District Appellate Supreme
Federal
District Of Columbia District Court Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit United States Supreme Court

Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd. v. CLS Bank International, et al.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 13-298

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alice Corporation, Pty Ltd., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carter G Phillips +1 202 736 8270 +7368 736 736 8711 cphillips@sidley.com
No Logo CLS Bank International, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Perry +1 202 887 3667 +1 202 530 9696 mperry@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Accenture Global Services, GmbH, et al., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by monoguelaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Michael Jakes +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 mike.jakes@finnegan.com
No Logo American Antitrust Institute, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by antitrustinstitute.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randy M. Stutz +1 202 905 5420 rsturz@antitrustinstitute.org
American Civil Liberties Union American Civil Liberties Union, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sandra Shin-Young Park +1 212 549 2668 +1 212 549 2580 spark@aclu.org
No Logo Business Software Alliance, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew John Pincus +1 202 263 3220 +1 202 263 3300 apincus@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Checkpoint Software, Inc., et al., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Durie Tangri LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A Lemley +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 mlemley@durietangri.com
No Logo Computer & Communications Industry Association, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Computer & Communications Industry Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew A. Levy +1 202 783 0070 mlevy@ccianet.org
No Logo Conejo Valley Bar Association, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Socal IP Law Group LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Charles Sereboff +8052 301 350 x220 +1 805 230 1355 ssereboff@socalip.com
No Logo Dale R. Cook, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by diazcook.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dale R. Cook +1 253 324 7423 dale@diazcook.com
Electronic Frontier Foundation Electronic Frontier Foundation, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Soonuk Kwun +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 michael@eff.org
Space Julie P. Samuels +1 415 436 9993 julie@eff.org
Google, Inc. Google, Inc., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daryl Joseffer +1 202 626 9252 +1 202 626 3737 djoseffer@kslaw.com
No Logo Intellectual Property Owners Association, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Bartley Eppenauer +1 425 765 0650 beppenauer@shb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Harrty and Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Bartley Eppenauer +1 425 765 0650 beppenauer@shb.com
No Logo Law, Business, and Economics Scholars, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Brennan Center for Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Michael Schultz +1 212 992 7365 schultzj@law.nyu.edu
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Amicus Curiae
Unknown Role, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Unknown Role, Facebook, Inc.
Unknown Role, Visiocorp
Unknown Role, Immersion Corp
Unknown Role, Avanade Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Washington, D.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey A. Lamken +1 202 639 7978 +1 202 639 7890 jlamken@mololamken.com
No Logo Professors Peter S. Menell and Jeffrey A. Lefstin, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by UC Berkeley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter S. Menell +1 510 642 5489 pmenell@law.berkeley.edu
No Logo Public Knowledge, et al., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Knowledge

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Duan +1 202 861 0020 cduan@publicknowledge.org
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Red Hat, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert H. Tiller +1 919 754 4232 rtiller@redhat.com
No Logo RichRelevance, Inc., et al., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM M. JAY +1 202 346 4000 +1 202 346 4444 wjay@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Software Freedo Law Center, et al., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Software Freedom Law Center, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eben Moglen +1 212 461 1900 moglen@softwarefreedom.org
No Logo Students of Patent Law, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by University of California Hastings College of the Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rory K. Little +1 415 565 4669 littler@uchastings.edu
No Logo The Clearing House Association L.L.C., et al., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Henry Burgess +1 202 879 5957 +1 202 879 5200 wburgess@kirkland.com
No Logo The Juhasz Law Firm PC, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by The Juhasz Law Firm PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Robert Juhasz +1 713 260 9651 pjuhasz@patenthorizon.com
No Logo Tony Dutra, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Antonio Dutra +1 703 341 3926 tonydutra@comcast.net
No Logo Trading Technologies International, et al., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Trading Technologies International, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven F. Borsand +1 312 476 1000 steve.borsand@tradingtechnologies.com
