Babbage Holdings, LLC v. 505 Games Interactive, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00749
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 4, 2017 at 7:01 PM EDT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Babbage Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Charhon, Callahan, Robson & Garza PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Chase Callahan +1 214 521 6400 +1 214 764 8392 scallahan@ccrglaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Matthew Garza +1 214 521 6400 +1 214 764 8392 agarza@ccrglaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ujaala Rashid +1 214 521 6400 +1 214 764 8392 urashid@ccrglaw.com
v.
No Logo 505 Games (U.S.) Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Erise IP, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R Hart +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 paul.hart@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Christopher Lang +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 mark.lang@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan J Redmond +1 913 777 5613 +1 913 777 5601 megan.redmond@eriseip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com
No Logo 505 Games Interactive, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Lee Gillam, Jr. +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 gil@gillamsmithlaw.com
Space William Robert Lamb +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 wrlamb@gillamsmithlaw.com
No Logo 2k Games, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo 2ksports, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Activision Blizzard, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Activision, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Activision Publishing, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/11/2015 Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/11/2015 Paul R Hart +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 paul.hart@eriseip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/11/2015, PRO HAC VICE Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
TERMINATED: 03/11/2015 Albert F. Harris, III al.harris@eriseip.com
TERMINATED: 03/11/2015 Mark Christopher Lang +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 mark.lang@eriseip.com
TERMINATED: 03/11/2015 Megan J Redmond +1 913 777 5613 +1 913 777 5601 megan.redmond@eriseip.com
No Logo Bandai Namco Games America Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/11/2015 Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/11/2015 Albert F. Harris, III al.harris@eriseip.com
TERMINATED: 03/11/2015 Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com
No Logo Bandai Namco Holdings USA Inc, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bandai Namco Holdings USA Inc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bandai Namco Holdings USA Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/11/2015 Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/11/2015 Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com
No Logo Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Capcom U.s.a., Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com
Electronic Arts, Inc. Electronic Arts, Inc., Consol Defendant
Officer/Director, F5 Networks, Inc.
Officer/Director, East West Bancorp, Inc.
Officer/Director, Trex Co Inc
Officer/Director, Teledyne Technologies Inc.
Stamps.com, Inc. Officer/Director, Stamps.com, Inc.
No Logo Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Jonathan Fox +1 213 892 5200 +1 213 892 5454 bfox@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy J Ray +1 213 892 5446 +1 213 892 5454 wray@mofo.com
No Logo Namco Bandai Games America Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Erise IP, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com
No Logo Namco Bandai Holdings (USA), Consol Defendant
Nintendo of America, Inc. Nintendo of America, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Reginald J. Hill +1 312 222 9350 rhill@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Unikowsky +1 202 639 6041 +1 202 661 4925 aunikowsky@jenner.com
No Logo Riot Games, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Rockstar Games, Inc., Consol Defendant
Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karineh Khachatourian +1 650 847 4150 +1 650 847 4151 kkhachatourian@duanemorris.com
Sony Online Entertainment LLC Sony Online Entertainment LLC, Consol Defendant
No Logo Square Enix of America Holdings, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Square Enix, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Take-two Interactive Software, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Ubisoft Holdings, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/11/2015 Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/11/2015 Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com
No Logo Ubi Soft, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Babbage Holdings, LLC, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Babbage Holdings, LLC, Consol Counter Defendant
No Logo Deborah G Hankinson, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1800

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah G Hankinson +1 214 754 9190 +1 214 754 9140 dhankinson@hankinsonlaw.com
Nintendo of America, Inc. Nintendo of America, Inc., Consol Counter Claimant
No Logo Scott Woloson, Technical Advisor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Scott Woloson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Woloson +1 281 352 9878 +1 281 978 2172 scott@scottwolosonlaw.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (197) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Stay
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal (Babbage and Riot Games) by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER terminating 118 Transfer for Improper Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a) upon stipulated dismissal of the party 169 . Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/25/2014. (jrg3) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Claim Construction Chart/Prehearing Statement
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Stay
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None Reply to Claim Construction Brief
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Expedite
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Stay
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Reply to Claim Construction Brief
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Expedite
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Claim Construction Brief
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Claim Construction Chart/Prehearing Statement
