Torres v. Albuquerque Police Department
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Mexico District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-01048

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 12, 2019 at 11:13 PM EDT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Stephen Torres, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGinn, Carpenter, Montoya & Love, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin P Holmes +1 505 843 6161 +1 505 242 8227 kevin@mcginnlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen J. Love +1 505 843 6161 +1 505 242 8227 kathy@mcginnlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randi McGinn +1 505 843 6161 randi@mcginnlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parnall Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/24/2014 Tyler J Atkins +1 505 268 6500 +1 505 268 8708 tyler@parnalllaw.com
v.
No Logo Albuquerque Police Department, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City Attorney's Office City Albuquerque

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/18/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Levy +1 505 768 4500 +1 505 768 4440 klevy@cabq.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Emily A Franke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W Ann Maggiore +1 505 884 0777 +1 505 889 8870 wamaggiore@btblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller Stratvert Torgerson & Schlenker PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terri S Beach +1 505 842 4710 +1 505 243 4408 tbeach@mstlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robles, Luis E.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas E Gardner +1 505 242 2228 +1 505 242 1106 douglas@roblesrael.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Luis E. Robles +1 505 242 2228 +1 505 242 1106 luis@roblesrael.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Anthony Roman +1 505 242 2228 +1 505 242 1106 droman@roblesrael.com
No Logo Christopher Brown, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City Attorney's Office City Albuquerque

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/18/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Levy +1 505 768 4500 +1 505 768 4440 klevy@cabq.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Emily A Franke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W Ann Maggiore +1 505 884 0777 +1 505 889 8870 wamaggiore@btblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller Stratvert Torgerson & Schlenker PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terri S Beach +1 505 842 4710 +1 505 243 4408 tbeach@mstlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robles, Luis E.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas E Gardner +1 505 242 2228 +1 505 242 1106 douglas@roblesrael.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Luis E. Robles +1 505 242 2228 +1 505 242 1106 luis@roblesrael.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Anthony Roman +1 505 242 2228 +1 505 242 1106 droman@roblesrael.com
No Logo City of Albuquerque ex rel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robles, Luis E.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas E Gardner +1 505 242 2228 +1 505 242 1106 douglas@roblesrael.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Anthony Roman +1 505 242 2228 +1 505 242 1106 droman@roblesrael.com
No Logo Richard Hilger, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City Attorney's Office City Albuquerque

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/18/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Levy +1 505 768 4500 +1 505 768 4440 klevy@cabq.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Emily A Franke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W Ann Maggiore +1 505 884 0777 +1 505 889 8870 wamaggiore@btblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller Stratvert Torgerson & Schlenker PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terri S Beach +1 505 842 4710 +1 505 243 4408 tbeach@mstlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robles, Luis E.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas E Gardner +1 505 242 2228 +1 505 242 1106 douglas@roblesrael.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Luis E. Robles +1 505 242 2228 +1 505 242 1106 luis@roblesrael.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Anthony Roman +1 505 242 2228 +1 505 242 1106 droman@roblesrael.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (231) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous relief
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 230 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
        MOTION for Trial In Albuquerque by Stephen Torres. (McGinn, Randi) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
          LREF
          Blank 229 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
          Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge Robert C. Brack: Status Conference (Telephonic) held on 5/5/2015. (Court Reporter Vanessa Alyce) (jn) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 5/5/2015 at 01:30 PM in Las Cruces - 320 Tortugas Courtroom (North Tower) before District Judge Robert C. Brack. Counsel may appear telephonically for Conference by calling Judge Brack's 'meet me' line a few minutes before the time scheduled for the Status Conference. (jac)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 05/04/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              Clerk's Minutes for in-person Status Conference held on 4/27/2015 before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. Participants included Randi McGinn, Kathleen Love, and Kevin Holmes on behalf of Plaintiffs, and Ann Maggiore and David Roman on behalf of Defendants. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cda) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Torres for Plaintiff's Offer of Settlement (Love, Kathleen) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack DENYING 104 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No I: Dismissal of Count II, DENYING 105 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. II: Dismissal of Count III, GRANTING 106 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. III: Dismissal of Plaintiff's Failure to Train Claims Against Defendant City of Albuquerque, DENYING 107 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. IV: Dismissal of Plaintiff's Municipal Liability Claims Against Defendant City of Albuquerque, DENYING, BUT THE COURT STRIKES THIS CLAIM FROM THE COMPLAINT 108 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. V: Dismissal of Plaintiff's Failure to Supervise Claims Against City Defendants, AND GRANTING 109 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. VI: Dismissal of Plaintiff's Hiring Practices Claim Regarding Detective Christopher Brown and Punitive Damages Against City of Albuquerque and APD. (yc) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen setting an in person Status Conference for 4/27/2015 at 03:30 PM in Albuquerque - 730 Judge Karen B. Molzen Chambers before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. (cda) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge Robert C. Brack: Status Conference held on 4/3/2015. (Court Reporter Vanessa Alyce) (yc) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/3/2015 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) before District Judge Robert C. Brack. Counsel may appear telephonically for all the Status conference by calling Judge Brack's'meet me' line a few minutes before the time scheduled. Shouldyou choose this conference method, please contact Chambers.