Killer Joe Nevada LLC v. Does 1-15
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00848

Tags
Last Updated July 23, 2017 at 12:30 AM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Killer Joe Nevada LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity AG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leon David Bass +1 614 431 2277 +1 614 221 0554 ldb@lawbass.com
v.
No Logo Heather Dew, Defendant
No Logo Ina Whirlow, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOES 1-15, Defendant
No Logo Phillip Spain, Defendant
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Certificate of Clerk
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Default Judgment (Motion for)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Default Judgment (Motion for)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Killer Joe Nevada LLC. (Bass, Leon) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                  Application to Clerk for entry of default against Heather Dew . (Bass, Leon) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 16 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to show cause within fourteen (14) days why this action should not be dismissed against the second defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 7/7/2014. (agm1) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                      LREF
                      Blank 15 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                      Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Phillip Spain (pes1) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                        Application to Clerk for entry of default against Phillip Spain . (Bass, Leon) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 13 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                          Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Ina Whirlow. (agm) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                            SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Heather Dew served on 5/1/2014, answer due 5/22/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt Return) (sr1) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                              SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Phillip Spain. Phillip Spain served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (pes1) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons were sent to the named defendants via certified mail. (er1) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                  Summons Issued as to Heather Dew, Phillip Spain and Ina Whirlow. (er1) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against Phillip Spain, Ina Whirlow, Heather Dew, filed by Killer Joe Nevada LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Summons Form P. Spain, # 3 Summons Form I. Whirlow, # 4 Summons Form H. Dew) (Bass, Leon) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: 12/31/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [6] Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Summons and Complaint - extension to 4/25/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 12/31/2013. (kk2)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: 12/24/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
                                        MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 4/25/2014. For Additional Time to Serve Summons and Complaint by Plaintiff Killer Joe Nevada LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Leon Bass, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: 9/11/2013 Related Case MemorandumCourt Filing
                                          RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:13-cv-439, 2:13-cv-440, 2:13-cv-441 and 2:13-cv-442 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Edmund A Sargus and Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus, Judge Algenon L Marbley and Judge Michael H Watson on 9/11/2013. (pes1)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [3] Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 8/30/13. (sh1)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013 Motion for Discovery
                                              Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery Application for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff Killer Joe Nevada LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Killer Joe Nevada LLC. (Bass, Leon)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against John Does 1-15 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-4239113), filed by Killer Joe Nevada LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B) (Bass, Leon)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 115 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?