NIEBUDEK, et al v. AIR PRODUCTS & CHEM, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 3:01-cv-04719
District Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 30, 2016 at 7:11 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DIANE NIEBUDEK, Plaintiff
No Logo THOMAS NIEBUDEK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PELLETTIERI, RABSTEIN & ALTMAN, ESQS.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS R. SMITH +1 609 520 0900 tsmith@pralaw.com
v.
No Logo ABC, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Dc Holdco Inc
Unknown Role, ABC Holding CO Inc.
No Logo Air Products & Chemicals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ANTHONY P. LAROCCO +1 973 848 4000 anthony.larocco@klgates.com
No Logo ALBERTUS ENGINEERING, Defendant
No Logo ALLEN-BRADLEY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Powell Trachtman Logan Carrle Bowman & Lomboardo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil P. Clain, Jr. +1 610 354 9700 +1 610 359 9760 nclain@powelltrachtman.com
No Logo Amsco Sales Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "AMSCO SALES CORP."
No Logo APPLIED CONTROLS, INC., Defendant
No Logo AUTOMATED CONTROL CONCEPTS, INC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by HERFORTH, MACDONALD & GALLICCHIO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT A. MCLARTY, JR. +1 973 630 6666 rmclarty@onebeacon.com
No Logo BERNHARD, INC.,, Defendant
No Logo BURLINGTON INSTRUMENT SERVICE;, Defendant
No Logo CEMTECH ENERGY CONTROLS, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by BORRELLE, SEARCH, DALMASS & LITTLE, ESQS.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHARLES A. LITTLE, JR. +1 856 642 9600 clittle@legal-org.com
No Logo DIDDY CONTRACTING INC.;, Defendant
No Logo FROMM ELECTRIC SUPPLY CORP., Defendant
No Logo GARNY MORRIS, INC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT GEORGE DEVINE +1 856 317 3600 deviner@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo Harold Beck & Sons, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 101

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo Hastings, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 101

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS A. SHOVLIN +1 856 627 1600 +1 856 232 3880 thomasashovlin@aol.com
No Logo HOAGANAES CORP., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by HILL WALLACK, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JULIE COLIN +1 609 734 6373 jcb@hillwallack.com
No Logo JENKINS ELECTRIC, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
No Logo M.A.C. EQUIPMENT CO, Defendant
No Logo North American Manufacturing Company,, Defendant
Officially listed as "NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO.,"
No Logo TRU TEMP SENSORS, INC.,, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Swartz Campbell LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEPHEN R DUMSER +1 856 727 4777 +1 856 727 0464
No Logo WEL-FAB, INC.;, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Travelers Indemnity Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BERNARD J. TKACZYNSKI +1 856 703 2130 +1 856 703 2156 btkaczyn@travelers.com
No Logo Air Products & Chemicals, Inc., Cross-Claimant
No Logo ALLEN-BRADLEY, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Powell, Trachtman, Logan, Carrle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a legal entity; Neil P. Clain, Jr. +1 610 354 9700 +1 610 359 9760 nclain@powelltrachtman.com
Space Neil P. Clain, Jr. +1 610 354 9700 +1 610 359 9760 nclain@powelltrachtman.com
No Logo AUTOMATED CONTROL CONCEPTS, INC, Cross-Claimant
No Logo GARNY MORRIS, INC, Cross-Claimant
No Logo Harold Beck & Sons, Inc., Cross-Claimant
No Logo Hastings, Cross-Claimant
No Logo HOAGANAES CORP., Cross-Claimant
No Logo TRU TEMP SENSORS, INC.,, Cross-Claimant
No Logo WEL-FAB, INC.;, Cross-Claimant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address by ROBERT GEORGE DEVINE (SA, ) (Entered: 03/31/2004)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
    Minute entry: Proceedings NOT recorded; Minutes of: 6/17/2; The following actions were taken, granting [23-1] motion to remand to Mercer Co. by pltfs; terminating [20-1] notice. By Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr. (eh) (Entered: 06/18/2002)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting [23-1] dispositive motion to remand to Mercer Co. by pltfs and consolidating with UNLEY v. AIR PRODUCTS, ET AL., CAM-L-1331-2 for purposes of trial. (signed by Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr.) (NM) (ij) (Entered: 06/17/2002)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: None
        STATEMENT by AUTOMATED CONTROL for a request of amount of damages claimed. (ij) (Entered: 06/07/2002)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: None
          ANSWER to complaint; jury demand, CROSSCLAIM & Answer to Crossclaims by AUTOMATED CONTROL (ij) (Entered: 06/07/2002)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None
            CERTIFICATION of THOMAS R. SMITH on behalf of pltfs in support Re: [23-1] motion to remand (eh) (Entered: 05/23/2002)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None
              CERTIFICATION of THOMAS R. SMITH on behalf of pltfs re: no opposition to [23-1] motion to remand (eh) (Entered: 05/23/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None