(jac)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack lifting stay (jn) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                            MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack GRANTING 211 MOTION Issue Preclusion Against Defendant City of Albuquerque .,DENYING 212 MOTION City Defendants' Motion for Claim and Issue Preclusion of Plaintiff's Monell Claim and to Deny Issue Preclusion Against Defendants filed by City of Albuquerque ex rel, Christopher Brown, Albuquerque Police Department, Richard Hilger, (yc) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger re 212 MOTION City Defendants' Motion for Claim and Issue Preclusion of Plaintiff's Monell Claim and to Deny Issue Preclusion Against Defendants filed by City of Albuquerque ex rel, Christopher Brown, Albuquerque Police Department, Richard Hilger (Robles, Luis) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Stephen Torres re 211 MOTION Issue Preclusion Against Defendant City of Albuquerque filed by Stephen Torres (Holmes, Kevin) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 211 MOTION Issue Preclusion Against Defendant City of Albuquerque filed by Stephen Torres. (Holmes, Kevin) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P Holmes on behalf of Stephen Torres (Holmes, Kevin) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 212 MOTION City Defendants' Motion for Claim and Issue Preclusion of Plaintiff's Monell Claim and to Deny Issue Preclusion Against Defendants filed by Stephen Torres. (McGinn, Randi) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None
                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 211 MOTION Issue Preclusion Against Defendant City of Albuquerque City Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Issue Preclusion Against Defendant City of Albuquerque filed by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Robles, Luis) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                          MOTION City Defendants' Motion for Claim and Issue Preclusion of Plaintiff's Monell Claim and to Deny Issue Preclusion Against Defendants by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Robles, Luis) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None
                                            MOTION Issue Preclusion Against Defendant City of Albuquerque by Stephen Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(McGinn, Randi) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Order on Motion to Extend (other)Court Filing
                                              ORDER Extending Deadline to File Motions on Claim or Issue Preclusion by District Judge Robert C. Brack granting 209 ORDER on Motion to Extend (jn)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: 10/23/2014 Motion to Extend (other)
                                                Joint MOTION to Extend (other) Deadline to File Motions on Claim or Issue Preclusion by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Roman, David)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: 7/9/2014 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                  MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack VACATING the Final Pretrial Conference set for 07/25/2014 @ 8:45 a.m. [Doc. 47]; and VACATING the Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 09/15/2014 through 09/26/2014, @ 9:00 a.m., (approximately ten (10) days), [Doc. 48], until further notice. [THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.](ao)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: 6/26/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack; Matter shall stayed in accordance with the parties' request, all pending motions are deemed withdrawn
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: 6/13/2014 response
                                                      Joint RESPONSE to Court's Request for Briefing Regarding Whether a Stay is Appropriate re 204 Order, Terminate Hearings filed by Stephen Torres. (Love, Kathleen)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER REGARDING FEES AND PROCEDURE FOR DEPOSITION OF NMS LABS TECHNICIAN DONNA PAPSUN by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. (cda)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: 6/3/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack vacating the pretrial conference set for June 20, 2014 as further described herein; (yc)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: 6/3/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                            MOTION in Limine #7 to Exclude Evidence of the Department of Justice's Letter Report on Albuquerque's Pattern and Practice of Excessive Force by City of Albuquerque ex rel. (Maggiore, W)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: 6/3/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                              MOTION in Limine #6 to Exclude Evidence of Detectives' Failure to Record the Incident or Evidence that the Recorders were Erased by City of Albuquerque ex rel. (Maggiore, W)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: 6/3/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                MOTION in Limine #5 to Exclude any Reference or Evidence of Failure to use a Belt Tape Recorder or Erasing Belt Tape Recorders by City of Albuquerque ex rel. (Maggiore, W)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: 6/3/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                  MOTION in Limine #4 to Exclude any Reference or Evidence of Post Shooting Events by City of Albuquerque ex rel. (Maggiore, W)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: 6/3/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                    MOTION in Limine #3 to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Request for Polygraph Examination of Officers by City of Albuquerque ex rel. (Maggiore, W)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: 6/3/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                      MOTION in Limine #2 to Exclude Evidence of Prior Citizen Complaints and Lawsuit by City of Albuquerque ex rel. (Maggiore, W)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: 6/3/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                        MOTION in Limine #1 to Exclude any Reference or Evidence Relating to the District Attorney's Criminal Investigation of the Events of April 12, 2011 by City of Albuquerque ex rel. (Maggiore, W)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: 5/22/2014 settlement conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                          Clerk's Minutes for Settlement Conference held on 5/22/2014 before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. Case did not settle. (cda)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: 5/8/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. Plaintiff will have an extension of time to depose a representative of NMS Laboratories through 6/5/14. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.](cda)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: 5/8/2014 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                              Clerk's Minutes for Status Conference held on 5/8/2014 before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. Participants included Kathleen Love and Kevin Holmes on behalf of Plaintiff and Doug Gardner on behalf of Defendants. The Court will extend the deadline for Plaintiff to take the deposition of a representative of NMS Laboratories until 6/5/14. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cda)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: 5/8/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen setting a Status Conference for 5/8/2014 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. (cda)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: 5/6/2014 Errata
