District Hospital Partners, et al v. Sylvia Mathews Burwell
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 14-5061

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 3:32 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Nature of Suit 2151 - Contract: Medicare Act Overpay
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207617987 Unknown Document Type
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207616379 Unknown Document Type
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207616375 Unknown Document Type
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207606784 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CLERK'S ORDER filed [1500163] granting appellants' unopposed motion to defer briefing schedule by approximately two weeks [1499797-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Brief due 07/31/2014. APPELLEE Brief due on 09/08/2014. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 09/22/2014. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 09/29/2014. Final Briefs due 10/06/2014. [14-5061]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207605996 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1499797] by All Plaintiffs APPELLANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DEFER BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR APPROXIMATELY TWO WEEKS. Pages: 1-10. [14-5061] (Roth, Robert)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207602193 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            CLERK'S ORDER filed [1497561] setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 07/23/2014. APPELLEE Brief due on 08/22/2014. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 09/05/2014. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 09/12/2014. Final Briefs due 09/26/2014. [14-5061]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207595684 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE FILED [1494059] by All Plaintiffs Appellants' Notice of Change of Address. [Service Date: 05/22/2014 ] [14-5061] (Roth, Robert)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207589321 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1490416] by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 04/28/2014 ] [14-5061] (Roth, Robert)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207589318 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                  STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1490415] by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 04/28/2014 ] [14-5061] (Roth, Robert)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207589315 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                    DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1490414] by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 04/28/2014 ] [14-5061] (Roth, Robert)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207589028 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                      CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1490276] to notice [1490237-2] filed by All Plaintiffs. [14-5061] (Roth, Robert)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207588994 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1490254] to notice [1490247-2], certificate [1490252-2] filed by Kathleen Sebelius. [14-5061] (Luh, James)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207588989 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                          CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1490252] by Kathleen Sebelius [Service Date: 04/28/2014 ] [14-5061] (Luh, James)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207588977 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                            UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1490249] by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 04/28/2014 ] [14-5061] (Roth, Robert)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207588972 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                              ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1490247] by James C. Luh and co-counsel H. Thomas Byron on behalf of Appellee Kathleen Sebelius. [14-5061] (Luh, James)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207588957 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1490241] by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 04/28/2014 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [14-5061] (Roth, Robert)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207588954 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                  TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1490240] by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 04/28/2014 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [14-5061] (Roth, Robert)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207588944 Unknown Document Type
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207580701 Unknown Document Type
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207579009 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1484776] by Aiken Regional Medical Centers, Inc., All Plaintiffs, Auburn Regional Medical Center, Inc., Cedars Healthcare Group, Ltd., Central Montgomery Medical Center, L.L.C., Chalmette Medical Center, Inc., District Hospital Partners, L.P., Galen Hospital Alaska, Inc., Good Samaritan Hospital, L.P., HCA-Healthone, LLC, JFK Medical Center Limited Partnership, Lancaster Hospital Corporation, Laredo Regional Medical Center, Los Robles Regional Medical Center, Manatee Memorial Hospital, L.P., Mcallen Hospital, L.P., Miami Beach Healthcare Group, Ltd., Northwest Texas Healthcare System, Inc., Okaloosa Hospital, Inc., Osceola Regional Hospital, Inc., Pendleton Methodist Hospital, L.L.C., Riverside Healthcare System, L.P., San Jose Healthcare System, L.P., San Jose Hospital, L.P., Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, L.P., UHS Of Oklahoma, Inc., UHS Of Puerto Rico, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc., Valley Health System, LLC, Wellington Regional Medical Center, Inc. and West Hills Hospital seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:11-cv-00116-ESH. Assigned USCA Case Number [14-5061]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 55 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?