HDNet, LLC v. Hambrecht et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-00061
District Judge Reed C O'Connor, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 12, 2016 at 6:08 AM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

HDNet, LLC HDNet, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Farney And Daniels

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Michael Brett Johnson +1 512 582 2828 +1 512 582 2829 bjohnson@farneydaniels.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing J Kristopher Long +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 klong@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Thomas M Melsheimer +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 melsheimer@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing John CC Sanders, Jr. +1 214 760 6160 +1 214 747 2091 jbs@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Scott Cashion Thomas +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 sthomas@fr.com
v.
No Logo The Hambrecht 1980 Revocable Trust, Defendant
No Logo William Hambrecht, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing David H Harper +1 214 651 5247 +1 214 200 0463 david.harper@haynesboone.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Michelle C Jacobs +1 214 651 5000 +1 214 651 5940 michelle.jacobs@haynesboone.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing John William Turner +1 214 651 5671 john.turner@haynesboone.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT: All writs and processes for the enforcement and collection of this judgment or the costs of court may issue as necessary. All relief requested in this case and not expressly granted is denied. This judgment finally disposes of all parties and claims and is appealable. (Ordered by Judge Reed C O'Connor on 10/5/2012) (ctf) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 9 Motion to Enter Agreed Final Judgment. Plaintiff's 16 request for hearing filed 10/4/2012 is moot. (Ordered by Judge Reed C O'Connor on 10/5/2012) (ctf) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
      MOTION for Hearing HDNet's Request for Hearing on Motion for Entry of Agreed Final Judgment [Doc. No. 9] filed by HDNet, LLC (Melsheimer, Thomas) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
        REPLY filed by HDNet, LLC re: 9 Agreed MOTION to Enter Agreed Final Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
          OBJECTION filed by William Hambrecht, The Hambrecht 1980 Revocable Trust re: 13 Notice (Other) (Turner, John) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Revised Proposed Order Regarding Motion to Enter Agreed Final Judgment filed by HDNet, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Revised) (Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
            OBJECTION filed by William Hambrecht, The Hambrecht 1980 Revocable Trust re: 9 Agreed MOTION to Enter Agreed Final Judgment (Turner, John) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John W Turner for David Harper, John Turner and Michelle Jacobs on behalf of William Hambrecht, The Hambrecht 1980 Revocable Trust. (Turner, John) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                MOTION to Lift Stay filed by HDNet LLC re 7 Order on Motion to Stay. (Thomas, Scott) Modified text and linkage on 4/25/2012 (axm). (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                  Agreed MOTION to Enter Agreed Final Judgment filed by HDNet LLC (Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                    ***DISREGARD PER ATTORNEY, INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED*** MOTION Lift Stay re 6 Agreed MOTION to Stay filed by HDNet, LLC (Thomas, Scott) Modified on 4/25/2012 (axm). (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 6 Agreed Motion to Stay. This case is stayed until 10/1/2012, or such earlier time as determined by the Court. It is further ORDERED that on or before 10/11/2012, the parties shall file an agreed motion for dismissal or an agreed judgment. (Ordered by Judge Reed C O'Connor on 10/28/2011) (aaa) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                        Agreed MOTION to Stay Plaintiff HD Net, LLC & Defendants William Hambrecht and The Hambrecht 1980 Revocable Trust filed by HDNet, LLC, William Hambrecht, and The Hambrecht 1980 Revocable Trust(Thomas, Scott) Modified Filers on 10/28/2011 (egb). (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff file a motion for default or voluntarily dismiss the non-appearing parties on or before Wednesday 10/26/2011. (Ordered by Judge Reed C O'Connor on 9/26/2011) (skt) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                            SUMMONS Returned Executed as to William Hambrecht; served on 2/8/2011. (skt) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                              Summons Issued as to William Hambrecht. (mpw) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HDNet, LLC. (Johnson, M) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by HDNet, LLC. Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (Filing fee $350; Receipt number 0539-3665003) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Cover Sheet) (Johnson, M) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Space Space

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 102 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?