UPMC Mercy v. Kathleen Sebelius
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 11-5204

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 10, 2016 at 1:34 PM EDT (5.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Nature of Suit 2151 - Contract: Medicare Act Overpay
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207335955 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
CLERK'S ORDER filed [1346209] granting motion to dismiss case voluntarily [1345209-2]. The Clerk is directed to transmit forthwith to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia a certified copy of this order in lieu of formal mandate [11-5204]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207334037 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
    MOTION filed [1345209] by Kathleen Sebelius to dismiss case voluntarily (Response to Motion served by mail due on 12/15/2011) [Service Date: 12/01/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [11-5204] (Gilbert, Helen)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207324021 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      CLERK'S ORDER filed [1339623] scheduling oral argument before Judges ROGERS, TATEL, BROWN Thursday, 02/16/2012 AM [11-5204]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207319398 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
        CLERK'S ORDER filed [1336852] setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 12/02/2011. Appendix due 12/02/2011. APPELLEE Brief due on 01/03/2012. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 01/17/2012 [11-5204]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207306462 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
          STATEMENT FILED [1329024] by UPMC Mercy with Disclosure Listing [Service Date: 09/12/2011 ] [11-5204] (Nash, Stephen)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207306456 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
            ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1329022] by Stephen P. Nash; Sven C. Collins on behalf of Appellee UPMC Mercy. [11-5204] (Nash, Stephen)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207306453 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
              CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1329021] by UPMC Mercy [Service Date: 09/12/2011 ] [11-5204] (Nash, Stephen)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207306351 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1328979] to certificate [1328965-2], statement [1328966-2], statement [1328969-2], report status of transcript (final) [1328971-2], record [1328976-2] filed by Kathleen Sebelius. [11-5204] (Gilbert, Helen)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207306344 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                  UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1328976] by Kathleen Sebelius [Service Date: 09/12/2011 ] [11-5204] (Gilbert, Helen)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207306333 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                    TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1328971] by Kathleen Sebelius [Service Date: 09/12/2011 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [11-5204] (Gilbert, Helen)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207306327 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                      STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1328969] by Kathleen Sebelius [Service Date: 09/12/2011 ] [11-5204] (Gilbert, Helen)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207306319 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                        DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1328966] by Kathleen Sebelius [Service Date: 09/12/2011 ] [11-5204] (Gilbert, Helen)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207306316 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                          CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1328965] by Kathleen Sebelius [Service Date: 09/12/2011 ] [11-5204] (Gilbert, Helen)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207300186 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                            NOTICE FILED [1325530] by UPMC Mercy to withdraw attorney John R. Sharp who represented UPMC Mercy in 11-5204 [Service Date: 08/16/2011 ] [11-5204]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207298269 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                              ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1324397] by Helen L. Gilbert and co-counsel Michael S. Raab on behalf of Appellant Kathleen Sebelius. [11-5204] (Gilbert, Helen)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207297446 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                CLERK'S ORDER filed [1323960] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 09/12/2011. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 09/12/2011. APPELLANT statement of issues due 09/12/2011. APPELLANT underlying decision due 09/12/2011. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 09/12/2011. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 09/12/2011. APPELLANT transcript status report due 09/12/2011. APPELLANT procedural motions due 09/12/2011. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 09/26/2011; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 09/12/2011. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 09/12/2011. APPELLEE procedural motions due 09/12/2011. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 09/26/2011 [11-5204]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207297441 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                  LETTER SENT [1323957] regarding attorney membership to John R. Sharp for UPMC Mercy. Application for Admission due 09/12/2011. [11-5204]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207297438 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                    LETTER SENT [1323956] regarding attorney membership to Sven Collins for UPMC Mercy. Application for Admission due 09/12/2011. [11-5204]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207297432 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1323954] by Kathleen Sebelius seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:09-cv-01286-HHK. Assigned USCA Case Number [11-5204]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 165 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?