TCYK, LLC v. Does 1-29
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Central District Court, Case No. 4:13-cv-04081

Tags
Last Updated September 20, 2016 at 10:29 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: 12/17/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman on 12/17/2013. Now before the Court is the motion by Plaintiff [4] for leave to obtain and serve a subpoena prior to the time authorized by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.The motion is GRANTED, but only to the extent stated herein. (See Order) Before getting to that motion, however, another preliminary matter is addressed, namely the issue of improper joinder. As this Court has consistently done in other BitTorrent cases, all defendants except John Doe #1 are dismissed for improper joinder. (See Order). (KB, ilcd)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 Memorandum
    MEMORANDUM by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Vogt, Keith) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/25/2013) (KB, ilcd). (Attachment 4 replaced on 9/25/2013) (KB, ilcd).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
      MOTION Discovery by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. Responses due by 10/11/2013 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Vogt, Keith)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: 9/20/2013 Certificate of Interest
        CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by TCYK, LLC. (Vogt, Keith)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: 9/20/2013 Report re Patent/Trademark/Copyright Action
          REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright by TCYK, LLC. (Vogt, Keith)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Complaint
            COMPLAINT against Does 1-29 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-1659174.), filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (3) Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Vogt, Keith)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 81 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?