Anderson et al v. The Fall River Housing Authority et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10131
District Judge George A. OToole, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 22, 2016 at 1:14 PM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jayne Kerns, Plaintiff
No Logo Loretta Anderson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Massachusetts Law Reform Institute

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/23/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy E. Copperman +1 617 357 0777

Toggle Switch Represented by NAVAL AIR WARFARE CENTER, AIRCRAFT DIV

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judith Liben +1 617 357 0777 jliben@mlri.org

Toggle Switch Represented by South Coastal Counties Legal Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip J. Kassel +1 508 586 2110 +1 508 587 3222
No Logo The Fall River Housing Joint Tenants Council, Plaintiff
No Logo The Massachusetts Coalition for the Homeless, Plaintiff
No Logo Vanessa Santiago, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Edward Lambert, Defendant
No Logo Robert Correia, Defendant
No Logo The City of Fall River, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuire & Coughlin PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas F. McGuire, Jr. +1 508 675 7896 +1 508 675 6595 tmcguire@meganet.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrissey, Wilson & Zafiropoulos, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kerry T. Ryan +1 781 353 5503 +1 781 356 5546 ktr@mwzllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NAVAL AIR WARFARE CENTER, AIRCRAFT DIV

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J. Coughlin +1 508 677 2800 +1 508 677 9300 jcoughlin@b-dlaw.com
No Logo The Fall River Housing Authority, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Curley & Curley PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S. BenEzra +1 617 523 2990 +1 617 523 7602 rsb@curleylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin J. Rooney +1 617 523 2990 +1 617 523 7602 mjr@curleylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James C. Wood +1 617 523 2990 jcw@curleylaw.com
No Logo Thomas Collins, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 443 - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations
  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Thomas Collins, The Fall River Housing Authority. (Rooney, Martin) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered. 90 DAY SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Lyness, Paul) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
      Joint MOTION to Continue status conference to May, 2012 by Loretta Anderson, Jayne Kerns, Vanessa Santiago, The Fall River Housing Joint Tenants Council, The Massachusetts Coalition for the Homeless.(Liben, Judith) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
        Joint MOTION to Continue status conference to January 19, 2011 by Loretta Anderson, Jayne Kerns, Vanessa Santiago, The Fall River Housing Joint Tenants Council, The Massachusetts Coalition for the Homeless.(Liben, Judith) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
          Joint MOTION to Continue status conference to mid-September by Loretta Anderson, Jayne Kerns, Vanessa Santiago, The Fall River Housing Joint Tenants Council, The Massachusetts Coalition for the Homeless.(Liben, Judith) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Amy E. Copperman (Copperman, Amy) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
              Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference to 3/22/2010 , 3/25/2010, 3/26/2010, 3/30/2010, or after 4/1/2010 by The Fall River Housing Authority.(BenEzra, Robert) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Wood on behalf of The Fall River Housing Authority, Thomas Collins (Wood, James) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None
                  Joint MOTION for Administrative Closing by The Massachusetts Coalition for the Homeless, The Fall River Housing Authority, Thomas Collins, Loretta Anderson, Jayne Kerns, Vanessa Santiago, The Fall River Housing Joint Tenants Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Agreement (MOA))(Copperman, Amy) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None
                    Opposition re 55 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by The Fall River Housing Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(BenEzra, Robert) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
                      MOTION to Certify Class stipulated by Loretta Anderson.(Kassel, Phillip) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by The Fall River Housing Authority.(BenEzra, Robert) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                          MOTION to Appoint Special Process Server, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction ( Responses due by 1/29/2009) by The Fall River Housing Authority.(BenEzra, Robert) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING - Documents in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction re 55 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by The Massachusetts Coalition for the Homeless, Loretta Anderson, Jayne Kerns, Vanessa Santiago, The Fall River Housing Joint Tenants Council (Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 55 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by The Massachusetts Coalition for the Homeless, Loretta Anderson, Jayne Kerns, Vanessa Santiago, The Fall River Housing Joint Tenants Council. (Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by The Massachusetts Coalition for the Homeless, Loretta Anderson, Jayne Kerns, Vanessa Santiago, The Fall River Housing Joint Tenants Council. (Attachments: # 2 Text of Proposed Order (Copperman, Amy) Modified on 1/8/2009 to modify entry (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: None
