Denise P Edwards v. The First American Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:07-cv-03796
District Judge S. James Otero, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 21, 2017 at 8:24 PM ST (3.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Denise P Edwards, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/19/2013 Edward G Kramer +1 216 231 5300 kramere7@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gauntlett & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/25/2008 Lawrence C Jones +1 949 553 1010 larry@lawjones.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon and Wolf Chtd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KATHERINE B. BORNSTEIN +1 410 825 2300 kbornstein@gordon-wolf.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard S Gordon +1 410 825 2300 +1 410 825 0066 rgordon@quinnlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by James W Spertus Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ezra D Landes +1 310 826 4700 +1 310 826 4711 ezra@spertuslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Spertus +1 310 826 4700 +1 310 826 4711 jim@spertuslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Gordon and Wolf Chtd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin Eugene Wolf +1 410 825 2300 +1 410 825 0066 mwolf@quinnlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Fair Housing Law Clinic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Oakley +1 216 431 5300

Toggle Switch Represented by Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William K Meyer +1 410 332 1240 +1 410 659 0436 wmeyer@zuckerman.com
TERMINATED: 07/06/2012 Peter N Nothstein +1 410 332 0444
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert T Shaffer, III +1 410 332 0044 +1 410 659 0436 rshaffer@zuckerman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cyril V. Smith +1 410 332 0444 +1 410 659 0436 csmith@zuckerman.com
v.
No Logo First American Title Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo The First American Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Benbrook Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley A. Benbrook +1 916 930 3200 +1 916 930 3201 brad@benbrooklawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/02/2009 Douglas W. King +1 314 259 2000 +1 314 259 2020 dwking@bryancave.com
TERMINATED: 03/02/2009 Keith D Klein +1 310 576 2100 +1 310 576 2200 keith.klein@bryancave.com
TERMINATED: 03/02/2009 Darci F. Madden +1 314 259 2000 +1 314 259 2020 dfmadden@bclplaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/02/2009 Brian James Recor +1 949 851 3939 +1 949 553 7539 brian.recor@bryancave.com
TERMINATED: 03/02/2009 Gustavo A Torres +1 310 576 2100 +1 310 576 2200

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. KATE DOUGLAS +1 314 241 1800 +1 314 259 5959 kate.douglas@snrdenton.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Duvall - NOT SWORN +1 213 623 9300 +1 213 623 9924 michael.duvall@snrdenton.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Teutenberg Ferrick +1 314 241 1800 +1 314 259 5959 elizabeth.ferrick@snrdenton.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Ronald David Kent +1 213 623 9300 +1 213 623 9924 ronald.kent@snrdenton.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Andrew Newman +1 314 259 5399 +1 314 259 5959 charles.newman@dentons.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert F Scoular +1 213 623 9300 +1 213 623 9924 robert.scoular@dentons.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel David Siegel +1 650 798 0300 +1 650 798 0310 joel.siegel@snrdenton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Z Edelstein +1 213 229 9500 +1 213 625 0248 AEdelstein@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller Shakman & Beem LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margo Weinstein +1 312 263 3700 +1 312 263 3270 mweinstein@millershakman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stevens and OConnell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J Stevens +1 916 329 9111
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2409(a)
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (569) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Distribution of Funds
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Mail Returned
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Mail Returned addressed to David Oakley re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive 538 . (lom) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Mail Returned
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Mail Returned addressed to David Oakley re Order for Final Approval of Settlement 543 . (vv) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Mail Returned
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Mail Returned addressed to David Oakley re Order on Motion Final Approval of Settlement. 541 (vv) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Mail Returned
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Mail Returned addressed to Charles J. Stevens re Order Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106), 533 . (vv) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Mail Returned
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Mail Returned addressed to Charles J. Stevens re Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) 529 . (vv) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER FOR AWARD OF INCENTIVE AWARD, ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS 525 530 by Judge S. James Otero: Upon consideration Plaintiff Denise Edwardss Motion for Attorneys Fees with supporting declarations (Motion) (Docket 525), Defendants Nonopposition to that Motion (Docket 526), and upon consideration of the Settlement Agreement executed between the parties (Settlement) (Docket 506-2), as amended by the Addendum to Class Action Settlement Agreement dated on or about October 11, 2016, Plaintiff Denise Edwardss Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlement (Docket 530), which the Court has construed as the parties Joint Motion for Final Approval of Settlement (Docket 531), and for good cause shown, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion and makes the following findings and orders: 1. The Court finds that Plaintiffs request for the payment of $15,000 as an incentive award is appropriate and warranted, given the services the Class representative provided to the Class, the considerable time and effort that she devoted to the investigation and prosecution of this action, the risks she incurred, and the benefit she has achieved for the Class. Dyer v. Wells Fargo Bank, 303F.R.D. 326, 336 (N.D. Cal. 2014). (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (vv) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT by Judge S. James Otero. The Court finds that this Order and Judgment constitutes a final adjudication on the merits of this action, and should be entered without delay. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to enter this Judgment forthwith. IT IS SO ORDERED. See order for further details. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jy) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion for Settlement,, Motion Hearing, 541 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Addendum to Class Settlement Agreement), # 2 Exhibit B (Declaration re Costs of Administration), # 3 Proposed Order for Final Approval, # 4 Proposed Order for Approval of Incentive Award, Fees and Costs, # 5 Exhibit E (Redlined Order for Final Approval), # 6 Exhibit F (Redlined Order for Approval of Incentive Award, Fees and Costs)))(Spertus, James) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: TENTATIVE RULING GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS 525 ; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT 530 . The parties must address the following issues at the hearing for final approval. Specifically, the parties must: (1) corroborate the settlement administration costs to show that $250,000 wasapproximately the amount billed by Epiq and that it is a reasonable rate; (2) demonstrate how the reversion of remaining funds to First American does not jeopardize final approval, and/or provide an alternative to the reverter term; and (3) clarify that the South Dakota Inquiry does not affect finalapproval. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR OTHER SPECIFICS). (lc) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      RESPONSE filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporationto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, 538 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Kent, Ronald) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS ORDER REQUIRING ADDITIONAL INFORMATION INRESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' NOTICE IN ADVANCE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S FINALAPPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT 537 by Judge S. James Otero: In light of the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Settlement set for October 5, 2016(the "Hearing"), the Court ORDERS Defendants to (1) provide the Court with additional information regarding the South Dakota Inquiry and its potential effect on the Hearing; and (2) state whether the Hearing should be continued until the resolution of the Inquiry and, if so, the reasons for a continuance. Defendants shall file said information with the Court by noon on Friday, September 30, 2016. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (vv) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE IN ADVANCE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Kent, Ronald) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            APPEAL RECORD RETURNED from 9th CCA RE: Appeal Record Sent to USCA (A-26) 485 3 Boxes containing Documents 123-124, 380-386, 387-394, and 395-403(kyc) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Order for Service Fee, Attorney's Fees and Costs re Non-Opposition to Motion 526 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs, 525 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Order for Final Approval of Settlement re for Settlement Approval 530 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) 527 . pdf is notice of withdrawal of only attorney Shaffer for plaintiff. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected.Leave of court required for filing. The correct event is: Request: order, to which the Missing Proposed order was not submitted as separate attachment.In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            The Court finds the following motion suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing re the MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs, filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. [ECF # 525], set for hearing on September 19, 2016. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). No appearance is required. The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/08/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Shaffer, Robert) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Non-Opposition to Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Mail Returned addressed to David Oakley re Order on Motion for Order 519 . (lom) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Mail Returned addressed to Charles J Stevens re Order on Motion for Order 519 . Address unknown. (jy) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Mail Returned addressed to David Oakley re Order on Motion for Settlement 517 . (vv) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Mail Returned addressed to Charles J. Stevens re Minutes of In Chambers Order 510 . (vv) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Mail Returned addressed to Charles J Stevens re Order on Motion for Settlement 517 (lc) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER ON UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SETTING FINAL APPROVAL HEARING DATE FOR SEPTEMBER 19, 2016 10:00 AM 518 by Judge S. James Otero (lc) Modified on 7/1/2016 (lc). (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Setting Final Approval Hearing Date filed by plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Landes, Ezra) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT [Docket No. 506 -1]. See order for details. (jy) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Mail Returned addressed to Charles J Stevens re Order on Motion for Settlement,, Order on Motion to Vacate, 509 . (jy) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Mail Returned addressed to Charles J Stevens re Order on Request to Substitute Attorney 505 . (jy) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Mail Returned addressed to David Oakley re Order on Request to Substitute Attorney 505 . (vv) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Mail Returned addressed to David Oakley re Minutes of In Chambers Order 510 . (vv) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            SCHEDULING NOTICE OF VACATING STATUS CONFERENCE: by Judge S. James Otero. The Status Conference set for hearing 6/20/16 is vacated. No appearance is required. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 511 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action 506 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James W. Spertus, # 2 Declaration of Cyril V. Smith, # 3 Declaration of Richard Bithell)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero: The Court has received Plaintiff Denise P. Edwards' Motion for Settlement Approval of ClassAction, ECF No. 506 . Defendants First American Corporation and First American Title Insurance Company do not oppose the Motion. After reviewing the briefing submitted by the parties, the Court ORDERS the parties to file supplementary briefing concerning the following: (1) the named Plaintiff's incentive award, (2) attorney's fees and expenses, (3) actions to be taken with funds remaining in the escrow account after paying the settlement and attorney's fees. The Court addresses each of these issues in turn. The supplementary briefing shall not exceed five (5) pages and must otherwise conform with the rules of this Court. The supplementary briefing shall be due on Wednesday June 1 at 5 pm.(SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (vv) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting ex parte application 507 and that the hearing on Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement 506 is vacated, and the Motion is submitted to the Court for ruling, without a hearing by Judge S. James Otero (lc) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Mail Returned addressed to David Oakley re Minutes of In Chambers Order 502 . (iv) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate , or, in the alternative, Continue the Hearing on Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (Docket No. 506), filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Landes, Ezra) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action filed by plaintiff Denise P Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 6/13/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum, # 3 Declaration of Cyril V. Smith with Letter from Judge McCoy) (Spertus, James) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: granting 504 Request to Substitute Attorney James W.Spertus in place instead of Richard S Gordon, Martin E Wolf on behalf of plaintiff Denise P Edwards (lc) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Richard S. Gordon, Martin E. Wolf; Gordon and Wolf Chtd. as counsel of record filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Landes, Ezra) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Mail Returned addressed to Charles J Stevens re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held 502 (lc) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero:The Court has received the Mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for theNinth Circuit, affirming the district courts denial of class certification in part as to the newly-formed title agencies, vacating the district courts denial of class certification in part as to the remaining title agencies, and remanding this matter for further proceedings. Accordingly the Court Orders this matter reopened and sets a Status Conference on Monday, June 20, 2016 8:30 a.m. The parties shall file a joint status report by June 6,2016. (lc) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: CCA # 13-55542. The judgment of the 9th Circuit Court, entered August 24, 2015, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of the 9th CCA issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Each party shall bear their own costs on appeal. [ See USCA Opinion 488 AFFIRMED IN PART, VACATED IN PART, AND REMANDED.] (mat) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 452 filed by Denise P Edwards. CCA # 13-55542. The parties' Joint Motion for Dissolution of Stay and Issuance of Mandate is GRANTED. The stay previously issued in this case is hereby dissolved and the mandate shall issue, implementing the August 24, 2015 opinion. (mat) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 452 filed by Denise P Edwards. CCA # 13-55542. The Appellees' Motion to Extend the Stay of the Mandate is GRANTED. The stay of mandate is extended by 30 days, to March 3, 2016. If a petition for writ of certiorari is timely filed by March 3, 2016, then the stay shall continue until final disposition by the Supreme Court. (mat) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge S. James Otero. Having reviewed the joint status report filed 1/11/16, the Court continues the Status Conference set for hearing on 1/25/16 to Tuesday, May 31, 2016 @ 8:30 a.m. The parties shall file a joint status report by May 16, 2016, or within seven (7) days of a ruling by the United States Supreme Court or settlement of this action. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/13/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge S. James Otero. Having reviewed the Joint Status report filed 3/16/15, the Court Orders the parties to file another Joint Status Report due by 9/21/2015. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              RECORD ON APPEAL sent to Circuit Court re: Appeal number, 13-55542. 24 bulky documents and 2 sealed docs forwarded to Seattle WA. (rsm) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING NOTICE TO FILE ADDITIONAL STATUS REPORT by Judge S. James Otero. The Court is in receipt of the Joint Status report filed on December 10, 2014. The Court ORDERS the parties to file another Joint Status Report on March 16, 2015, or within 2 weeks of the Ninth Circuit issuing its decision in appeal number 13-55542, whichever occurs sooner. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Mail Returned addressed to David Oakley re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held 480 (lc) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Mail Returned addressed to David Oakley re Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail, 471 (lc) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned addressed to David Oakley re Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail, 471 (jed) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Mail Returned (return to sender moved left no address) addressed to David Oakley The Fair Housing Law Clinic 3214 Prospect Avenue Cleveland, OH 44115-2600 re Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail, 471 (es) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Mail Returned addressed to David Oakley re Text Only Scheduling Notice, 470 (lc) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Mail Returned addressed to David Oakley re Text Only Scheduling Notice, 474 (bp) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING NOTICE TO FILE ADDITIONAL STATUS REPORT by Judge S. James Otero. The Court is in receipt of the Joint Status Report filed on July 21, 2014. The Court ORDERS the parties to file another Joint Status Report on December 15, 2014, or within 2 weeks of the Ninth Circuit issuing its decision in appeal number 13-55542, whichever occurs sooner. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT (JOINT) filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James W Spertus counsel for Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. Katherine B. Bornstein is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Denise Edwards. (Spertus, James) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Electronic Filing re Text Only Scheduling Notice 470 e-mailed to Attorney Katherine B Bornstein at kbornstein@gordon-wolf.com, bounced due to invalid email. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING NOTICE OF FILING STATUS REPORT by Judge S. James Otero. This matter was stayed by this Court on 4/9/2013. The Court Orders the parties to file a Joint Status Report due by 8/5/2014. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: granting 467 James W. Spertus Request to Substitute Attorney of record in place and Stead of Edward Kramer. Attorney Edward G Kramer terminated (lt) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 8/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST to Substitute attorney James W. Spertus in place of attorney Edward G. Kramer 467 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect party on the [Prop] Order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 8/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST to Substitute attorney James W. Spertus in place of attorney Edward G. Kramer filed by plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 08/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Denise P Edwards Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Suzanne S. Obeda at suzie@spertuslaw.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: Scheduling Conference 11-08-2010, Status Conference 09-24-2012. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Obeda, Suzanne) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120), 464 . The following error was found: These Transcripts are available thru PACER (90 day restriction has expired)THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Denise P Edwards Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Suzanne S. Obeda at suzie@spertuslaw.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: Scheduling Conference 11/08/2010, Status Conference 9/24/2012. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Obeda, Suzanne) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120), 462 . The following error(s) was found: REQUESTED HEARINGS ARE DIGITALLY RECORDED. PLEASE REFILE UNDER DIGITALLY RECORDED PROCEEDINGS. Transcript deadline terminated. You must electronically refile the above referenced Request for Transcript in this case to correct this deficiency. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(mw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Denise P Edwards Court Reporter. Court will contact Suzanne S. Obeda at suzie@spertuslaw.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: Scheduling Conference 11/8/2010, Status Conference 9/24/2012. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Obeda, Suzanne) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A STAY PENDING NINTH CIRCUIT REVIEW 456 .All proceedings in this case are STAYED pending ruling by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, and all calendared dates are hereby VACATED. (lc) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Ruling by Ninth Circuit on Appeal after Petition to Appeal Was Granted 456 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Spertus, James) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Ruling by Ninth Circuit on Appeal after Petition to Appeal Was Granted 456 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Duvall, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Proposed Order)(Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Declaration of Class Notice Administrator re Notice to Class re Order 438 (Spertus, James) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. correcting EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Ruling by Ninth Circuit on Appeal after Petition to Appeal Was Granted 456 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Request for Stay)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Ruling by Ninth Circuit on Appeal after Petition to Appeal Was Granted filed by plaintiff Denise P Edwards.(Spertus, James) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Order on Motion to Certify Class Action 379 CCA # 12-80227. Respondents' unopposed motion to extend time to file an opposition to the petition is granted. The court, in its discretion, grants the petition for permission to appeal the district court's December 3, 2012 order denying class action certification. Within 14 days after the date of this order, petitioner shall perfect the appeal in accordance with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 5(d). Order received in this district on 4/2/13. (mat) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) 450 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Change of Address. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike the Declaration of Robert B. Holman in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 5/6/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Duvall in Support of Motion to Strike, # 2 Exhibit A & B to Duvall Declaration in Support of Motion to Strike, # 3 Proposed Order on Motion to Strike)(Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by plaintiff Denise P Edwards. Appeal of Order on Motion to Certify Class Action 379 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0973-11899803 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit November 30, 2012 Order (District Court Docket Entry 379))(Spertus, James) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability 419 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit I-M to Duvall Declaration in Support of Reply in Support of Summary Judgment Motion, # 3 Supplement to Defendants' Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts)(Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Firm Name filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. correcting Statement (Motion related) 448 To Correct Typographical Error In Fact Response No. 13 (Spertus, James) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability 419 , filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Landes, Ezra) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability 419 , filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cyril V. Smith with Exhibits 1-7, # 2 Declaration of Richard S. Gordon with Exhibits 1-4, # 3 Declaration of Robert B. Holman with CV)(Landes, Ezra) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: granting 445 plaintiffs Ex Parte Application thatr Plaintiffs shall file their Opposition to Defendants motion no later than March 15, 2013, and Defendants shall file their Reply in Support of their Motion no later than April 1, 2013. (lc) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for to Modify the Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule (UNOPPOSED), filed by Plaintiffs Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Landes, Ezra) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: The Court finds this matter suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearingre the MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability filed by DEFENDANTS First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. 419 , set for March 11, 2013. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). (lc) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DENIED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: denying 440 Ex Parte Application to Quash : DENIED ORDER BY THE COURT, IT IS SO ORDERED. (jm) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY In Support Of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Quash Deposition Subpoena 440 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 3/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Quash Deposition Subpoena 440 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Shaffer, III, # 2 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Ex Parte Application)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 03/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EX PARTE APPLICATION to Quash Deposition Subpoena filed by defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Duvall, # 2 Proposed Order)(Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service of Subpoena and Consent to Deposition of Marilyn Mannarino (Smith, Cyril) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEFENDANTS CLASS NOTICE PLAN AND ORDER THEREON by Judge S. James Otero (lc) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT Defendants' Statement Regarding Plaintiff's Proposed Class List, Notice Plan, and Notice Form filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company re: Miscellaneous Document, 436 . (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' [Proposed] Class Notice Plan)(Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PLAINITFFS' SUBMISSION REGARDING THE TOWER CITY CLASS LIST AND CLASS NOTICE, WITH PROPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 1 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Tower City Class List, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Class Notice, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Administrative Order, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of D'Ann Vermilye)(Smith, Cyril) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC HEARING RE: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE held before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: Plaintiff's ex parte application for leave to take the deposition of Marilyn Mannarino is granted as stated on the record. Court Recorder: CS 02/14/13. (jm) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 2/14/13 1:28 p.m. re Transcript 433 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 2/14/13 1:28 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Babykin Courthouse Services, phone number (626)963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/13/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2013. (ha) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120). PROCEEDINGS WERE HELD IN CHAMBERS - NO RECORDING IS AVAILABLE. NO FURTHER ACTION IS NEEDED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to DEFENDANTS First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Michael J. Duvall at michael.duvall@snrdenton.com; carrie.rice@snrdenton.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 02/14/2013 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Depose M. Mannarino. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER VACATING ORDER ON STIPULATION REGARDING SEALING OF CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION MATERIALS 428 ; GRANTING MOTION TO DEFER RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTPURSUANT TO ONE-WAY INTERVENTION RULE AND TO MODIFY THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE 422 . The Court therefore GRANTS Defendants' Motion. The March 11, 2013, hearing date on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is adjourned, and the Court will issue a ruling on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment after the completion of the class notice process. Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is due no later than March 8, 2013. Defendants' Reply is due no later than March 25, 2013. In addition, the Court VACATES its Order on Stipulation Regarding Sealing of Class Certification Motion Materials 428 , which was issued in error. (lc) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO DEPOSE MARILYN MANNARINO DE BENE ESSE by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: granting 416 Ex Parte Application for Leave (see attached) (jm) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER ON STIPULATION RE SEALING OF CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION MATERIALS 275 by Judge S. James Otero:(1) The Clerk shall temporarily remove from the Courts CM/ECF Pacer website Volumes I, II, and III of Plaintiffs Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Motion for Class Certification (Docs. 241-243); (2) The Clerk shall seal Plaintiffs manually-filed DVD of Federal Rule of Evidence 1006 Voluminous Material in Support of Motion for Class Certification (referenced in Notice of Manual Filing, Doc. 244); (3) The Clerk shall retain on file as unsealed Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification and supporting Memorandum (Doc. 240); (4) On or before May 6, 2011, the parties shall file a joint stipulation to seal the materials designated by Defendants contained in Plaintiffs Appendices of Exhibits; (5) Defendants shall be able to file their Appendices of Exhibits under seal and on or before May 12, 2011 shall file redacted Appendices by the CM/ECF system; and (6) In the event that the Court signs an order authorizing the sealing of documents designated by Defendants as containing confidential information, Plaintiffs will then re-file on or before May 20, 2011 two sets of the appendices: (1) a publicly filed set of the appendices that are redacted to protect the information the Court has authorized to be filed under seal; and (2) an unredacted set of the same appendices filed with the Court under seal pursuant to the Courts order authorizing the under seal filing. (lc) Modified on 2/14/2013 (lc). (VACATED PER 2/14/13 MINUTE ORDER) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: ORDER TELEPHONIC HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to take the de bene esse deposition of Marilyn Mannarino pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(a)(2)(B) 416 .( Telephone Conference set for 2/14/2013 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm.) (jm) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR THE COMPLETION OF DISCOVERY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF TAKING THREE DEPOSITIONS AND TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR SUBMISSION OF CLASS LIST 415 .The discovery cut-off is extended to March 8, 2013, for the limited purpose of taking the depositions of Mr. James Stipanovich, Mr. Samuel Halkias, and Mr. Craig Syby. The discovery cut-off of February 25, 2013, otherwise governs. The February 14, 2013, deadline for the submission of a class notice plan, class list, notice forms, and accompanying documents is extended to February 22, 2013. (lc) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Ezra D Landes counsel for Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. Changing firm name to Spertus, Landes & Umhofer, LLP. Filed by Plaintiff Denise P. Edwards (Landes, Ezra) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney James W Spertus counsel for Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. Changing firm name to Spertus, Landes & Umhofer, LLP. Filed by Plaintiff Denise P. Edwards (Spertus, James) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Michael J. Duvall In Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability 419 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for on Unopposed Motion to Defer ruling on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to One-Way Intervension Rule and to Modify the Briefing Schedule filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 3/11/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Duvall, # 2 Proposed Order on Defts Unopposed Motion to Defer Ruling on Motin for Summary Judgment Pursuant to One-Way Intevention rule and to the Modify Briefing Schedule)(Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Craig W. Syby Re Tower City Title Agency LLC in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability 419 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Todd A. Jones In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability 419 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability filed by DEFENDANTS First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 3/11/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, # 3 [Proposed] Judgment)(Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 2/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to to take the de bene esse deposition of Marilyn Mannarino pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(a)(2)(B) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to to take the de bene esse deposition of Marilyn Mannarino pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(a)(2)(B) 416 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Spertus, James) (Entered: 02/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to to take the de bene esse deposition of Marilyn Mannarino pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(a)(2)(B) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to to take the de bene esse deposition of Marilyn Mannarino pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(a)(2)(B) 416 filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Duvall, # 2 Proposed Order)(Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to to take the de bene esse deposition of Marilyn Mannarino pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(a)(2)(B) filed by plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert T. Shaffer, III, # 2 Proposed Order)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to March 8, 2013 for limited purposes filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: granting 412 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert T. Shaffer, III on behalf of Plaintiff Denise P. Edwards, designating James W. Spertus as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: granting 408 Defendants' Application To File Portions Of And Exhibits To The Declaration Of Karen M. Barney Under Seal is granted. The Clerk is directed to file the unredacted, Confidential version of the Barney Declaration and accompanying Exhibits A and B under seal. (lc) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for attorney Robert T. Shaffer, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11589582 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Landes, Ezra) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 411 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Karen M. Barney. (mat) (Main Document 411 replaced on 1/30/2013) (mat). (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Ronald D Kent counsel for Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. Adding Ronald D. Kent as attorney as counsel of record for First American Financial Corporation and First American Title Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants First American Financial Corporation and First American Title Insurance Company (Kent, Ronald) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero:ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 1 AND APPROVAL OF FORM NOTICE 405 .The parties shall jointly submit a revised class list, notice plan, notice forms, and any accompanying documents, or, if necessary, submitcompeting proposed class lists, notice plans, notice forms, and accompanying documents within 21 days from the issuance of this Order. (lc) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to file portions of and exhibits to declaration of Karen M Barney in support of defendants opposition to plaintiffs ex parte application under seal filed by defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company of Application to Seal and Unredacted Declaration of Karen M. Barney and Exhibits A & B. (Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Entry of Administrative Order No. 1 and Approval of Form of Class Notice 405 filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Duvall in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application, # 2 Declaration of Karen M. Barney [Redacted], # 3 Proposed Order)(Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Entry of Administrative Order No. 1 and Approval of Form of Class Notice filed by plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 404 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT- DEFENDANTS' SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL APPLICATION to Seal Portions of Defendants' Appendix in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. (mat) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 24 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 23 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 22 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 21 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 20 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 19 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 18 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 17 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 16 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 15 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 14 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 13 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 12 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 11 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 10 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 9 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 8 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 7 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 6 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 5 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 4 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 3 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 2 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 256 : VOLUME 1 OF 24 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (cch) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NATIONWIDE CLASS CERTIFICATION 240 . (lc) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY CLASS 253 ; DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPELARBITRATION 254 . (lc) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS 253 , MOTION to Certify Class 240 Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority (1) in Support of Motion for Nationwide Class Certification and (2) in Opposition to Motion to Decertify filed by First American Financial Corporation and filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Weinstein, Margo) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. correcting Response in Opposition to Motion 375 and filed by First American Financial Corporation (Weinstein, Margo) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION Motion to Decertify filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Weinstein, Margo) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Certify Class 240 and in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Decertify Class filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Spertus, James) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Certify Class 240 and in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Decertify Class filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Spertus, James) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation of Defendants' Appendix in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, Volumes 1-24, Partially Redacted, Per November 6, 2012, Order. (Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation of Unredacted Pages of Defendants' Appendix in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification permitted to be filed under seal by November 6, 2012 Order. (Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (A.000001 A.000635) re MOTION to Certify Class 240 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix VOLUME 1 OF 15 OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (A.000001-A.000046), # 2 Appendix VOLUME 2 OF 15 OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (A.000047-A.000096), # 3 Appendix VOLUME 3 OF 15 OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (A.000097-A.000146), # 4 Appendix VOLUME 4 OF 15 OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (A.000147-A.000196), # 5 Appendix VOLUME 5 OF 15 OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (A.000197-A.000242), # 6 Appendix VOLUME 6 OF 15 OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (A.000243-A.000292), # 7 Appendix VOLUME 7 OF 15 OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (A.000293-A.000332), # 8 Appendix VOLUME 8 OF 15 OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (A.000333-A.000349), # 9 Appendix VOLUME 9 OF 15 OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (A.000350-A.000400), # 10 Appendix VOLUME 10 OF 15 OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (A.000401-A.000447), # 11 Appendix VOLUME 11 OF 15 OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (A.000448-A.000487), # 12 Appendix VOLUME 12 OF 15 OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (A.000488-A.000503), # 13 Appendix VOLUME 13 OF 15 OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (A.000504-A.000548), # 14 Appendix VOLUME 14 OF 15 OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (A.000549-A.000596), # 15 Appendix VOLUME 15 OF 15 OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (A.000597-A.000635))(Spertus, James) (Entered: 11/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Sheryl Fuller in Support of MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS 253 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Andrew Z. Edelstein in Opposition to MOTION to Certify Class 240 Supplemental Declaration of Andrew Z. Edelstein in Support of Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-F)(Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' SECONDSUPPLEMENTAL APPLICATION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS' APPENDIX INSUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 365 .On or before November 13, 2012, the parties shall re-file unredacted versions of the Supplemental Edelstein Declaration, the Declaration of Sheryl Fuller in Support of Defendants' Motion to Decertify the Tower City (Ohio) Class, as well as Defendants' and Plaintiff's Appendices, except with respect to those documents identified here and in the Court's October 22, 2012, Orderas being appropriate for filing under seal. The parties shall re-file under seal those documents identified in the Court's October 22, 2012, Order on or before November 13, 2012. (lc) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Order re MOTION to Supplement Defendants' Second Supplemental Application to Seal Portions of Defendants' Appendix in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification re MOTION to Certify Class 240 (REDACTED VERSION) MOTION to Supplement Defendants' Second Supplemental Application to Seal Portions of Defendants' Appendix in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification re MOTION to Certify Class 240 (REDACTED VERSION) MOTION to Supplement Defendants' Second Supplemental Application to Seal Portions of Defendants' Appendix in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification re MOTION to Certify Class 240 (REDACTED VERSION) 365 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order on Second Supplemental Application to Seal Materials)(Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Supplement Defendants' Second Supplemental Application to Seal Portions of Defendants' Appendix in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification re MOTION to Certify Class 240 (REDACTED VERSION) filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 11/5/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-M to Defendants' Second Supplemental Application to Seal Portions of Defendants' Appendix in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification)(Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company of SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL APPLICATION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS' APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. (Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge S. James OteroThe Court is in receipt of the Joint Request Re November 5, 2012 Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion forNationwide Class Certification and Defendants' Motion to Decertify' and November 19, 2012 Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration 359 . The Court vacates the hearings on Plaintiff's Motion for Nationwide Class Certification 240 and Defendants' Motion to Decertify 253 set for November 5, 2012. The Court also vacates the hearing on Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration 254 set for November 19, 2012. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). No appearances are necessary. Oral argument will be set only if required by the Court. (lc) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: granting 361 Defendants First AmericanFinancial Corporation and First American Title Insurance Companys Ex ParteApplication for a Partial Extension of Time to Comply with this Courts October 22, 20012 Order, and orders as follows: Defendants may have until November 2, 2012 to file a supplemental application to seal as described in the Courts October 22, 2012 Order Granting In Part And Denying In Part Defendants Supplemental Application To Seal. (lc) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Application to Seal in Response to Court's Oct. 22, 2012 Order [Doc. 355] filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew Z. Edelstein in Support of Ex Parte Application for Partial Extension of Time to Comply with Court's Oct.22, 2012 Order [Doc. 355], # 2 Declaration of Jeffrey T. Heintz in Support of Ex Parte Application for Partial Extension of Time to Comply with Court's Oct.22, 2012 Order [Doc. 355], # 3 Proposed Order on Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Partial Extension of Time to Comply with Court's Oct. 22, 2012 Order [Doc. 355])(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) 359 . pdf is a joint request for order to set argument time re pending motions. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Request: order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE filed by defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. of Joint Request re November 5, 2012 Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Nationwide Class Certification and Defendants' Motion to Decertify; and November 19, 2012 Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Weinstein, Margo) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Supplemental Brief on Motion to Compel Arbitration of Tower City (Ohio) Class re MOTION to Compel Arbitration 254 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Landes, Ezra) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Supplemental Brief on Class Decertification re MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS 253 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Cyril V. Smith), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Declaration of Denise Edwards))(Landes, Ezra) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENT - Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A - Transcript of 7-8-08 Hearing in Slapikas)(Newman, Charles) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL.Defendants' Application to File Under Seal is GRANTED with respect to the documents referenced in Paragraphs 4.E, 4.G, and 4.H of the Application. Defendants' Application is DENIED with respect to the remaining documents referenced in the Application and Plaintiff's DVD. Defendants shall file a supplemental application to file these documents under seal in strict compliance with this Order on or before October 29, 2012. Failure to comply with this Order will result in the Court ordering the parties to file unredacted copies of the documents 306 . (lc) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Andrew Z. Edelstein in Opposition to MOTION to Certify Class 240 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ANDREW Z. EDELSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (REDACTED) filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-F to Supplemental Declaration of Andrew Z. Edelstein in Support of Opposition to Motion for Class Certification (REDACTED))(Edelstein, Andrew) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company of Application to Seal Supplemental Declaration of Andrew Z. Edelstein in Support of Opposition to Motion for Class Certification [Doc.# 256]; Proposed Order on Application to Seal Supplemental Edelstein Declaration; Supplemental Declaration of Andrew Z. Edelstein in Opposition to Class Certification Motion [Doc.# 256] (Under Seal Version). (Edelstein, Andrew) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company of CD-ROM of Defendants' Motion to Decertify Tower City (Ohio) Class. (Edelstein, Andrew) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF LODGING filed of CD-ROM of Defendants' Motion to Decertify the Tower City (Ohio) Class re MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS 253 (Edelstein, Andrew) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Certify Class 240 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Landes, Ezra) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Certify Class 240 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Landes, Ezra) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS 253 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Arbitration 254 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/24/12 11:16 a.m. re Transcript 345 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(mo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/24/12 11:16 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc., phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/22/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/1/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2012. (mo) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge S. James Otero:The Court lifts the Stay in this case. Court and Defense Counsel confer regarding Defendant's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Court and Counsel confer regarding how to proceed in this matter. The Court DENIES Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 255 . The Court sets the following dates: Supplemental 5-page briefs in support ofplaintiff's Motion for Nationwide Class Certification, defendant's Motion to Compel, Defendant's Motion to Decertify the Tower City Class due: 10/15/12; 5-page supplemental opposition briefs due: 10/22/12; Class certification motion hearing: 11/5/12 10:00 AM; Motion to compel arbitration hearing: 11/19/12 10:00 AM; Discovery cutoff: 2/25/13; Motion hearing cut-off date (If Motion for Nationwide Certification isgranted, and Motion for De-certification is denied): 4/15/13 10:00 AM; Motion hearing cut-off date (if Motion for Nationwide Certification is denied, and Motion for De-Certification is granted: 3/11/13 10:00 AM; Final Pretrial conference: 6/17/13 9:00; Jury Trial: 6/25/13 9:00 AM>Court Recorder: CS 9/24/12. (lc) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Transcript Order Form (AO-435), Transcript Order Form (AO-435) 342 , as to Defendant First American Title Insurance Company Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Andrew Edelstein at andrew.edelstein@snrdenton.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Status Conference 09/24/2012. Category: Expedited. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Edelstein, Andrew) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings 9-24-2012 to 9-24-2012 as to defendant The First American Corporation Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Suzanne Obeda at suzie@spertuslaw.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Status Conference re Stay (9-24-2012). Category: Expedited. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Obeda, Suzanne) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge S. James Otero. The Status Conference set for Monday, September 24, 2012 at 8:30 a.m. has been continued, as to the TIME ONLY, to 10:00 a.m. THE STATUS CONFERENCE IS NOW SET FOR SEPTEMBER 24, 2012 AT 10:00 A.M. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Margo Weinstein counsel for Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. Changing Firm and Address to Miller Shakman & Beem LLP, 180 N. LaSalle St., Suite 3600, Chicago, IL 60601. Changing e-mail to mweinstein@millershakman.com. Filed by counsel for defendants Margo Weinstein (Weinstein, Margo) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT Updated Status Report filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Defendants' Updated Status Report)(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPEAL RECORD RETURNED from 9th CCA. Received: Volume(s): 1 through 4; 24 Brown Folders: B0282, B0283, B0284, B0285, B0286, B0287, B0288, B0289, B0290, B0291, B0292, B0293, B0294, B0295, B0296, B0297, B0298, B0299, B0300, B030 1, B0302, B0304, B0305, SH247; Sealed envelopes S0123, S0124. (dmap) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Electronic Filing re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Hearing 336 e-mailed to davidgoakley@aol.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.1.1 : Recipient address rejected: aol.com'. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: The Court continues the Status Conference to Monday, September 24, 2012 at 8:30 a.m. (sch) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards, Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Joint Status Report)(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero. The parties Orders the parties to file a joint status report by Monday, July 23, 2012. (sch) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Ezra D Landes counsel for Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. Peter N. Nothstein will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Peter N. Nothstein is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Denise P. Edwards, et al. (Landes, Ezra) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Decision: Notice of United States Supreme Court's Dismissal of Writ of Certiorari as Improvidently Granted filed by Plaintiffs Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Notice (U.S. Supreme Court's per curiam dismissal, as docketed by the Ninth Circuit))(Spertus, James) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mail Returned addressed to Peter N. Nothstein re Order on Ex Parte Application, 330 (sch) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge S. James Otero: FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN hereby orders that status conference in this matter set for July 9, 2012 be continued to July 30, 2012 at 8:30am 329 . (pj) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Status Conference from July 9, 2012 to July 30, 2012 filed by plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Acknowledgment of Receipt from the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals: 2 sealed documents (dmap); Modified on 10/12/2011 (dmap). (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Acknowledgment of Receipt from the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals: 4 volumes; 24 Brown Folders: B0282, B0283, B0284, B0285, B0286, B0287, B0288, B0289, B0290, B0291, B0292, B0293, B0294, B0295, B0296, B0297, B0298, B0299, B0300, B0301, B0302, B0304, B0305, SH247. (dmap) ; Modified on 10/12/2011 (dmap). (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPEAL RECORD sealed documents sent to Circuit Court re: Appeal number, 10-708. 2 documents were sent with this transmittal. Document numbers S0123, S0124. (lr) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RECORD ON APPEAL sent to Circuit Court re: Appeal number, 10-708 Record consists of 4 volumes; 24 Brown Folders: B0282, B0283, B0284, B0285, B0286, B0287, B0288, B0289, B0290, B0291, B0292, B0293, B0294, B0295, B0296, B0297, B0298, B0299, B0300, B0301, B0302, B0304, B0305, SH247. (lr) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: The parties' request for a stay pending the United States Supreme Court's decision is GRANTED 319 and this action is STAYED. A status conference is scheduled for July 9, 2012 at 8:30 A.M. The Court STAYS discovery, VACATES all current case management dates, and all pending motions are taken off calendar (Docket Nos. 240 , 253 , 254 , 255 , 306 ). (lc) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Arbitration 254 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cyril V. Smith, # 2 Exhibit A to Smith Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Smith Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to Smith Decl., # 5 Exhibit D to Smith Decl.)(Meyer, William) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINDER in EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Pending United States Supreme Court Review 319 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Arbitration 254 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration)(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Certify Class 240 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Motion for Nationwide Class Certification filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Meyer, William) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Pending United States Supreme Court Review filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Certify Class 240 Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion for Nationwide Class Certification filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Certify Class 240 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Nationwide Class Certification filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Nationwide Class Certification)(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in Support of MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to on the Pleadings 255 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in Support of MOTION to Compel Arbitration 254 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY in Support of MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS 253 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Duvall in Support of Reply in Support of Motion to Decertify Tower CIty (Ohio) Class, # 2 Exhibit A to M. Duvall Declaration, # 3 Declaration of Todd A. Jones in Support of Reply in Support of Motion to Decertify Tower City (Ohio) Class, # 4 Exhibit A to T. Jones Declaration)(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Decision: Supplemental Authority filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Minter decision))(Meyer, William) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to on the Pleadings 255 CORRECTED filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William K. Meyer, # 2 Exhibit A to Meyer Decl.)