                                                                                  ERRATA re 191 Pretrial Order by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger (Gardner, Douglas)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    PRETRIAL ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack (jn)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: 5/2/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen setting a Settlement Conference for 5/22/2014 at 01:00 PM in Albuquerque - 560 Cimarron Courtroom before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. (cda)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: 5/1/2014 Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                        Proposed Pretrial Order by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger (Gardner, Douglas)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: 5/1/2014 Order on Motion to Extend (other)Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting in part and denying in part 80 ORDER on Motion to Extend Discovery. (cda)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                            Clerk's Minutes for Status Conference held on 4/17/2014 before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. Participants included Randi McGinn, Kathleen Love, and Kevin Holmes on behalf of Plaintiffs and Ann Maggiore, Luis Robles, and David Roman on behalf of Defendants. The Court will grant Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend the Discovery Deadline [Doc. 80] in part and deny it in part. The parties will submit a proposed order consistent with the Court's ruling. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cda)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Witness List *
                                                                                              Witness List by Stephen Torres. (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Certificate of service
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger for City Defendants' Thirteenth Supplemental Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: 4/7/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen setting an in-person Status Conference for 4/17/2014 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - 730 Judge Karen B. Molzen Chambers before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. (cda)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: 4/2/2014 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER Granting City Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limits on Their Reply In Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment NO III by District Judge Robert C. Brack granting 160 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (jn)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Notice of Briefing Complete
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger re 109 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. VI: Dismissal of Plaintiff's Hiring Practices Claim Regarding Detective Christopher Brown and Punitive Damages Against City of Albuquerque and APD filed by City of Albuquerque ex rel, Christopher Brown, Albuquerque Police Department, Richard Hilger (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 109 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. VI: Dismissal of Plaintiff's Hiring Practices Claim Regarding Detective Christopher Brown and Punitive Damages Against City of Albuquerque and APD filed by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Notice of Briefing Complete
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger re 108 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. V: Dismissal of Plaintiff's Failure to Supervise Claims Against City Defendants filed by City of Albuquerque ex rel, Christopher Brown, Albuquerque Police Department, Richard Hilger (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 108 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. V: Dismissal of Plaintiff's Failure to Supervise Claims Against City Defendants filed by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Notice of Briefing Complete
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger re 107 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. IV: Dismissal of Plaintiff's Municipal Liability Claims Against Defendant City of Albuquerque filed by City of Albuquerque ex rel, Christopher Brown, Albuquerque Police Department, Richard Hilger (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 107 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. IV: Dismissal of Plaintiff's Municipal Liability Claims Against Defendant City of Albuquerque filed by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Notice of Briefing Complete
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger re 106 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. III: Dismissal of Plaintiff's Failure to Train Claims Against Defendant City of Albuquerque filed by City of Albuquerque ex rel, Christopher Brown, Albuquerque Police Department, Richard Hilger (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 106 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. III: Dismissal of Plaintiff's Failure to Train Claims Against Defendant City of Albuquerque filed by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Notice of Briefing Complete
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger re 105 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. II: Dismissal of Count III filed by City of Albuquerque ex rel, Christopher Brown, Albuquerque Police Department, Richard Hilger (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 105 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. II: Dismissal of Count III filed by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Notice of Briefing Complete
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger re 104 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No I: Dismissal of Count II filed by City of Albuquerque ex rel, Christopher Brown, Albuquerque Police Department, Richard Hilger (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 104 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No I: Dismissal of Count II filed by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Notice of Briefing Complete
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger re 103 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by City of Albuquerque ex rel, Christopher Brown, Albuquerque Police Department, Richard Hilger (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 103 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Notice of Briefing Complete
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger re 102 MOTION to Exclude No. IV: Exclusion of the Expert Report and Testimony of George Kirkham filed by City of Albuquerque ex rel, Christopher Brown, Albuquerque Police Department, Richard Hilger (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 102 MOTION to Exclude No. IV: Exclusion of the Expert Report and Testimony of George Kirkham filed by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: 3/21/2014 Order on Motion to Extend (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting City Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limits on its Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by District Judge Robert C. Brack granting 141 ORDER on Motion to Extend (jn)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Notice of Briefing Complete
