County of Cook v. HSBC North America Holdings, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-02031
District Judge John Z. Lee, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2020 at 5:29 PM ST (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo County of Cook, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Evangelista & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James M. Evangelista +1 404 478 7195 +1 404 478 7139 jme@eafirm.com
Space David James Worley +1 404 478 7195 +1 404 478 7139 djw@eafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Harris, Penn & Lowry, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey R. Harris +1 404 961 7650 jeff@hpllegal.com
Space Darren W. Penn +1 404 961 7650 darren@hpllegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by James D. Montgomery & Associates, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James D. Montgomery, Sr. +1 312 977 0200 james@jdmlaw.com
Space Daniel A. Dailey +1 312 977 0200 ddailey@jdmlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John K Kennedy +1 312 977 0200 jkennedy@jdmlaw.com
Space James Douglas Montgomery, Jr. +1 312 977 0200 james2@jdmlaw.com
Space Michelle M. Montgomery +1 312 977 0200 mmm@jdmlaw.com
v.
Bank of America Corporation Bank of America Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Beneficial Company LLC, Defendant
No Logo Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, Defendant
No Logo HFC Company LLC, Defendant
HSBC Bank USA, NA HSBC Bank USA, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "HSBC Bank USA National Association"
HSBC Finance Corporation HSBC Finance Corporation, Defendant
No Logo HSBC Mortgage Corp. (USA), Defendant
Officially listed as "HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA)"
No Logo HSBC Mortgage Services Inc., Defendant
HSBC North America Holdings Inc. HSBC North America Holdings Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buckley Sandler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard E. Gottlieb +1 312 627 2196 +1 866 548 2878 rgottlieb@buckleysandler.com
Space Valerie L. Hletko +1 202 349 8054 vhletko@buckleysandler.com
Space Mark E. Rooney +1 202 349 8033
Space Andrew L. Sandler +1 202 349 8000 +1 202 349 8080 asandler@buckleysandler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Buckley Sandler, LLP-IL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brett J Natarelli +1 312 924 9837 bnatarelli@buckleysandler.com
Space Ann D. Wiles +1 202 349 8000 awiles@buckleysandler.com
HSBC USA, Inc. HSBC USA, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 405
Nature of Suit 443 - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations
  Entries (218) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Stay
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None Continue
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 6/19/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: None Continue
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7/17/2018 before the Honorable John Z. Lee. Order Number: 31490. Court Reporter Contact Information: ALEXANDRA ROTH, alexandra_roth@ilnd.uscourts.gov, (312) 408-5038. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2018. (Roth, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 7/17/18. The deadline to amend the pleading and join parties is 4/30/19; initial written discovery requests are to be served by 6/28/19. Fact discovery shall close on 9/30/19. Status hearing set for 10/24/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      ANSWER to amended complaint by Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc.(Hletko, Valerie) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE by Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. Joint Proposed Discovery Schedule on behalf of All Parties (Hletko, Valerie) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Defendants' motion to withdraw as attorney 178 is granted. Andrew Sandler and Ann Wiles are granted leave to withdraw as counsel. Unopposed motion for an extension of time until June 27, 2018 to answer second amended complaint 180 is granted. No appearance is required on the motions. Mailed notice (ca, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Valerie Lynn Hletko for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, 180 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 6/14/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Hletko, Valerie) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018 Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                              MOTION by Defendants Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint 136 (Unopposed) (Hletko, Valerie)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Valerie Lynn Hletko for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney, 178 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 6/14/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Hletko, Valerie) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018 Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                  MOTION by Attorney Andrew L. Sandler and Ann D. Wiles to withdraw as attorney for Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc.. No party information provided (Hletko, Valerie)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:By agreement of the parties, the status hearing set for 6/19/18 is reset to 7/17/18 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:In light of the Court's order 175, the parties are directed to meet and confer and submit a proposed discovery schedule by 6/13/18. The status hearing set for 5/31/18 is reset to 6/19/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 Memorandum Opinion and Order
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 5/30/18.Mailed notice(ca, )
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: For the reasons provided in the memorandum opinion and order, the Court grants in part and denies in part HSBC's motion to dismiss 137 the County's Second Amended Complaint. HSBC's motion is granted as to the following claimed injuries: the County's costs of providing social services to homeowners; costs of demolishing homes; loss of property tax revenue from foreclosed, abandoned and vacant properties; loss of various revenue from abandoned or foreclosed properties; diminution of the tax base due to foreclosed homes and surrounding properties; and the costs associated with urban blight. The motion is denied with respect to the County's claimed injuries resulting from HSBC's allegedly improper use of the Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., as well as the additional costs the County incurred for the administration of foreclosure proceedings that resulted from the challenged practices, including the costs of serving eviction notices, conducting judicial and administrative foreclosure procedures, and registering and inspecting foreclosed homes. The motion also is denied in all other respects. [For further details see memorandum opinion and order].Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The status hearing set for 5/16/18 is reset to 5/31/18 at 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:By agreement of the parties, the status hearing set for 4/27/18 is reset to 5/16/18 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice by Kristi Stahnke McGregor 169 is granted.Mailed notice (ca, )