                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to June 30, 2009 to Complete Discovery by The Massachusetts Coalition for the Homeless, The Fall River Housing Authority, Thomas Collins, Loretta Anderson, Jayne Kerns, Vanessa Santiago, The Fall River Housing Joint Tenants Council.(Copperman, Amy) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None
                                    Supplemental Opposition re 25 MOTION to Dismiss by City Defendants filed by The Massachusetts Coalition for the Homeless, Loretta Anderson, Jayne Kerns, Vanessa Santiago, The Fall River Housing Joint Tenants Council. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Counsel)(Copperman, Amy) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered. OPINION AND ORDER granting 25 Motion to Dismiss AS TO The City of Fall River and Robert Correia, Mayor. (Edge, Eugenia) Modified on 9/23/2008 to correct name of current Mayor of Fall River(Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                        Opposition re 48 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Their Opposition to City Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by The City of Fall River, Robert Correia. (Ryan, Kerry) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Their Opposition to City Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by The Massachusetts Coalition for the Homeless, Loretta Anderson, Jayne Kerns, Vanessa Santiago, The Fall River Housing Joint Tenants Council. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Supplemental Opposition to City Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Affidavit)(Copperman, Amy) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on November 19, 2007 before Judge O'Toole. Court Reporter: Marcia G. Patrisso. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/737-8728 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: None
                                              Notice of substitution of party defendant due to successor Fall River mayor. by Loretta Anderson (Kassel, Phillip) Modified on 1/11/2008 (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 01/09/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on November 19, 2007 before Judge O'Toole. Court Reporter: Marcia G. Patrisso. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/737-8728 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                  Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by The Fall River Housing Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement FRHA Board Address and Election Information# 2 Supplement Spreadsheet with documents listed and described)(Rooney, Martin) (Entered: 06/14/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. BenEzra on behalf of The Fall River Housing Authority (BenEzra, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip J. Kassel on behalf of Loretta Anderson (Kassel, Phillip) (Entered: 05/22/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                        Opposition re 25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Massachusetts Coalition for the Homeless, Loretta Anderson, Jayne Kerns, Vanessa Santiago, The Fall River Housing Joint Tenants Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Copperman, Amy) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 39 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Loretta Anderson, Jayne Kerns, Vanessa Santiago. (Copperman, Amy) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION to Certify Class by Loretta Anderson, Jayne Kerns, Vanessa Santiago. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit # 9 Affidavit # 10 Affidavit # 11 Affidavit # 12 Exhibit # 13 Exhibit # 14 Exhibit # 15)(Copperman, Amy) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                              Amended CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by The Massachusetts Coalition for the Homeless.(Copperman, Amy) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                Amended CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by The Fall River Housing Joint Tenants Council.(Copperman, Amy) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  Amended CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Vanessa Santiago.(Copperman, Amy) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    Amended CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Jayne Kerns.(Copperman, Amy) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      Amended CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Loretta Anderson.(Copperman, Amy) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by The City of Fall River, Edward Lambert.(Ryan, Kerry) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by The Massachusetts Coalition for the Homeless.(Copperman, Amy) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                            CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by The Fall River Housing Joint Tenants Council.(Copperman, Amy) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Vanessa Santiago.(Copperman, Amy) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Jayne Kerns.(Copperman, Amy) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                  CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Loretta Anderson.(Copperman, Amy) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                    JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by all parties.(Copperman, Amy) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The City of Fall River, Edward Lambert. (Ryan, Kerry) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss by The City of Fall River, Edward Lambert.