(Meyer, William) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to on the Pleadings 255 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William K. Meyer, # 2 Exhibit A to Meyer Decl.)(Meyer, William) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS 253 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Richard S. Gordon, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Gordon Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to Gordon Decl., # 4 Exhibit 3 to Gordon Decl., # 5 Exhibit 4 to Gordon Decl.)(Meyer, William) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Arbitration 254 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Cyril V. Smith, # 2 Exhibit A to Smith Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Smith Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to Smith Decl., # 5 Exhibit D to Smith Decl., # 6 Exhibit E to Smith Decl., # 7 Affidavit Robert B. Holman)(Meyer, William) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF LODGING filed CD-ROM re Response in Opposition to Motion 256 (Edelstein, Andrew) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge S. James Otero. The parties are advised that MOTION to Certify Class filed by plaintiff Denise P Edwards 240 , scheduled for hearing on May 23, 2011, is taken under submission. Accordingly, the hearing date is vacated. Order will issue. (sch) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL APPLICATION to file under seal : plaintiffs appendix in support of class certification; DVD of voluminous evidence; defendants appendix ins support of opposition to plaintiffs motion for class certification; Edelstein and Fuller declarations in support of motion for decertification filed by defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 24 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation.(lc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 23 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (lc) Modified on 5/9/2011 (lc). (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 22 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation.(lc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 21 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (lc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 20 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (lc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 19 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation.(lc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 18 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (lc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 17 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation.] (lc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 16 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation.(lc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 15 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (lc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 14 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (lc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 13 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (lc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 12 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (lc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 11 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (lc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 10 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (lc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 9 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (lc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 8 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (lc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 7 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation.(lc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 6 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (lc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 5 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (lc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 4 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation.(lc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 3 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (lc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 2 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (lc) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: VOLUME 1 OF 24 256 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (lc) (Main Document 282 replaced on 5/9/2011) (lc). (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT IN RESPONSE TO ORDER REGARDING UNDER SEAL FILINGS filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards re: Order on Application for Order,,,,,,,,,,, 275 . (Spertus, James) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation of Defendants' Appendix in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification REDACTED. (Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation of Defendants' Appendix in Support of Opposition to Motion for Class Certification UNDER SEAL; Declarations of Andrew Z. Edelstein and Sheryl Fuller in Support of Motion to Decertify Tower City Class UNDER SEAL. (Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation of Supplemental Application to Seal Materials re Motion for Class Certification and Motion to Decertify Class and [Proposed] Order on Supplemental Application. (Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in Support of MOTION to Certify Class 240 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Meyer, William) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Appendix 271 , Appendix 272 , Appendix 273 , Appendix 274 . The following error(s) was found: Title page information and docket text do not correspond, tile page to # 273 missing). Docket entries read "REDACTED" and specifies which volume, but this information missing on the Title pages of the PDFs. PDFs, have label, "Filed Under Seal pursuant to 9/26/07 instead). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER DENYING STIPULATION RE SEALING OF CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION MATERIALS 249 ; DENYING DEFENDANTS'UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO SEAL APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TOPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 268 ; DENYING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO SEAL DECLARATION OF SHERYLL FULLER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS 269 ; DENYING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO SEAL DECLARATION OF ANDREW Z. EDELSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS 270 . Furthermore, the Court STRIKES all sealed documents pertaining to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification Docket Nos. 241 , 242 , 243 . Parties are ORDERED to submit supplemental applications to file under seal specific materials for the class certification motion consistent with this Order and file redacted versions on or before May 6, 2011. (lc) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPENDIX filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. Re: Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 234 (REDACTED) Vol. 3 (Meyer, William) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPENDIX filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. Re: Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 234 (REDACTED) Vol. 2B (Meyer, William) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPENDIX filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. Re: Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 234 (REDACTED) Vol. 2A (Meyer, William) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPENDIX filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. Re: Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 234 (REDACTED) Vol. 1 (Meyer, William) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        UNOPPOSED APPLICATION to seal DECLARATION OF ANDREW Z EDELSTEIN in support of defendants motion to decertify Tower City(Ohio) Class filed by defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to file under seal declaration of Sheryll Fuller in support of motion to decertify the Tower City(Ohio) Class filed by defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to seal appendix in support of opposition to plaintiffs motion for class certification filed by defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)by Judge S. James Otero: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Schedule Hearing Date on MotionsRelated to the Certified Tower City Class 239 . For good cause shown, the Court hereby ORDERS that the hearings for Defendants' Motion to Decertify the Tower City Class 253 and Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 255 be continued to July 5, 2011 at 10:00 a. m. (lc) Modified on 4/26/2011 (lc). (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation, re Response in Opposition to Motion 256 Appendix in Support of Opposition served on April 25, 2011. (Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation, re Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 258 of Declaration of Michael J. Duvall in Support of Defendants' Motion to Decertify Tower City Class served on April 25, 2011. (Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation of Application to Seal Declaration of Sheryll Fuller in Support of Defendants' Motion to Decertify Tower City Class; Declaration of Sheryll Fuller in Support of Defendants' Motion to Decertify the Tower City (Ohio) Class. (Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation of Appendix in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. (Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Michael J.Duvall In Support of MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS 253 VOLUME 5 OF 5 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Vol 5 of 5, part 2, # 2 Declaration Vol 5 of 5, part 3, # 3 Declaration Vol 5 of 5, part 4, # 4 Declaration Vol 5 of 5, part 5, # 5 Declaration Vol 5 of 5, part 6)(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Michael J. Duvall In Support of MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS 253 VOLUME 4 OF 5 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Vol 4 of 5, part 2, # 2 Declaration Vol 4 of 5, part 3, # 3 Declaration Vol 4 of 5, part 4, # 4 Declaration Vol 4 of 5, part 5, # 5 Declaration Vol 4 of 5, part 6)(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Michael J. Duvall In Support of MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS 253 VOLUME 3 OF 5 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Vol 3 of 5, part 2, # 2 Declaration Vol 3 of 5, part 3, # 3 Declaration Vol 3 of 5, part 4, # 4 Declaration Vol 3 of 5, part 5, # 5 Declaration Vol 3 of 5, part 6)(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Michael J. Duvall In Support of MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS 253 VOLUME 2 OF 5 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Vol 2 of 5, Part 2, # 2 Declaration Vol 2 of 5, Part 3, # 3 Declaration Vol 2 of 5, Part 4, # 4 Declaration Vol 2 of 5, Part 5, # 5 Declaration Vol 2 of 5, Part 6)(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Michael J. Duvall In Support of MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS 253 VOLUME 1 OF 5 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Vol 1 of 5, part 2, # 2 Declaration Vol 1 of 5, part 3)(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation of Defendants' Unopposed Application to Seal Appendix in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Class Certification; [Proposed] Order on Application. (Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION to MOTION to Certify Class 240 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to on the Pleadings filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 7/5/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of T. Jones, # 3 Declaration C. Syby, # 4 [Proposed] Judgment, # 5 Declaration of M.Duvall)(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 7/5/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of T. Jones, # 2 Declaration of M. Duvall, # 3 Proposed Order)(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS filed by DEFENDANTS First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 5/23/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS, # 2 Declaration TODD A. JONES DECLARATION IN SUPPORT, # 3 Declaration DECLARATION OF CRAIG W. SYBY IN SUPPORT, # 4 Declaration DECLARATION OF SHERYL FULLER IN SUPPORT, # 5 Declaration ANDREW Z. EDELSTEIN DECLARATION IN SUPPORT, # 6 Proposed Order DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED ORDER DECERTIFYING TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS)(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation of CONFIDENTIAL DECLARATION OF ANDREW Z. EDELSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS. (Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation of (1) DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO SEAL DECLARATION OF ANDREW Z. EDELSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DECERTIFY TOWER CITY (OHIO) CLASS; AND (2) [PROPOSED] ORDER ON UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO SEAL DECLARATION OF ANDREW Z. EDELSTEIN. (Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to file under seal pursuant to protective order dated 9/26/07; declaration of James W Spertus in support (DUPLICATE ORIGINAL) filed by plaintiff Denise P Edwards.(lc) Modified on 4/25/2011 (lc). (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint STIPULATION File Class Certification Motion Materials Under Seal filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Stipulation re Sealing of Class Certification Motion Materials)(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero:Having notified that the previous documents of confidential nature were erroneously filed by the parties, the Court hereby orders the Clerks Office to Seal following documents from the public view at the request of the parties: Docket # 241 - Exhibit Volume I; Docket # 242 - Exhibit Volume II; Docket # 243 - Exhibit Volume III. The parties are ordered to file Redacted Version of the documents in one week (lc) Modified on 4/22/2011 (lc). Modified on 4/22/2011 (lc). (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 1006 VOLUMINOUS MATERIAL IN SUPPORT re MOTION to Certify Class 240 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (lc) Modified on 2/14/2013 (mat). (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Defendants To Set Any Hearings on Motions Related to the Certified Tower City Class on a Date on or after July 5, 2011 239 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Meyer, William) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Defendants To Set Any Hearings on Motions Related to the Certified Tower City Class on a Date on or after July 5, 2011 239 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew Z. Edelstein in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Order Scheduling Hearing Date for New Motions, # 2 Exhibit A to C to Edelstein Declaration in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application)(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards of DVD OF FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 1006 VOLUMINOUS MATERIAL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. (Spertus, James) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 243 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT VOLUME III OF APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 240 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Spertus, James) Modified on 4/22/2011 (lc). Modified on 4/28/2011 (lc).