District Agency Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Northern District Court USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board
  1. Case No. CBM2014-00159
    Filed 7/21/2014
  2. Case No. CBM2015-00067
    Filed 1/29/2015
Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit United States Supreme Court

Think Computer Corporation v. Square, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-01374-EDL
District Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 21, 2018 at 7:36 PM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Think Computer Corporation Think Computer Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aschenbrener Law PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael James Aschenbrener +1 415 813 6245 +1 415 813 6246 mja@aschenbrenerlaw.com
Space Brian Thomas Noack +1 312 859 8485 btn@aschenbrenerlaw.com
v.
Square, Inc. Square, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugene Marder +1 415 947 2039 emarder@wsgr.com
Space Stefani Elise Shanberg +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 sshanberg@wsgr.com
Office San Jose
Filed 3/25/2014
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Santa Clara
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP,CONSENT
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 56 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Patent/Trademark report
REPORT on the determination of an action regarding patent infringement (cc: form transmitted to register). (Attachments: # (1) Stipulation of Dismissal)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
LREF
Legal Document 55 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
ORDER granting Stipulation of Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
    LREF
    Blank 54 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Case Management Conference - InitialCourt Filing
    Minute Entry for case management conference held on 9/4/2018 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel reports that the parties have resolved the case and that they have filed a stipulation to dismiss. The Court acknowledges the stipulation and indicates that it has been approved. FTR Time: 3:10 - 3:11 Plaintiff Attorney: Kar Matuszewski (telephonic appearance) Defendant Attorney: Stefani Shanberg (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/4/2018)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018, Terminated: 9/4/2018 stipulation
      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Square, Inc.. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Case Management Statement
        CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Square, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 51 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Order on Motion to Appear by TelephoneCourt Filing
          ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting [50] Motion to Appear by Telephone as to Isaac Rabicoff.(tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018, Terminated: 8/23/2018 Motion to Appear by Telephone
            REQUEST TO PARTICIPATE IN CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE & [PROPOSED] ORDER; filed by Think Computer Corporation. (Broderick, Timothy) (Filed on 8/23/2018) Modified on 8/24/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 49 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
              CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are hereby notified that a case management conference is set for 9/4/2018 at 3:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Case Management Statement is due by 8/28/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: 8/1/2018 Status report
                STATUS REPORT by Square, Inc.. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 47 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER Directing Parties to File Joint Status Report by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 46 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                    NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel & [PROPOSED] ORDER; by Timothy Blaise Broderick (Broderick, Timothy) (Filed on 9/20/2017) Modified on 9/22/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 45 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                      ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting [44] Application. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 44 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/18/2017, Terminated: 9/19/2017 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                        MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11726358.) filed by Think Computer Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Letter of Good Standing)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Filed on 9/18/2017) Modified on 9/19/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 43 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: 9/1/2017 Status report
                        STATUS REPORT Regarding Federal Circuit Appeal by Square, Inc.. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: 3/3/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER REQUIRING STATUS UPDATE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/3/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 41 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: 3/1/2017 Status report
                            STATUS REPORT on Progress of Federal Circuit Appeal by Square, Inc.. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER Requiring Status Update by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 39 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: 6/7/2016 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal no longer assigned to the case. Signed by The Executive Committee on 06/06/2016. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: 3/11/2015 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                  ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting [37]. Attorney Brian Thomas Noack terminated. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 37 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: 3/9/2015, Terminated: 3/11/2015 Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Think Computer Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 3/23/2015. Replies due by 3/30/2015. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Noack, Brian) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 36 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: 9/3/2014 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                      ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting [35]. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 35 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: 9/2/2014, Terminated: 9/3/2014 stipulation
                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, [30] MOTION to Stay Pursuant to Section 18(b) of the America Invents Act filed by Think Computer Corporation. (Noack, Brian) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 34 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: 8/12/2014 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                          ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting [33] Stipulation.(psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                            Set/Reset Deadlines as to [30] MOTION to Stay Pursuant to Section 18(b) of the America Invents Act and Case Management Conference: 8/26/2014 Motion Hearing is continued to 9/23/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 9/2/2014. Replies due by 9/9/2014. 8/26/2014 Case Management Conference is continued to 9/23/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2014. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                              Set/Reset Deadlines as to [30] MOTION to Stay Pursuant to Section 18(b) of the America Invents Act and Case Management Conference: 8/26/2014 Motion Hearing is continued to 9/23/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 9/2/2014. Replies due by 9/9/2014. 8/26/2014 Case Management Conference is continued to 9/23/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2014. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 33 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: 8/5/2014, Terminated: 8/12/2014 stipulation