(Ryan, Kerry) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                          CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3) by The Fall River Housing Authority.(Rooney, Martin) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry T. Ryan on behalf of The City of Fall River, Edward Lambert (Ryan, Kerry) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 5/7/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.. Please mark your calendars accordingly. (Lyness, Paul) (Entered: 04/12/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                Answer to Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by The Fall River Housing Authority.(Rooney, Martin) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Fall River Housing Authority, Thomas Collins, The City of Fall River, Edward Lambert , filed by The Massachusetts Coalition for the Homeless, Loretta Anderson, Jayne Kerns, Vanessa Santiago, The Fall River Housing Joint Tenants Council.(Lyness, Paul) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2007 (Lyness, Paul). (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE by The Massachusetts Coalition for the Homeless, Loretta Anderson, Jayne Kerns, Vanessa Santiago, The Fall River Housing Joint Tenants Council re 17 MOTION to Amend 7 Complaint, (Liben, Judith) (Entered: 03/30/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 17 MOTION to Amend 7 Complaint, filed by The Massachusetts Coalition for the Homeless, Loretta Anderson, Jayne Kerns, Vanessa Santiago, The Fall River Housing Joint Tenants Council. (Liben, Judith) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend 7 Complaint, by The Massachusetts Coalition for the Homeless, Loretta Anderson, Jayne Kerns, Vanessa Santiago, The Fall River Housing Joint Tenants Council. (Attachments: # 1 amended complaint)(Liben, Judith) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Coughlin on behalf of The City of Fall River, Edward Lambert (Coughlin, John) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas F. McGuire, Jr on behalf of The City of Fall River, Edward Lambert (McGuire, Thomas) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/9/2007 (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by The City of Fall River. (Coughlin, John) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/9/2007 (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by The City of Fall River.(Coughlin, John) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/9/2007 (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Martin J. Rooney on behalf of The Fall River Housing Authority, Thomas Collins (Rooney, Martin) Modified on 2/28/2007 (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Returned Executed Edward Lambert served on 2/7/2007, answer due 2/27/2007. (Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Returned Executed The City of Fall River served on 2/7/2007, answer due 2/27/2007. (Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Returned Executed Thomas Collins served on 2/7/2007, answer due 2/27/2007. (Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Returned Executed The Fall River Housing Authority served on 2/7/2007, answer due 2/27/2007. (Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            **Pursuant to order entered 1/30/07** COMPLAINT against The Massachusetts Coalition for the Homeless, Loretta Anderson, Jayne Kerns, Vanessa Santiago, The Fall River Housing , filed by The Fall River Housing Authority, Thomas Collins, The City of Fall River, Edward Lambert.(Edge, Eugenia) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2007 (Edge, Eugenia). (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E. Copperman on behalf of The Massachusetts Coalition for the Homeless (Copperman, Amy) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: THE FILING FEE entered: the Motions to Proceed in forma pauperis (## 2, 3, and 4) are all hereby ALLOWED. The clerk is directed to issue summonses for each of the named Defendants, and the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the summons, complaint, and this Order upon each Defendant(s) as directed by the Plaintiffs, with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. Notwithstanding the grant of in forma pauperis status to the three individual Plaintiffs, however, the two other Plaintiffs to this action (i.e., The Fall River Housing Joint Tenants Council and The Massachusetts Coalition for the Homeless) remain obligated to pay their proportionate share of the $350.00 filing fee for this action. Accordingly, it is hereby Further Ordered that Plaintiffs The Fall River Housing Joint Tenants Council and The Massachusetts Coalition for the Homeless, shall each pay $70.00 toward the filing fee for this action within thirty-five (35) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, failing which, these Plaintiffs claims shall be dismissed and they shall be terminated as parties to this action. (PSSA, 1) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Loretta Anderson.(Diskes, Sheila) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Vanessa Santiago.(Diskes, Sheila) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jayne Kerns.(Diskes, Sheila) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against The Fall River Housing Authority, Thomas Collins, The City of Fall River, Edward Lambert , filed by The Massachusetts Colition for the Homeless, Loretta Anderson, Jayne Kerns, Vanessa Santiago, The Fall River Housing. (Attachments: # 1 cover sheets)Re:Order Entered on 1/30/07 Filing fee $140.00 Modified (Sheila Diskes) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 78 times.

                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?