(STRICKEN PER 4/28/11 MINUTES) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 242 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT VOLUME II OF APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 240 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Spertus, James) Modified on 4/22/2011 (lc). Modified on 4/28/2011 (lc).(STRICKEN PER 4/28/11 MINUTES) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 241 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT VOLUME I OF APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 240 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Spertus, James) Modified on 4/22/2011 (lc). Modified on 4/28/2011 (lc). (STRICKEN PER 4/28/11 MINUTES) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class filed by plaintiff Denise P Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 5/23/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Defendants To Set Any Hearings on Motions Related to the Certified Tower City Class on a Date on or after July 5, 2011 filed by plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER DENYING plaintiffs ex parte to file motion for class certification and supporting documents under seal (see document for list) by Judge S. James Otero, (lc) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Rescheduling the HearingDate on Plaintiff's Class Certification Motion, and for Leave to File an Additional Five Pages in Plaintiff's Reply Brief, filed on March 2, 2011 226 . The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's request to rescheduling the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification is set for hearing on May 23, 2011. The Court, however, will likely take the hearing off calendar and reset only if the Court determines that a hearing is required. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff leave to file a Reply of 10 pages. Plaintiff's Reply will be due on May 2, 2011. (lc) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Denise P Edwards, (1) Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification; (2) Memorandum of Point and Authorities; (3) Vol. I Appendix; (4) Vol. II Appendix ; (5) Vol. III Appendix; (6) Fed. R. Ev. 1006 Voluminous Writings (DVD); (7) Application for Leave to File Under Seal; and (8) [Proposed] Order Permitting Filing Under Seal served on March 21, 2011. (Spertus, James) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards of [Proposed] Order on Ex Parte Application to Seal Pleadings. (Spertus, James) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 3/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards of (1) Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification; (2) Memorandum of Point and Authorities; (3) Vol.I Appendix; (4) Vol.II Appendix ; (5) Vol.III Appendix; (6) Fed. R. Ev. 1006 Voluminous Writings (DVD); (7) Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Under Seal. (Spertus, James) (Entered: 03/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero:ORDER AMENDING THE COURT'S FEBRUARY 25, 2011 ORDER 225 . The Court corrects its February 25, 2011 Order as follows: Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification is set for hearing on May 16, 2011. The Court does not intend to hold any evidentiary hearingsregarding Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. Defendants' Opposition will be due on April 25, 2011, 35 days after the due date for Plaintiff'sMotion for Class Certification and 21 days before the hearing date. Defendants are granted leave to file an Opposition of 25 pages. (lc) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER DENYING 229 Ex Parte Application to Stay Case by Judge S. James Otero: DENIED by the Order of the Court. (sch) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: granting 228 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Elizabeth Ferrick on behalf of Defendants, designating Robert F. Scoular as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending United States Supreme Court Review 229 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending United States Supreme Court Review filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Stay of Proceedings Pending United States Supreme Court Review, # 2 Exhibit A to F to Edelstein Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application for Stay of Proceedings, # 3 Proposed Order on Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Stay of Proceedings)(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for attorney Elizabeth T. Ferrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Application of Elizabeth T. Ferrick to Appear in a Specific Case)(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF'S CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION, AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN ADDITIONAL FIVE PAGES IN PLAINTIFFS REPLY BRIEF 226 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF'S CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION, AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN ADDITIONAL FIVE PAGES IN PLAINTIFFS REPLY BRIEF filed by plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge S. James Otero GRANTING Ex Parte Application for an Extended Briefing Schedule and Evidentiary hearing on Plaintiff Motion for class certification 221 as follows: Defendants opposition will be due April 25, 35 days after the due date for Plaintiff Motion for Class Certification and 21 days before the hearing date; Defendants are granted leave to file an opposition of 25 pages; and A hearing will be held on Plaintiff Motion for Class Certification on 5/16/2011 at 10:00 AM. (jp) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Extended Briefing Schedule and Evidentiary Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification 221 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. correcting EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Extended Briefing Schedule and Evidentiary Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification 221 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Errata re [Proposed] Order on Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Extended Briefing Schedule and Evidentiary Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification)(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses of First American Financial Corporation to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant The First American Corporation. (Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Extended Briefing Schedule and Evidentiary Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew Z. Edelstein in Support of Ex Parte Application for Extended Briefing Schedule and Evidentiary Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, # 2 Exhibit A to M to A. Edelstein Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application for Extended Briefing Schedule and Evidentiary Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, # 3 Proposed Order on Ex Parte Application for Extended Briefing Schedule and Evidentiary Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification)(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: GRANTING Motion for Leave to File Amended answers 198 . (See attached Minute Order for further information). The Court deems the Amended Answers filed and served effective 2/22/2011. (jp) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 2/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint STIPULATION for Discovery as to Depositions filed by Plaintiffs Denise P Edwards.(Meyer, William) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings February 1, 2011 at 10:11 AM (mw) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on February 1, 2011 at 10:11 AM. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Huntington Court Reporters and Transcription, Inc., phone number (626) 792-7250. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/10/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2011. (mw) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF Plaintiff's Motion Hearing DENYING Motion for Sanctions and Motion to Compel, 201 held before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm:Case called. Counsel make their appearance. Court hears arguments. Plaintiffs motion for sanctions is denied as stated on the record. Court Reporter: CS 2/1/11. (sl) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: granting 213 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Celia Kate Douglas on behalf of First American Financial Corp. and First American Title Insur. Co., designating Robert F. Scoular as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION for attorney Celia Kate Douglas to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Application of Celia K. Douglas to Appear in a Specific Case)(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Court hereby grants Defendants First American Financial Corporation andFirst American Title Insurance Companys Application to Withdraw and Refile Reply in Support of Defendants Motion for Leave to File Amended Answers in this case 208 . The Reply in Support of Defendants Motion for Leave to File Amended Answers is deemed withdrawn and replaced by the Reply attached to Defendants Application by Judge S. James Otero (lc) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: The parties are advised that MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answers to Complaint filed byDefendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation 198 filed 12/21/10, scheduled for hearing on January 24, 2011, is taken under submission. Accordingly, the hearing date is vacated. Order will issue. (lc) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Sanctions Precluding Use of Certain Evidence By First American Corp. and First American Title Ins. Co. in Opposition to Class Certification Motion MOTION to Compel Compliance with November 8, 2010, Scheduling Order 201 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Spertus, James) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY Opposition MOTION for Sanctions Precluding Use of Certain Evidence By First American Corp. and First American Title Ins. Co. in Opposition to Class Certification Motion MOTION to Compel Compliance with November 8, 2010, Scheduling Order 201 Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Andrew Z. Edelstein in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions)(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Withdraw and Refile Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Amended Answers Reply (Motion related) 207 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Amended Answers, # 2 Proposed Order on Unopposed Application to Withdraw and Refile Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Amended Answers)(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in Support of MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answers to Complaint 198 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Scoular, Robert) Modified on 1/20/2011 (lc). (DEEMED WITHDRAWN PER 1/20/11 ORDER) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER ON STIPULATION MODIFYING STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER (DOC. #41) by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: re Stipulation to Amend/Correct, 200 (see attached). (jm) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION to MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answers to Complaint 198 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Bornstein, Katherine) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 1/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Andrew Z. Edelstein in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions Precluding Use of Certain Evidence By First American Corp. and First American Title Ins. Co. in Opposition to Class Certification Motion MOTION to Compel Compliance with November 8, 2010, Scheduling Order 201 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-M, # 2 Exhibit N-Z, # 3 Exhibit AA-MM, # 4 Exhibit NN)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 01/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Karen Lieber in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions Precluding Use of Certain Evidence By First American Corp. and First American Title Ins. Co. in Opposition to Class Certification Motion MOTION to Compel Compliance with November 8, 2010, Scheduling Order 201 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Spertus, James) (Entered: 01/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 1/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION for Sanctions Precluding Use of Certain Evidence By First American Corp. and First American Title Ins. Co. in Opposition to Class Certification Motion MOTION to Compel Compliance with November 8, 2010, Scheduling Order 201 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Tom Wawersich, # 2 Exhibit B (November 8, 2010 Scheduling Order), # 3 Exhibit C (Declaration of William K. Meyer), # 4 Exhibit D (Nov. 29, 2010 Order Granting Ex Parte App.))(Spertus, James) (Entered: 01/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 1/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Precluding Use of Certain Evidence By First American Corp. and First American Title Ins. Co. in Opposition to Class Certification Motion, MOTION to Compel Compliance with November 8, 2010, Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 2/1/2011 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 01/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION to Amend Stipulation and Order 41 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Stipulation Modifying Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order (Doc. #41))(Edelstein, Andrew) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Margo Weinstein in Support of MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answers to Complaint 198 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answers to Complaint filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Proposed Amended Answer of First American Financial Corporation, # 2 Supplement Proposed Amended Answer of First American Title Insurance Company, # 3 Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to File Amended Answers)(Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: granting 196 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William K. Meyer on behalf of Denise P. Edwards, designating James W. Spertus as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for attorney William K. Meyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7871934 paid.) filed by plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: granting 184 plaintiffs Ex Parte Application that the 10-day period for defendants to participate in a pre-filing conference shall be shortened to one day. the 7 day period for defendants to deliver their portion of the required Joint stipulation shall also be shortened to one day. (lc) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Andrew Zachary Edelstein counsel for Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. Adding Michael J. Duvall as attorney as counsel of record for First American Financial Corporation and First American Title Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendants First American Financial Corporation and First American Title Insurance Company (Edelstein, Andrew) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Andrew Zachary Edelstein counsel for Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. Adding Margo Weinstein as attorney as counsel of record for First American Financial Corporation and First American Title Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendants First American Financial Corporation and First