TCYK, LLC v. Does 1-8
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00691

Tags
Last Updated September 17, 2016 at 1:28 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: 3/21/2014 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC re [1] Complaint of Dismissal Without Prejudice (Bass, Leon)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: 3/17/2014 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
    ORDER. Show Cause Response due by 3/21/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 3/17/2014. (pes1)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to Effect Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 11/15/2013. (pes1)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
        MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 3/14/2014. to Serve Summons and Complaint by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: 7/22/2013 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [3] motion for discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 7/22/13. (rew)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: 7/17/2013 Motion for Discovery
            Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: 7/17/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
              Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Bass, Leon)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: 7/17/2013 Complaint
                COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against John Does 1-8 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-4182929), filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B) (Bass, Leon)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 80 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?