                Notice of MOTION to remand to Mercer Co. by pltfs . Motion set for 10:00 6/17/02 on [20-1] notice & [23-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (eh) (Entered: 05/23/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None
                  ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT; answer to crossclaims; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by ALLEN BRADLEY (eh) (Entered: 05/21/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: None
                    ANSWER to Complaint by CEMTCH ENERGY CONT; jury demand (ij) (Entered: 05/08/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: None
                      Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion to remand by pltfs. (ij) (Entered: 05/14/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: None
                        ANSWER to complaint; jury demand, ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIMS and CROSSCLAIM by WEL-FAB, INC. (ij) (Entered: 05/08/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: None
                          ANSWER to amended complaint; jury demand, ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIMS and CROSSCLAIM by GARNY MORRIS, INC (ij) (Entered: 05/07/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of attorney appearance for GARNY MORRIS, INC by ROBERT GEORGE DEVINE. (eh) (Entered: 04/22/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/17/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                              SCHEDULING ORDER setting Teleconference 3:30 7/1/02. (signed by Mag. Judge Freda L. Wolfson) (NM) (eh) (Entered: 04/17/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: None
                                ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by HASTINGS (ij) (Entered: 04/12/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: None
                                  ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by HAROLD BECK & SONS (eh) (Entered: 04/08/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: None
                                    DEMAND for jury trial by ALLEN BRADLEY (ij) (Entered: 04/05/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of attorney appearance for ALLEN BRADLEY by NEIL P. CLAIN (ij) (Entered: 04/05/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: None
                                        ANSWER by HOAGANAES CORP. to [8-1] amended complaint; jury demand CROSSCLAIM & Answer to CROSSCLAIMS. (ij) (Entered: 04/05/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: None
                                          LETTER request by pltfs requesting issuance of summons as to all named dfts except: AIR PRODUCTS & CHEM, HOAGANAES CORP. (DH) Modified on 03/26/2002 (Entered: 03/26/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: None
                                            ANSWER by AIR PRODUCTS & CHEM to amended complaint; crossclaims and answer to crossclaims; jury demand (eh) (Entered: 03/13/2002)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None
                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT by pltfs, amending [1-1] complaint adding NORTH AMERICAN MANU, AUTOMATED CONTROL, FROMM ELECTRIC SUPP, M.A.C. EQUIPMENT BERNHARD, INC., APPLIED CONTROLS, IN, GARNY MORRIS, INC, HAROLD BECK & SONS, CEMTCH ENERGY CONT, WEL-FAB, INC., ALBERTUS ENGINEERING, BURLINGTON INSTRU, DIDDY JENKINS ELECTRIC, TRU TEMP SENSORS, IN, ALLEN BRADLEY, HASTINGS, AMSCO SALES CORP. and jury demand. (ij) (Entered: 02/26/2002)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                SCHEDULING ORDER setting Teleconference 2:30 4/16/02. (signed by Mag. Judge Freda L. Wolfson) (NM) (eh) (Entered: 02/08/2002)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                  ANSWER to complaint; answer to crossclaims; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by HOAGANAES CORP. (eh) (Entered: 01/24/2002)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/21/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 9/30/02; Joining of Parties 3/22/02; Amending of pleadings on 5/24/02; Discovery Motion due on or before 8/23/02; Dispositive Motion due on or before 9/13/02; Teleconference 2:30 2/5/02; and setting schedule for service of certain reports. (signed by Mag. Judge Freda L. Wolfson) (NM) (eh) Modified on 11/29/2001 (Entered: 11/21/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER set scheduling conference 11:00 11/20/01 (signed by Mag. Judge Freda L. Wolfson) (nm) (DH) Modified on 10/12/2001 (Entered: 10/12/2001)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. (Trenton-Hon. Garrett E. Brown) Magistrate Judge Freda L. Wolfson (nm) (DH) (Entered: 10/12/2001)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                          ANSWER to complaint and crossclaims; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by AIR PRODUCTS & CHEM (DH) (Entered: 10/12/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                            COMPLAINT as filed in Mercer County Superior Court on 9/7/01; docket# 01cv2868-L; jury demand (DH) (Entered: 10/12/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 227 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?