Richard Gale v. First Franklin Loan Services, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 13-15656

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 16, 2016 at 1:07 AM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3371 - TORTS-Truth in Lending
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: ME): The court has received appellee EC Closing Corp.’s (f/k/a Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp.) notice of bankruptcy filing. This case is stayed as to the noted appellee. 11 U.S.C. § 362(a). On or before March 3, 2014, and every 120 days thereafter, appellee EC Closing Corp. shall file a status report regarding its bankruptcy proceedings, including, if applicable, whether proceedings with Gale’s appeal in this case violates U.S.C. § 362(a). [8846043] (ME)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
    Filed original and 7 copies of Appellant Richard S. Gale (Informal: Yes) reply brief of 11 pages. Served on 10/23/2013. [8837838] (LA)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
      Received Appellee EC Closing Corp notice of suggestion bankruptcy. [8820913]--[Edited 10/28/2013 by JFF] (JFF)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
        Streamlined request by Appellant Richard S. Gale to extend time to file the reply brief is approved. The reply brief is due October 25, 2013. [8795289] [13-15656] (AT)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
          Filed clerk order: The answering brief [6] submitted by appellees is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [7] submitted by appellees. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [8781375] (LA)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
            Filed (ECF) Appellees First Franklin Financial Corporation, First Franklin Loan Services, LaSalle Bank National Association and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. Motion to take judicial notice of Appellant's Replacement Opening Brief. Date of service: 09/13/2013. [8780981] (CBD)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
              Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellees First Franklin Financial Corporation, First Franklin Loan Services, LaSalle Bank National Association and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. Date of service: 09/12/2013. [8779280]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected excerpts. Resent NDA. 09/13/2013 by RY] (CBD)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 29 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?