Nancy Tarsha v. Bank of America, N.A., et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 13-55707

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 29, 2016 at 4:50 AM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3371 - TORTS-Truth in Lending
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
Filed order (Deputy Clerk: SL): Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, this appeal is voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys’ fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. [8945211] (AF)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
    Filed (ECF) Appellee Bank of America, N.A. Amended Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 01/16/2014. [8941085] (MJB)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
      Filed (ECF) Appellee Bank of America, N.A. Stipulated Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 01/14/2014. [8938467] (MJB)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
        Filed notice of withdrawal of Plaintiff's attorney John E. Engel. Served on 12/23/2013. [8916893] (EL)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
          Filed order MEDIATION (SL): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellant shall file an opening brief on or before February 7, 2014; appellees shall file an answering brief on or before March 10, 2014; appellant may file an optional reply brief within fourteen (14) days from the service date of the answering brief. [8899161] (AF)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
            Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): Court records do not reflect that counsel John E. Engel, Esq., has been admitted to the Ninth Circuit bar. See Fed. R. App. P. 46(a); 9th Cir. R. 46-1.2 (“Any attorney who causes a case to be docketed in this Court or who enters an appearance in this Court, and who is not already admitted to the Bar of the Court, shall simultaneously apply for admission.”). Court records reveal that respondent Engel is counsel of record for appellant in Tarsha v. Bank of America, No. 13-55707. The court is informed that respondent has been suspended from the practice of law in California. Given that respondent does not appear to be admitted to the bar of this court and that respondent is presently ineligible to practice law in California, respondent shall, within 28 days after the date of this order, withdraw as counsel of record in all pending cases before this court in which he is counsel of record. See Fed. R. App. P. 46(c); 9th Cir. R. 46-1.2; In re Rosenthal, 854 F. 2d 1187 (9th Cir.1988). Respondent Engel’s failure timely to respond to this order will result in the removal of respondent as counsel of record in all pending cases and may subject respondent to the imposition of monetary sanctions. If an attorney is registered for the Court’s Electronic Case Filing System (Appellate ECF) and is removed, suspended, or disbarred by this Court, the attorney’s Appellate ECF account will also be suspended (locked) until the attorney has been admitted/reinstated to the bar of this court. The Clerk shall serve this order on respondent electronically.(Appellate Commissioner) [8861631] [13-80221, 13-55707] (DL)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
              Filed (ECF) Appellant Nancy Tarsha Correspondence: Notice of Suspension of Attorney. Date of service: 10/30/2013 [8844728] (JE)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                Filed order MEDIATION (SL): On or before November 20, 2013, counsel for appellant shall provide the undersigned with a status report via e-mail (stephen_liacouras@ca9.uscourts.gov). The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellant shall file an opening brief on or before January 8, 2014; appellees shall file an answering brief on or before February 7, 2014; appellant may file an optional reply brief within fourteen (14) days from the service date of the answering brief. [8789519] (AF)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                  Filed order MEDIATION (SL): The further assessment conference originally scheduled for September 12, 2013, is rescheduled to September 17, 2013, at 3:00 p.m. PACIFIC (San Francisco) Time. [8780590] (AF)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 51 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?