United States of America United States of America, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald B. Verrilli +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
No Logo American Intellectual Property Law Association, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson & Sheridan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Robin Selinger +1 214 272 0957 +1 214 296 0246 jselinger@pattersonsheridan.com
No Logo Association Of The Bar Of The City Of New York, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Sills Cummis Epstein & Gross PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles E. Miller +1 212 643 7000 cmiller@sillscummis.com
No Logo Brian R. Galvin, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by royraineylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roy Allison Horan +1 360 692 0777 roy@royraineylaw.com
No Logo Gibbons Institute of Law, Science and Technology, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbons PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David E. DeLorenzi +1 973 596 4500 +1 973 596 0545 ddelorenzi@gibbonslaw.com
No Logo IEEE-USA, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chris J. Katopis +1 202 200 9490 chriskatopis@gmail.com
No Logo Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margaret M. Duncan +1 312 372 2000 mduncan@mwe.com
No Logo International Association for the Protection of Intellectual Property, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip C. Swain +1 617 832 1150 +1 617 832 7000 pswain@foleyhoag.com
International Business Machines Corporation International Business Machines Corporation, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Bancroft PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 234 0090 +1 202 234 2806 pclement@bancroftpllc.com
No Logo James B. Lampert, and David A. Chavous, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Blaine Lampert +1 978 208 0404 james.lampert@comcast.net
No Logo Margo Livesay Ph.D., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by livesay-ip.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margo Livesay +1 202 684 8685 margo@livesay-IP.com
No Logo New York Intellectual Property Law Association, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Amster Rothstein & Ebenstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Robert Macedo +1 212 336 8074 +1 212 336 8001 cmacedo@arelaw.com
No Logo Paul R. Michel, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by fr,com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Hieken +1 617 542 5070 heiken@fr,com
No Logo Professor Lee Hollaar, and Peter K. Trzyna, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Karol Trzyna 1 +14 +14 1444 pkt-law@sbcglobal.net
No Logo Professor Robin Feldman, and U.C. Hastings Institute for Innovation Law,, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by University of California Hastings College of the Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Cooper Feldman +1 415 565 4661 feldmanr@uchastings.edu
No Logo Proove Biosciences, Inc., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick R. Delaney +1 703 628 7074 patrickrdelaney@gmail.com
No Logo Retailers, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Brann & Isaacson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter J. Brann +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 pbrann@brannlaw.com
No Logo Ronald M. Benrey, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert R. Sachs +1 650 988 8500 rsachs@fenwick.com
No Logo SHFL entertainment, Inc. n, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by gkaserweil Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adrian M. Pruetz +1 310 553 3000 apruetz@gkaserweil
No Logo Sigram Schindler Beteiligungsgesellschaft Mbh, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Sughrue Mion, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chidambaram S. Iyer +1 202 775 7542 +1 202 293 7860 ciyer@sughrue.com
No Logo Trading Technologies International, Inc., et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
Lower Court Linked with 13A95
Lower Court Case No(s). 2011-1301
Lower Court Decision Date 5/10/2013
  Entries (76) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 76 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
    LREF
    Blank 75 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
    Reply of petitioner Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd. filed. (Distributed)
      LREF
      Blank 74 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
      Brief amici curiae of The Clearing House Association L.L.C., et al. filed. (Distributed)
        LREF
        Blank 73 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
        Brief amicus curiae of American Antitrust Institute filed. (Distributed)
          LREF
          Blank 72 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
          Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
            LREF
            Legal Document 71 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
            Brief amicus curiae of Computer & Communications Industry Association filed. (Distributed)
              LREF
              Blank 70 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
              Brief amicus curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation filed. (Distributed)
                LREF
                Legal Document 69 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                Brief amici curiae of Google Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 68 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                  Brief amici curiae of Checkpoint Software, Inc., et al. filed.
