Kerin v. Titeflex Corporation
Appeal Court of Appeals for the First Circuit, Case No. 14-1130

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 11:55 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4385 - Property Damage-Product Liability
  Entries (71) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106760202 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Kenneth F. Ripple* and Bruce M. Selya, Appellate Judge. Affirmed. * Of the Seventh Circuit, sitting by designation. [14-1130] (GK)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106760202 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    JUDGMENT entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Kenneth F. Ripple* and Bruce M. Selya, Appellate Judge. Affirmed. * Of the Seventh Circuit, sitting by designation. [14-1130] (GK)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106760202 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      JUDGMENT entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Kenneth F. Ripple* and Bruce M. Selya, Appellate Judge. Affirmed. * Of the Seventh Circuit, sitting by designation. [14-1130] (GK)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106760199 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        OPINION issued by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Kenneth F. Ripple* and Bruce M. Selya, Appellate Judge. Published. * Of the Seventh Circuit, sitting by designation. [14-1130] (GK)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106760199 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          OPINION issued by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Kenneth F. Ripple* and Bruce M. Selya, Appellate Judge. Published. * Of the Seventh Circuit, sitting by designation. [14-1130] (GK)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106760199 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            OPINION issued by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Kenneth F. Ripple* and Bruce M. Selya, Appellate Judge. Published. * Of the Seventh Circuit, sitting by designation. [14-1130] (GK)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106739680 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None
              RESPONSE to citation of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) [5852472-2] filed by Appellee Titeflex Corporation. Certificate of service dated 09/16/2014. [14-1130] (JGP)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106739680 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                RESPONSE to citation of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) [5852472-2] filed by Appellee Titeflex Corporation. Certificate of service dated 09/16/2014. [14-1130] (JGP)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106739680 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  RESPONSE to citation of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) [5852472-2] filed by Appellee Titeflex Corporation. Certificate of service dated 09/16/2014. [14-1130] (JGP)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106738677 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                    CITATION of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) filed by Appellant Tim Kerin. Certificate of service dated 09/12/2014. [14-1130] (ET)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106738677 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CITATION of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) filed by Appellant Tim Kerin. Certificate of service dated 09/12/2014. [14-1130] (ET)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106738677 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        CITATION of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) filed by Appellant Tim Kerin. Certificate of service dated 09/12/2014. [14-1130] (ET)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106733645 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
                          CITATION of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) filed by Appellee Titeflex Corporation. Certificate of service dated 09/02/2014. [14-1130] (JGP)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106733645 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            CITATION of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) filed by Appellee Titeflex Corporation. Certificate of service dated 09/02/2014. [14-1130] (JGP)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106733645 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              CITATION of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) filed by Appellee Titeflex Corporation. Certificate of service dated 09/02/2014. [14-1130] (JGP)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106718896 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
                                DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney John G. Papianou for Appellee Titeflex Corporation. Certificate of service dated 07/25/2014. [14-1130] (JGP)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106718896 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney John G. Papianou for Appellee Titeflex Corporation. Certificate of service dated 07/25/2014. [14-1130] (JGP)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106718896 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney John G. Papianou for Appellee Titeflex Corporation. Certificate of service dated 07/25/2014. [14-1130] (JGP)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106715377 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                      DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Kevin Thomas Peters for Appellant Tim Kerin. Certificate of service dated 07/17/2014. [14-1130] (KTP)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106715377 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Kevin Thomas Peters for Appellant Tim Kerin. Certificate of service dated 07/17/2014. [14-1130] (KTP)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106715377 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Kevin Thomas Peters for Appellant Tim Kerin. Certificate of service dated 07/17/2014. [14-1130] (KTP)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106712542 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                            CASE calendared: Tuesday, 09/09/2014 Boston, MA Panel Courtroom. Designation form due 07/25/2014. [14-1130] (LM)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106712542 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              CASE calendared: Tuesday, 09/09/2014 Boston, MA Panel Courtroom. Designation form due 07/25/2014. [14-1130] (LM)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106712542 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                CASE calendared: Tuesday, 09/09/2014 Boston, MA Panel Courtroom. Designation form due 07/25/2014. [14-1130] (LM)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 00106698709 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                  BRIEF tendered by Appellee Titeflex Corporation. Certificate of service dated 06/09/2014. [14-1130] (JKM)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106698709 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    BRIEF tendered by Appellee Titeflex Corporation. Certificate of service dated 06/09/2014. [14-1130] (JKM)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106698509 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Titeflex Corporation filed by Attorney Charles B. Casper. Certificate of service dated 06/09/2014. [14-1130] (CBC)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106698509 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Titeflex Corporation filed by Attorney Charles B. Casper. Certificate of service dated 06/09/2014. [14-1130] (CBC)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106698509 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Titeflex Corporation filed by Attorney Charles B. Casper. Certificate of service dated 06/09/2014. [14-1130] (CBC)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106698371 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Titeflex Corporation filed by Attorney John G. Papianou. Certificate of service dated 06/09/2014. [14-1130] (JGP)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106698371 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Titeflex Corporation filed by Attorney John G. Papianou. Certificate of service dated 06/09/2014. [14-1130] (JGP)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106698371 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Titeflex Corporation filed by Attorney John G. Papianou. Certificate of service dated 06/09/2014. [14-1130] (JGP)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106687589 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Tim Kerin. Certificate of service dated 05/07/2014. Brief due 06/09/2014 for Appellee Titeflex Corporation. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 05/20/2014. [14-1130] (DK)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106687589 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Tim Kerin. Certificate of service dated 05/07/2014. Brief due 06/09/2014 for Appellee Titeflex Corporation. