TCYK LLC v. Doe 1
Federal Civil Lawsuit Indiana Northern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00320

Tags
Last Updated August 1, 2017 at 3:51 AM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/8/2014 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
ORDER granting [5] Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoenas Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/7/14. (kjp)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: 12/16/2013 Opinion and OrderCourt Filing
    OPINION AND ORDER The Court ORDERS that Defendants Does 2-19 are SEVERED from this case. Plaintiff may continue in the instant action, cause number 2:13cv320-RLM-JEM, against Doe 1, identified by the IP address of 50.158.170.39, only. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to sever the claims against Does 2-19, to treat the claims against those defendants as separate actions, and to assign a separate docket number to each action. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file separate amended complaints containing only its claims against each individual defendant and pay the filing fee for each case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/13/13. Per Magistrate Judge Martin's chambers,the severed parties will be termed in the original case. All docket entries to be copied in new cases, with motion, DE[5], termed. Old and new cases will be related cases and the filing date of the new cases will be 9/11/13. (kjp)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013 Memorandum in Support of Response to Order to Show Cause
      MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE [6] filed by TCYK LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Vogt, Keith)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER This matter is before the Court sua sponte. The court DIRECTS Plaintiff to file with the Court, on or before October 28, 2013, a brief addressing why the claims against the Defendants should not be severed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/4/13. (kjp)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
          ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John E Martin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 10/3/13. (kjp)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 Filing Fee Received
            Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 2006543 (kjp)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: 9/25/2013 Memorandum in Support
              MEMORANDUM in Support of [5] MOTION for leave to serve third party subpoenas prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by TCYK LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Proposed Order)(Vogt, Keith) Modified on 9/26/2013 to reflect correct title of [5] motion (rmn).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: 9/25/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                MOTION for leave to serve third party subpoenas prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff TCYK LLC. (Vogt, Keith) Modified on 9/26/2013 to reflect actual title of pleading (rmn).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: 9/20/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by TCYK LLC. (Vogt, Keith)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: 9/20/2013 Report
                    REPORT by TCYK LLC Copyright. (Vogt, Keith)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: 9/13/2013 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT for COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT with jury demand against Does 1-19 (Filing fee not paid), filed by TCYK LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet) AO 121 form not submitted(kjp)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 96 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?