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER finding as moot 29 Motion to Dismiss in light of subsequently amended complaint and 85 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/29/14. (jrg3) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER finding as moot 13 Motion to Dismiss in light of subsequently amended complaint and 85 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/29/14. (jrg3) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 103 Amended Complaint by Electronic Arts, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Additional Attachments to Main Document: 118 MOTION to Transfer for Improper Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a) .. (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 7/15/2014 (nkl, ). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Transfer for Improper Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a) by 505 Games (U.S.) Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2014: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 107 Amended Complaint by Ubisoft, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 106 Amended Complaint by 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 105 Amended Complaint by Square Enix, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 104 Amended Complaint by Riot Games, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 102 Amended Complaint by Capcom U.S.A., Inc..(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 101 Amended Complaint by Bandai Namco Games America Inc.(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 100 Amended Complaint by Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 99 Amended Complaint by 505 Games (U.S.) Inc.(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., 505 Games (U.S.) Inc, 505 Games Interactive, Inc., Activision Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Bandai Namco Games America Inc, Bandai Namco Holdings USA Inc, Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc., Riot Games, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Sony Online Entertainment, LLC, Square Enix of America Holdings, Inc., Square Enix, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Ubisoft Holdings, Inc., Ubisoft, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 98 Motion to Substitute Party. Activision Publishing, Inc. added. Activision Blizzard, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/25/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Complaint) against Ubisoft, Inc., filed by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Patent In Suit))(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Complaint) against 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., filed by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Patent In Suit))(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Complaint) against Square Enix, Inc., filed by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Patent In Suit))(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Complaint) against Riot Games, Inc., filed by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Patent In Suit))(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Complaint) against Electronic Arts, Inc., filed by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Patent In Suit))(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Complaint) against Capcom U.S.A., Inc., filed by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Patent In Suit))(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Complaint) against Bandai Namco Games America Inc, filed by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Patent In Suit))(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT (Third Amended Complaint) against Activision Blizzard, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., filed by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Patent In Suit))(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Complaint) against 505 Games (U.S.) Inc, filed by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Patent In Suit))(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Substitute Party And Amend Case Caption by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 15 Amended Complaint by Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc..(Fox, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice) by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 94 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Activision Blizzard, Inc.; Activision, Inc.,; Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.; Capcom U.S.A., Inc.; Capcom Entertainment, Inc.; Electronic Arts, Inc.; Namco Bandai Games America Inc.; Namco Bandai Holdings (USA);Riot Games, Inc.; Square Enix, Inc.; Square Enix of America Holdings, Inc.; Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.; Rockstar Games, Inc.; 2KSports, Inc.; 2K Games, Inc.;Ubisoft, Inc.; and Ubisoft Holdings, Inc. Deadline 6/26/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/20/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINTS by 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Inc., Bandai Namco Games America Inc, Bandai Namco Holdings USA Inc, Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc., Riot Games, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings, Inc., Square Enix, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Ubisoft Holdings, Inc., Ubisoft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc. Service of Responses and Objections to Babbage Holdings, LLC's Second Set of Common Interrogatories (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Motion for Name Change. Defendants Namco Bandai Games America, Inc. and Namco Bandai Holdings (USA) has been changed to Bandai Namco Games America Inc and Bandai Namco Holdings USA Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/13/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AGREED DISCOVERY ORDER re 71 Agreed MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AGREED DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/10/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 87 Motion to Withdraw Indirect Infringement Claims. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/10/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 85 Motion to Withdraw Indirect Infringement Claims. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/10/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 84 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ActivisionBlizzard, Inc.; Activision, Inc.,; Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.; Capcom U.S.A., Inc.;Capcom Entertainment, Inc.; Electronic Arts, Inc.;Namco Bandai Games America Inc.; Namco Bandai Holdings (USA); Riot Games, Inc.; Square Enix, Inc.; Square Enix of America Holdings, Inc.;Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.; Rockstar Games, Inc.; 2KSports, Inc.; 2K Games, Inc.; Ubisoft, Inc.; and Ubisoft Holdings, Inc. Deadline is 6/19/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/10/14. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw Indirect Infringement Claims by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Inc., Babbage Holdings LLC, Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc., Namco Bandai Games America, Inc., Namco Bandai Holdings (USA), Riot Games, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings, Inc., Square Enix, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Ubisoft Holdings, Inc., Ubisoft, Inc. JOINT NOTICE OF AGREEMENT REGARDING INDIRECT INFRINGEMENT AND REQUEST TO CANCEL JUNE 27 HEARING (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw Indirect Infringement Claims by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaints by 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., 505 Games (U.S.) Inc, 505 Games Interactive, Inc., Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc., Namco Bandai Games America, Inc., Namco Bandai Holdings (USA), Riot Games, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings, Inc., Square Enix, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Ubisoft Holdings, Inc., Ubisoft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 9/6/2014., Jury Selection set for 6/8/2015 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 2/6/2014., Markman Hearing set for 12/2/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions due by 4/6/2015., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/20/2015. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/6/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., 505 Games (U.S.) Inc, Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Inc., Babbage Holdings LLC, Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc., Namco Bandai Games America, Inc., Namco Bandai Holdings (USA), Nintendo of America, Inc., Riot Games, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Sony Online Entertainment, LLC, Square Enix of America Holdings, Inc., Square Enix, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Ubisoft Holdings, Inc., Ubisoft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 79 Motion Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to answer. Activision Blizzard, Inc Activision, Inc.,; Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.; Capcom U.S.A., Inc.; Capcom Entertainment, Inc.; Electronic Arts, Inc.; Namco Bandai Games America Inc.; Namco Bandai Holdings (USA);Riot Games, Inc.; Square Enix, Inc.;Square Enix of America Holdings, Inc.; Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.; Rockstar Games, Inc.; 2KSports, Inc.; 2K Games, Inc.; Ubisoft, Inc.; and Ubisoft Holdings, Inc. Deadline is 6/12/14. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/2/14. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 36 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINTS by 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc., Namco Bandai Games America, Inc., Namco Bandai Holdings (USA), Riot Games, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Square Enix of America Holdings, Inc., Square Enix, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Ubisoft Holdings, Inc., Ubisoft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/28/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 75 Agreed Motion to Extend Deadline to Submit a Protective Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/28/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Entry of Protective Order by 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., 505 Games (U.S.) Inc, Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Inc., Babbage Holdings LLC, Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc., Namco Bandai Games America, Inc., Namco Bandai Holdings (USA), Nintendo of America, Inc., Riot Games, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Sony Online Entertainment, LLC, Square Enix of America Holdings, Inc., Square Enix, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Ubisoft Holdings, Inc., Ubisoft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE TO SUBMIT A PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Sony Online Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 67 Motion for Extension of Time to File Certain Deadlines. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/20/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 69 Motion to for Leave to file under seal. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/20/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 68 Motion for extension of time to Submit Protective Order. Deadline is 5/23/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/20/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AGREED DISCOVERY ORDER by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Sony Online Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 70 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 36 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California filed by 505 Games (U.S.) Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Seal by 505 Games (U.S.) Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Agreed MOTION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE TO SUBMIT A PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Sony Online Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Order and Protective Order by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Babbage Holdings LLC of Compliance Regarding Initial Disclosures (Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AGREED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 9/16/2014., Jury Selection set for 6/8/2015 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 2/6/2015., Markman Hearing set for 12/2/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions due by 4/6/2015., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/20/2015. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/6/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 58 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/6/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 57 Motion to Seal Response to Dft's Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/6/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by 2K Games, Inc., 2KSports, Inc., 505 Games (U.S.) Inc, 505 Games Interactive, Inc., Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Inc., Babbage Holdings LLC, Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc., Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc., Namco Bandai Games America, Inc., Namco Bandai Holdings (USA), Nintendo of America, Inc., Riot Games, Inc., Rockstar Games, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Sony Online Entertainment, LLC, Square Enix of America Holdings, Inc., Square Enix, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Ubisoft Holdings, Inc., Ubisoft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Docket Control Order)(Hill, Reginald) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc. OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING INITIAL AND ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURES (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Sony Online Entertainment, LLC of Compliance Regarding Initial and Additional Disclosures (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Deborah Hankinson, filed by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document 56 Sealed Response to Motion,,, by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 56 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 36 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit, # 31 Exhibit, # 32 Exhibit, # 33 Exhibit, # 34 Exhibit, # 35 Exhibit, # 36 Exhibit, # 37 Exhibit, # 38 Exhibit, # 39 Exhibit, # 40 Exhibit, # 41 Exhibit, # 42 Exhibit)(Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 53 Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Paragraphs 1 & 3. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/29/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 52 Motion TO Extend Certain Deadlines. Deadline 5/5/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/29/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO COMPLY WITH PARAGRAPHS 1 & 3 by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Sony Online Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clyde Moody Siebman on behalf of Nintendo of America, Inc. (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 49 Motion For Leave to Take Agreed Upon Venue Discovery and Proposed Schedule For Associated Transfer Briefing. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/3/14. (mrm, ) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Discovery (Motion for Leave to Take Agreed Upon Venue Discovery and Proposed Schedule Regarding Associated Transfer Briefing) by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The new deadline is APRIL 1, 2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/31/14. (bas, ) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reginald J Hill on behalf of Nintendo of America, Inc. (Hill, Reginald) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam G Unikowsky on behalf of Nintendo of America, Inc. (Unikowsky, Adam) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motions to Transfer Venue by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wendy J Ray on behalf of Konami Digital Entertainment, Inc. (Ray, Wendy) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sony Corporation for Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony Online Entertainment, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC for Sony Online Entertainment, LLC. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 36 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California Responses due by 3/27/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/21/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER - setting Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2014 02:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/20/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motions to Transfer Venue by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER - the above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:13-CV-749. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/19/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint's Claims of Indirect Patent Infringement filed by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California by 505 Games (U.S.) Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Ian Howe, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint's Claims of Indirect Patent Infringement filed by 505 Games (U.S.) Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint's Claims of Indirect Patent Infringement filed by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Eric A Buresh on behalf of 505 Games (U.S.) Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4529024. (Buresh, Eric) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Babbage Holdings LLC of Readiness for Scheduling Conference (Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEMAND for Trial by Jury by 505 Games (U.S.) Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by 505 Games (U.S.) Inc identifying Corporate Parent 505 Games S.r.L., an Italian Company for 505 Games (U.S.) Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint's Claims of Indirect Patent Infringement by 505 Games (U.S.) Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Paul R Hart on behalf of 505 Games (U.S.) Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4523894. (Hart, Paul) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Megan J Redmond on behalf of 505 Games (U.S.) Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4523876. (Redmond, Megan) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mark Christopher Lang on behalf of 505 Games (U.S.) Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4523852. (Lang, Mark) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re 505 Games (U.S.) Inc.( Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Babbage Holdings LLC (Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 15 Amended Complaint. Deadline is 1/27/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/24/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 15 Amended Complaint by 505 Games Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 20 Motion to Withdraw 18 Notice of Readiness. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/15/2014. (sm, ) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Issued as to 505 Games U.S. per amended complaint (ch, ) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #21***NOTICE by Babbage Holdings LLC of Readiness for Scheduling Conference (Rashid, Ujaala) Modified on 1/16/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Additional Attachments to Main Document: 15 Amended Complaint.. (Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Babbage Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT , First against 505 Games Interactive, Inc., filed by Babbage Holdings LLC.(Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ujaala Rashid on behalf of Babbage Holdings LLC (Rashid, Ujaala) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss by 505 Games Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of S. Salbe, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Babbage Holdings LLC of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Request for Injunction (Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Robert Lamb on behalf of 505 Games Interactive, Inc. (Lamb, William) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Babbage Holdings LLC of Related Cases (Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re 505 Games Interactive, Inc. (Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The new deadline is DECEMBER 5, 2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/30/13. (bas, ) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by 505 Games Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Issued as to 505 Games Interactive, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Babbage Holdings, LLC (Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Chase Callahan on behalf of Babbage Holdings, LLC (Callahan, Steven) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against 505 Games Interactive, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4327371.), filed by 505 Games Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garza, Anthony) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 215 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?