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger re 101 MOTION to Exclude No. III: The Exclusion of Testimony of Ronald Scott filed by City of Albuquerque ex rel, Christopher Brown, Albuquerque Police Department, Richard Hilger (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: 3/20/2014 Notice of Briefing Complete
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Stephen Torres re 117 MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Defendant's Criminology Expert Ronald Martinelli, Ph. D filed by Stephen Torres (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 101 MOTION to Exclude No. III: The Exclusion of Testimony of Ronald Scott filed by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: 3/20/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 117 MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Defendant's Criminology Expert Ronald Martinelli, Ph. D filed by Stephen Torres. (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Notice of Briefing Complete
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger re 100 MOTION to Exclude No. II: The Exclusion of Testimony of George Schiro filed by City of Albuquerque ex rel, Christopher Brown, Albuquerque Police Department, Richard Hilger (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: 3/20/2014 Notice of Briefing Complete
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Stephen Torres re 116 MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Defendants' Firearms Expert Lance Martini filed by Stephen Torres (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 100 MOTION to Exclude No. II: The Exclusion of Testimony of George Schiro filed by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: 3/20/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 116 MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Defendants' Firearms Expert Lance Martini filed by Stephen Torres. (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Notice of Briefing Complete
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger re 99 MOTION to Exclude No. I: The Exclusion of Benchmark Figures for Lost Household Services and Lost Value of the Pleasure of Life by Plaintiff's Expert Economist Brian McDonald filed by City of Albuquerque ex rel, Christopher Brown, Albuquerque Police Department, Richard Hilger (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: 3/18/2014 Motion to Extend (other)
                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Extend (other) [Motion to Exceed Page Limits for Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment No. I] by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 99 MOTION to Exclude No. I: The Exclusion of Benchmark Figures for Lost Household Services and Lost Value of the Pleasure of Life by Plaintiff's Expert Economist Brian McDonald filed by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger (Notice of Stipulated Briefing Deadlines for Defendants' Reply Brief for Defendants' Motion for Separate Trials) (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: 3/28/2014 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for City Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment No. III by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: 3/13/2014 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger (Notice of Stipulated Briefing Deadlines for Defendants' Reply Briefs for Defendants' Daubert Motions I-IV and Defendants' Motions for Partial Summary Judgment Nos. II-VI) (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: 3/27/2014 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by City of Albuquerque ex rel Notice of Non-Availability (Maggiore, W)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 117 MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Defendant's Criminology Expert Ronald Martinelli, Ph. D filed by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: 3/27/2014 Notice of Briefing Complete
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Stephen Torres re 97 MOTION in Limine (Daubert) to Exclude the Unreliable Expert Testimony of Toxicologist Don Fisher, MD filed by Stephen Torres (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 116 MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Defendants' Firearms Expert Lance Martini filed by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: 3/27/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 97 MOTION in Limine (Daubert) to Exclude the Unreliable Expert Testimony of Toxicologist Don Fisher, MD filed by Stephen Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: 3/4/2014 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger re 104 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No I: Dismissal of Count II (Notice Regarding Stipulated Briefing Deadline for City Defendants' Reply Brief) (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 Notice of Briefing Complete
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Stephen Torres re 96 MOTION in Limine to Prevent the Introduction of Evidence or Testimony about the Details of Events Detectives Brown and Hilger Admit they Knew Nothing About Before Mr. Torres' Death filed by Stephen Torres (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/4/2014 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limits for Responses and to Exceed Page Limits for Exhibits by District Judge Robert C. Brack granting 128 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (jn)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 96 MOTION in Limine to Prevent the Introduction of Evidence or Testimony about the Details of Events Detectives Brown and Hilger Admit they Knew Nothing About Before Mr. Torres' Death filed by Stephen Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/3/2014 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 123 Response to Motion, 120 Response in Opposition to Motion, 118 Response in Opposition to Motion, 119 Response in Opposition to Motion, 122 Response to Motion, 121 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Stephen Torres. (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 Notice of Briefing Complete
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Stephen Torres re 94 MOTION in Limine to Prevent any Allegations of Prior Drug Use by Christopher Torres from Reaching the Jury filed by Stephen Torres (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 106 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. III: Dismissal of Plaintiff's Failure to Train Claims Against Defendant City of Albuquerque, 107 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. IV: Dismissal of Plaintiff's Municipal Liability Claims Against Defendant City of Albuquerque, 109 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. VI: Dismissal of Plaintiff's Hiring Practices Claim Regarding Detective Christopher Brown and Punitive Damages Against City of Albuquerque and APD, 108 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. V: Dismissal of Plaintiff's Failure to Supervise Claims Against City Defendants filed by Stephen Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20)(Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 94 MOTION in Limine to Prevent any Allegations of Prior Drug Use by Christopher Torres from Reaching the Jury filed by Stephen Torres. (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 105 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. II: Dismissal of Count III filed by Stephen Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V)(Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 Notice of Briefing Complete