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status hearing set for 4/12/18 is reset to 4/27/18 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14337686. Kristi Stahnke McGregor (Evangelista, James)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE by Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. re notice of filing, 167 Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority (Hletko, Valerie) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE by County of Cook of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (City of Philadelphia v. Wells Fargo Decision), # 2 Exhibit B (County of Cook v. Wells Fargo Decision), # 3 Exhibit C (County of Cook v. Bank of America Decision))(Evangelista, James) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Defendants' motion to dismiss second amended complaint 137 is granted in part and denied in part. A memorandum opinion and order will be issued shortly. Mailed notice (ca, )
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The status hearing set for 3/14/18 is reset to 4/12/18 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE by Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hletko, Valerie) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE by Melissa Ryan Clark of Change of Address (Clark, Melissa) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion to withdraw appearances of Jeffrey Harris and Darren Penn 160 is granted. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by John K. Kennedy for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 160 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/30/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Kennedy, John) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      MOTION by Attorney Jeffrey Harris and Darren Penn ONLY to withdraw as attorney for County of Cook. No party information provided (Kennedy, John)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status hearing set for 1/17/18 is reset to 3/15/18 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The status hearing set for 11/15/17 is reset to 1/17/18 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Plaintiff County of Cook to notice of filing,, 156 RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Kennedy, John) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. re MOTION by Defendants HSBC USA, Inc., HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Bank USA National Association, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., Beneficial Company, LLC, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HFC Company LLC, HSBC Mor 137 of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hletko, Valerie) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice by J. Birt Reynolds 151 , Jennifer Czeisler 152 and Sanford Dumain 153 are granted.Mailed notice (ca, )
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  REPLY by Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. to MOTION by Defendants HSBC USA, Inc., HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Bank USA National Association, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., Beneficial Company, LLC, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HFC Company LLC, HSBC Mor 137 in support of Motion to Dismiss SAC (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Tab A, # 3 Tab B, # 4 Tab C, # 5 Tab D, # 6 Tab E, # 7 Tab F, # 8 Tab G, # 9 Tab H, # 10 Tab I)(Hletko, Valerie) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: 9/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13632719. (Dumain, Sanford)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: 9/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13631492. (Czeisler, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13630066. (Reynolds, J.)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: 9/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motions for leave to appear pro hac vice by Melissa Clark 147 and Peggy Wedgworth 149 are granted. Mailed notice (ca, )
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: 9/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13617633. (Wedgworth, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of $50, receipt no. 0752-13597874, regarding motion to appear pro hac vice 147 County of Cook v. HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., et al. (Clark, Melissa) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13598253. (Clark, Melissa) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by County of Cookin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants HSBC USA, Inc., HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Bank USA National Association, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., Beneficial Company, LLC, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HFC Company LLC, HSBC Mor 137 (Kennedy, John) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Unopposed motion for extension of time for a four day extension of time to file a response 143 is granted; response due by 9/8/17; reply due by 9/29/17. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by John K. Kennedy for presentment of extension of time 143 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 9/5/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Kennedy, John) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Plaintiff County of Cook for extension of time UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR A FOUR DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE BRIEF AND TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR FILING DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF (Kennedy, John) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Uncontested motion of Plaintiff Cook County for leave to file oversized response brief 140 is granted. