Remote Vehicle Security System

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 10229757
Examiner Nam V Nguyen, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Nam V Nguyen
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Kapolka, Michael, Applicant

Represented by McDonnell Boehnen Hulbert & Berghoff LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LAWRENCE AARONSON +1 312 913 0001
Space Michael Anderson +1 312 913 3342
Space Jeffrey Armstrong +1 312 913 0001
Space Alison Baldwin +1 312 913 0001
Space Michael Baniak +1 312 460 5000
Space Paul Berghoff +1 312 913 0001
Space Denis Berntsen +1 312 671 2813
Space Isadora Bielsky +1 312 913 0001
Space Daniel Boehnen +1 312 913 0001
Space Michael Borella +1 312 913 0001
Space S. Carden +1 312 913 0001
Space Christopher Cavan +1 312 913 0001
Space Yijan Chang +1 650 467 5096
Space Nathaniel Chongsiriwatana +1 312 913 0001
Space David Ciesielski +1 312 913 0001
Space Michael Clifford +1 312 913 0001
Space Bradley Crawford +1 989 638 8254
Space James DeGiulio +1 312 913 2109
Space Grantland Drutchas +1 312 913 0001
Space Thomas Fairhall +1 312 913 0001
Space Sarah Fendrick +1 312 913 3369
Space David Frischkorn +1 312 913 0001
Space Paula Fritsch +1 312 913 0001
Space Jori Fuller +1 312 913 0001
Space Michael Gannon +1 312 913 0001
Space Patrick Gattari +1 312 913 0001
Space David Grabelsky +1 312 913 0001
Space Michael Greenfield +1 312 913 0001
Space James Gumina +1 312 913 0001
Space DAVID S. HARPER +1 312 913 0001
Space Joseph Herndon +1 312 913 0001
Space Lisa Hillman +1 312 913 0001
Space Gary Hood +1 312 913 0001
Space A Hughes +1 319 913 3200
Space Bradley Hulbert +1 312 913 0001
Space Paul Kafadar +1 312 913 0001
Space Nicole Keenan +1 312 913 0001 keenan@mbhb.com
Space Andrea Klock +1 312 913 3363
Space Sydney Kokjohn +1 312 913 3304
Space Alan Krantz +1 312 913 0001
Space Jennifer Kurcz +1 312 913 0001
Space George Lee +1 312 913 0001
Space Jelena Libby +1 312 913 0001
Space Timothy Long +1 312 913 0001
Space Thomas Loos +1 312 913 0001
Space Jessica Lunney +1 650 458 7644
Space Richard Machonkin +1 312 913 0001
Space James McCarthy +1 312 913 0001
Space John McDonnell +1 312 913 0001
Space Michelle Mcmullen-tack +1 312 913 0001 mcmullen-tack@mbhb.com
Space Kwame Mensah +1 312 913 0001
Space EMILY MIAO +1 312 913 0001
Space Scott Miller +1 312 913 3350
Space Eric Moran +1 312 913 0001
Space Jeremy Noe +1 312 913 0001
Space Kevin Noonan +1 312 913 0001
Space Sherri Oslick +1 312 913 0001
Space Anthoula Pomrening +1 312 913 0001 +1 312 913 0002 pomrening@mbhb.com
Space Nicole E. Reifman +1 312 913 0001
Space Joshua Rich +1 312 913 0001
Space Cole Richter +1 312 913 0001
Space Kurt Rohde +1 312 913 0001
Space Matthew Sampson +1 312 913 0001
Space Steven Sarussi +1 312 913 0001
Space Rory Shea +1 312 913 0001
Space Leif R. Sigmond, Jr. +1 312 913 0001 +1 312 913 0002 sigmond@mbhb.com
Space John Smith +1 312 913 3367
Space James Suggs +1 312 913 0001
Space Sean Sullivan +1 312 913 0001
Space Anita Terpstra +1 312 913 0001
Space Kirsten Thomson +1 312 913 3329
Space Marcus Thymian +1 312 913 0001
Space Paul Tully +1 312 913 0001
Space Dmitriy Vinarov +1 608 262 0459
Space Sandra Weiss +1 312 913 0001
Space Thomas Wettermann +1 312 913 0001
Space Andrew Williams +1 312 913 0001
Space Daniel Williams +1 312 913 0001
Space Donald Zuhn +1 312 913 0001
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Kapolka, Michael, Sterling Heights, MI (US)
Filing Date August 28, 2002
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 65855-0079
Confirmation Number 1969
Group Art Unit 2612
Class / Sub-Class 340 / 6
Timeline
  Entries (110) Tab Overlap Assignments (7) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Dispatch to FDC
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Response to 312 Amendment (PTO-271)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - ANE.I
Amendment After Final or under 37CFR 1.312, initialed by the examiner. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CTMS
Miscellaneous Action with SSP (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Response to Amendment under Rule 312
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Notice of Allowance (Rule 312)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Received
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - IFEE
Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (10 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - A.NA
Amendment after Notice of Allowance (Rule 312) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - ANE.I
Amendment After Final or under 37CFR 1.312, initialed by the examiner. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (PTO-875) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (10 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: None Prosecution - A.NE
Amendment After Final (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
Final Rejection (14 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/26/2005, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (9 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/24/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (PTO-875) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (11 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (13 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None Prior Art - 1449
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (13 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/26/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Response to Election / Restriction Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/26/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/26/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (PTO-875) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/26/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/26/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - ELC.
Response to Election / Restriction Filed (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Restriction Requirement
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - 1449
List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CTRS
Requirement for Restriction/Election (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Restriction/Election Requirement
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Reference capture on IDS
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
Foreign Reference (16 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
Foreign Reference (12 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
Foreign Reference (14 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
NPL Documents (5 Pages)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed (SB/08) (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Rescind Nonpublication Request for Pre Grant Publication
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
Power of Attorney (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - IRFND
Processed Request for Refund (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/12/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - IMIS
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - CFILE
Request for Corrected Filing Receipt (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Now Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Refund
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed (SB/08) (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (PTO-875) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (PTO-875) (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
Oath or Declaration filed (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (9 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
Specification (19 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (7 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - 136A
Authorization for Extension of Time all replies (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
Transmittal of New Application (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Pacr - OATH
Oath or Declaration filed (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Pacr - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (7 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Pacr - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Pacr - CLM
Claims (9 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Pacr - SPEC
Specification (19 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Pacr - TRNA
Transmittal of New Application (5 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 2 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?