Maria Stein v. Bank of America, N.A., et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 13-15351

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 29, 2016 at 4:21 PM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3371 - TORTS-Truth in Lending
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
Filed order (Deputy Clerk: MGS) The court is in receipt of appellant’s correspondence dated March 11, 2013. The court construes appellant’s letter as a motion to dismiss. So construed, the motion is granted and this appeal is dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. [8556589] (WL)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
    Received Appellant Maria Christina Stein letter dated 03/11/2013 re: We have now settled this case and the appeal is not necessary.. [8552983] (JFF)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
      Filed order MEDIATION (EPM): The Court of Appeals’ records do not indicate that appellant has filed a Mediation Questionnaire in accordance with Circuit Rule 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing of this order, appellant shall: (a) file a Mediation Questionnaire (available on the court's website, www.ca9.uscourts.gov); (b) dismiss the appeal voluntarily pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b); or (c) show cause in writing why this appeal should not be dismissed pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. [8542548] (SM)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
        DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Fee due from Appellant Maria Christina Stein on 02/15/2013. Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/05/2013. Transcript ordered by 03/18/2013. Transcript due 04/16/2013. Appellant Maria Christina Stein opening brief due 05/28/2013. Appellees Bank of America, N.A. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. answering brief due 06/27/2013. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8526298] (GR)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 24 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?