Howard Town Center Developer v. Howard University
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 14-7029

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3230 - Real Property: Rent Lease Ejectment
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207609695 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1501726] filed by Castlerock Partners, LLC and Howard Town Center Developer, LLC in 13-7198, 14-7029 [Service Date: 07/09/2014 ] Length of Brief: 6,988 Words. [13-7198, 14-7029] (Schmidtlein, John)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207605483 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
    APPELLEE BRIEF [1499517] filed by Howard University in 13-7198, 14-7029 [Service Date: 06/26/2014 ] Length of Brief: 10,991 words. [13-7198, 14-7029] (McCormack, Timothy)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207596660 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
      JOINT APPENDIX [1494542] filed by Castlerock Partners, LLC and Howard Town Center Developer, LLC in 13-7198, 14-7029. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 05/27/2014 ] [13-7198, 14-7029] (Schmidtlein, John)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207596649 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
        APPELLANT BRIEF [1494539] filed by Castlerock Partners, LLC and Howard Town Center Developer, LLC in 13-7198, 14-7029 [Service Date: 05/27/2014 ] Length of Brief: 12,240 Words. [13-7198, 14-7029] (Schmidtlein, John)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207587466 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE FILED [1489394] by Castlerock Partners, LLC and Howard Town Center Developer, LLC in 13-7198, 14-7029 to substitute attorney Glenn C. Etelson substituted by John E. Schmidtlein, Kenneth C. Smurzynski, and Masha G. Hansford [Service Date: 04/22/2014 ] [13-7198, 14-7029] (Hansford, Masha)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207585636 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
            CLERK'S ORDER filed [1488410] setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 05/27/2014. APPENDIX due 05/27/2014. APPELLEE Brief due on 06/26/2014. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 07/10/2014 [13-7198, 14-7029]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207579903 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
              CLERK'S ORDER filed [1485270] consolidating cases 14-7029 (Consolidation started 03/25/2014) with 13-7198 [13-7198, 14-7029]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207577175 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1483784] by Castlerock Partners, LLC and Howard Town Center Developer, LLC seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:13-cv-01075-BAH. Assigned USCA Case Number [14-7029]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 47 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?