Segal et al v. Firtash et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-07818
District Judge Richard J. Sullivan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 17, 2017 at 11:13 PM EDT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Dancroft Holdings, Plaintiff
No Logo Ilya Segal, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hodgson Russ LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Paul Goldberg +1 212 751 4300 +1 212 751 0928 jgoldberg@hodgsonruss.com
No Logo Vadim Segal, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Firtash, Dmitry, Defendant
Officially listed as "Dmitry Firtash"
No Logo Open Joint Stock Company Commercial Bank Nadra, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Connon Wood Scheidemantle LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Arnold de By +1 626 638 1762 +1 626 792 9304 rdeby@connonwood.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen M Wood +1 626 389 3845 kwood@connonwood.com
No Logo Public Joint Stock Company Commercial Bank Nadra, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court.. Document filed by Dancroft Holdings, Ilya Segal, Vadim Segal. (Goldberg, Joseph) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
    DECLARATION of Vadim Segal in Support re: 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court.. Document filed by Dancroft Holdings, Ilya Segal, Vadim Segal. (Goldberg, Joseph) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
      DECLARATION of Michael Hawkins in Support re: 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court.. Document filed by Dancroft Holdings, Ilya Segal, Vadim Segal. (Goldberg, Joseph) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
        DECLARATION of Andriy Kovalevskiy in Opposition re: 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court.. Document filed by Public Joint Stock Company Commercial Bank Nadra. (Wood, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Request to Take Judicial Notice of Official Public Records of the Government of Cyprus in Support of Defendant Nadra Bank's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand re: 25 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion. Document filed by Public Joint Stock Company Commercial Bank Nadra. (Wood, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court.. Document filed by Public Joint Stock Company Commercial Bank Nadra. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Olga Zalomiy)(Wood, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court.. Document filed by Dancroft Holdings, Ilya Segal, Vadim Segal. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Case Law Appendix)(Goldberg, Joseph) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                DECLARATION of Joseph P. Goldberg in Support re: 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court.. Document filed by Dancroft Holdings, Ilya Segal, Vadim Segal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Goldberg, Joseph) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                  DECLARATION of Vadim Segal in Support re: 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court.. Document filed by Dancroft Holdings, Ilya Segal, Vadim Segal. (Goldberg, Joseph) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                    MOTION to Remand to State Court. Document filed by Dancroft Holdings, Ilya Segal, Vadim Segal.(Goldberg, Joseph) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 19 Letter filed by Public Joint Stock Company Commercial Bank Nadra. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant shall not be required to answer or move against Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 18) until 14 days after the Court resolves the remand motion. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/25/2013) (tn) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Robert A. de By dated 11/25/2013 re: Clarification of November 19, 2013 Order. Document filed by Public Joint Stock Company Commercial Bank Nadra.(Wood, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 18 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against Public Joint Stock Company Commercial Bank Nadra. Document filed by Ilya Segal, Dancroft Holdings, Vadim Segal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (tn) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiffs shall submit their motion to remand no later than December 20, 20 13. 2. Bank Nadra shall respond, if at all, no later than January 10, 2014. 3. Plaintiffs shall reply, if at all, no later than January 31, 2014.Bank Nadra shall not file its contemplated motion to dismiss until the resolution of the motion to remand. ( Motions due by 12/20/2013., Responses due by 1/10/2014, Replies due by 1/31/2014.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/19/2013) (js) Modified on 11/21/2013 (js). (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Joseph P. Goldberg dated 11/18/2013 re: Vadim Segal, Ilya Segal, and Dancroft Holdings v. Firtash et al. (13 Civ. 7818 (RJS) (SN). Document filed by Dancroft Holdings, Ilya Segal, Vadim Segal.(Goldberg, Joseph) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                              FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE of Filing of Amended Complaint. Document filed by Dancroft Holdings, Ilya Segal, Vadim Segal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Goldberg, Joseph) Modified on 11/19/2013 (ka). (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Document filed by Dancroft Holdings, Ilya Segal, Vadim Segal.(Goldberg, Joseph) Modified on 11/19/2013 (ka). (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                  FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Dancroft Holdings.(Goldberg, Joseph) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Paul Goldberg on behalf of Dancroft Holdings, Ilya Segal, Vadim Segal. (Goldberg, Joseph) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Filing Original Certificate of Service re Nadra Bank's Pre-Motion Letter and Court Order Thereof. Document filed by Open Joint Stock Company Commercial Bank Nadra. (Wood, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Bank Nadra shall serve Plaintiffs with copies of its pre-motion letter and this Order no later than November 13, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT counsel for Plaintiffs shall file Notices of Appearance with the Court no later than November 15, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs shall file a pre-motion letter in response to Bank Nadra's pre-motion letter no later than November 18, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs shall file any Amended Complaint no later than November 18, 2013. ( Amended Pleadings due by 11/18/2013.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/8/2013) (mro) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Service re Notices of Appearance; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Request to Take Judicial Notice and Declaration and Expert Opinion on Ukrainian Law on Plaintiffs' Counsel by U.S. Mail. Document filed by Open Joint Stock Company Commercial Bank Nadra. (Wood, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Centragas Holding GmbH for Open Joint Stock Company Commercial Bank Nadra. Document filed by Open Joint Stock Company Commercial Bank Nadra.(Wood, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Related Documents served on Plaintiffs Ilya Segal, Vadim Segal, and Dancroft Holdings on 11/4/2013. Service was accepted by Joseph P. Goldberg, Partner, on behalf of himself, Robert J. Fluskey, Jr., Partner, and Kathryn A. Tiskus, Associate, of Hodgson Russ LLP, Counsel for Plaintiffs. Document filed by Open Joint Stock Company Commercial Bank Nadra. (Wood, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                DECLARATION of Prof. Oleksandr Merezhko. Document filed by Open Joint Stock Company Commercial Bank Nadra. (Wood, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Request to Take Judicial Notice of Official Public Records; Declaration of Kathleen M. Wood in Support Thereof re: 1 Notice of Removal. Document filed by Open Joint Stock Company Commercial Bank Nadra. (Wood, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                    FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Open Joint Stock Company Commercial Bank Nadra.(Wood, Kathleen) Modified on 11/5/2013 (lb). (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Arnold de By on behalf of Open Joint Stock Company Commercial Bank Nadra. (de By, Robert) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathleen M. Wood on behalf of Open Joint Stock Company Commercial Bank Nadra. (Wood, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 652512-2013. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401080566).Document filed by Open Joint Stock Company Commercial Bank Nadra.(msa)(Main Document 1 replaced on 11/5/2013) (msa). Modified on 11/5/2013 (msa). (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 434 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?