Daniel Sanders, et al v. Sutton Funding, LLC, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 13-57021

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 28, 2016 at 1:45 PM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3371 - TORTS-Truth in Lending
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
Filed clerk order: The answering brief [16] submitted by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [16] submitted by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [8949368] (WP)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
    Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief and supplemental excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellee Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.. Date of service: 01/22/2014. [8947929] (BSE)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
      Filed clerk order: The opening brief [10] submitted by Daniel Sanders and Karen L. Sanders is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [10] submitted by Daniel Sanders and Karen L. Sanders. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [8920863] (WP)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
        Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief and excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellants Daniel Sanders and Karen L. Sanders. Date of service: 12/26/2013. [8916403]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached certificate of service. Resent NDA. 12/30/2013 by RY] (EG)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 27 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?