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Stephen Torres re 95 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Releated to Christopher Torres' Driving filed by Stephen Torres (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 100 MOTION to Exclude No. II: The Exclusion of Testimony of George Schiro filed by Stephen Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 95 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Releated to Christopher Torres' Driving filed by Stephen Torres. (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 102 MOTION to Exclude No. IV: Exclusion of the Expert Report and Testimony of George Kirkham filed by Stephen Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X)(Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 Notice of Briefing Complete
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Stephen Torres re 93 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Reference to Eyewitness' Prior Citations for DWI filed by Stephen Torres (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 104 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No I: Dismissal of Count II filed by Stephen Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29)(Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 93 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Reference to Eyewitness' Prior Citations for DWI filed by Stephen Torres. (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Responses and to Exceed Page Limits for Exhibits by Stephen Torres. (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 Notice of Briefing Complete
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Stephen Torres re 98 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Reference at Trial to Physician Kevin Rexroad, MD's Testimony Fee Waiver or Any Other Suggestion that a Verdict in Plaintiff's Favor Would be Paid by Albuquerque's Taxpayers filed by Stephen Torres (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Stephen Torres of Withdrawal of Counsel (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 127 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 101 MOTION to Exclude No. III: The Exclusion of Testimony of Ronald Scott filed by Stephen Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 126 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 99 MOTION to Exclude No. I: The Exclusion of Benchmark Figures for Lost Household Services and Lost Value of the Pleasure of Life by Plaintiff's Expert Economist Brian McDonald filed by Stephen Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 125 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 103 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Stephen Torres. (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 124 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Witness List by Stephen Torres. (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 98 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Reference at Trial to Physician Kevin Rexroad, MD's Testimony Fee Waiver or Any Other Suggestion that a Verdict in Plaintiff's Favor Would be Paid by Albuquerque's Taxpayers filed by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 97 MOTION in Limine (Daubert) to Exclude the Unreliable Expert Testimony of Toxicologist Don Fisher, MD filed by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 96 MOTION in Limine to Prevent the Introduction of Evidence or Testimony about the Details of Events Detectives Brown and Hilger Admit they Knew Nothing About Before Mr. Torres' Death filed by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 95 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Releated to Christopher Torres' Driving filed by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 94 MOTION in Limine to Prevent any Allegations of Prior Drug Use by Christopher Torres from Reaching the Jury filed by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 93 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Reference to Eyewitness' Prior Citations for DWI filed by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 117 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: 2/21/2014 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Defendant's Criminology Expert Ronald Martinelli, Ph. D by Stephen Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: 2/21/2014 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Defendants' Firearms Expert Lance Martini by Stephen Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: 2/21/2014 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger for City Defendants' Twelfth Supplemental Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: 2/18/2014 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting 113 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses. City Defendants responses to Plaintiffs outstanding Daubert motions and motions limine are due February 24, 2014; and Plaintiffs responses to City Defendants outstanding Daubert motions and motions for partial summary judgment are due February 28, 2014. (KBM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/14/2014 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger for City Defendants' Eleventh Supplemental Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen that having reviewed the settlement statements submitted by the parties, the settlement conference scheduled for February 12, 2014 is hereby vacated as premature. It will be reset at a later date. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED. (KBM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: 2/5/2014 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting Defendant City of Albuquerque's Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limits on its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment No. I by District Judge Robert C. Brack granting 91 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (jn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Motion for partial summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. VI: Dismissal of Plaintiff's Hiring Practices Claim Regarding Detective Christopher Brown and Punitive Damages Against City of Albuquerque and APD by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Motion for partial summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. V: Dismissal of Plaintiff's Failure to Supervise Claims Against City Defendants by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Motion for partial summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. IV: Dismissal of Plaintiff's Municipal Liability Claims Against Defendant City of Albuquerque by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit H, # 8 Exhibit I, # 9 Exhibit J, # 10 Exhibit K, # 11 Exhibit L, # 12 Exhibit M, # 13 Exhibit N, # 14 Exhibit D)(Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Motion for partial summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. III: Dismissal of Plaintiff's Failure to Train Claims Against Defendant City of Albuquerque by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Motion for partial summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No. II: Dismissal of Count III by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Motion for partial summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment No I: Dismissal of Count II by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 103 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Motion to