Kunz v. Cox et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:12-cv-40037
Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 17, 2016 at 8:12 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kai Kunz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ruth Allen Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David E. Ashworth +1 508 753 9199 +1 508 753 9199 d_evan_ashworth@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo Attorney Anthony J Benedetti, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Massachusetts Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas A Ogden +1 617 963 2211 nicholas.ogden@state.ma.us
No Logo City of Haverhill, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Benedetti, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kopelman & Paige, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janelle M. Austin +1 617 556 0007 +1 617 654 1735 jaustin@k-plaw.com
TERMINATED: 11/29/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katharine Isabel Doyle +6175560 007 ext1726 +1 617 654 1735 kdoyle@k-plaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michele E. Randazzo +1 617 556 0007 +1 617 654 1735 mrandazzo@k-plaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M. Silverstein +1 617 556 0007 +1 617 654 1729 jsilverstein@k-plaw.com
No Logo Katherine Cox, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine Cox
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Janelle M. Austin on behalf of Joseph Benedetti, City of Haverhill (Austin, Janelle) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Canceling Deadline. The motion hearing scheduled for 3/13/14 is hereby canceled.(Castles, Martin) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER entered granting 18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and denying as moot 22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs Amended Complaint (Docket No. 5) is not signed and was filed without leave of Court and is therefore, stricken. See Fed.R.Civ.P. 11(a), 15(a)(1)(A). The motion to dismiss filed by A. Benedetti (Docket No. 22) is, therefore, denied, as moot. The motion to dismiss the original complaint for failure to state a claim filed by the City of Haverhill and J. Benedetti (Docket No. 18) is allowed, without prejudice, for the reasons set forth in the motion and supporting memorandum. The plaintiff, who is now represented by counsel, may seek leave of Court to file an amended complaint within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM the Amended Complaint, 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2014 at 10:00AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 35 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
          Opposition re 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, and Attached Ex. "A" [proposed] Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; filed by Kai Kunz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A")(Ashworth, David) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to File opposition. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
            Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 02-03-14 to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Kai Kunz.(Ashworth, David) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
              Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Order granting motion to extend time 31 was corrected because: Order was entered as to both motions to dismiss 18 and 22 when it should have been entered as to document 18 only. Entry has been corrected. (Castles, Martin) Modified on 1/9/2014 (Castles, Martin). (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 1/24/2014. (Castles, Martin) Modified on 1/9/2014 (Castles, Martin). Modified on 1/9/2014 (Castles, Martin). (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                  Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/24/2014 to File Response/Reply Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion To Dismiss, by Kai Kunz.(Ashworth, David) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Response due by 1/13/2014. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/7/2013, Entered: None
                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/13/14 to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion To Dismiss by Kai Kunz.(Ashworth, David) Modified on 12/9/2013 (Castles, Martin). (Entered: 12/07/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/7/2013, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Ashworth on behalf of Kai Kunz (Ashworth, David) (Entered: 12/07/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Michele E. Randazzo on behalf of Anthony J Benedetti, Joseph Benedetti, City of Haverhill, Katherine Cox (Randazzo, Michele) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Katharine Isabel Doyle (Doyle, Katharine) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 24 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                              CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re 23 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM the Amended Complaint by Nicholas A Ogden on behalf of Anthony J Benedetti. (Ogden, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM the Amended Complaint filed by Anthony J Benedetti. (Ogden, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                  MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM the Amended Complaint by Anthony J Benedetti.(Ogden, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas A Ogden on behalf of Anthony J Benedetti (Ogden, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                      CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Katharine Isabel Doyle on behalf of City of Haverhill, Joseph Benedetti by on behalf of City of Haverhill, Joseph Benedetti. Related document: 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Joseph Benedetti, City of Haverhill.(Doyle, Katharine) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Joseph Benedetti, City of Haverhill. (Silverstein, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                          MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Joseph Benedetti, City of Haverhill.(Silverstein, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Joseph Benedetti answer due 10/23/2013; City of Haverhill answer due 10/23/2013. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Anthony J Benedetti served on 10/9/2013, answer due 10/30/2013. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/23/2013 to file response by Katharine Isabel Doyle on behalf of Joseph Benedetti, City of Haverhill. (Doyle, Katharine) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/23/2013 to file response by Joseph Benedetti, City of Haverhill.(Doyle, Katharine) Modified on 10/23/2013 (Castles, Martin). (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Katharine Isabel Doyle on behalf of Joseph Benedetti, City of Haverhill (Doyle, Katharine) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Silverstein on behalf of Joseph Benedetti, City of Haverhill (Silverstein, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                        US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for City of Haverhill served on 9/18/2013, answer due 10/9/2013. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                          US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Joseph Benedetti served on 9/18/2013, answer due 10/9/2013. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                            Summons Returned Unexecuted by Kai Kunz as to Katherine Cox. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                              Summons Issued at the counter as to Anthony J Benedetti, Joseph Benedetti, City of Haverhill, Katherine Cox. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                ***Staff notes - Mailed blank summons to Plaintiff this day with instruction for completion. (Burgos, Sandra) (Burgos, Sandra). (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. 1.The Clerk shall correct the docket to reflect defendant's name as Katherine Cox. 2.The Clerk shall issue summonses and the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the summons, amended complaint, and this order upon the defendants as directed by plaintiff with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against Haverhill Police Department, Anthony J Benedetti, Kristin Cox, Joseph Benedetti, City of Haverhill, filed by Kai Kunz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Within 35 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, Plaintiff shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed, or he shall file an amended complaint that cures the pleading deficiencies." (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. Mailed to Mr. Kunz (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kai Kunz.(Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            COMPLAINT against Haverhill Police Department, Flynn, Anthony J Benedetti, Kristin Cox, Joseph Benedetti, filed by Kai Kunz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 civil cover and category sheets)(Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 754 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?