                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [32] Clerks Notice, [30] MOTION to Stay Pursuant to Section 18(b) of the America Invents Act filed by Think Computer Corporation. (Noack, Brian) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014 Clerks Notice
                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING AUGUST 19, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 8/19/2014 Case Management Conference is reset to 8/26/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 8/19/2014. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document 31 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                    Declaration of Eugene Marder in Support of [30] MOTION to Stay Pursuant to Section 18(b) of the America Invents Act filed bySquare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Related document(s)[30]) (Marder, Eugene) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014, Terminated: 9/19/2014 Motion To StayCourt Filing
                                                    MOTION to Stay Pursuant to Section 18(b) of the America Invents Act filed by Square, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 8/5/2014. Replies due by 8/12/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: 7/18/2014 Clerks Notice
                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING JULY 29, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 7/29/2014 Case Management Conference is reset to 8/19/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2014. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: 7/15/2014 Order on Stipulation selecting Private ADRCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting [26] Stipulation selecting Private ADR.(psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: 7/15/2014 answer to counterclaim
                                                        ANSWER to Counterclaim byThink Computer Corporation. (Noack, Brian) (Filed on 7/15/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: 7/8/2014, Terminated: 7/15/2014 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR
                                                          STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Square, Inc. filed by Square, Inc.. (Marder, Eugene) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: 7/8/2014 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                            ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options on behalf of Defendant Square, Inc. (Marder, Eugene) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: 7/8/2014 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                              ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Noack, Brian) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: 7/7/2014 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Think Computer Corporation bySquare, Inc.. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: 6/17/2014 answer to counterclaim
                                                                  ANSWER to Counterclaim byThink Computer Corporation. (Noack, Brian) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: 6/17/2014 Exhibits
                                                                    EXHIBITS re [20] Amended Complaint filed byThink Computer Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit B, # (2) Exhibit C, # (3) Exhibit D, # (4) Exhibit E)(Related document(s)[20]) (Noack, Brian) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: 6/17/2014 Amended complaint
                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against Square, Inc.. Filed byThink Computer Corporation. (Noack, Brian) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: 6/5/2014 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING JULY 22, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Due to the Court's unavailability, 7/22/2014 Case Management Conference is reset to 7/29/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2014. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: 5/29/2014 Patent/Trademark report
                                                                        REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: 5/28/2014 Answer to Complaint
                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Think Computer Corporation bySquare, Inc.. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: 4/25/2014 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                            CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Square, Inc... (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: 4/25/2014 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                              CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Think Computer Corporation.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Noack, Brian) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: 4/25/2014 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                              Certificate of Interested Entities by Think Computer Corporation (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Noack, Brian) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: 4/24/2014 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                              Certificate of Interested Entities by Square, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Square, Inc. for Square, Inc.. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: 4/23/2014 stipulation
                                                                                STIPULATION re [1] Complaint, Extending Time to Respond filed by Square, Inc. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 4/23/2014) Modified on 4/24/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: 4/23/2014 Notice of appearance
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Stefani Elise Shanberg on Behalf of Defendant Square, Inc. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: 4/23/2014 Notice of appearance
                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Marder on behalf of Square, Inc. (Marder, Eugene) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: 4/18/2014 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice, by 5/2/2014. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Square, Inc. on 04/07/14, filed by Think Computer Corporation. (Noack, Brian) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: 3/26/2014 Summons issued
                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Square, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: 3/26/2014 Proposed Summons
                                                                                            Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Noack, Brian) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: 3/26/2014 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING [4] MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: 3/26/2014, Terminated: 3/26/2014 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Brian Noack ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8481873.) filed by Think Computer Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # (2) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Noack, Brian) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: 3/25/2014 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/15/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: 3/25/2014 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: 3/25/2014 Complaint
                                                                                                    COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Square, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8478980.). Filed byThink Computer Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Civil Cover Sheet)(Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 1,441 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?