VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC. v. CEPHALON, INC. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:06-cv-01833
District Judge MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 7, 2021 at 10:36 AM DT (6.2 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Avmed, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Daniel Schwartz +1 212 983 9330 +1 212 983 9331 rschwartz@faruqilaw.com
Space KENDALL SCOTT ZYLSTRA +1 215 914 2460 +1 215 277 5771 kzylstra@faruqilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David S. Nalven +1 617 482 3700 +1 617 482 3003 davidn@hbsslaw.com
Space Thomas Matthew Sobol +1 617 482 3700 +1 617 482 3003 tom@hagens-berman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rawlings & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARK D. FISCHER +1 502 814 2139 +1 502 584 8580 mdf@rawlingsandassociates.com
Space ROBERT C. GRIFFITH +1 502 814 2157 rg1@rawlingsandassociates.com
Space Mark S. Sandmann +1 502 814 2157 +1 502 584 8580 mms@rawlingsandassociates.com
Space Jeffrey C. Swann +1 502 814 2492 +1 502 584 8580 js5@rawlingsandassociates.com
No Logo DEBRA LANGAN, Plaintiff
No Logo District Council 37 Health & Security Plan, Plaintiff
No Logo JEFFREY R. KRINSK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Finkelstein & Krinsk LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Richard Restis , +1 619 238 1333 +1 619 238 5425 wrr@classactionlaw.com
No Logo PENNSYLVANIA EMPLOYEES BENEFIT TRUST FUND, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARY ANN GEPPERT +1 215 496 0300 mgeppert@srkw-law.com
Space Jeffrey Louis Kodroff +1 215 496 0300 +1 215 496 6611 jkodroff@srkw-law.com
No Logo Pennsylvania Turnpike Commission, Plaintiff
No Logo SHIRLEY PANEBIANO, Plaintiff
No Logo VISTA HEALTHPLAN INC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Criden & Love, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin B. Love +1 305 357 9000 +1 305 357 9050 klove@hanzmancriden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Finkelstein Thompson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael G McLellan +1 202 337 8000 +1 202 337 8090 mmclellan@finkelsteinthompson.com
Space Lawrence Kendall Satterfield +1 202 337 8000 +1 202 337 8090 ksatterfield@finkelsteinthompson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph H. Meltzer, PHV +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 661 7056 jmeltzer@ktmc.com
Space Terence Scott Ziegler +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 tziegler@sbtklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert W. Sink

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert W. Sink +1 610 566 0800 +1 610 566 4408 rsink@sinklawoffices.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THEODORE M. LIEVERMAN +1 215 496 0300 tlieverman@srk-law.com
Space John Angelo Macoretta +1 215 496 0300 +1 215 496 6611 jmacoretta@srkw-law.com
v.
No Logo Barr Laboratories, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay Philip Lefkowitz +1 212 446 4970 +1 212 446 4900 lefkowitz@kirkland.com
Space JOHN C. O'QUINN +1 202 879 5191 +1 202 879 5200 john.oquinn@kirkland.com
Space Gregory Lee Skidmore +1 202 879 5246 +1 202 879 5200 greg.skidmore@kirkland.com
Space Karen Natalie Walker +1 202 879 5000 +1 202 879 5200 kwalker@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Montgomery McCracken Walker & Rhoads, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RICHARD L. SCHEFF +1 215 772 7502 +1 215 731 3922 rscheff@mmwr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Montgomery McCracken Walker Rhoades

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LATHROP B. NELSON, III +1 215 772 7473 +1 215 731 3708 lnelson@mmwr.com
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Bailey & Glasser, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth A. Ryan +1 617 439 6730 +1 617 951 3954 eryan@baileyglasser.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Conrad O'Brien, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space FRANK R. EMMERICH, JR. +1 215 864 9600 femmerich@conradobrien.com
Space NANCY J. GELLMAN +1 215 864 9600 +1 215 864 9620 ngellman@cogr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP (919 Third Ave)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JAMES C. BURLING +1 617 526 6416 +1 617 526 5000 james.burling@wilmerhale.com
Space MARK A. FORD +1 617 526 6423 +1 617 526 5000 mark.ford@wilmerhale.com
Space PETER J. KOLOVOS +1 617 526 6493 +1 617 526 5000 peter.kolovos@wilmerhale.com
Space Bethany M Stevens +1 213 443 5324 +1 213 443 5400 bethany.stevens@wilmerhale.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 215-864-9600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN A. GUERNSEY +1 215 864 9600 +1 215 864 9620 jguernsey@cogr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID J. CREAGAN +1 215 864 7032 creagand@whiteandwilliams.com
Space DAVID E. EDWARDS +1 215 864 7166 edwardsd@whiteandwilliams.com
Space Michael N. Onufrak +1 215 864 7174 +1 215 789 7674 onufrakm@whiteandwilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARY J. EDWARDS +1 617 526 6215
Space ROBERT J. GUNTHER, JR. +1 212 230 8830 +1 212 230 8888 robert.gunther@wilmerhale.com
Space MICHELLE D. MILLER +1 617 526 6116 michelle.miller@wilmerhale.com
Space PETER A. SPAETH +1 617 526 6150 peter.spaeth@wilmerhale.com
Space GREGORY P. TERAN +1 617 526 6574 gregory.teran@wilmerhale.com
Space Emily R. Whelan +1 617 526 6567 emily.whelan@wilmerhale.com
Space YIN ZHOU +1 617 526 6127 yin.zhou@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Eckerd Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hangley, Aronchick, Segal & Pudlin, Esqs.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Monica L. Rebuck +1 717 364 1007 +1 717 362 1020 mrebuck@hangley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by HILLIARD & SHADOWEN LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STEVE D. SHADOWEN +1 855 344 3298 steve@hilliardshadowenlaw.com
Mylan Laboratories, Inc. Mylan Laboratories, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID L. COMERFORD +1 215 965 1200 +1 215 965 1210 dcomerford@akingump.com
Space Catherine Elizabeth Creely +1 202 887 4331 +1 202 887 4288 ccreely@akingump.com
Space JEFFERY A. DAILEY +1 215 965 1200 jdailey@akingump.com
Space Paul B. Hewitt +1 202 887 4120 +1 202 955 7617 phewitt@akingump.com
Space KATHERINE M. KATCHEN +1 215 965 1200 kkatchen@akingump.com
Space EDWARD F. MANNINO +1 215 965 1200 +1 215 965 1210 emannino@akingump.com
Space C. FAIRLEY SPILLMAN +1 202 887 4409 +1 202 887 4288 fspillman@akingump.com
Space Reginald David Steer +1 415 765 9500 +1 415 765 9501 rsteer@akingump.com
Space MATTHEW RYAN VARZALLY +1 215 965 1273 mvarzally@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARY KAY COSTELLO +1 215 861 8923 marykay.costello@usdoj.gov
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID G. ADAMS +1 202 344 4000
Space J. DOUGLAS BALDRIDGE +1 202 344 4703 +1 202 344 8300 jdbaldridge@venable.com
Space Sarah Choi +1 202 344 8274 +1 202 344 8300 schoi@venable.com
Space LISA JOSE FALES +1 202 344 4349 ljfales@venable.com
Space DANIELLE R. FOLEY +1 202 344 4343 drfoley@venable.com
Space MOLLY GEISSENHAINER +1 202 344 4215 mtgeissenhainer@venable.com
Space VINCENT E. VERROCCHIO +1 202 344 4496 +1 202 344 8300 veverrocchio@venable.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Volpe & Koenig, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 215 568 6400 +1 215 568 6499 JOMalley@vklaw.com
Space Anthony S. Volpe, Esquire AVolpe@volpe-koenig.com
No Logo Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stevens & Lee, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOSEPH E. WOLFSON +1 610 205 6019 +1 610 988 0808 jwo@stevenslee.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP (DC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JEFFREY B. KORN +1 212 728 8842 +1 212 728 8111 jkorn@willkie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Harry Rooney +1 212 728 8259 +1 212 977 0292 maoedny@willkie.com
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (634) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None Returned Mail
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None Statement
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Costs
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: None Costs
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Hearing
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Memorandum
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: None Approval
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Approval
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Approval
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Enforce
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Order to Remove from Suspense
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Enforce
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Enforce
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Enforce