Bifurcate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Bifurcate by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Exclude No. IV: Exclusion of the Expert Report and Testimony of George Kirkham by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Exclude No. III: The Exclusion of Testimony of Ronald Scott by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Exclude No. II: The Exclusion of Testimony of George Schiro by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Exclude No. I: The Exclusion of Benchmark Figures for Lost Household Services and Lost Value of the Pleasure of Life by Plaintiff's Expert Economist Brian McDonald by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 98 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to Exclude Reference at Trial to Physician Kevin Rexroad, MD's Testimony Fee Waiver or Any Other Suggestion that a Verdict in Plaintiff's Favor Would be Paid by Albuquerque's Taxpayers by Stephen Torres. (Atkins, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 97 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine (Daubert) to Exclude the Unreliable Expert Testimony of Toxicologist Don Fisher, MD by Stephen Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Atkins, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 96 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Prevent the Introduction of Evidence or Testimony about the Details of Events Detectives Brown and Hilger Admit they Knew Nothing About Before Mr. Torres' Death by Stephen Torres. (Atkins, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 95 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Releated to Christopher Torres' Driving by Stephen Torres. (Atkins, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 94 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Prevent any Allegations of Prior Drug Use by Christopher Torres from Reaching the Jury by Stephen Torres. (Atkins, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 93 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude Reference to Eyewitness' Prior Citations for DWI by Stephen Torres. (Atkins, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 order on motion to resetCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting 90 Unopposed Motion to Reset Daubert Motion Deadline. (cda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Defendant City's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment No. I by Albuquerque Police Department, City of Albuquerque ex rel. (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014 motion to reset
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Reset Daubert Motion Deadline by Stephen Torres. (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: 1/8/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ORDER (as to location only) by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen setting Settlement Conference for 2/12/2014 at 9:30 AM in Albuquerque - 340 Pecos Courtroom before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: 1/8/2014 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by David Anthony Roman on behalf of Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger (Roman, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: 1/8/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen setting Settlement Conference for 2/12/2014 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 560 Cimarron Courtroom before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. Settlement statements are due to chambers on or before 2/5/14. (cda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: 1/2/2014 Notice of Briefing Complete
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Briefing Complete by All Plaintiffs re 80 Opposed MOTION to Extend (other) December 13, 2013 Discovery Deadline filed by Stephen Torres (McGinn, Randi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: 1/2/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 80 Opposed MOTION to Extend (other) December 13, 2013 Discovery Deadline filed by Stephen Torres. (McGinn, Randi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: 12/18/2013 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas E Gardner on behalf of Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger (Gardner, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: 12/16/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Torres Corrected Responses to 1st Requests for Production & 3rd Supplemental & Corrected Answers to 1st Interrogatories (Atkins, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: 12/16/2013 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Clerk's Minutes for Status Conference held on 12/16/2013 before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. Participants included Randi McGinn and Kathleen Love on behalf of Plaintiffs and W. Ann Maggiore and Doug Gardner on behalf of Defendants. The Court has taken the issue of whether to set a federal mediation under advisement. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.](cda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: 12/16/2013 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 80 Opposed MOTION to Extend (other) December 13, 2013 Discovery Deadline filed by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Gardner, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 80 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: 12/10/2013 Motion to Extend (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposed MOTION to Extend (other) December 13, 2013 Discovery Deadline by Stephen Torres. (McGinn, Randi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: 12/4/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen setting Status Conference for 12/16/2013 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. (cda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger City Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission; Defendant Brown's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission; and Defendant Hilger's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: 11/19/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger Rule26(a)(2) Expert Disclosures (Maggiore, W)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting 74 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Defendants' Expert Disclosure Deadline. (cda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Order on Motion to Extend (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILED IN ERROR ***ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting 74 Motion to Extend time for Defendants' Expert Disclosure. (cda) Modified to add error text on 11/15/2013 (yc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: 11/13/2013 Motion to Extend (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Extend (other) Defendants' Expert Disclosure Deadline by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger. (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: 11/13/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger for City Defendants' Tenth Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: 10/31/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger for City Defendants' Third Supplemental Answers and Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: 10/31/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger for City Defendants' Ninth Supplemental Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: 10/30/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Torres for Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions to Defendant Richard Hilger (Atkins, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: 