Steve Ballard v. Bank of America, NA, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 14-55334

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 6:21 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4371 - Truth in Lending
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
Filed Appellant Steve Ballard letter dated 06/04/2015 responding to court's order filed 4/28/15. Paper filing deficiency: None. [9568223] (RR) [Entered: 06/09/2015 07:18 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT): Attorney Lenore Albert’s motion to withdraw as counsel is granted. Lenore Albert, Esq. shall be removed from the court’s service list. Court records shall reflect that Steven Ballard, 5331 Rosecrest Drive, Huntington Beach, CA 92649, is representing himself. Within 14 days after the date of this order, appellant Ballard may move to file a substitute opening brief. The absence of a motion will be construed as a joinder in the brief filed by former counsel. [9517375] (WL) [Entered: 04/28/2015 01:19 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
      Filed (ECF) Appellant Steve Ballard Motion to withdraw as counsel. Date of service: 04/27/2015. [9511796] [14-55334] (LA) [Entered: 04/27/2015 12:51 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/2/2015, Entered: None
        Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CB): Appellant’s motion to augment the record is denied. 9th Cir. R. 10-2; Kirshner v. Uniden Corp., 842 F.2d 1074 (9th Cir. 1988). [9368115] (OC) [Entered: 01/02/2015 09:17 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None
          Filed (ECF) Appellees Bank of America, NA, Nationstar Mortgage LLC and Wells Fargo Bank, NA response to motion (motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies), motion to take judicial notice). Date of service: 12/29/2014. [9364298] [14-55334] (PDF) [Entered: 12/29/2014 03:17 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
            Filed clerk order: The reply brief [25] submitted by Steve Ballard is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9358468] (KT) [Entered: 12/22/2014 01:45 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
              Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Steve Ballard. Date of service: 12/19/2014. [9357317] [14-55334] (LA) [Entered: 12/19/2014 09:07 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                Filed (ECF) Appellant Steve Ballard Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion to Augment the Record], Motion to take judicial notice of July 2014 Loan Modification Agreement and September 2014 TPP on HELOC. Date of service: 12/19/2014. [9357316] [14-55334] (LA) [Entered: 12/19/2014 09:03 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                  Filed (ECF) Appellees Bank of America, NA, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/13/2014. [9014532] (PDF)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Steve Ballard Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/10/2014. [9009995] (LA)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                      Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Paul D. Fogel for Appellees Bank of America, NA, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Date of service: 03/05/2014. [9003414] (PDF)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                        Filed Appellant Steve Ballard's Representation Statement. Served on 02/28/2014. [8998525] (JN)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                          DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/10/2014. Transcript ordered by 03/31/2014. Transcript due 06/30/2014. Appellant Steve Ballard opening brief due 08/11/2014. Appellees Bank of America, NA, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Reconstrust Company, NA, U.S. Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answering brief due 09/10/2014. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8998518] (JN)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 111 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?