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Enforce
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Bifurcate
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT, JOHN R. THOMAS IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/22/2015. 12/23/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED ECONOMIC EXPERTS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/22/2015. 12/23/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Certified Copy of Order
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE in Opposition re 506 MOTION in Limine filed by CEPHALON, INC.. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE in Opposition to re 503 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Court's Patent Rulings filed by VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC.. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE FRAUDULENT PATENT THEORY FROM PLAINTIFFS' PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/14/2015. 12/15/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/14/2015. 12/15/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 498 MOTION to Strike "Fraudulent Patent" Theory from Plaintiffs' Pretrial Memorandum filed by APOTEX, INC.. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, ) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 11/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY THAT THERE WOULD HAVE BEEN LESS PROVIGIL SALES ABSENT DEFENDANTS' ANTICOMPETITIVE ACTS. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (amas) (Entered: 11/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 11/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY THAT CEPHALON WOULD HAVE ENFORCED THE INVALID '516 PATENT IN A BUT-FOR WORLD BY SUING APOTEX FOR INFRINGEMENT. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (amas) (Entered: 11/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 11/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY REGARDING ALLEGED PRO-COMPETITIVE EFFECTS IN MARKETS UNRELATED TO MODAFINIL. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(amas) (Entered: 11/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 11/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE IRRELEVANT, OVERLY PREJUDICIAL, AND LATER ARISING REGULATORY ISSUES. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(amas) (Entered: 11/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS.1-0 AND DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY HENNINGS AND EXHIBITS. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jl, ) (Entered: 11/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Minute Entry - Multicase
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Support re 469 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Decision On Their Rule 23(f) Appeal filed by MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (kp, ) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY MEMORANDUM IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FILE THE MEMORANDUM ATTACHED TO THE MOTION AT EXHIBIT 1. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/19/2015.11/20/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PLAINTIFF'S PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM, APPENDICES. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jl, ) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEFENDANT'S PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jl, ) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 1/19/2016 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. MOTIONS IN LIMINE ARE DUE BY 11/25/2015. PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMORANDA DUE BY 10/28/2015. THE TRIAL DATE IS SET FOR 2/2/2016 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. FURTHER DEADLINES AND INSTRUCTIONS ARE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/11/2015. 8/12/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT IS SET FOR 9/15/2015 AT 02:00 PM IN COURTROOM 4B BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/11/2015. 8/12/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/6/2015 before Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg. Court Reporter: ESR/ Transcriber: Veritext Legal Solutions.. (kp, ) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEFENDANTS' JOINT OFFERS OF PROOF ON EXPERTS (FILED UNDER SEAL). (jaa, ) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings/motion hearing held on 3/25/2015 before Judge Goldberg. Court Reporter: ESR/VERITEXT NATIONAL COURT REPORTING COMPANY.. (kp, ) Modified on 4/3/2015 (afm, ). (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/23/2015 before Judge Goldberg. Court Reporter: ESR.. (kp, ) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT FOR THE REASONS OUTLINED HEREIN MYLAN'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (DOC. NO. 396 ), IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/27/2015.3/30/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL SUBMIT JOINT OFFERS OF PROOF ON THE EXPERTS CHALLENGED IN THESE MOTIONS. THE EXPERTS CHALLENGED IN THESE MOTIONS WILL NOT BE PERMITTED TO PROVIDE OPINIONS THAT FALL OUTSIDE OF THE OFFERS OF PROOF SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANTS. THESE SUBMISSIONS SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 4/22/15. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/27/15. 3/30/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) Modified on 3/31/2015 (tjd). Modified on 3/31/2015 (mbh, ). (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Docket Call
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Docket Call
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Docket Call
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG Motion Hearing held on 3/24/2015. Court Reporter: ESR. (kp, ) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY EVAN R. CHESLER FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/12/2015. 3/13/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY ROWAN D. WILSON FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/12/2015. 3/13/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY DAVID R. MARRIOTT FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/12/2015. 3/13/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT A MOTION HEARING ON THE MOTION to Certify Class IS SET FOR 3/24/2015 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 4B BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/6/2015. 2/9/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG Status Conference held on 1/29/2015. (kp, ) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 5/19/2015 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. MOTIONS IN LIMINE DUE BY 4/3/2015. PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMORANDA ARE DUE BY 3/20/2015. THE TRIAL DATE IS SET FOR 6/1/2015 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. FURTHER DEADLINES AND INSTRUCTIONS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/3/2015. 2/3/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT A STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING TRIAL SCHEDULING IS SET FOR 1/29/2015 AT 10:00 AM IN A COURTROOM TO BE DETERMINED BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/6/2015. 1/7/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT COUNSEL SHALL FILE A STIPULATION ON OR BEFORE 1/16/2015 TO UNSEAL DOCUMENTS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/6/2015. 1/7/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY DECLARATION OF JOSEPH H. MELTZER. Exhibits (26 through 36). (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ems) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          END-PAYOR PLAINTIFFS' REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Certificate of Service. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ems) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MATTHEW RYAN VARZALLY on behalf of MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.(VARZALLY, MATTHEW) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT END PAYOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE; AND LEAVE TO FILE EXCESS PAGES IS GRANTED. END PAYOR PLAINTIFF MAY FILE A REPLY BRIEF OF NO MORE THAN 20 PAGES ON OR BEFORE 7/25/2014. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/10/2014.7/10/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply in Further Support of re 368 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Complete Reply Brief in Support of Class Certification and MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (UNOPPOSED) filed by DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, SHIRLEY PANEBIANO, PENNSYLVANIA EMPLOYEES BENEFIT TRUST FUND, PENNSYLVANIA TURNPIKE COMMISSION, VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC., certificate of service. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Proposed Order)(MELTZER, JOSEPH) Modified on 7/11/2014 (fb). (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 368 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief in Support of Class Certification and MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (UNOPPOSED) filed by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., CEPHALON, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (SKIDMORE, GREGORY) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief in Support of Class Certification and, MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (UNOPPOSED) filed by DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, SHIRLEY PANEBIANO, PENNSYLVANIA EMPLOYEES BENEFIT TRUST FUND, PENNSYLVANIA TURNPIKE COMMISSION, VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MELTZER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FILED BY CEPHALON AND THE GENERIC DEFENDANTS ARE GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN, AND THE MOTION FILED BY THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS IS DENIED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/23/2014. 6/23/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/23/2014. 6/23/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO END-PAYOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. (FILED UNDER SEAL). (kp, ) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CEPHALON, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. of Filing Under Seal (SKIDMORE, GREGORY) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS TO REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS CEPHALON, TEVA AND BARR'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS' CHALLENGES TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (amas) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS CEPHALON, TEVA, AND BARR'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS' CHALLENGES TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(amas) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY IN SUPPORT OF STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS CEPHALON, TEVA AND BARR'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS' CHALLENGES TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (amas) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS, APOTEX, INC., AND END-PAYOR PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED STATEMENT OF UNCONTESTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MEMORANDA IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS CEPHALON, TEVA, BARR, RANBAXY, AND MYLAN'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS' CHALLENGES TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (amas) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF GREGORY K. BELL. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jl, ) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM, DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO EXCLUDE DAMAGES OPINIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' EXPERTS DRS. HARTMAN, LEFFLER, LEITZINGER AND NOLL. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (amas) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INC.'S, DEFENDANT TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD'S AND TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT THOMAS HOXIE, DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(amas) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MYLAN DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF MYLAN DEFENDANTS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL CLAIMS UNDER FTC V. ACTAVIS. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (amas) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF MYLAN DEFENDANTS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL CLAIMS UNDER FTC V. ACTAVIS. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (amas) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY IN SUPPORT OF RANBAXY DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; REPLY IN SUPPORT OF STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF RANBAXY DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF DANIELLE R. FOLEY IN SUPPORT OF RANBAXY DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND EXHIBITS 1-8. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(amas) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED ECONOMIC EXPERTS AND EXHIBITS 19-26. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(amas) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED EXPERT, JOHN R. THOMAS. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (amas) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY in Support of MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Expert Reports of Dr. James Hughes, together with Exhibits filed by VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ti, ) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. of Filing under Seal of Mylan Defendants' Reply in Support of their Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion of Mylan Defendants for Summary Judgment on all Claims under FTC v. Actavis (VARZALLY, MATTHEW) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. of Filing under Seal of Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion of Mylan Defendants for Summary Judgment on all Claims under FTC v. Actavis (VARZALLY, MATTHEW) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CEPHALON, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. re 303 MOTION to Exclude NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL ALL DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED EXPERT JOHN R. THOMAS (BALDRIDGE, J.) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., CEPHALON, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. re 305 MOTION to Exclude NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL ALL DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED ECONOMIC EXPERTS HAL J. SINGER, RAYMOND S. HARTMAN, ROGER G. NOLL, JEFFREY LEITZINGER, KEITH B. LEFFLER AND EINER R. ELHAGUE (BALDRIDGE, J.) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re 302 MOTION for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (BALDRIDGE, J.) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CEPHALON, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. of Filing Under Seal (SKIDMORE, GREGORY) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CEPHALON, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. of Filing Under Seal (SKIDMORE, GREGORY) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support re 290 Joint MOTION to Exclude Damages Opinions of Plaintiffs' Experts Drs. Hartman, Leffler, Leitzinger and Noll (filed by all Defendants) filed by CEPHALON, INC. (GELLMAN, NANCY) Modified on 6/9/2014 (md). (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC. of Designation to Join in Reply Briefs on Daubert Motions (MACORETTA, JOHN) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC. re 292 MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Expert Reports of Dr. James Hughes -Filed Under Seal (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(MACORETTA, JOHN) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of REPLY Memorandum in Support re 288 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Thomas Hoxie by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., and Cephalon, Inc. filed by CEPHALON, INC. (GELLMAN, NANCY) Modified on 6/9/2014 (md). (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT CEPHALON'S JOINT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CONSOLIDATED BRIEFING IS GRANTED, AND CEPHALON MAY FILE THE FIVE BRIEFS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/2/2014.6/3/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Briefing in Reply to Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Oppositions and in Reply to Plaintiffs' Daubert Oppositions (Unopposed) filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    END-PAYOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, DECLARATION OF JOSEPH H. MELTZER, AND EXHIBTIS 1-25. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, SHIRLEY PANEBIANO, PENNSYLVANIA EMPLOYEES BENEFIT TRUST FUND, PENNSYLVANIA TURNPIKE COMMISSION, VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC. of Filing Under Seal End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Memorandum of Law, Declaration of Joseph H. Meltzer and Exhibits (MELTZER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF GREGORY K. BELL. (FILED UNDER SEAL). (kp, ) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE in Opposition re 292 MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Expert Reports of Dr. James Hughes. EXHIBITS. (FILED UNDER SEAL). (kp, ) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEFENDANTS' JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' DAUBERT MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS CONCERNING THE BUSINESS TRANSACTIONS WITH GENERIC DEFENDANTS, DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT. (FILE UNDER SEAL). (kp, ) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DEFENDANT CEPHALON 'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' DAUBERT MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS CONCERNING THE "516 PATIENT", DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT. (FILED UNDER SEAL). (kp, ) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEFENDANTS' JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN EXPERT OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF JERRY HAUSMAN, EDWARD A. SNYDER, AND BRUCE STANGLE, DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT. (FILED UNDER SEAL). (kp, ) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT THE END PAYOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS ON CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING IS GRANTED. THE END PAYOR PLAINTIFFS MAY FILE A BRIEF OF UP TO 40 PAGES, AND DEFENDATS MAY FILE AN OPPOSITION BRIEF OF UP TO 40 PAGES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/12/2014. 