Tang v. Chertoff
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10231
District Judge Nancy Gertner, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 3:47 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: ATTORNEY'S FEES(gam) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
    Letter/request (non-motion) from Vard R. Johnson to Judge Gertner regarding pending motion for attorneys fees. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 21 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Supplemental Brief Discussing Impact of Aronov Decision filed by Michael Chertoff, Emilio Gonzalez, Paul Novak, Robert Mueller, III. (Donato, Christopher) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
        MEMORANDUM in Support re 21 First MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Yong Tang. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Johnson, Vard) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: None
          Opposition re 21 First MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Michael Chertoff, Emilio Gonzalez, Paul Novak, Robert Mueller, III. (Donato, Christopher) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: None
            First MOTION for Extension of Time to October 3, 2007 to File Response/Reply (Assented to by Counsel for Plaintiffs) by Michael Chertoff, Emilio Gonzalez, Paul Novak, Robert Mueller, III.(Donato, Christopher) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None
              MEMORANDUM in Support re 21 First MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Yong Tang. (Johnson, Vard) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None
                First MOTION for Attorney Fees by Yong Tang. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Yong Tang# 2 Affidavit Vard R. Johnson# 3 Exhibit CPI-Boston 1996# 4 Exhibit CPI-Boston-Current)(Johnson, Vard) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Judge Nancy Gertner : ORDER entered; ORDER DISMISSING CASE.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None
                    AFFIDAVIT of Peter R. Thomas, Adjudications Officer for the Vermont Service Center by Michael Chertoff, Emilio Gonzalez, Paul Novak, Robert Mueller, III. (Donato, Christopher) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Judge Nancy Gertner: AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: This Memorandum and Order replaces the one filed earlier today. Two changes have been made: This Memorandum has a full caption listing all defendants, and the ampersand has been replaced in the title. No other changes have been made.MEMORANDUM AND OPINION(MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Judge Nancy Gertner: Defendants Motion to Dismiss (document #9) is hereby DENIED. Defendants are ORDERED to adjudicate Tangs application for adjustment of status to permanent resident. Defendants shall file an Affidavit demonstrating compliance with this Order on or before August 6, 2007.(MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None
                          Second RESPONSE to Motion re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Yong Tang. (Johnson, Vard) (Entered: 06/06/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None
                            AFFIDAVIT in Support re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Donato, Christopher) (Entered: 06/05/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 14 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by all plaintiffs. (Johnson, Vard) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 30, 2007 to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Yong Tang.(Johnson, Vard) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Vard R. Johnson on behalf of Yan Luo (Johnson, Vard) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Vard R. Johnson on behalf of Yong Tang (Johnson, Vard) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None
                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by all defendants. (Donato, Christopher) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None
                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Michael Chertoff, Emilio Gonzalez, Paul Novak, Robert Mueller, III.(Donato, Christopher) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None
                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Chertoff, Emilio Gonzalez, Paul Novak, Robert Mueller, III , filed by Yan Luo, Yong Tang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Filo, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/03/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None
                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Attorney General of the United States with service made on 2/12/2007 by Yong Tang. (Filo, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None
                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Attorney with service made on 2/12/2007 by Yong Tang. (Filo, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yong Tang. Michael Chertoff (In official capacity only) served on 2/21/2007, answer due 4/23/2007. (Filo, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yong Tang. Emilio Gonzalez served on 2/12/2007, answer due 4/13/2007. (Filo, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yong Tang. Paul Novak served on 2/12/2007, answer due 4/13/2007. (Filo, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yong Tang. Robert Mueller, III served on 2/8/2007, answer due 4/9/2007. (Filo, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                        COMPLAINT against Michael Chertoff, Emilio Gonzalez, Paul Novak, Robert Mueller, III , filed by Yong Tang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits# 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 39 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?