10/30/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Torres for Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions to Defendant City of Albuquerque ex rel. Albuquerque Police Department (Atkins, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: 10/30/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Torres for Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions to Defendant Christopher Brown (Atkins, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REGARDING SCENE WALK-THROUGH by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. (KBM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: 10/24/2013 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Stephen Torres of Non-Appearance at the Deposition of Ronald R. Scott (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: 10/24/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger for City Defendants' Eighth Supplemental Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/21/2013 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting 59 Motion for Order Allowing Entry upon Land as described herein. (KBM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: 10/18/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger for City Defendants' Seventh Supplemental Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: 10/17/2013 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Clerk's Minutes for Discovery Status Conference held on 10/17/2013 before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. Participants included Kathleen Love and Katie Curry on behalf of Plaintiff. W. Ann Maggiore and Luis Robles appeared on behalf of Defendant. Plaintiff Stephen Torres was also present. The Court heard from counsel regarding a walk-through of the scene by Defendant's expert. The Court ruled on the conditions of the walk-through. A proposed order conforming with the Court's ruling will be submitted by Defendant. Plaintiff will have until 10/24/13 to file a response brief to Defendant's First Request to Enter Upon Land for Inspection and Other Purposes (Doc. 59) to preserve Plaintiff's position and protect the record. [THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen setting Telephonic Discovery Status Conference for 10/17/13 at 9:00 a.m. (cda) Modified date on 10/16/2013 (bap).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  "FILED IN ERROR" Wrong PDF document attached. ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen setting Discovery Status Conference for 10/17/2013 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. (cda) Modified text to include error message on 10/16/2013 (bap).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: 10/10/2013 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION for Order to Enter Upon Land for Inspection and Other Purposes by City of Albuquerque ex rel. (Maggiore, W)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: 10/9/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen vacating the telephonic status conference set for 10/15/13 at 2:00 P.M. The Court has been advised by the parties that this conference is no longer necessary. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.](cda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness List by Stephen Torres. (Atkins, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen setting Discovery Status Conference for 10/15/2013 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen.(cda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: 8/21/2013 order on motion to resetCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting 54 Unopposed Motion Resetting Certain Pretrial Deadlines. (as).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 motion to reset
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Reset Certain Pretrial Deadlines by Stephen Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Atkins, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: 8/9/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger for City Defendants' Sixth Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: 8/5/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: 7/19/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Torres Plaint's 2nd Amended Initial Disclosures; 2nd Supp Responses to Def's 1st Rogs and Rfps (Atkins, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, City of Albuquerque ex rel, Richard Hilger for City Defendants' Fourth Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/18/2013 Notice of Attorney Substitution
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Substitution: W Ann Maggiore substituted for Kathryn Levy (Maggiore, W)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/18/2013 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection and Jury Trial originally set for 04/28/2014 through 05/09/2014, is HEREBY VACATED and RE-SET to 09/15/2014 through 09/26/2014 (approximately ten (10) days) at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) before District Judge Robert C. Brack. (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/18/2013 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference originally set for 03/28/2014, is HEREBY VACATED and RE-SET to 07/25/2014 at 08:45 AM in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) before District Judge Robert C. Brack. (Counsel may appear telephonically for all Pretrial Conferences by calling Judge Brack's 'meet me' line a few minutes before the time scheduled for the Pretrial Conference. Should you choose this conference method, please contact Chambers.) (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/18/2013 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference originally set for 02/21/2014, is HEREBY VACATED and RE-SET to 06/20/2014 at 08:45 AM in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) before District Judge Robert C. Brack. (Counsel may appear telephonically for all Pretrial Conferences by calling Judge Brack's 'meet me' line a few minutes before the time scheduled for the Pretrial Conference. Should you choose this conference method, please contact Chambers.) (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: 6/12/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, Richard Hilger for City Defendants' Third Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: 5/30/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Torres for Notice of Videotaped Depo DT of Paige Lavilla (McGinn, Randi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: 5/24/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, Richard Hilger for City Defendants' Second Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: 5/23/2013 Order on Motion to Extend (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting 41 Unopposed Motion Resetting Discovery-Related and Certain Pretrial Deadlines. Discovery due 10/31/2013. Motions due 12/16/2013. Pretrial order due to Court by 3/17/2014. (tah) Modified to correct date on 5/23/2013 (dds).