5/12/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF PAUL GARDNER AND S. PETER LUDWIG. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, ) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      END-PAYOR PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY AND DAMAGES OPINION OF EXPERT DR. RAMOND S. HARTMAN. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. EXHIBIT A. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, ) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        END-PAYOR PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. EXHIBITS A-D. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, ) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. of Filing Under Seal of Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Exclude Opinions of Paul Gardner and S. Peter Ludwig (VARZALLY, MATTHEW) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. of Adoption of Cephalon's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Daubert Motions to Exclude Opinions Concerning the '516 Patent (VARZALLY, MATTHEW) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC. of Filing Under Seal of End-Payor Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motions (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MACORETTA, JOHN) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. of Filing Under Seal of Defendants' Joint Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions and Testimony of Jerry Hausman and Edward A. Snyder (filed by all defendants) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. of Filing Under Seal of Cephalon's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Daubert Motions to Exclude Opinions Concerning the '516 Patent (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. of Filing Under Seal of Defendants' Joint Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs Daubert Motions to Exclude Certain Opinions Concerning the Business Transactions with Generic Defendants (filed by all defendants) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CEPHALON, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. of Filing Under Seal (SKIDMORE, GREGORY) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CEPHALON, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. of Filing Under Seal (SKIDMORE, GREGORY) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, SHIRLEY PANEBIANO, PENNSYLVANIA EMPLOYEES BENEFIT TRUST FUND, PENNSYLVANIA TURNPIKE COMMISSION, VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC. of Filing Under Seal End-Payor Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Exclude the Testimony and Damages Opinion of Expert Dr. Raymond S. Hartman (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Order)(MELTZER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT CEPHALON'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CONSOLIDATED BRIEFING IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' DAUBERT MOTIONS IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/7/2014.5/8/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' JOINT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONSOLIDATE BRIEFING IS GRANTED. APOTEX, THE END PAYOR PLAINTIFFS, AND THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MAY EACH FILE A CONSOLIDATED BRIEF, NOT TO EXCEED 55 PAGES, RESPONDING TO THE THREE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS. THE INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFFS MAY FILE A CONSOLIDATED BRIEF NOT TO EXCEED 40 PAGES OPPOSING THE MOTIONS FILED BY MYLAN AND RANBAXY. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO CITE EXHIBITS IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS' SHALL PROVIDE THE COURT WITH AN ELECTRONIC COPY OF ANY EXHIBITS CITED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/7/2014.5/8/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Class Certification Briefing (Unopposed) filed by VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC... (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MACORETTA, JOHN) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Briefing in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Daubert Motions (Unopposed) filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT RESPONSES TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 5/9/14. CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 5/12/14; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 4/17/14. 4/17/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION Unopposed Amendment to Pre-Trial Scheduling Orders filed by CEPHALON, INC.. (GELLMAN, NANCY) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 4/17/2014 (nd, ). (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PLAINTIFF'S DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF GREGORY K. BELL, MEMORANDUM, DECLARATION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE,EXHIBITS. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM, DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS CEPHALON, INC.'S DEFENDANT TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD'S AND TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERT THOMAS HOXIE. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, ) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            END-PAYOR PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE REPORT OF DR. JAMES HUGHES. EXHIBITS A-E. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, ) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM, DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO EXCLUDE DAMAGES OPINIONS OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS DRS. HARTMAN,LEFFLER,LEITZINGER AND NOLL. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEFENDANTS CEPHALON, BARR AND TEVA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS CHALLENGES TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS, STATEMENT, MEMORANDUM, EXHIBITS. (FILED UNDER SEAL).(kp, ) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS 8-18 IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED ECONOMIC EXPERTS HAL J. SINGER, RAYMOND HARTMAN, ROGER G. NOLL, JEFFREY LEITZINGER, KEITH B. LEFFLER AND EINER R. ELHAUGE. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXLCUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED ECONOMIC EXPERTS, MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT, EXHIBITS 1-7. (FILED UNDER SEAL).(kp, ) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF THE MYLAN DEFENDANTS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL CLAIMS UNDER FTC VS ACTAVIS, SUPPORTING STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS, DELCARATION OF C. FARLEY SPILLMAN, EXHIBITS. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, ) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED EXPERT JOHN R. THOMAS, MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED EXPERT, JOHN R. THOMAS, EXHIBITS 1-5. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT, STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS, DECLARATION OF SARAH CHOI, EXHIBITS 1-47. (FILED UNDER SEAL).(kp, ) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL DEFENDANT RANBAXY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, MEMO IN SUPPORT, STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS, AND DECLARATION OF SARAH CHOI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(BALDRIDGE, J.) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL ALL DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED ECONOMIC EXPERTS HAL J. SINGER, RAYMOND S. HARTMAN, ROGER G. NOLL, JEFFREY LEITZINGER, KEITH B. LEFFLER AND EINER R. ELHAGUE AND THEIR MEMO IN SUPPORT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(BALDRIDGE, J.) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL ALL DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED EXPERT JOHN R. THOMAS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(BALDRIDGE, J.) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC. of Designation to Join in Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motions to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions (MACORETTA, JOHN) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC. of Adoption of FTC Daubert Motions (MACORETTA, JOHN) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. Notice of Filing Under Seal (VARZALLY, MATTHEW) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment of Mylan Defendants on All Claims under FTC v. Actavis filed by MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(VARZALLY, MATTHEW) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC. re 292 MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Expert Reports of Dr. James Hughes Notice of Filing Under Seal, Memorandum and Exhibits (MACORETTA, JOHN) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CEPHALON, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. of Filing Under Seal (SKIDMORE, GREGORY) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Expert Reports of Dr. James Hughes filed by VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MACORETTA, JOHN) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. re 290 Joint MOTION to Exclude Damages Opinions of Plaintiffs' Experts Drs. Hartman, Leffler, Leitzinger and Noll (filed by all Defendants) - Notice of Filing Under Seal Memorandum, Declaration and Exhibits (GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Exclude Damages Opinions of Plaintiffs' Experts Drs. Hartman, Leffler, Leitzinger and Noll (filed by all Defendants) filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. re 288 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Thomas Hoxie filed by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and filed by Cephalon, Inc. - Notice of Filing Under Seal Memorandum, Declaration and Exhibits (GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Thomas Hoxie filed by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT A STATUS CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 4/8/2014 10:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. ONLY ONE ATTORNEY PER PARTY MAY ATTEND. ON OR BEFORE 4/4/14, THE PARTIES MAY SUBMIT BY EMAIL PROPOSED AGENDA/TOPIC ITEMS THAT ARE NOT COVERED IN MY 3/18/14 EMAIL.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/20/14. 3/21/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, ) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY CATHERINE E. CREELY for MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC. AND MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/25/2014. 2/26/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF CATHERINE E. CREELY ON BEHALF OF MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC. AND MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. SPONSORSHIP STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, PROPOSED ORDER. (kp, ) (FILING FEE PAID $40. RECEIPT NO. 096819)Modified on 2/26/2014 (kp, ). (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE: Settlement Conference held on 1/21/2014. (kp, ) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/23/14 before Judge GOLDBERG. Court Reporter: STEVE SONNIE. (SEE 06-1797 PAPER #591) (jl, ) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG: Motion Hearing held on 1/23/2014 re 233 Final MOTION for Judgment filed by VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC. Court Reporter: STEPHEN SONNIE. (kp, ) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE THREE BUSINESS-DAY EXTENSION FOR SERVICE OF RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS IS HEREBY GRANTED. RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS ARE DUE 1/29/2014. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/27/2014. 1/27/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT THE MOTION HEARING IS RESCHEDULED FOR 1/22/2014 AT 03:30 PM IN COURTROOM 4B BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/10/2014. 1/10/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT AN ORAL ARGUMENT IS HEREBY SET FOR 1/22/2014 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 4B BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/9/2014. 1/9/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF REGINALD D. STEER IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/8/2014.1/8/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Reginald D. Steer filed by MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..Certificate of Service.(KATCHEN, KATHERINE)(FILING FEE PAID $40. RECEIPT NO. 094157) Modified on 1/8/2014 (kp, ). (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY IN SUPPORT OF GENERIC DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS OF AN OVERALL CONSPIRACY AND THEIR REPLY IN SUPPORT OF STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT THEREOF. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, ) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEFENDANTS' JOINT RESPONSE TO END-PAYOR PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR OPPOSITION TO CEPHALON'S AND GENERIC DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS OF AN OVERALL CONSPIRACY.(FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, ) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION OF THOMAS J. MAAS. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, ) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE TO CEPHALON'S STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS THAT PRECLUDE SUMMARY JUDGMENT by APOTEX, INC.. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, ) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE TO GENERIC DEFENDANTS' STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO APOTEX' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF ANTITRUST LIABILITY by APOTEX, INC.. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APOTEX'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF ANTITRUST LIABILITY ON THE ISSUE OF MONOPOLY POWER by APOTEX, INC.. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, ) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO APOTEX, INC.'S COUNTERSTATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs' Claims of an Overall Conspiracy Among All Defendants, filed by CEPHALON, INC.. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, ) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO APOTEX INC.'S COUNTERSTATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS OF AN OVERALL CONSPIRACY AMONG ALL DEFENDANTS, FILED BY CEPHALON, INC. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, ) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS OF AN OVERALL CONSPIRACY AMONG ALL DEFENDANTS by CEPHALON, INC.. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, ) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs' Claims of an Overall Conspiracy Among All Defendants filed by CEPHALON, INC.. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, ) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CEPHALON, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. of Filing Under Seal (SKIDMORE, GREGORY) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. of Filing Under Seal (SKIDMORE, GREGORY) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. (Filing Under Seal) (GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 233 Final MOTION for Judgment PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(MACORETTA, JOHN) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 1/20/2014 AT 01:30 PM IN ROOM 3030 BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 12/11/2013. 12/12/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE: Settlement Conference held on 12/4/2013. (kp, ) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THE 10/22/2013 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER IS HEREBY VACATED, AND THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE STRAWBRIDGE FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES. ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 2/28/2014. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE DUE BY 3/14/2014. FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS AND DEADLINES ARE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/3/2013. 12/3/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INC.'S CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS SEEKING SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR PRECLUSION ON WALKER PROCESS FRAUD AND OTHER ANTITRUST ISSUES FROM THE BIFURCATED PATENT LITIGATION, FILED BY CEPHALON, INC. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APOTEX, INC.'S COUNTER STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' PARTIAL MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS OF AN OVERALL CONSPIRACY AMONG ALL DEFENDANTS. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APOTEX'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO GENERIC DEFENDANTS' STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS OF AN OVERALL CONSPIRACY. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APOTEX, INC.'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO CEPHALON'S STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS OF AN OVERALL CONSPIRACY AMONG ALL DEFENDANTS. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        END-PAYOR PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND COUNTER STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MEMORANDA IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INC.'S AND GENERIC DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS OF AN OVERALL CONSPIRACY. EXHIBITS 1-4. DECLARATION OF JOHN A. MACORETTA IN OPPOSITION TO CEPHALON MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, ) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. (of Filing Under Seal of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motions) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 233 Final MOTION for Judgment filed by CEPHALON, INC.. (GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 236 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs' Claims of an Overall Conspiracy Among All Defendants Consolidated filed by VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Under Seal, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(MACORETTA, JOHN) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 233 Final MOTION for Judgment filed by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(SKIDMORE, GREGORY) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT CEPHALON'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED SUMMARY JUDGMENT OPPOSITION BRIEF IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/4/2013.11/5/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE: Settlement Conference held on 10/24/13. (jl, ) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File a Consolidated Summary Judgment Opposition Brief on Patent-Related Issues and Separate Responses on Other Issues filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 2/10/2014. MOTIONS FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION DUE BY 4/21/2014. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 2/24/2014, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/22/2013. 10/22/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT REOPEN AND REMOVE THE ABOVE-REFERENCED ACTIONS FROM THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/18/2013. 10/18/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT MARK THIS ACTION CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES AND PLACE THE MATTER IN THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/1/2013. 10/1/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. (Response to The Federal Trade Commission's Motion to Stay) (GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE: Telephone Conference (RE: SETTLEMENT) held on 9/25/2013. (tomg, ) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT-RELATED MATTERS IS SET FOR 10/2/2013 04:45 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. COUNSEL FOR CEPHALON IS DIRECTED TO INITIATE THIS CALL, OR ALTERNATIVELY, PROVIDE A DIAL-IN CONFERENCE LINE NO LATER THAN 48 HOURS BEFORE THE SCHEDULED CALL TO ALL PARTIES, INCLUDING THE COURT(lds, ) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS OF AN OVERALL CONSPIRACY AMONG ALL DEFTS, STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT (FILED UNDER SEAL) (tomg, ) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      GENERIC DEFTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS OF AN OVERALL CONSPIRACY, MEMORANDUM OF LAW, STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS, PROPOSED ORDER, EXHIBITS VOLUME 1 AND VOLUME 2. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(tomg, ) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs' Claims of an Overall Conspiracy Among All Defendants filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service.(GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. (Filing Under Seal of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs' Claims of an Overall Conspiracy Among All Defendants) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (proposed Order))(GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. of Filing Under Seal (SKIDMORE, GREGORY) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Final MOTION for Judgment filed by VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC..Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Memo in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(MACORETTA, JOHN) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT REOPEN AND REMOVE THE ABOVE-REFERENCED ACTIONS FROM THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/4/2013. 9/4/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE: Telephone Conference (re: settlement) held on 8/28/2013. (ems) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING held on 8/8/2013 before Judge MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. Court Reporter: ESR.. (tomg, ) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RE: ALL MATTERS RELATED TO SETTLEMENT AND POSSIBLY SCHEDULING OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 8/28/2013 04:30 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. COUNSEL FOR CEPHALON IS DIRECTED TO INITIATE THIS CALL AND TO DIAL/CONNECT CHAMBERS (PH: 267-299-7790) INTO THE CALL ONCE ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE AND READY TO PROCEED.(lds, ) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 1/3/2014., MOTIONS FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION DUE BY 3/21/2014., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 1/24/2014, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/14/2013. 8/15/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OR COMPEL DISCLOSURE FILED BY THE PLAINTIFFS ARE DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/5/2013.8/5/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint Discovery Plan and Proposed Schedule by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., CEPHALON, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY) Modified on 8/1/2013 (md). (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Final Pretrial Scheduling Order by VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to the Court)(MACORETTA, JOHN) Modified on 8/1/2013 (md). (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/11/13 before Judge GOLDBERG. Court Reporter: STEPHEN SONNIE. STATUS HEARING (jl, ) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT COUNSEL SHALL CONFER AND SUBMIT TO THE COURT, WITHIN 20 DAYS, A JOINT DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING PLAN THAT INCLUDES THE FOLLOWING LISTED IN THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/11/2013. 7/12/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG: Status Conference held on 7/11/2013. Court Reporter: ESR. (tomg, ) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT A STATUS CONFERENCE WITH COUNSEL WILL BE HELD ON THURSDAY, 7/11/2013 AT 2:00 P.M., IN A COURTROOM TO BE DETERMINED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/24/2013. 6/25/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 219 MOTION to Preclude Evidence or Compel Disclosure of Cephalon Documents and Certificate of Service filed by CEPHALON, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Preclude Evidence or Compel Disclosure of Cephalon Documents filed by VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC..Certificate of Service.(MACORETTA, JOHN) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT (Joint) by CEPHALON, INC.. (GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT THE ABOVE MATTERS SHALL BE PLACED IN SUSPENSE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MARK THESE MATTERS CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/29/2012. 8/29/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE: AND NOW, THIS 25TH DAY OF JULY, 2012, IN LIGHT OF THE RECENT DECISION BY THE UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE THIRD CIRCUIT IN IN RE K-DUR ANTITRUST LITIGATION, NOS. 10-2077, 10-2078, AND 10-2079, A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 2:00 P.M., TUESDAY, AUGUST 7, 2012. COUNSEL FOR CEPHALON SHALL INITIATE THE CONFERENCE CALL PRIOR TO CALLING CHAMBERS. ONLY ONE (1) COUNSEL EACH FOR THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS, END PAYOR PLAINTIFFS, APOTEX, THE FTC, CEPHALON AND THE GENERIC DEFENDANTS MAY PARTICIPATE. NO WRITTEN SUBMISSIONS WILL BE ACCEPTED IN ADVANCE OF THE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. (CJL) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by ROBERT J. GUNTHER, JR(GUNTHER, ROBERT) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/12/12 before Judge GOLDBERG. Court Reporter: STEVE SONNIE. STATUS CONFERENCE (jl, ) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR APPLICATION OF COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL (DOC. #199) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 4/12/2012.4/13/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE: AND NOW, THIS 9TH DAY OF APRIL, 2012, A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 11:00 A.M., THURSDAY, APRIL 12, 2012. COUNSEL FOR CEPHALON SHALL INITIATE THE CONFERENCE CALL PRIOR TO CALLING CHAMBERS. ONLY ONE (1) COUNSEL EACH FOR THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS, END PAYOR PLAINTIFFS, APOTEX, THE FTC, CEPHALON AND THE GENERIC DEFENDANTS MAY PARTICIPATE. (CJL) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Preclude Defts From Relitigating Issues Relating to the Validity and Enforceability of the Re'516 Patent (tomg, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT THTE MOTION (DOC. #206) IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FILE EXHIBIT A TO THIS ORDER AS PLAINTIFFS' REPLY BRIEF. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/29/2012;3/30/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) Modified on 4/2/2012 (tomg, ). (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Generic Defts' Sur-Reply Brief In Opposition To Plaintiffs Preclusion Motions (tomg, ) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT THE GENERIC DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS PRECLUSION MOTIONS IS GRANTED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/29/2012;3/29/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Leave to File A Sur-Reply Brief In Opposition To Plaintiffs Preclusion Motions filed by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Sur-Reply Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(SPILLMAN, C.) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File A Reply In Support Of Their Motion to Preclude Defendants From Relitigating Issues Relating To The Validity And Unenforceability Of The Re'516 Patent filed by DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, SHIRLEY PANEBIANO, PENNSYLVANIA EMPLOYEES BENEFIT TRUST FUND, PENNSYLVANIA TURNPIKE COMMISSION, VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MELTZER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 199 MOTION for Application of Collateral Estoppel filed by CEPHALON, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 199 MOTION for Application of Collateral Estoppel filed by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(SKIDMORE, GREGORY) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY L. KODROFF on behalf of DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, PENNSYLVANIA EMPLOYEES BENEFIT TRUST FUND with Certificate of Service(KODROFF, JEFFREY) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by THEODORE M. LIEVERMAN on behalf of DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, PENNSYLVANIA EMPLOYEES BENEFIT TRUST FUND(LIEVERMAN, THEODORE) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by MARY ANN GIORNO on behalf of DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, PENNSYLVANIA EMPLOYEES BENEFIT TRUST FUND with Certificate of Service(GIORNO, MARY) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order filed by DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, SHIRLEY PANEBIANO, PENNSYLVANIA EMPLOYEES BENEFIT TRUST FUND, PENNSYLVANIA TURNPIKE COMMISSION, VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC..Proposed Order.(MELTZER, JOSEPH) Modified on 1/24/2012 (nd, ). (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Application of Collateral Estoppel filed by DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, SHIRLEY PANEBIANO, PENNSYLVANIA EMPLOYEES BENEFIT TRUST FUND, PENNSYLVANIA TURNPIKE COMMISSION, VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law)(MELTZER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT Letter to Judge Goldberg by VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC.. (MACORETTA, JOHN) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CEPHALON, INC..(GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE ANY MOTIONS REQUESTING THAT THE COURT'S 10/31/2011 OPINION REGARDING THAT RE'516 PATENT IN APOTEX V. CEPHALON, DKT. NO. 2:06-CV-2768, BE GIVEN PRECLUSIVE EFFECT AGAINST THE DEFTS IN THE IN THE ANTITRUST CLAIMS ON OR BEFORE 1/20/2012, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/8/2011. 12/12/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE: AND NOW, THIS 2ND DAY OF DECEMBER, 2011, THE STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, DECEMBER 6, 2011 AT 10:30 A.M. WILL BE HEARD IN COURTROOM 11B. (CJL ) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE: AND NOW, THIS 1ST DAY OF DECEMBER, 2011, THE STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, DECEMBER 6, 2011, WILL BEGIN AT 10:30 A.M., AND NO 9:30 A.M.(CJL) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by CEPHALON, INC.. (GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (SKIDMORE, GREGORY) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, SHIRLEY PANEBIANO, PENNSYLVANIA EMPLOYEES BENEFIT TRUST FUND, PENNSYLVANIA TURNPIKE COMMISSION, VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC.. (MELTZER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by W. ROSS FOOTE on behalf of BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC., J M SMITH CORPORATION, KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC.(FOOTE, W.) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT A STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 12/6/2011 AT 9:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG (COURTROOM TO BE DETERMINED). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/8/2011. 11/9/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(md) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT AVMED, INC.'S CLAIMS BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, WITH EACH PARTY BEARING ITS RESPECTIVE COSTS, INCLUDING ATTORNEYS' FEES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/8/2011. 9/8/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ems) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal by AVMED, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(GRIFFITH, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT THE COURT'S 3/8/11, AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER IS VACATED. UPON ISSUANCE OF THE COURT'S DECISIONS IN 06-2768, THE COURT WILL SCHEDULE A CONFERENCE WITH COUNSEL TO DISCUSS SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILING DEADLINES, PAGE LIMITS. THE FOURTEEN MOTIONS LISTED ABOVE ARE DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/23/2011.8/24/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Expedite (Uncontested) Consideration of its Motion to File Consolidated Summary Judgment Briefing filed by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service.(SKIDMORE, GREGORY) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Summary Judgment Briefing filed by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(SKIDMORE, GREGORY) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Expedite (Uncontested) Consideration of its Motion for Leave to File Two Consolidated Summary Judgment Briefs filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service.(GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Two Consolidated Summary Judgment Briefs filed by CEPHALON, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF WILLIAM R. RESTIS, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/9/2011. 8/9/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. Withdrawal of Appearance of Bethany Marvin Stevens (GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF MARY J. EDWARDS, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/5/2011.8/8/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION of (WILLIAM R. RESTIS) filed by (JEFFREY R. KRINSK), certificate of service. (FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE047620) (tomg, ) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Mary J. Edwards, Esquire filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service.(GELLMAN, NANCY)(FEE PAID, $40, RECEIPT #047586) Modified on 8/8/2011 (amas). (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF EMILY R. WHELAN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/1/2011.8/2/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Emily R. Whelan, Esquire filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service. (FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE047244) (GELLMAN, NANCY) Modified on 8/1/2011 (tomg, ). (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF MOLLY GEISSENHAINER, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/12/2011.7/12/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Molly Geissenhainer, Esquire filed by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE046280) (O'MALLEY, JOHN) Modified on 7/13/2011 (tomg, ). (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT CASE #11-4053 SHALL BE CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE #06-1833 FOR ALL PURPOSES. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FORWARD ALL FILINGS IN #11-4053 TO #06-1833; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL AMEND THE CAPTIONED IN #06-1833 TO REFLECT ALL PARTIES AND ATTORNEYS OF RECORD IN #11-4053. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE #11-4053, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/28/2011. 