sabrina Y. T. Fang & William H. Sudell, Jr., Attys/ PLAINTIFF, Daniel S. Schecter & Laura Davis Jones, Attys/ DEFENDANTS/ CHEROKEE, INC./ CARY D. COOPER/ JO E ELLES/ BRYAN MARSAL/ MICHAEL SEYHUN/ MICHAEL SINGER and Philip J. Graves & Robert J. Stearn, Jr., Attys/ DEFENDANTS/ JOHN KISSICK/ ANTONY RESSLER], [KM] ORDER SIGNED 4/19/95., [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #28 (Entered: 04/21/1995)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: None
                                                            CERTIFICATE of Service Re: Item # 48, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #27A (Entered: 04/11/1995)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: None
                                                              STATEMENT of Counsel Pursuant Dist. Ct. Rule 81.2[Filed by Daniel Scott Schecter & Laura Davis Jones, Attys/ DEFENDANTS/ CHEROKEE INC./ CARY D. COOPER/ JOE ELLES, et al., Philip J. Graves & Robert J. Stearn, Jr., Attys/ DEFENDANTS/ JOHN H. KISSICK/ ANTONY P. RESSLER and Sabrina Fang & William H. Sudell, Jr., Attys/ PLAINTIFF] Re: Item # 46, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #27 (Entered: 04/11/1995)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: None
                                                                CERTIFICATE of Service Re: Item # 46, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #26A (Entered: 04/11/1995)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: None
                                                                  STIPULATION Re: Hold on Discovery & Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead [Filed by Daniel Scott Schecter, Atty/ DEFENDANTS/ CHEROKEE, INC., CARY D. COOPER, JOE ELLES, et al., Philip J. Graves & Robert J. Stearn, Jr., Attys/ DEFENDANTS/ JOHN H. KISSICK/ ANTO NY P. RESSLER and Sabrina Fang & William H. Sudell, Jr., Attys/ PLAINTIFF] , [KM] ORDER SIGNED 4/13/95., [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #26 (Entered: 04/11/1995)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: None
                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service Re: Item # 44, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #25A (Entered: 04/11/1995)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Philip J. Graves, [KM] ORDER SIGNED 4/11/95., [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #25 (Entered: 04/11/1995)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: None
                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Service Re: Item # 42, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #24A (Entered: 04/11/1995)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard H. Borow , [KM] ORDER SIGNED 4/11/95., [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #24 (Entered: 04/11/1995)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/20/1995, Entered: None
                                                                            U.S.B.C. Notice of Docketing [Adversary Proceeding No. A-95-23]. Re: Item # 1, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #23 (Entered: 03/22/1995)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                              TRANSMITTAL LETTER/ U.S.B.C./ Central District of California w/ Acknowledgment of Receipt. Re: Item # 38, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #22 (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Entry of Judgment or Order & Cert. of Mailing. Re: Item # 38, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #21A (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING Motion to Transfer Venue and TRANSFERRING Adversary Proceeding to Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware. [ORDER SIGNED 2/6/95]. Re: Item # 13, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #21 (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Entry of Judgment or Order & Cert. of Mailing. Re: Item # 36, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #20A (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                      ORDER DENYING Motions to Dismiss Without Prejudice [ORDER SIGNED 2/6/95]Re: Item #'s 3 & 5., [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #20 (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                        HEARING Held 1/3/95. [SEE Memorandum to Record] Re: Item # 13, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #19 (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                          HEARING Held 1/3/95. [SEE Memorandum To Record] Re: Item #'s 3 & 5., [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #18 (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                            PROOF of Service Re: Item # 32, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #17A (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM In Support of Motion to Dismiss [Filed by Philip J. Graves, Atty/ DEFENDANTS/ JOHN H. KISSICK/ ANTONY P. RESSLER] Re: Item # 7, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #17 (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                PROOF of Service Re: Item # 30, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #16A (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM In Support of Request that the Court take Judicial Notice and Declaration In Support [Filed by Philip J. Graves, Atty/ DEFENDANTS/ JOHN H. KISSICK/ ANTONY P. RESSLER] Re: Item #'s 10 & 11., [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #16 (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                    PROOF of Service Re: Item # 28, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #15A (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue, Motion to Dismiss & Request for Judicial Notice [Filed by Daniel Scott Schecter, Atty/ DEFENDANTS/ CHEROKEE INC./ CARY D. COOPER/ JOE ELLES/ BRYAN MARSAL/ MICHAEL SEYHUN/ MICHAEL SINGER] Re : Item #'s 12, 13 & 14., [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #15 (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                        PROOF of Service Re: Item # 26, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #14A (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & Authorities In Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice [Filed by Dan Woods, Atty/ PLAINTIFF] Re: Item # 18, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #14 (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                            PROOF of Service Re: Item # 24, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #13A (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & Authorities In Opposition to Motion for Transfer of Venue [Filed by Dan Woods, Atty/ PLAINTIFF] Re: Item # 13, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #13 (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                PROOF of Service Re: Item # 22, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #12A (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & Authorities In Combined Opposition to Motions to Dismiss Complaint [Filed by Dan Woods, Atty/ PLAINTIFF] Re: Item #'s 3 & 5., [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #12 (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    PROOF of Service Re: Item # 20, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #11A (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Philip J. Graves In Support of John H. Kissick & Antony P. Ressler's Request Re: Item # 18, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #11 (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        PROOF of Service Re: Item # 18, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #10A (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          REQUEST that Court take Judicial Notice that Neither John H. Kissick nor Antony P. Ressler was an Officer of Cherokee, Inc. [Filed by Philip J. Graves, Atty/ DEFENDANTS], [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #10 (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            PROOF of Service Re: Item # 16, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #9A (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Joinder [Filed by Philip J. Graves, Atty/ DEFENDANTS/ JOHN H. KISSICK/ ANTONY P. RESSLER] Re: Item # 13, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #9 (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE & Order for Status Conference Re: Item # 1, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #8 (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  PROOF of Service Re: Item # 13, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #7A (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion & Motion for Transfer of Venue [Filed by Daniel Scott Schecter/ Atty/ DEFENDANTS/ CHEROKEE INC./ CARY D. COOPER/ JOE ELLES/ BRYAN MARSAL/ MICHAEL SEYHUN/ MICHAEL SINGER], [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #7 (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      PROOF of Service Re: Item # 11, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #6A (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Joinder of Defendants [Filed by Philip J. Graves, Atty/ DEFENDANTS/ JOHN H. KISSICK/ ANTONY P. RESSLER], [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #6 (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          PROOF of Service Re: Item # 9, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #5C (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion & Motion to Dismiss [Filed by Philip J. Graves, Atty/ DEFENDANTS/ JOHN H. KISSICK/ ANTONY P. RESSLER] Re: Item # 7, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #5B (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              PROOF of Service Re: Item # 7, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #5A (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss [Filed by Philip J. Graves, Atty/ DEFENDANTS/ JOHN H. KISSICK/ ANTONY P. RESSLER], [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #5 (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  PROOF of Service Re: Item # 5, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #4A (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    APPENDIX of Exhibits & Cases In Support of Motion to Dismiss [LOCATED EXPANSION FOLDER] Re: Item # 3, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #4 (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      PROOF of Service Re: Item # 3, [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #3A (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion & Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim & to Plead Fraud [Filed by Robert D. Crockett, Atty/ DEFENDANTS/ CHEROKEE INC./ CARY D. COOPER/ JOE ELLES/ BRYAN MARSAL/ MICHAEL SEYHUN; MICHAEL SINGER], [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #3 (Entered: 03/17/1995)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS 1 through 12 [CONTAIN true and correct copies of all Process and Pleadings from State Court Proceeding] [LOCATED EXPANSION FOLDER]FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract, Fraudulent Misrepresentation, and Conspiracy to Defraud [Filed by Dan Woods, Atty/ PLAINTIFF] [LOCATED ITEM #2, EXHIBIT 1], [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #2 (Entered: 03/16/1995)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Removal Pursuant 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1334[b] & Bk. Rule 9027 [Filed by Robert D. Crockett, Atty/ DEFENDANTS/ CHEROKEE INC./ CARY D. COOPER/ JOE ELLES, et al.] [ADVERSARY COMPLAINT FILED in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Los Angeles , Action No. BC113978] [PROCEEDING TRANSFERRED to the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware.] , [KM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #1 (Entered: 03/16/1995)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 134 times.

                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?