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 67 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                    Brief amici curiae of Microsoft Corporation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 66 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                      Brief amici curiae of Professors Peter S. Menell and Jeffrey A. Lefstin filed. (Distributed)
                        LREF
                        Blank 65 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                        Brief amici curiae of Software Freedom Law Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 64 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                          Brief amici curiae of RichRelevance, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
                            LREF
                            Blank 63 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                            Brief amicus curiae of BSA / The Software Alliance filed. (Distributed)
                              LREF
                              Blank 62 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                              Brief amicus curiae of Tony Dutra filed. (Distributed)
                                LREF
                                Blank 61 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                Brief amicus curiae of Red Hat, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 60 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                  Brief amici curiae of Law, Business, and Economics Scholars filed. (Distributed)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 59 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                    Brief amicus curiae of American Civil Liberties Union filed. (Distributed)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 58 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                      Brief amicus curiae of the United States filed. (Distributed)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 57 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                        Brief amici curiae of Public Knowledge, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 56 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                          Brief amicus curiae of The Juhasz Law Firm, P.C. filed. (Distributed)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 55 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                            Brief of respondents CLS Bank International, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 54 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                              Letter received from counsel for amicius curiae Ronald M. Benrey proposing a lodging of the book entitled "Understanding Digital Computers" (1964). Distributed.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 53 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                CIRCULATED.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Owners Association filed.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Ronald M. Benrey in support of neither party filed.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Advanced Biological Laboratories, SA filed.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Association of the Bar of the City of New York in support of neither party filed.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                          Brief amicus curiae of New York Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 47 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Brief amicus curiae of IEEE-USA in support of neither party filed.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 46 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Margo Livesay Ph.D. in support of neither party filed.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Conejo Valley Bar Association in support of neither party filed.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Brian R. Galvin in support of neither party filed.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of SHFL entertainment, Inc. in support of neither party filed.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 42 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      Brief amici curiae of Professor Robin Feldman, and U.C. Hastings Institute for Innovation Law, in support of neither party filed.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago in support of neither party filed.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 40 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          Brief amici curiae of Trading Technologies International, Inc., et al. filed.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 39 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of International Business Machines Corporation in support of neither party filed.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 38 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Sigram Schindler Beteiligungsgesellschaft mbH in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 37 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                Brief amici curiae of James B. Lampert, and David A. Chavous in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Proove Biosciences, Inc. in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 34 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Professor Lee Hollaar, and Peter K. Trzyna in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of International Association for the Protection of Intellectual Property in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Paul R. Michel in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Dale R. Cook filed.
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 30 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Retailers in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                Brief of petitioner Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd. filed.
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Joint appendix (3 volumes) filed. (Statement of costs filed)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Record received from U.S.C.A. Federal Circuit. 1 Box.
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Record received from U.S.D.C. District of Columbia. The record is electronic.
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, March 31, 2014
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondents.
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Petition GRANTED.
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 6, 2013.
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Reply of petitioner Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd. filed.
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Brief of respondents CLS Bank International, et al. in opposition filed.
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Brief amici curiae of Students of Patent Law filed.
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of New York Intellectual Property Law Association filed.
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago filed.
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Institute of Electrical and Electronics Engineers, Inc.- USA filed.
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of Accenture Global Services, GmbH, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Gibbons Institute of Law, Science and Technology in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Professor Lee Hollaar, and Peter K. Trzyna in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Sigram Schindler Beteiligungsgesellschaft mbH filed.
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Brief amici curiae of Trading Technologies International, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation filed.
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Dale R. Cook filed.
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Consent to filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or neither party, received from counsel for petitioner Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd..
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Letter of September 13, 2013, from counsel for respondents received.
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 6, 2013.
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondents.
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 7, 2013)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Application (13A95) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 6, 2013.
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Application (13A95) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 8, 2013 to September 6, 2013, submitted to The Chief Justice.
                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 1,196 times.

                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?