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by John K. Kennedy for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 140 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 8/22/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Kennedy, John) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 140 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Plaintiff County of Cook for leave to file excess pages - UNCONTESTED MOTION TO FILE 25 PAGE RESPONSE (Kennedy, John) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The parties are directed to brief Defendants' motion to dismiss 137 in accordance with the briefing schedule previously set by the Court. No appearance is required on the motion. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Valerie L Hletko for presentment of motion to dismiss,, 137 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 8/22/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Hletko, Valerie) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Defendants HSBC USA, Inc., HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Bank USA National Association, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., Beneficial Company, LLC, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HFC Company LLC, HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. to dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Appendix A, # 3 Appendix B, # 4 Tab A, # 5 Tab B, # 6 Tab C, # 7 Tab D, # 8 Tab E, # 9 Tab F, # 10 Tab G)(Hletko, Valerie) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: 7/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      SECOND AMENDED complaint by County of Cook against All Defendants (Kennedy, John)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: 6/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion hearing held on 6/7/17. Plaintiff is not present. Joint motion to have the Court enter the parties' agreed upon case management schedule in light of the Supreme Court's decision in City of Miami 133 is granted. Plaintiff's amended complaint shall be due by 7/10/17; Defendant's answer or motion to dismiss shall be due by 8/7/17; response due by 9/4/17; reply due by 9/18/17. Status hearing set for 11/15/17 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by Valerie L Hletko for presentment of motion by filer to set a briefing schedule, 133 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 6/7/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Hletko, Valerie) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Defendants Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. to set a briefing schedule (Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule and to Strike June 13 Status Hearing) (Hletko, Valerie)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: In light of the Court's prior order resetting the next status hearing to 6/13/17 at 9:00 a.m., the joint motion to continue status hearing 129 is stricken as moot. No appearance is required on the motion. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The Supreme Court has not issued its decision in the Bank of America v. City of Miami. Accordingly, the status hearing set for 4/11/17 is reset to 6/13/17 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Valerie L Hletko for presentment of motion to continue, 129 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/11/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Hletko, Valerie) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Defendants Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. to continue April 11 Status Hearing (Joint Motion by All Parties) (Hletko, Valerie)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status hearing set for 1/11/17 is reset to 4/11/17 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS Report (Joint Status Report by All Parties) by Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. (Hletko, Valerie) (Entered: 12/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status hearing set for 1/5/17 is reset to 1/11/17 at 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: 11/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion to withdraw as attorney 123 is granted. Daniel A Dailey is granted leave to withdraw as counsel. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Daniel A Dailey for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 123 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/22/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Dailey, Daniel) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: 11/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Attorney Daniel A. Dailey to withdraw as attorney for County of Cook. No party information provided (Dailey, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 122 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5/18/2016 before the Honorable John Z. Lee. Court Reporter Contact Information: ALEXANDRA ROTH, alexandra_roth@ilnd.uscourts.gov (312) 408-5038. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/26/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/5/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2016. (Roth, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Defendants' uncontested motion to stay proceedings pending Supreme Court resolution of controlling issues of law 118 is granted. This case is placed on the Court's suspended trial calendar. Status hearing set for 1/5/17 at 9:00 a.m. The parties should submit a status report by 12/29/16. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. re MOTION by Defendants Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, 118 of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Hletko, Valerie) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion by Valerie L Hletko for presentment of motion to stay, 118 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 8/4/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Hletko, Valerie) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 118 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Defendants Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. to stay Uncontested Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Supreme Court Resolution of Controlling Issue of Law (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support, # 2 Exhibit A)(Hletko, Valerie) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The request for continuance is granted. The status hearing set for 6/28/16 is reset to 8/4/16 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS Report (Joint Status Report and Request for Continuance) by Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. (Hletko, Valerie) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Defendants' motion to withdraw as counsel 113 is granted; Brett J Natarelli is granted leave to withdraw as counsel. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Scott Tadashi Sakiyama for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney, 113 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 6/21/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Sakiyama, Scott) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 113 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Attorney Brett J. Natarelli to withdraw as attorney for Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc.. No party information provided (Sakiyama, Scott) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. by Scott Tadashi Sakiyama (Sakiyama, Scott) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff's unopposed motion to extend time to amend the pleadings 109 is granted. The deadline to amend the pleadings is extended 120 days. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion by Daniel A Dailey for presentment of motion for extension of time to amend 109 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 6/1/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Dailey, Daniel) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Plaintiff County of Cook for extension of time to amend Pleadings (Unopposed) (Dailey, Daniel) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion hearing held on 5/18/16. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion to compel production of documents 105 is denied with leave to refile if necessary. Defendant should provide plaintiff with an index of the data fields for the seven active systems by 5/27/16 (6/3/16 for systems used by sub-servicers). The index should identify the field name as well as a brief description sufficient to identify the information intended to be captured by the field. The parties then are ordered to meet and confer to determine the data fields that will be produced by Defendant to Plaintiff and the time table for such production. Status hearing set for 6/28/16 at 11:00 a.m.; out of town counsel may appear by telephone and should provide the Court with a conference call in number. The parties should provide a status report to the Court no later than 6/23/16 regarding the status of these discussions. The status report should attach a copy of the index. In the event that additional motions to compel are filed in this case, the parties are advised that the Court will award reasonable costs and fees to the prevailing party at its discretion. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION by Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. to Plaintiff's Motion to compel 105 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Hletko, Valerie) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 5/13/2016 (jh, ). (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 4/27/2016 before the Honorable John Z. Lee. Court Reporter Contact Information: ALEXANDRA ROTH, alexandra_roth@ilnd.uscourts.gov (312) 408-5038. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/1/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2016. (Roth, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 105 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Plaintiff County of Cook to compel production of documents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Kennedy, John) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status hearing held on 4/27/16. The parties provided the Court will an update on the status of discovery, including issues regarding production of loan data. To the extent that the parties are at issue with respect to certain discovery issues, motions to compel are due by 5/4/16; responses are due by 5/11/16; oral argument on the motion will take place on 5/18/16 at 2:00 p.m. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Defendants' motion to withdraw as counsel 101 is granted; Richard Gottlieb is granted leave to withdraw his appearance. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Valerie L Hletko for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney, 101 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/28/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Hletko, Valerie) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Attorney Richard E. Gottlieb to withdraw as attorney for Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc.. No party information provided (Hletko, Valerie) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Correction regarding document number, 97 (tmh, ) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AGREED order governing the protocol for the production of documents and electronically stored information Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 2/29/16Mailed notice(ca, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AGREED Confidentiality Order Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 2/29/16Mailed notice(ca, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Joint motion for entry of a agreed confidentiality order and agreed ESI protocol 95 is granted. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Main Document 97 replaced on 3/3/2016) (tmh, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Valerie L Hletko for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, 95 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 3/1/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Hletko, Valerie) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: 2/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Defendants Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Confidentiality Order and Agreed ESI Protocol (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Hletko, Valerie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AGREED Order Governing the protocol for the production of documents and electronically stored information by Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. (Hletko, Valerie) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 2/22/2016 (jh, ). (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AGREED Confidentiality Order by Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. (Hletko, Valerie) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 2/22/2016 (jh, ). (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status hearing held on 1/26/16. The parties are to exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by 3/1/16; initial written discovery requests are to be served by 3/22/16. The deadline to amend the pleading is 5/31/16. Fact discovery shall close on 1/31/17. The parties should