SADLER et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:11-vv-00040

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 30, 2016 at 12:30 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo KRISTI SADLER, Petitioner
No Logo KURT SADLER, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Lommen, Abdo, Cole, King & Stageberg, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila Ann Bjorklund +1 612 336 9312 +1 612 339 8064 sheila@lommen.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent James Matanoski +1 202 616 4124 +1 202 616 4310 vincent.matanoski@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 300
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING Election to Accept Judgment as to Fees and Costs by KRISTI SADLER, KURT SADLER. (Bjorklund, Sheila) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded attorneys fees and other litigation costs in the amount of $13,378.22, in addition to the May 16, 2011 judgment of compensation. This award shall be in the form of a check made payable to petitioner and petitioners attorney.(Copy to parties) (lld) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
      JOINT NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by KRISTI SADLER, KURT SADLER re 17 DECISION of Special Master - Fees. (Bjorklund, Sheila) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
        Petitioner's Election to Accept 16 Judgment. (Bjorklund, Sheila) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
          ORDER granting 19 petitioner's motion to redact decision on fees and costs. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A) (jc3) Copy to parties. (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/27/2011: # 1 Order) (tjk). (Entered: 05/26/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
            MOTION to Redact 17 DECISION of Special Master - Fees, filed by KRISTI SADLER, KURT SADLER.Response due by 6/13/2011. (Bjorklund, Sheila) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
              Order granting petitioner's motion to redact the 4/12/2011 unpublished decision awarding compensation. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(jc3) Copy to parties. (Entered: 05/25/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
                DECISION on Attorney's Fees and Costs. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (jc3) Copy to parties. (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                  JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded compensation in the amount of $250,000.00.(Copy to parties) (lld) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                    STIPULATION for Fees, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Matanoski, Vincent) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                      MOTION to Redact 13 DECISION of Special Master, filed by KRISTI SADLER, KURT SADLER.Response due by 5/2/2011. (Bjorklund, Sheila) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                        DECISION. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (jc3) Copy to parties. (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                          Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Matanoski, Vincent) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent shall file her Rule 4 report by 4/7/2011. A status conference is set, sua sponte, for 4/12/2011 at 10:30 A.M. Eastern Time. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (jc3) Copy to parties. (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                              STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Matanoski, Vincent) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                STATEMENT of Completion by KRISTI SADLER, KURT SADLER. (Bjorklund, Sheila) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                  Exhibit List, filed by KRISTI SADLER, KURT SADLER. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kurt Sadler, Ex. 7)(Bjorklund, Sheila) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                    Exhibit List Exhibits 1 - 4, filed by KRISTI SADLER, KURT SADLER, NOTICE of Intent to File on Compact Disc pursuant to Vaccine General Order #13 filed by KRISTI SADLER, KURT SADLER(Compact Disc due by 2/8/2011.). (Bjorklund, Sheila) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent James Matanoski for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.. (Matanoski, Vincent) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall submit any outstanding medical records and affidavits by 2/23/2011. The deadline for respondent's Rule 4 report is suspended. Respondent shall file a status report 30 days after petitioner files a statement of completion. This report shall indicate whether the medical records filed are complete, and if so, shall propose a date for respondent's Rule 4 report. A status confernece will be set after respondent files her Rule 4 report. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (jc3) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                          INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (jc3) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (tjk, ) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, ) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $350, Receipt number 071816) (Filed with CD containing Exhibits 3-6 and Motion to Convert Case to ECF), filed by KURT SADLER, KRISTI SADLER.Respondents Report due by 4/13/2011.(tjk, ) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 208 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?