6/29/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by AVMED, INC., DISTRICT COUNCIL 37 HEALTH & SECURITY PLAN, SHIRLEY PANEBIANO, PENNSYLVANIA EMPLOYEES BENEFIT TRUST FUND, PENNSYLVANIA TURNPIKE COMMISSION, VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC. Notice of Firm Name Change (MELTZER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ELIZABETH M. RYAN on behalf of CEPHALON, INC.(RYAN, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE: AND NOW, THIS 15TH DAY OF MARCH, 2011, A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE REGARDING THE DISCOVERY DISPUTE ON RULE 30(b)(6)DEPOSITION TOPICS IS SCHEDULED FOR FRIDAY, MARCH 18, 2011, AT 10:00 A.M. E.S.T. COUNSEL FOR THE END PAYOR PLAINTIFFS SHALL INITIATE THE CONFERENCE CALL PRIOR TO CALLING CHAMBERS. ONLY ONE (1) COUNSEL EACH FOR THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS, END PAYOR PLAINTIFFS, APOTEX, THE FTC, CEPHALON AND THE GENERIC DEFENDANTS MAY PARTICIPATE.(CJL) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT FOR ALL SEALED MOTIONS AND DOCUMENTS, COUNSEL SHALL FILE A REDACTED COPY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF. COUNSEL SHALL THEN SEND ONE UNREDACTED COPY TO CHAMBERS ONLY, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/10/2011. 3/10/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER THAT APOTEX, INC. MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF THE EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINE IN ALL COORDINATED PROVIGIL ANTITRST CASES IS GRANTED. PARAGRAPHS 10-11 AND 13-14 OF THE COURT'S 4/26/10, SCHEDULING ORDER ARE VACATED. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 9/9/11; ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/8/2011. 3/8/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF MICHAEL G. MCLELLAN, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/7/2011. 2/9/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jcab) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION for admission of MICHAEL MCLELLAN, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Sponsor's Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC. (Filing Fee Received, Receipt # 037156) (jcab) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF VINCENT E. VERROCCHIO, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/4/2011.1/5/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Vincent E. Verrocchio filed by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..Certificate of Service.(O'MALLEY, JOHN) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE CONSUMER PARTY PLAINTIFF IS GRANTED. DEBRA LANGAN IS GRANTED LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS A PARTY PLAINTIFF AND PUTATIVE CLASS REPRESENTATIVE AND SHIRLEY PANEBIANO IS GRANTED LEAVE TO PARTICIPATE IN THIS ACTION, IN SUBSTITUTION THEREOF.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/14/2010.12/15/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Substitute Party End-Payor Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Substitute Consumer Party Plaintiff filed by VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LIEVERMAN, THEODORE) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF YIN ZHOU, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/9/2010.12/10/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ELIZABETH M. RYAN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/9/2010.12/10/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Yin Zhou, Esquire filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service.(FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE034169)(GELLMAN, NANCY) Modified on 12/10/2010 (tomg, ). (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth M. Ryan, Esquire filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service.(FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT #PPE034169)(GELLMAN, NANCY) Modified on 12/10/2010 (tomg, ). (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by KENDALL SCOTT ZYLSTRA on behalf of AVMED, INC.(ZYLSTRA, KENDALL) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to the Court by VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC.. (LIEVERMAN, THEODORE) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT THE JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DISCOVERY COORDINATION ORDER ARE GRANTED AND THE TERMS OF EXHIBIT A TO THOSE MOTIONS, "PROPOSED JOINT DISCOVERY COORDINATION ORDER" ARE ADOPTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/31/10. (Attachments: # 1 JOINT DISCOVERY)9/2/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kk, ) (Main Document 154 replaced on 9/2/2010) (kk, ). (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery Coordination Order filed by CEPHALON, INC... (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A - Proposed Joint Coordination Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JOHN ROBERT ROBERTSON on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION(ROBERTSON, JOHN) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ROBERT C. GRIFFITH, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/24/2010. 6/25/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF SARAH CHOI, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/18/2010.6/25/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION by AVMED, INC. FOR ROBERT GRIFFITH TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (FEE PAID) (jl, ) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Sarah Choi, Esquire filed by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..Certificate of Service.(O'MALLEY, JOHN) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO: Settlement Conference held on 6/17/2010. (tomg, ) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT ALL COUNSEL SHALL REPORT BACK TO THE UNDERSIGNED NO LATER THAN 11/12/10 WITH AN UPDATE AS WHEN SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS SHOULD RECONVENE; ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 6/18/2010. 6/18/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT IN AN EFFORT TO MINIMIZE THE AMOUNT OF DOWN TIME FOR COUNSEL THE PARTIES SHALL APPEAR IN COURTROOM 3I WITH THE FOLLOWING SCHEDULE OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 6/14/2010. 6/15/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT THE END PAYOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND IS DENIED; END PAYOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/27/2010.5/28/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT of END-PAYOR Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration and for leave to file a second amended consolidated complaint(tomg, ) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF (DOC. #141) IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FILE PAGES 3-11 OF DOCUMENT NUMBER 141 AS PLAINTIFFS' REPLY MEMORANDUM.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/10/2010.5/12/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(tomg, ) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in support of Motion for Reconsideration and for Leave to File Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by VISTA HEALTHPLAN, INC..Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(LIEVERMAN, THEODORE) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint 74 Amended Complaint, RANBAXY'S AMENDED ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AVMED, INC. by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (BALDRIDGE, J.) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint 75 Amended Complaint, by MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (SPILLMAN, C.) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint of Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint of End-Payors by MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(SPILLMAN, C.) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RANBAXY'S ANSWER TO AVMED'S AMENDED COMPLAINT ANSWER to 74 Amended Complaint, by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(BALDRIDGE, J.) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant Mylan Inc.'s ANSWER to 74 Amended Complaint, by MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(SPILLMAN, C.) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant Mylan Inc.'s ANSWER to 75 Amended Complaint, by MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(SPILLMAN, C.) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RANBAXY'S ANSWER TO AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION, COMPLAINT OF END-PAYORS ANSWER to 75 Amended Complaint, by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(BALDRIDGE, J.) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 114 MOTION for Reconsideration MOTION for Leave to File of Generic Defendants filed by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (SKIDMORE, GREGORY) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 74 Amended Complaint, of Avmed by BARR LABORATORIES, INC..(SKIDMORE, GREGORY) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 1,136 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?