meet and confer and file a joint motion for protective order and file their proposed ESI protocol by 2/19/16. Status hearing set for 4/27/16 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by County of Cook and HSBC et al., JOINT PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN (Dailey, Daniel) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 1/20/16. The parties should meet and confer and submit a joint discovery schedule by 1/22/16. Status hearing set for 1/26/16 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status hearing set for 1/20/16 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: 1/19/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Defendants' motion 81 for certification of the Court's order 76 of 9/30/15 for an interlocutory appeal is denied. A district court may certify an interlocutory appeal if the order (1) presents a controlling question of law (2) upon which there is substantial ground for difference of opinion and (3) an immediate appeal could materially advance the ultimate termination of the litigation. 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b). At a minimum, the second requirement is not met in this case. Defendants are correct that there is a split in this district over the requirements for standing under the Fair Housing Act (Title VIII of the Civil Rights Act of 1968, 42 U.S.C. § 3601 et seq.), compare Cnty. of Cook v. Wells Fargo & Co., No. 14 C 9548, 2015 WL 4397842 (N.D. Ill. July 17, 2015) (holding that county lacks standing) to Cnty. of Cook v. Bank of Am. Corp., No. 14 C 2280, 2015 WL 1303313 (N.D. Ill. Mar. 19, 2015) (holding the opposite), but the Court is persuaded that binding precedent mandates the conclusion that Cook County has standing under the FHA in this case. See Gladstone Realtors v. Village of Bellwood, 441 U.S. 91 (1979) (holding that a municipality satisfied standing requirements under the FHA); Gorski v. Troy, 929 F.2d 1183, 1188 (1991) (explaining that Congresss amendments to Title VIII since Gladstone were explicitly intended to "reaffirm" the decision in that case). Although the Supreme Court in Thompson v. North American Stainless, LP, 562 U.S. 170, 17677 (2011), criticized a broad statement about standing that originated in a Title VIII case that preceded Gladstone, the Supreme Court limited its holding in Thompson to Title VII cases. Id. at 176 ("In any event, it is Title VII rather than Title VIII that is before us here, and as to that we are surely not bound by the Trafficante dictum."). What is more, to the extent that Defendants take issue with Gladstone, the Supreme Court in Thompson acknowledged that the holding in Gladstone is compatible with the standing analysis articulated in Thompson. See id. Accordingly, the motion is denied. The parties should be prepared to discuss a briefing schedule at the status hearing on January 20, 2016. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/19/16. Mailed notice(ca, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS Report on Behalf of Plaintiff and All Defendants by County of Cook (Evangelista, James) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. to MOTION by Defendants Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, 81 in Support of Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal (Sandler, Andrew) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by County of Cook in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal. (Evangelista, James) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 12/3/2015 (jh, ). (Entered: 12/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion hearing held on 11/5/15. Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motion to certify order for interlocutory appeal [81 is due by 12/1/15; reply due by 12/15/15. The status hearing set for 12/3/15 is reset to 1/20/16 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to amended complaint by Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc.(Sandler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Andrew L. Sandler for presentment of motion for certificate of appealability, 81 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/5/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Sandler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: 10/28/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Defendants Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. for certificate of appealability (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal)(Sandler, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:By agreement of the parties, the status hearing set for 11/12/15 is reset to 12/3/15 at 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Defendants' agreed motion for extension of time to answer 77 is granted Defendants' answer is due by 10/28/15. The status hearing set for 10/15/15 is reset to 11/12/15 at 9:15 a.m. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Brett J Natarelli for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, 77 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 10/13/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Natarelli, Brett) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: 10/6/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Defendants Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Agreed Motion) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Natarelli, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 9/30/15Mailed notice(ca, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: For the reasons stated in the memorandum opinion and order, the Court denies Defendants' motion to dismiss 49 . A status hearing is set for 10/15/15 at 9:00 a.m. [For further details see memorandum opinion and order.] Mailed notice (ca, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion of James D. Montgomery, Jr. to withdraw as counsel for plaintiff Cook County, Illinois 72 is granted. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by James Douglas Montgomery, Jr for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 72 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 9/9/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Montgomery, James) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: 8/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Attorney James D. Montgomery, Jr. to withdraw as attorney for County of Cook. No party information provided (Montgomery, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. of Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sandler, Andrew) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by County of Cook of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kennedy, John) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by County of Cook of Supplemental Authority to Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order from DeKalb)(Dailey, Daniel) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/22/2014, Entered: 11/22/2014 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by County of Cook of Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Dailey, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: 10/20/2014 order on motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiff's motion to strike "notice of filing supplemental authority" 65 is denied. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: 10/17/2014 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Daniel A Dailey for presentment of motion to strike 65 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 10/23/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Dailey, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: 10/17/2014 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Plaintiff County of Cook to strike Defendants' Notice of Filing a Supplemental Authority (Dailey, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. re MOTION by Defendants HSBC USA, Inc., HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Bank USA National Association, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., Beneficial Company, LLC, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HFC Company LLC, HSBC Mor 49 Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sandler, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: 7/28/2014 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by County of Cook of filed Surreply (Dailey, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 62 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: 7/28/2014 Sur-Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUR-REPLY by Plaintiff County of Cook (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Dailey, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014 order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a surreply 56 is granted. No appearance is necessary on 7/29/14. Mailed notice (ca, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Daniel A Dailey for presentment of motion for leave to file 56 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 7/29/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Dailey, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: 7/24/2014 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by County of Cook of Presentment (Dailey, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: 7/24/2014 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff County of Cook for leave to file Surreply 56 (Sandler, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: 7/23/2014 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by County of Cook of Motion for Leave to File a Surreply (Dailey, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: 7/23/2014 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Plaintiff County of Cook for leave to file Surreply (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Dailey, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: 7/17/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. to MOTION by Defendants HSBC USA, Inc., HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Bank USA National Association, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., Beneficial Company, LLC, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HFC Company LLC, HSBC Mor 49 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Sandler, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: 7/3/2014 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by County of Cookin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants HSBC USA, Inc., HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Bank USA National Association, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., Beneficial Company, LLC, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HFC Company LLC, HSBC Mor 49 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Dailey, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: 7/3/2014 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by County of Cook Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dailey, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: 6/12/2014 Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss 49 due 7/3/14. Defendant's reply due 7/17/14. No appearance necessary on the motion. Court will rule by mail. Mailed notice (yp, ) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: 6/3/2014 notification of affiliates pursuant to local rule 3.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. re MOTION by Defendants HSBC USA, Inc., HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Bank USA National Association, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., Beneficial Company, LLC, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HFC Company LLC, HSBC Mor 49 (Sandler, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: 6/3/2014 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Andrew L. Sandler for presentment of motion to dismiss,, 49 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 6/17/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Sandler, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: 6/3/2014 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Defendants HSBC USA, Inc., HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Bank USA National Association, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., Beneficial Company, LLC, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HFC Company LLC, HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. to dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Mem. of Law in Supp. of Defs.' Mot. to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Text of Proposed Order, # 10 Certificate of Service)(Sandler, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: 5/27/2014 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court grants in part the parties' joint motion for excess pages 46 . Defendants' motion to dismiss will be limited to 20 pages, Plaintiff's opposition will be limited to 20 pages, and Defendants' reply will be limited to 15 pages. No appearance is required on the motion. Mailed notice (ca, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: 5/23/2014 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Brett J Natarelli for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, 46 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 5/29/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Natarelli, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: 5/23/2014 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Defendants Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Natarelli, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 5/20/14Mailed notice(ca, ). (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion to reassign a related case 39 is denied. [For further details see separate order.] Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Dailey, Daniel) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by County of Cook for Response to Motion for Reassigning a Case as Related (Dailey, Daniel) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by County of Cook to MOTION by Defendant Bank of America Corporation to reassign case as related 39 (Dailey, Daniel) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Joel Erik Connolly for presentment of motion to reassign case, 39 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 5/22/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Connolly, Joel) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Defendant Bank of America Corporation to reassign case as related (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Murry v. Am.s Mortgage Banc, Inc., 2004 WL 407010 (N.D. Ill. Mar. 1, 2004), # 7 Pena v. Freedom Mortgage Team, Inc., 2007 WL 3223394 (N.D. Ill. Oct. 24, 2007))(Connolly, Joel) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 4/24/2014 before the Honorable John Z. Lee. Court Reporter Contact Information: ALEXANDRA ROTH, alexandra_roth@ilnd.uscourts.gov (312) 408-5038. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/2/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2014. (Roth, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. by Mark E. Rooney (Rooney, Mark) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. by Ann D. Wiles (Wiles, Ann) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. by Valerie L Hletko (Hletko, Valerie) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. by Andrew L. Sandler (Sandler, Andrew) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motions for leave to appear pro hac vice by Andrew Sandler 29 , Valerie Hletko 30 , Ann Wiles 31 and Mark Rooney 32 are granted. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9422845. (Rooney, Mark) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9422798. (Wiles, Ann) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9422769. (Hletko, Valerie) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9422648. (Sandler, Andrew) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion hearing held on 4/24/14. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendant's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead 22 is granted; responsive pleading is due by 6/3/14. The status hearing set for 5/7/14 is stricken.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff County of Cook by Daniel A Dailey (Dailey, Daniel) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT by Defendants Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. regarding reply, 25 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Natarelli, Brett) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by Defendants Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. to motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief,,,, 22 (Natarelli, Brett) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTIONS To Extension of Time (Montgomery, James) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Richard Eric Gottlieb for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief,,,, 22 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/24/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Gottlieb, Richard) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Defendants Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint 1 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Gottlieb, Richard) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. by Richard Eric Gottlieb (Gottlieb, Richard) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Beneficial Company, LLC, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HFC Company LLC, HSBC Bank USA National Association, HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc. by Brett J Natarelli (Natarelli, Brett) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by County of Cook as to All Defendants. (Montgomery, James) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by County of Cook as to All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit)(Montgomery, James) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff County of Cook by Darren Penn (Penn, Darren) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff County of Cook by Jeffrey Harris (Harris, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff County of Cook by James M. Evangelista (Evangelista, James) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff County of Cook by David J. Worley (Worley, David) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff County of Cook by Michelle M. Montgomery (Montgomery, Michelle) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED complaint by County of Cook against All Defendants (Montgomery, James) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff County of Cook by James Douglas Montgomery, Jr (Montgomery, James) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice by James Evangelista 6 , David Worley 7 , Darren Penn 8 and Jeffrey Harris 9 are all granted. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9332581. (Harris, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9332549. (Penn, Darren) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9332459. (Worley, David) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9332412. (Evangelista, James) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff County of Cook by James D. Montgomery, Sr (Montgomery, James) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 5/7/14 at 9:15 a.m. The parties are directed to file an initial status report as set forth in the Judge's standing order four business days prior to the status hearing.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kennedy, John) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff County of Cook by John K. Kennedy (Kennedy, John) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT filed by County of Cook; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9318124.(Kennedy, John) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 2,039 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?