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: 5/22/2013 Motion to Extend (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Extend (other) Discovery Related and Certain Pre-Trial Deadlines by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, Richard Hilger. (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Torres Rogs, Rfp - Defs' 1st to Plaint, 1st Supp Resp and 1st Amended Initial Disclosures (Atkins, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: 5/10/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, Richard Hilger for City Defendants' Second Supplemental Answers and Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: 4/15/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, Richard Hilger for City Defendants' First Supplemental Answers and Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogtories and Requests for Production (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: 4/1/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher Brown, Richard Hilger City Defendants Answers and Responses to Plaintiffs First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Torres (for amended notice to Lopez & notice to DiVasto) (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: 3/12/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, Richard Hilger City Defendants' First Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Torres of Notice of Videotape Deposition of Detective Xavier Lopez (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/15/2013 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen: Status Conference held on 2/13/2013. Participants included Randi McGinn, Tyler Atkins & Kathleen Love on behalf of Plaintiff and Doug Gardner on behalf of Defendant.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (tah) Modified text on 3/8/2013 (ick).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: 2/11/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Torres for Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and First Requests for Prodction (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/21/2013, Entered: 1/21/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Torres Plaintiff's Answers and Responses to Initial Discovery Requests (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: 1/10/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Torres Amended Notice of Videotape Deposition Duces Tecum of Chief Raymond Schultz (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 04/28/2014 through 05/09/2014 (approximately ten (10) days) at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) before District Judge Robert C. Brack. (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 03/28/2014 at 08:30 AM in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) before District Judge Robert C. Brack. (Counsel may appear telephonically for all Pretrial Conferences by calling Judge Brack's 'meet me' line. Should you choose this conference method, please contact Chambers.) (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 02/21/2014 at 08:30 AM in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) before District Judge Robert C. Brack. (Counsel may appear telephonically for all Pretrial Conferences by calling Judge Brack's 'meet me' line. Should you choose this conference method, please contact Chambers.) (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: 12/17/2012 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, Richard Hilger City Defendants' First Set of Discovery Requests to Steven Torres as personal representative of the estate of Christopher Torres (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: 12/14/2012 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Torres regarding Notices of Deposition Duces Tecum of Chief Raymond Schultz and Lt. Steve Tate (Ret.) (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen setting a Status Conference for 2/13/2013 at 3:00 PM in Albuquerque - 730 Judge Karen B. Molzen Chambers before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. (tah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012 Order Adopting Joint Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. (tah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. Discovery due by 8/5/2013. Motions due by 9/16/2013. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/19/2013. (tah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012 scheduling conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen: Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 12/11/2012. (tah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: 12/11/2012 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Torres for Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: 12/6/2012 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, Richard Hilger for City Defendants' Rule 26 (A)(1) Initial Disclosures (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Notice of Judge ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. District Judge C. LeRoy Hansen no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Notice of Removed Rule 73 Document Entries
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: 14. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/4/2012 Joint Status Report (JSR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Stephen Torres (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Notice of Judge ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge C. LeRoy Hansen as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: 11/9/2012 Initial Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. Telephonic Rule 16 initial scheduling conference set for 12/11/2012 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel shall call my meet-me conference line at 505-348-2353 to be joined to the proceedings. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due on 12/04/2012. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/30/2012. (tah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: 11/8/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, Richard Hilger. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Stephen Torres.(Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: 10/12/2012 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Richard Hilger on October 11, 2012, filed by Stephen Torres. (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: 10/12/2012 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Christopher Brown on October 11, 2012, filed by Stephen Torres. (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: 10/12/2012 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on City of Albuquerque ex rel. Albuquerque Police Department on October 11, 2012, filed by Stephen Torres. (Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: 10/10/2012 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Terri S Beach on behalf of Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, Richard Hilger (Beach, Terri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: 10/10/2012 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Luis E. Robles on behalf of Albuquerque Police Department, Christopher Brown, Richard Hilger (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: 10/10/2012 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Hilger as to Richard Hilger. (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: 10/10/2012 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Brown as to Christopher Brown. (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: 10/10/2012 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Albuquerque Police Department as to Albuquerque Police Department. (Robles, Luis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: 10/10/2012 Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment (Text Only)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmcourt.fed.us for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 10/10/2012 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 1084-2737030 (ln)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 10/9/2012 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT FOR DEPRIVATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS AND VIOLATION OF AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Stephen Torres.(Love, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?