Kaass Law v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 13-56099

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 28, 2016 at 9:55 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
Filed clerk order: The reply brief [29] submitted by Kaass Law is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [29] submitted by Kaass Law. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [9026115] (GV)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
    Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief and supplemental excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellant Kaass Law. Date of service: 03/20/2014. [9025171] (VM)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
    Filed clerk order: The answering brief [23] submitted by Wells Fargo Bank, NA is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [23] submitted by Wells Fargo Bank, NA. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [8967016] (GV)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
      Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief and supplemental excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, NA. Date of service: 02/04/2014. [8964455] (KWF)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
        Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Vahag Matevosian for Appellant Kaass Law. Date of service: 01/06/2014. [8926729]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached printed to PDF version of form to correct viewing error (blank). Resent NDA. 01/06/2014 by RY] (AK)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 0 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?