LaserDynamics, LLC v. Alco Electronics LTD et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-01704
District Judge John G. Koeltl, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 1:44 PM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Laserdynamics, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gaston Kroub +1 212 801 2100 +1 212 754 8522 kroubg@gtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Finnegan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sergey Kolmykov +1 917 702 9135 skolmykov@kskiplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Torys LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary David Silbersher +1 917 609 2296 zsilbersher@torys.com
v.
No Logo Alco Electronics Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Larkin, Hoffman, Daly & Lindgren, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A Cotter +1 952 896 3340 +1 952 896 1599 jcotter@larkinhoffman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenna L Gilbert +1 952 896 3283 +1 952 842 1723 ggilbert@larkinhoffman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerry S Podkopacz +1 952 896 3262 +1 952 842 1750 jerryp@larkinhoffman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Manny Joseph Caixeiro +1 212 977 6900 +1 212 977 1649 mcaixeiro@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Alco Electronics Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Alco Holdings Limited, Defendant
No Logo Alco Investments (B.V.I.) Limited, Defendant
No Logo AVC Multimedia Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Kroub, Gaston) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Sergey Kolmykov dated 12/12/2014 re: Status Report. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC.(Kroub, Gaston) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 44 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Sergey Kolmykov and Jerry Podkopacz dated November 14, 2014 re: Status Report. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The parties should advise the Court of the status of this case by 12/12/2014. So ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/17/2014) (rjm) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Sergey Kolmykov and Jerry Podkopacz dated November 14, 2014 re: Status Report. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC.(Kolmykov, Sergey) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER: The parties shall advise the Court regarding the status of this case by November 14, 2014. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/19/2014) (ja) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Sergey Kolmykov dated September 5, 2014 re: Status Report. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC.(Kolmykov, Sergey) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JERRY S. PODKOPACZ granting 29 Motion for Jerry S. Podkopacz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/08/2014) (ama) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER: Third party discovery of customers and vendors is stayed until any additional defendants are brought into the case. The parties should submit a joint letter by September 5, 2014 advising tho Court about the status of the case. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/7/2014) (djc) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 38 Letter filed by Alco Electronics Inc. ENDORSEMENT: A telephone conference is acceptable and the parties should consult with the court's deputy, Mr. Fletcher, to set it up. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/02/2014) (ama) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from John A. Cotter dated 07/02/2014 re: Appearance by Telephone. Document filed by Alco Electronics Inc..(Cotter, John) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER: A conference in this matter will be held on Monday, July 7, 2014 at 12:00pm. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 7/7/2014 at 12:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/01/2014) (ama) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Sergey Kolmykov dated June 27, 2014 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC.(Kolmykov, Sergey) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER:...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. This Order is not binding on the Court or Court personnel. The Court reserves the right to amend it at any time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/16/2014) (ama) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                            FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - JOINT MOTION for Protective Order . Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC.(Kroub, Gaston) Modified on 6/13/2014 (db). (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                              ANSWER to 23 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Alco Electronics Inc..(Cotter, John) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER: The parties should submit a joint letter by June 27, 2014 advising the Court about the status of the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/27/2014) (ama) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures of LaserDynamics. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC. (Kolmykov, Sergey) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from John A. Cotter dated May 23, 2014 re: Request to appear by telephone. Document filed by Alco Electronics Inc..(Cotter, John) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Jerry S Podkopacz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9703539. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alco Electronics Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing JSP MN, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing JSP CA, # 3 [Proposed] Order)(Podkopacz, Jerry) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF GLENNA L. GILBERT: granting 27 Motion for Glenna L. Gilbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Glenna L. Gilbert, for admission to practice Pro Hae Vice in the above captioned action is granted. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/21/2014) (ama) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Glenna L Gilbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9693976. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alco Electronics Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing MN, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing IL, # 3 [Proposed] Order)(Gilbert, Glenna) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JOHN A. COTTER granting 18 Motion for John A Cotter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/13/2014) (ama) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AVC Multimedia Inc., Alco Investments (B.V.I.) Limited. (jd) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alco Investments (B.V.I.) Limited, AVC Multimedia Inc., re: 23 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC. (Kolmykov, Sergey) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                  FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 2 Complaint against AVC Multimedia Inc., Alco Electronics Inc., Alco Electronics LTD, Alco Holdings Limited, Alco Investments (B.V.I.) Limited with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC. Related document: 2 Complaint filed by LaserDynamics, LLC.(Kolmykov, Sergey) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER: As stated at today's conference, the plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint by May 15, 2014. The defendants' time to move or answer with respect to the Amended Complaint is extended to May 29, 2014. The parties should make initial disclosures by May 27, 2014 and the parties should submit a proposed protective order by June 12, 2014. The next conference in this matter is scheduled for May 27, 2014 at 4:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2014., Status Conference set for 5/27/2014 at 04:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/13/2014) (ama) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alco Investments (B.V.I.) Limited, AVC Multimedia Inc., re: 20 Amended Complaint. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC. (Kolmykov, Sergey) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 2 Complaint against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC. Related document: 2 Complaint filed by LaserDynamics, LLC.(Kolmykov, Sergey) Modified on 5/13/2014 (jom). (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jerry S Podkopacz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alco Electronics Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing MN, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing CA, # 3 [Proposed] Order)(Podkopacz, Jerry) Modified on 5/12/2014 (bcu). (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for John A Cotter to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alco Electronics Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing MN, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing WI, # 3 [Proposed] Order)(Cotter, John) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jerry S. Podkopacz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9662099. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alco Electronics Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing MN, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing CA)(Podkopacz, Jerry) Modified on 5/12/2014 (sdi). (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for John A Cotter to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9662033. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alco Electronics Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing MN, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing WI)(Cotter, John) Modified on 5/12/2014 (sdi). (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Joint Initial Pretrial Report Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC.(Kolmykov, Sergey) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Alco Investments (B.V.I.) Limited for Alco Electronics Inc.. Document filed by Alco Electronics Inc..(Caixeiro, Manny) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Alco Electronics Inc..(Caixeiro, Manny) Modified on 4/23/2014 (lb). (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        ANSWER to 2 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Alco Electronics Inc..(Caixeiro, Manny) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Alco Electronics Inc..(Caixeiro, Manny) Modified on 4/23/2014 (lb). (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: You are directed to appear for a pretrial conference, to be held on Tuesday, May 13, 2014, in Courtroom 12B, at 4:30pm in front of the Honorable John G. Koeltl. All requests for adjournments must be made in writing to the Court. For any further information, please contact the Court at (212) 805-0107. (Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2014 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 12B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (kgo) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Response to Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Manny J. Caixeiro dated 04/07/2014. Alco Electronics Inc. answer due 4/21/2014. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/9/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Response to Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Manny J. Caixeiro dated 04/07/2014. Document filed by Alco Electronics Inc..(Caixeiro, Manny) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Manny Joseph Caixeiro on behalf of Alco Electronics Inc.. (Caixeiro, Manny) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Alco Electronics Inc. served on 3/17/2014, answer due 4/7/2014. Service was accepted by Stephen Jorge, Registered Agent. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Kolmykov, Sergey) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      STANDING ORDER IN RE IMPLEMENTATION OF PATENT PILOT PROGRAM IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 21, 2011). It appearing that the Court has elected to participate in the Pilot Project for Patent Cases established pursuant to Pub L. No. 111-349, 124 Stat. 3674. Therefore, effective November 21, 2011, the Court's participation in the Patent Pilot Project will commence and shall include pro se cases. The Pilot program will be subject to the following procedures: When a designated Pilot judge receives a patent case on initial assignment, no transfer will take place. The designated Pilot judge will notify, by memorandum, the Assignment Committee of the assignment with a copy to the Case Assignment Unit.... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/29/2012) (sjo) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Kamatani Technologies, LLC for LaserDynamics, LLC. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC.(Kolmykov, Sergey) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (cde) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Alco Electronics Inc., Alco Electronics LTD, Alco Holdings Limited. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401089792)Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC.(cde) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (cde) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 135 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?