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 05/20/2014. [14-1130] (DK)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106687589 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Tim Kerin. Certificate of service dated 05/07/2014. Brief due 06/09/2014 for Appellee Titeflex Corporation. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 05/20/2014. [14-1130] (DK)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106685366 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      BRIEF tendered by Appellant Tim Kerin. Certificate of service dated 05/07/2014. [14-1130] (ET)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106685366 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        BRIEF tendered by Appellant Tim Kerin. Certificate of service dated 05/07/2014. [14-1130] (ET)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106685366 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          BRIEF tendered by Appellant Tim Kerin. Certificate of service dated 05/07/2014. [14-1130] (ET)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106667025 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 05/07/2014 for appellant Tim Kerin. Appendix due 05/07/2014 for appellant Tim Kerin. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 14 days following service of appellee's brief. [14-1130] (GK)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106667025 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 05/07/2014 for appellant Tim Kerin. Appendix due 05/07/2014 for appellant Tim Kerin. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 14 days following service of appellee's brief. [14-1130] (GK)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106667025 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 05/07/2014 for appellant Tim Kerin. Appendix due 05/07/2014 for appellant Tim Kerin. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 14 days following service of appellee's brief. [14-1130] (GK)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106658304 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Tim Kerin indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2014. [14-1130] (KTP)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106658304 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Tim Kerin indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2014. [14-1130] (KTP)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106658289 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Tim Kerin. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2014. [14-1130] (KTP)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106658289 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Tim Kerin. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2014. [14-1130] (KTP)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106658282 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Tim Kerin filed by Attorney Kevin T. Peters. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2014. [14-1130] (KTP)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106658282 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Tim Kerin filed by Attorney Kevin T. Peters. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2014. [14-1130] (KTP)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106657987 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Tim Kerin filed by Attorney Erika Todd. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2014. [14-1130] (ET)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106657987 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Tim Kerin filed by Attorney Erika Todd. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2014. [14-1130] (ET)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106657984 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Tim Kerin filed by Attorney Kevin T. Peters. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2014. [14-1130] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS (3/11/2014). (ET)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106657984 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Tim Kerin filed by Attorney Kevin T. Peters. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2014. [14-1130] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS (3/11/2014). (ET)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106652137 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Charles B. Casper for Titeflex Corporation and John G. Papianou for Titeflex Corporation. [14-1130] (GK)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106652137 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Charles B. Casper for Titeflex Corporation and John G. Papianou for Titeflex Corporation. [14-1130] (GK)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106652134 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form, docketing statement and transcript report/order form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form due 03/07/2014. Docketing Statement due 03/07/2014. Transcript report/order form due 03/07/2014. [14-1130] (GK)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106652134 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form, docketing statement and transcript report/order form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form due 03/07/2014. Docketing Statement due 03/07/2014. Transcript report/order form due 03/07/2014. [14-1130] (GK)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106650867 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Titeflex Corporation filed by Attorney Jeffrey E. Poindexter. Certificate of service dated 02/19/2014. [14-1130] (JEP)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106650867 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Titeflex Corporation filed by Attorney Jeffrey E. Poindexter. Certificate of service dated 02/19/2014. [14-1130] (JEP)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106650764 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Titeflex Corporation filed by Attorney Jodi K. Miller. Certificate of service dated 02/19/2014. [14-1130] (JKM)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106650764 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Titeflex Corporation filed by Attorney Jodi K. Miller. Certificate of service dated 02/19/2014. [14-1130] (JKM)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106642352 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #34) filed by Appellant Tim Kerin. Docketing Statement due 02/12/2014. Transcript Report/Order form due 02/12/2014. Appearance form due 02/12/2014.. [14-1130] (GK)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106642352 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #34) filed by Appellant Tim Kerin. Docketing Statement due 02/12/2014. Transcript Report/Order form due 02/12/2014. Appearance form due 02/12/2014.. [14-1130] (GK)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106658304 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Tim Kerin indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2014. [14-1130] (KTP)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106658289 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Tim Kerin. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2014. [14-1130] (KTP)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106658282 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Tim Kerin filed by Attorney Kevin T. Peters. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2014. [14-1130] (KTP)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106657987 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Tim Kerin filed by Attorney Erika Todd. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2014. [14-1130] (ET)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106657984 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Tim Kerin filed by Attorney Kevin T. Peters. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2014. [14-1130] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS (3/11/2014). (ET)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106652137 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Charles B. Casper for Titeflex Corporation and John G. Papianou for Titeflex Corporation. [14-1130] (GK)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106652134 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form, docketing statement and transcript report/order form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form due 03/07/2014. Docketing Statement due 03/07/2014. Transcript report/order form due 03/07/2014. [14-1130] (GK)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106650867 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Titeflex Corporation filed by Attorney Jeffrey E. Poindexter. Certificate of service dated 02/19/2014. [14-1130] (JEP)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106650764 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Titeflex Corporation filed by Attorney Jodi K. Miller. Certificate of service dated 02/19/2014. [14-1130] (JKM)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106642352 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #34) filed by Appellant Tim Kerin. Docketing Statement due 02/12/2014. Transcript Report/Order form due 02/12/2014. Appearance form due 02/12/2014.. [14-1130] (GK)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 66 times.

                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?