American Title Insurance Company (Edelstein, Andrew) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: denying 181 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice, William K. Meyer. (sce) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: denying 177 Charles J. Stevens Application to Withdraw as Attorney without prejudice to renew. (lc) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: denying 176 Bradley A. Benbrook Application to Withdraw as Attorney without prejudice to renew. (lc) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: granting 168 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney MARGO WEINSTEIN on behalf of Defendant, First American Fin. Corp. and First American Title Insurance Co., designating JOEL D. SIEGEL as local counsel. (sce) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: granting 170 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney MICHAEL J. DUVALL on behalf of Defendant First American Fin. Corp. and First American Title Insurance Co., designating JOEL D. SIEGEL as local counsel. (sce) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge S. James Otero; Hearing held. The Court and counsel confer regarding scheduling dates. The Court places this matter on second call and orders the parties to meet and confer outside. Matter recalled. The parties agree to the following schedule: Defendants begin production of deal/transaction files for all 180 title companies: November 8, 2010.Parties conduct ESI conference: November 15, 2010. Parties exchange initial disclosures under November 23, 2010 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 (including, but not limited to the list of 180 title companies with name, address, dates of transaction/acquisition, and First American percentage of ownership:November 23, 2010. Defendants produce documents in response November 30, 2010 to outstanding document requests and respond to open interrogatories; complete production of any of the remaining deal/transaction files for all 180 title companies:November 30, 2010.Plaintiff to file class certification motion: March 21, 2011.Discovery cutoff: August 1, 2011.Motion hearing cutoff for all motions except class certification: September 12, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. Pretrial Conference:October 17, 2011 at 9:00 a.m.Jury Trial: November 1, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. All discovery disputes are to be brought before the Magistrate Judge assigned to the case. Parties reminded of requirements of FRCP 26-1(a); counsel are advised all pretrial documents (as listed) must be filed in compliance with Courts Initial Standing order.Court Recorder: CS: 11/8/10. (lc) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for ACCELERATING THE MEET AND CONFER SCHEDULE SET FORTH IN LOCAL RULE 37 184 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Spertus, James) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition in opposition to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for ACCELERATING THE MEET AND CONFER SCHEDULE SET FORTH IN LOCAL RULE 37 184 Opposition of Defendants First American Financial Corporation and First American Title Insurance Company to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Accelerate Meet and Confer Schedule Set Forth in Local Rule 37 filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Michael J. Duvall in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Acceleration of Local Rule 37 Meet and Confer Deadlines)(Edelstein, Andrew) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for ACCELERATING THE MEET AND CONFER SCHEDULE SET FORTH IN LOCAL RULE 37 filed by plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 11-8-10 9:00 a.m. & 1:32 p.m. (ha) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11-8-10 9:00 a.m. & 1:32 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc., phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/8/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2011. (ha) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 11/10/0100, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION for attorney William K Meyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by plaintiff Denise P Edwards. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney James W Spertus counsel for Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. Adding Katherine B. Bornstein as attorney as counsel of record for Denise P. Edwards for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Denise P. Edwards (Spertus, James) (Entered: 11/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Scheduling Order re Report 172 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Edelstein, Andrew) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF LODGING filed in Support of Proposed Scheduling Order re Report 172 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION of Charles J. Stevens to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Benbrook, Bradley) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION of Bradley A. Benbrook to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Benbrook, Bradley) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MANDATE from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 08-56536 and 08-56538. The decision of the district fourtis affirmed in part ; reversed in part and remanded. Order received in this district on 9/8/2010. (dmap) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error document number 158 was erroneously docketed as an order. The correct docket entry should read Mandate. The order will be re docketed as a Mandate. Re: USCA Order 158 . (dmap) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Report 172 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event: Joint Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT REPORT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards, Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of firm name by Robert F Scoular attorney for Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. Changing firm name to SNR Denton US LLP. Filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Scoular, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for attorney Michael J. Duvall to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Siegel, Joel) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of firm name by Andrew Zachary Edelstein attorney for Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. Changing firm name to SNR Denton US LLP. Filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Edelstein, Andrew) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for attorney Margo Weinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Siegel, Joel) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Michael J. Duvall to Appear Pro Hac Vice 164 . The following error(s) was found: A Certification of Good Standing is not attached to Pro Hac Vice Application. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (mg) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORRECTED NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Margo Weinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice 163 . The following error(s) was found: Certificate of Good Standing is not attached.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (mg) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Margo Weinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice 163 . The following error(s) was found: 1) Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. See General Order 08-02 re: electronically filing proposed orders. 2) Certificate of Good Standing is not attached. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (mg) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for attorney Michael J. Duvall to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7654525 paid.) filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Siegel, Joel) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for attorney Margo Weinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7654450 paid.) filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Siegel, Joel) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of firm name by Joel D Siegel attorney for Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. Changing firm name to SNR Denton US LLP. Filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Siegel, Joel) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Certification Of Interested Parties Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company, identifying First American Financial Corporation. (Newman, Charles) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of firm name by Charles A Newman attorney for Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. Changing firm name to SNR Denton US LLP. Filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Newman, Charles) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPEAL RECORD RETURNED from 9th CCA Received: Volume(s): 4; 2 Sealed Documents(s): S0123, S0124. (lr) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 08-56536 and 08-56538. The decision of the district fourtis affirmed in part ; reversed in part and remanded. Order received in this district on 9/8/2010. (dmap) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 08-56536 and 08-56538. "Appellants Limited Motion for Clarification, Correction and/or Panel Rehearing" is DENIED. The panel has voted to deny Appellees petition for panel rehearing. Judges Pregerson and Graber have voted to deny Appellees petition for rehearing en banc, and Judge Fletcher has so recommended. The full court has been advised of the petition for rehearing en banc, and no judge of the court has requested a vote on it. Appellees petition for panel rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc are DENIED. Order received in this district on 8/30/2010. (dmap) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge S. James Otero, re Stipulation 154 the status conference previously scheduled for July 26, 2010, at 8:30 a.m. is continued to Monday, November 8, 2010 @ 8:30 a.m. The parties shall file a joint report by October 25, 2010. (lc) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 08-56536, 08-56538. Order received in this district on 7/12/10. Appellees are directed to file a response to Appellant's Limited Motion for Clarification, Correction and/or Panel Rehearing filed July 6, 2010. See Order for more details. (cbr) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report and Continue Status Conference filed by Defendants First American Title Insurance Company, The First American Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Newman, Charles) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge S. James Otero:, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings:( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/12/2010., Scheduling Conference set for 7/26/2010 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero.) (lc) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 08-56536, 08-56538. The addendum to Appellant's reply brief, construed as a request for judicial notice, and all related filings are DENIED. Order received in this district on 6/14/2010. (lr) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 08-56536, 08-56538. The Motion for Leave to File Brief of National Association of Independent Land Title Agents as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiff-Appellant and in Favor of Reversal is GRANTED. The brief tendered March 12, 2009 is ordered filed. Order received in this district on 6/14/2010. (lr) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPEAL RECORD sealed documents sent to Circuit Court, re: Appeal number, 08-56536. 2 documents were sent with this transmittal (lra) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RECORD ON APPEAL as to sent to US Court of Appeals Appeal number, 08-56536, clerk's file 3 volumes (lra) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Order, Util - Class Action Denied 74 , Order, 126 , CCA # 08-56536, 08-56538. The appellees' opposed motion to strike the addendum to the appellant's reply brief is granted. 9th Cir. R. 28-1(b). The Clerk shall strike the noted addendum. Order received in this district on 5/29/09. (lr) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF RECORD Transmitted to USCA re 9th Circuit Court of Appellate Number 08-56536 and 08-56538 (car) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 08-56536, 08-56538. The court is in receipt of the motion of the National Association of Independent Title Agents for leave to file an amicus curiae brief. The motion and any future related filings shall be referred for disposition to the panel that considers the merits of the case. Copies of the proffered brief shall be provided to the panel to aid resolution of the motion. Any further requests to file friend of the court briefs shall be treated in the same fashion. Court records do not currently reflect that the district court has issued the certificates of record. The appellant shall monitor the issuance of the certificates. Order received in this district on 3/20/09. (car) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error The Attorney used incorrect event code of Miscellanous Document for Transcript Designation and Ordering Form. Item Number (139). Re: Miscellaneous Document 139 (lr) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge S. James Otero Granting Substituting attorney Joel D Siegel for The First American Corporation in place and stead of attorney Darci F Madden; Brian J Recor; Gustavo A Torres; Douglas W King and Keith D Klein. (bp) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order On Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Siegel, Joel) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order On Request for Approval for Substitution of Attorney)(Siegel, Joel) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Joel D Siegel attorney for Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company, changing Address and firm name to Sonnenschein Nath & Rosenthal LLP, 601 South Figueroa Street, Suite 2500, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, and First American Title Insurance Company (Siegel, Joel) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 08-56536, 08-56538. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to respond to appellees' motion to dismiss is granted. Appellant's response is due December 2, 2008. Briefing is held in abeyance pending disposition of the motion to dismiss. (cbr) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript Designation and Ordering Form A-9 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards re: USCA Order,, 136 (Spertus, James) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appeal Fee Paid: re Order from 9th CCA filed, CCA 08-56538; 136 as to Plaintiff Denise P. Edwards; Receipt Number: 111596, Paid in the amount of $455.00. (lr) Modified on 9/30/2008 (lr). (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Appeal Fee Paid: re Order from 9th CCA filed, CCA 08-56536, 131 ; as to Plaintiff Denise P. Edwards; Receipt Number: 111595, Paid in the amount of $455.00. (lr) Modified on 9/29/2008 (lr, ). (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 07-80211. Respondents' motion to lift the stay of proceedings is granted. The court, in its discretion, grants the petition for permission to appeal the district court's December 10, 2007 order denying class action certification. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(f); Chamberlan v. Ford Motor Co., 402 F.3d 952 (9th Cir. 2005) (per curiam). Within 10 days after the date of this order, petitioner shall perfect the appeal in accordance with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 5(d). Petitioner's motion to stay all district court proceedings pending determination of this appeal is granted. Order received in this district on 9/24/08. (lr) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney James W Spertus counsel for Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. Lawrence C. Jones will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Lawrence C. Jones is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Denise Edwards (Spertus, James) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney James W Spertus counsel for Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. Adding Ezra D. Landes as attorney as counsel of record for Denise Edwards for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Denise Edwards (Spertus, James) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 07-80211. Respondent's motion to lift the stay of proceedings is granted. The court, in its discretion, grants the petition for permission to appeal the district court's 12/10/07 order denying class action certification. Within 10 days after the date of this order, petitioner shall perfect the appeal in accordance with Fededral Rule of Appellate Procedure 5(d). Petitioner's motion to stay all district court proceedings pending determination of this appeal is granted. Order received in this district on 9/22/08. (car) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 08-56536, CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals as to Plaintiff Denise P. Edwars re: USCA Order,, 131 (cbr) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 08-80096. The court, in its discretion, grants the petition for permission to appeal the district court's 6/6/08 order denying class action certification. Within 10 days after the date of this order, petitioner shall perfect the appeal in accordance with Fededral Rule of Appellate Procedure 5(d). Petitioner's motion to stay all district court proceedings pending determination of this appeal is granted. Order received in this district on 9/16/08. (car) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE by Judge S. James Otero, re Joint EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Specific Discovery Deadlines 129 (bp) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Specific Discovery Deadlines filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Re Ex Parte Joint Application to Extend and Make More Specifc Discovery Deadlines)(Recor, Brian) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for a Stay Pending Ninth Circuit Orders 127 held before Judge S. James Otero. Edwards' Application id DENIED for the reasons contained in this order. See order for details. (csi) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Rulings by Ninth Circuit on Petitions for Review of Orders Denying Class Certification filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 06/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Second Motion for Class Certification 99 by Judge S. James Otero. Because the proposed class is not maintainable under Rule 23(b)(3), Edwards' Motion for Certificatino of a Tower City Class is DENIED. See order for further details. (csi) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge S. James Otero DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION for Hearing on Motion for Class Certification of Tower City Class, re MOTION to Certify Class as Tower City Class 99 , 121 . (rrey) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 124 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of TODD A. JONES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION to Certify Class as Tower City Class 99 filed (lra) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 123 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of BRIAN J. RECOR IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION to Certify Class as Tower City Class 99 filed (lra) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge S. James Otero, GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION to Seal 116 (lra) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EX PARTE APPLICATION for Hearing on Motion for Class Certification of Tower City Class, re MOTION to Certify Class as Tower City Class 99 , filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Request for Hearing)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' ex parte application to file Exhibits A and B to the declaration of Brian J. Recor and Exhibits A-F to the Declaration of Todd A. Jones under seal is hereby GRANTED by Judge S. James Otero, re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Seal 116 (bp) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY In Support of MOTION to Certify Class as Tower City Class 99 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 17, 18 AND 19)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defedants' The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company, re Declaration (Motion related) 117 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Seal 116 served on 5/6/08. (bp) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Brian J. Recor in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Seal 116 filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company. (bp) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EX PARTE APPLICATION to File Document Under Seal filed by defendants' The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company. Lodged Proposed.(bp) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge S. James Otero : re: MOTION to Certify Class as Tower City Class 99 . The parties are advised that the MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF A TOWER CITY CLASS filed by plaintiffs on 4/21/08, scheduled for hearing on 5/19/08, at 10:00 a.m. is taken under submission. Accordingly, the hearing date is vacated. Order will issue. (bp) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company, re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 113 PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE served on May 6, 2008. (Recor, Brian) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company of Defendant's Ex Parte Application to File Document Under Seal; Declaration of Brian J. Recor in Support of Ex Parte Application; [Proposed] Order Authorizing Filing Under Seal. (Recor, Brian) (Entered: 05/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company, re Declaration (Motion related) 110 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion 107 , Declaration (Motion related) 109 , Declaration (Motion related) 108 PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE served on May 5, 2008. (Recor, Brian) (Entered: 05/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company, re Declaration (Motion related) 110 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion 107 , Declaration (Motion related) 109 , Declaration (Motion related) 108 served on May 5, 2008. (Recor, Brian) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Tom Wawersich in opposition to MOTION to Certify Class as Tower City Class 99 filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company. (Recor, Brian) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Todd A. Jones in opposition to MOTION to Certify Class as Tower City Class 99 filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company. (Recor, Brian) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Brian J. Recor in opposition to MOTION to Certify Class as Tower City Class 99 filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company. (Recor, Brian) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company. (Recor, Brian) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company of (1) Exhibits A - F to Declaration of Todd A. Jones, (2) Exhibits A - B to Declaration of Brian J. Recor. (Recor, Brian) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company, re Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06), Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) 104 served on May 1, 2008. (Klein, Keith) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Keith D Klein counsel for Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company. Adding Brian Recor as attorney as counsel of record for The First American Corporation and First American Title Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, et al. (Klein, Keith) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO JOIN A PARTY held before Judge S. James Otero : re: MOTION to Dismiss Complaint 76 . (bp) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO JOIN A PARTY Judge S. James Otero : re: MOTION to Dismiss Complaint 76 . (bp) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS 1, 2, 3, 9, 11, 12, 13 AND 14 UNDER SEAL re MOTION to Certify Class as Tower City Class 99 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Spertus, James) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 10, 15 and 16 to MOTION to Certify Class as Tower City Class 99 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Vol II# 2 Exhibit Vol III# 3 Exhibit Vol. IV)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class as Tower City Class filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards.Motion set for hearing on 5/19/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Spertus, James) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Seal Certain Exhibits filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Spertus, James) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Frederick F. Mumm : ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE: Pursuant to the Joint Notice of Withdrawal of (1) Plaintiffs Notice of Deposition; and (2) Defendants Motion for Rule 26(c) Protective Order to Quash CEO Deposition, filed April 1, 2008, the hearing scheduled for April 15, 2008 is vacated. (jm) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge S. James Otero, re ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND THE COURT'S ORDER DENYING CLASS CERTIFICATION 74 [Docket No. 93] (vcr) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company, served on James Spertus. (Klein, Keith) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT Exhibits A-D to MOTION to Amend Order, Util - Class Action Denied 74 93 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Spertus, James) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Order, Util - Class Action Denied 74 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (Spertus, James) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Withdrawal of (1) Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition; and (2) Defendants' Motion for Rule 26(c) Protective Order to Quash CEO Deposition filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company. (Klein, Keith) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Withdrawal of (1) Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition; and (2) Defendants' Motion for Rule 26(c) Protective Order to Quash CEO Deposition filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company. (Klein, Keith) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge S. James Otero, Re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Class Certification 82 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Ex Parte Application for an extension of time to respond to the Motion for Class Certification and to continue the hearing is GRANTED as follows: 1) Defendant's shall file and serve their Opposition to the Motion for Class Certification on or before May 5, 2008. 2) Plaintiff shall file her reply to the opposition by May 12, 2008. 3) Oral argument, if necessary, will be heard on May 19, 2008, at 10:00 a.m. (csi) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company, served on Declaration of Parker S. Kennedy, Declaration of Richard S. Grodon, Joint Stipulation Re Defendants' Motion for Rule 26(c) Protective Order, Notice of Motion and Motion for Rule 26(c) Protective Order. (Klein, Keith) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Richard S. Gordon filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company. (Klein, Keith) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company.(Klein, Keith) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Parker S. Kennedy filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company. (Klein, Keith) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for Rule 26(c) Protective Order filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company.Motion set for hearing on 4/15/2008 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (Klein, Keith) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company, served on Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Extensinon of Time to Respond to Motion for Class Certification, Declaration of Darci F. Madden re Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Class Certificfation and [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Class Certification. (Klein, Keith) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Darci F. Madden re Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company. (Klein, Keith) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company.(Klein, Keith) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge S. James Otero : Order Granting the Parties' Joint Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. Class Certification Discovery Cutoff 4/11/08; Class Certification Hearing 5/12/08 at 9:00 a.m. Discovery cut-off 7/31/2008., Motion hearing cutoff 9/15/2008.,Jury Trial set for 10/28/2008 09:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero.,Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2008 09:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (bp) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION to Stay Case The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company, Denise P Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Madden, Darci) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge S. James Otero : The parties are advised that MOTION to Dismiss Complaint 76 , scheduled for hearing on 1/7/08, is taken under submission. Accordingly, the hearing date is vacated. Order will issue. (bp) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION to Dismiss Complaint 76 filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company. (bp) (Entered: 01/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Complaint 76 filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards. (mmu) (Entered: 12/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for failure to join an indispensable party filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 1/7/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. Lodged Notice and Motion. (rmo) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR INTERLOUCTORY APPEAL by Judge S. James Otero, re MOTION to Certify the 10/11/07 order for appeal MOTION to Stay Case 67 (rmo) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge S. James Otero 42 Class Action Denied. (rmo) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Certify the 10/11/07 order for appeal MOTION to Stay Case 67 , MOTION to Certify Class 42 filed by Defendants The First American Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company. (bp) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to ADR Questionnaire filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards (bp) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Peter M. Nothstein for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID. filed by plaintiff Denise P Edwards. Lodged proposed order. (bp) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Denise P Edwards.. (bp) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 652 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?