Mark Mortimer v. Bank of America
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 13-15684

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 26, 2017 at 3:28 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
Filed order (RICHARD A. PAEZ, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and KEVIN THOMAS DUFFY) A joint Notice of Settlement was filed on May 5, 2015. The court having been advised that the parties have reached a settlement in principle, this matter is removed from the May 14, 2015, oral argument calendar in San Francisco, California. The parties shall file a notice of dismissal or status report within 60 days from the date of this order, and every 60 days thereafter until the appeal is dismissed. The currently-assigned panel shall retain responsibility for this case. [9528757] (WL) [Entered: 05/07/2015 11:10 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
    Filed (ECF) Appellee Bank of America, National Association and Appellant Mark Mortimer Correspondence: Notice of Settlement. Date of service: 05/05/2015 [9525819] [13-15684] (ZAJ) [Entered: 05/05/2015 02:19 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Elliot Gale for Appellant Mark Mortimer and Scott Joseph Sagaria for Appellant Mark Mortimer. [9453722] [13-15684] (EG) [Entered: 03/11/2015 03:02 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Margaret Anne Grignon, Esquire for Appellee Bank of America, National Association. [9453525] [13-15684] (MAG) [Entered: 03/11/2015 02:03 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
          Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Margaret Anne Grignon for Appellee Bank of America, National Association. Date of service: 03/11/2015. [9452994] [13-15684] (MAG) [Entered: 03/11/2015 10:47 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
            Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Mark Mortimer. Date of service: 11/01/2013. [8847680]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached certifcate of service. Resent NDA. 11/08/2013 by RY] (EG)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
            Filed clerk order: The answering brief [20] submitted by Bank of America, National Association is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [20] submitted by Bank of America, National Association. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [8826297] (GV)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
              Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief and supplemental excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellee Bank of America, National Association. Date of service: 10/16/2013. [8823243] (ZAJ)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 1 time.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?